Belmond Anguilla Owner, LLC v. DCK International, LLC et al
Petitioner: Belmond Anguilla Owner, LLC
Respondent: DCK International, LLC and DCK Worldwide, LLC
Case Number: 1:2022cv04817
Filed: June 8, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Alvin K Hellerstein
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 9 U.S.C. ยง 9 Motion to Confirm Arbitration Award
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 18, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 18, 2022 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Petition to Compel/Confirm/Modify/Stay/Vacate Arbitration,. Service was accepted by Tammy Rose who is authorize to accept service. Document filed by Belmond Anguilla Owner, LLC..(Hutchinson, Jenna)
July 18, 2022 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Petition to Compel/Confirm/Modify/Stay/Vacate Arbitration,. DCK Worldwide, LLC served on 7/14/2022, answer due 8/4/2022. Service was accepted by Augustine Lizarazo who is authorize to accept service. Document filed by Belmond Anguilla Owner, LLC..(Hutchinson, Jenna)
July 18, 2022 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Petition to Compel/Confirm/Modify/Stay/Vacate Arbitration,. Service was accepted by Tammy Rose who is authorized to accept service. Document filed by Belmond Anguilla Owner, LLC..(Hutchinson, Jenna)
July 18, 2022 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Petition to Compel/Confirm/Modify/Stay/Vacate Arbitration,. DCK International, LLC served on 7/14/2022, answer due 8/4/2022. Service was accepted by Augustine Lizarazo who is authorize to accept service. Document filed by Belmond Anguilla Owner, LLC..(Hutchinson, Jenna)
July 11, 2022 Filing 8 PROPOSED ORDER. Document filed by Belmond Anguilla Owner, LLC. Related Document Number: 001 ..(Hutchinson, Jenna) Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
July 11, 2022 ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED ORDER. Document No. #8 Proposed Order was reviewed and approved as to form. (km)
July 7, 2022 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to DCK Worldwide, LLC..(jgo)
July 7, 2022 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to DCK International, LLC..(jgo)
July 6, 2022 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to DCK International, LLC, re: #1 Petition to Compel/Confirm/Modify/Stay/Vacate Arbitration,. Document filed by Belmond Anguilla Owner, LLC..(Hutchinson, Jenna)
July 6, 2022 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to DCK Worldwide, LLC, re: #1 Petition to Compel/Confirm/Modify/Stay/Vacate Arbitration,. Document filed by Belmond Anguilla Owner, LLC..(Hutchinson, Jenna)
June 9, 2022 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vf)
June 9, 2022 Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vf)
June 9, 2022 Case Designated ECF. (vf)
June 8, 2022 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Other Affiliate Belmond Anguilla Member LLC for Belmond Anguilla Owner, LLC. Document filed by Belmond Anguilla Owner, LLC..(Hutchinson, Jenna)
June 8, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Hutchinson, Jenna)
June 8, 2022 Filing 1 PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-26258862).Document filed by Belmond Anguilla Owner, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Contract, #2 Exhibit B - Belmond Demand, #3 Exhibit C - DCK Counterclaim, #4 Errata D - Final Award).(Hutchinson, Jenna)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Belmond Anguilla Owner, LLC v. DCK International, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Belmond Anguilla Owner, LLC
Represented By: Jenna Christine Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: DCK International, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: DCK Worldwide, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?