Yan Luis v. St Barth Group, LLC
Plaintiff: Kevin Yan Luis
Alternative Dispute Resolution (Adr) Provider: St Barth Group, LLC
Case Number: 1:2022cv04722
Filed: June 6, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lorna G Schofield
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 12132 Americans with Disabilities Act - Discrimination
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND SCHEDULING ORDER: All parties do not consent to conducting all further proceedings before a United States Magistrate Judge, including motions and trial. See 28 U.S.C. 636(c). Amended Pleadings due by 8/29/2022. Joinder of Parties due by 8/29/2022. Deposition due by 12/12/2022. Fact Discovery due by 12/12/2022. Expert Discovery due by 1/27/2023. This case is to be tried to a jury. Counsel for the parties have conferred and their present best estimate of the length of trial is 3 days. Telephone Conference set for 2/15/2023 at 04:20 PM before Judge Lorna G. Schofield. A party wishing to file a summary judgment or other dispositive motion shall file a pre-motion letter at least two weeks before the conference and in the form provided in the Court's Individual Rule III.A.1. Any party wishing to oppose shall file a responsive letter as provided in the same Individual Rule. The motion will be discussed at the conference. To join the conference, the parties shall call (888) 363-4749 and use Access Code 558-3333. The time of the conference is approximate, but the parties shall be ready to proceed at that time. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 8/4/2022) (mml)
August 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the August 10, 2022, initial pretrial conference is cancelled. If the parties believe that a conference would nevertheless be useful, they should inform the court immediately so the conference can be reinstated. The case management plan and scheduling order will issue in a separate order. The parties' attention is particularly directed to the provisions for periodic status letters, and the need for a pre-motion letter to avoid cancellation of the final conference and setting of a trial date. It is further ORDERED that if Defendant seeks to file a motion to dismiss, Defendant shall file a premotion letter pursuant to Individual Rules III.A.1 and III.C.2 by August 12, 2022. If Defendant has not filed a pre-motion letter or otherwise responded to the Complaint by August 12, 2022, Plaintiff shall file a proposed order to show cause for default judgment and supporting papers as required by the Court's Individual Rules. It is further ORDERED, regarding settlement discussions, if and when the parties are ready to proceed with a settlement conference with the assigned Magistrate Judge or mediation in the Court's mediation program, they shall file a joint letter on ECF requesting a referral. The parties should be aware that the Court does not extend the deadlines for fact and expert discovery absent compelling circumstances. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 8/4/2022) (mml)
August 4, 2022 Filing 10 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN. Document filed by Kevin Yan Luis. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Joint Letter).(Abou-Saab, Noor)
August 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED the parties shall file a joint letter and proposed case management plan as soon as possible and no later than August 4, 2022, at 12:00 P.M. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 8/3/2022) (tg)
July 26, 2022 Filing 8 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. St Barth Group, LLC served on 6/20/2022, answer due 7/11/2022. Document filed by Kevin Yan Luis..(Abou-Saab, Noor)
July 17, 2022 Filing 7 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by St Barth Group, LLC..(Stein, David)
July 17, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David Stein on behalf of St Barth Group, LLC..(Stein, David)
June 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: This case has been assigned to me for all purposes. It is hereby ORDERED that a telephonic conference will be held on August 10, 2022 at 4:20 p.m. The parties shall call (888) 363-4749 and enter the access code 558-3333, as further set forth. Initial Conference set for 8/10/2022 at 04:20 PM before Judge Lorna G. Schofield. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 6/24/2022) (mml)
June 7, 2022 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to St Barth Group, LLC. (vf)
June 7, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Noor Abou-Saab, I. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: St Barth Group, LLC. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party role was entered incorrectly. (vf)
June 7, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Noor Abou-Saab, I to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Form is Blank. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. (vf)
June 7, 2022 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Lorna G. Schofield. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vf)
June 7, 2022 Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vf)
June 7, 2022 Case Designated ECF. (vf)
June 6, 2022 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to St Barth Group, LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Kevin Yan Luis..(Abou-Saab, Noor)
June 6, 2022 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT-BLANK FORM - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Abou-Saab, Noor) Modified on 6/7/2022 (vf).
June 6, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against St Barth Group, LLC. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-26244735)Document filed by Kevin Yan Luis..(Abou-Saab, Noor)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Yan Luis v. St Barth Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Yan Luis
Represented By: Noor Abou-Saab, I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Alternative dispute resolution (adr) provider: St Barth Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?