The 32BJ North Pension Fund and its Board of Trustees v. AF&G Realty Associates, LLC et al
Plaintiff: The 32BJ North Pension Fund and its Board of Trustees
Defendant: AF&G Realty Associates, LLC, Aisenberg Family Holdings LLC, Bernard P. Aisenberg Standard Marital Trust, Bernard P. Aisenberg Credit Shelter Trust, Estate of Michele Aisenberg, Chestnut Beacon L.P., Jonathan Aisenberg Living Trust, Nadya L. Aisenberg Trust FBO Margaret Aisenberg, Margaret Aisenberg, James Aisenberg 2016 Revocable Trust, Robert Aisenberg and Elizabeth Crane
Case Number: 1:2022cv04984
Filed: June 14, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Alvin K Hellerstein
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1132 E.R.I.S.A.: Civil Enforcement of Employee Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 26, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 26, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) AF&G Realty Associates, LLC, Aisenberg Family Holdings LLC, Bernard P. Aisenberg Credit Shelter Trust, Bernard P. Aisenberg Standard Marital Trust, Chestnut Beacon L.P., Elizabeth Crane, Estate of Michele Aisenberg, James Aisenberg 2016 Revocable Trust, Jonathan Aisenberg Living Trust, Margaret Aisenberg, Nadya L. Aisenberg Trust FBO Margaret Aisenberg, Robert Aisenberg. Document filed by The 32BJ North Pension Fund and its Board of Trustees. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)...(Golfo, Meredith)
July 26, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL. Notice to Attorney Meredith Golfo. RE-FILE Document No. #10 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal,,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the parties whom the voluntary dismissal is against were not selected;. Re-file the document using the event type Notice of Voluntary Dismissal found under the event list Notices - select the correct filer/filers - select the correct party/parties the voluntary dismissal is against - and attach the correct signed PDF. (nd)
July 25, 2022 Filing 10 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR - NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) All Defendants. Document filed by The 32BJ North Pension Fund and its Board of Trustees. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)...(Golfo, Meredith) Modified on 7/26/2022 (nd).
June 21, 2022 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Aisenberg Family Holdings LLC..(jgo)
June 17, 2022 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Aisenberg Family Holdings LLC, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by The 32BJ North Pension Fund and its Board of Trustees..(Golfo, Meredith)
June 15, 2022 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Robert Aisenberg..(pc)
June 15, 2022 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to AF&G Realty Associates, LLC..(pc)
June 15, 2022 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Robert Aisenberg, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by The 32BJ North Pension Fund and its Board of Trustees..(Golfo, Meredith)
June 15, 2022 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to AF&G Realty Associates, LLC, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by The 32BJ North Pension Fund and its Board of Trustees..(Golfo, Meredith)
June 15, 2022 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by The 32BJ North Pension Fund and its Board of Trustees..(Golfo, Meredith)
June 15, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Golfo, Meredith)
June 15, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Meredith B Golfo. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code XX Out of State;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to New York;. (pc)
June 15, 2022 Magistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
June 15, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Meredith B Golfo. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (pc)
June 15, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Meredith B Golfo. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand $155,000; County code Albany;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to blank; the County code has been modified to XX Out of State;. (pc)
June 15, 2022 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
June 15, 2022 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
June 14, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against AF&G Realty Associates, LLC, Aisenberg Family Holdings LLC, Bernard P. Aisenberg Credit Shelter Trust, Bernard P. Aisenberg Standard Marital Trust, Chestnut Beacon L.P., Elizabeth Crane, Estate of Michele Aisenberg, James Aisenberg 2016 Revocable Trust, Jonathan Aisenberg Living Trust, Margaret Aisenberg, Nadya L. Aisenberg Trust FBO Margaret Aisenberg, Robert Aisenberg. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-26281722)Document filed by The 32BJ North Pension Fund and its Board of Trustees. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F).(Golfo, Meredith)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The 32BJ North Pension Fund and its Board of Trustees v. AF&G Realty Associates, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The 32BJ North Pension Fund and its Board of Trustees
Represented By: Meredith B Golfo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AF&G Realty Associates, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aisenberg Family Holdings LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bernard P. Aisenberg Standard Marital Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bernard P. Aisenberg Credit Shelter Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Estate of Michele Aisenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chestnut Beacon L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan Aisenberg Living Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nadya L. Aisenberg Trust FBO Margaret Aisenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Margaret Aisenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Aisenberg 2016 Revocable Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Aisenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth Crane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?