Urena v. Shaw
Plaintiff: Amaury Urena
Defendant: Captain Shaw
Case Number: 1:2022cv04679
Filed: June 3, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Ronnie Abrams
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 25, 2022 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Shaw waiver sent on 7/25/2022, answer due 9/23/2022. Document filed by Shaw..(Guillaume, Melissa)
June 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 INFORMATION PACKAGE MAILED to Amaury Urena, 2412102214, at G.R.V.C., 09-09 Hazen St., East Elmhurst, NY 11370, on 6/24/2022 Re: #6 Order of Service. The following document(s) were enclosed in the Service Package: a copy of the order of service or order to answer and other orders entered to date, the individual practices of the district judge and magistrate judge assigned to your case, Instructions for Litigants Who Do Not Have Attorneys, Notice Regarding Privacy and Public Access to Electronic Case Files, a Motions guide, a notice that the Pro Se Manual has been discontinued, a Notice of Change of Address form to use if your contact information changes, a handout explaining matters handled by magistrate judges and consent form to complete if all parties agree to proceed for all purposes before the magistrate judge. (sha)
June 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF SERVICE: The Clerk of Court is directed to notify the New York City Department of Correction and the New York City Law Department of this order. The Court requests that Captain Shaw (Shield No. #1683) waive service of summons. The Clerk of Court is directed to mail an information package to Plaintiff. Waiver of Service due by 7/25/2022. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 6/23/2022) (ate) Transmission to Pro Se Assistants for processing.
June 16, 2022 Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (aea)
June 16, 2022 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Ronnie Abrams. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (aea)
June 13, 2022 MAILING RECEIPT: Document No: 4. Mailed to: Amaury Urena 2412102214 G.R.V.C. 09-09 Hazen St. East Elmhurst, NY 11370. (kh)
June 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER GRANTING IFP APPLICATION IN PRISONER CASE: The Clerk of Court is directed to send a copy of this order and the prisoner authorization to the agency having custody of Plaintiff. That agency is directed to forward copies of Plaintiff's prison trust fund account for the past six months and to disburse the payments required under 28 U.S.C. 1915 to the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York and to include the above docket number on the disbursement before sending it to the Court. If Plaintiff is transferred to another facility, the current facility shall provide a copy of this order to the facility to which Plaintiff is transferred. Finally, it is Plaintiff's obligation to promptly submit a written notification to the Court if Plaintiff's address changes, and the Court may dismiss the action if Plaintiff fails to do so. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 6/10/2022) (vn)
June 3, 2022 Filing 3 PRISONER AUTHORIZATION. Document filed by Amaury Urena..(rdz)
June 3, 2022 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Shaw. Document filed by Amaury Urena..(rdz)
June 3, 2022 Filing 1 REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by Amaury Urena..(rdz)
June 3, 2022 Case Designated ECF. (rdz)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Urena v. Shaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amaury Urena
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Captain Shaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?