Richards v. Long Island Railroad Company
Plaintiff: Captain Michael Richards and Michael Richards
Defendant: Long Island Railroad Company
Case Number: 1:2022cv04924
Filed: June 13, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: J Paul Oetken
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 45 U.S.C. ยง 51 Railways: Fed. Employer's Liability Act
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 27, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Counsel for all parties are directed to appear telephonically for an initial pretrial conference with the Court on August 30, 2022, at 12:00 p.m. Counsel should call (888) 557-8511 at the scheduled time. The access code is 9300838. Initial Conference set for 8/30/2022 at 12:00 PM before Judge J. Paul Oetken. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 7/27/2022) (ate)
July 26, 2022 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Long Island Railroad Company..(Yodice, Christopher)
July 26, 2022 Filing 6 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent METROPOLITAN TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY, Other Affiliate MTA Bridges & Tunnels, Other Affiliate MTA Capital Construction, Other Affiliate MTA Bus Company, Other Affiliate MTA Staten Island Railway, Other Affiliate MTA Metro North Commuter Railroad, Other Affiliate MTA New York City Transit for Long Island Railroad Company. Document filed by Long Island Railroad Company..(Yodice, Christopher)
July 7, 2022 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Long Island Railroad Company waiver sent on 6/16/2022, answer due 8/15/2022. Document filed by Michael Richards..(Wietzke, Marc)
June 14, 2022 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Long Island Railroad Company. (vf)
June 14, 2022 Case Designated ECF. (vf)
June 14, 2022 Magistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vf)
June 14, 2022 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge J. Paul Oetken. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vf)
June 13, 2022 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Wietzke, Marc)
June 13, 2022 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Long Island Railroad Company, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Michael Richards..(Wietzke, Marc)
June 13, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Long Island Railroad Company. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-26272064)Document filed by Michael Richards..(Wietzke, Marc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Richards v. Long Island Railroad Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Captain Michael Richards
Represented By: Marc Twyman Wietzke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Richards
Represented By: Marc Twyman Wietzke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Long Island Railroad Company
Represented By: Christopher P. Yodice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?