NMB Therapeutics, Inc. v. National Fire Insurance Company of Hartford
Plaintiff: NMB Therapeutics, Inc.
Defendant: CNA Financial Insurance Company and National Fire Insurance Company of Hartford
Case Number: 1:2022cv05057
Filed: June 16, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Valerie E Caproni
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity Action
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 3, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 STIPULATION OF DISCONTINUANCE WITHOUT PREJUDICE AGAINST DEFENDANT CNA FINANCIAL CORPORATION SUED HEREIN AS CNA FINANCIAL INSURANCE COMPANY: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED that Plaintiffs Action against Defendant CNA Financial Corporation ("CNAF") sued herein as CNA FINANCIAL INSURANCE COMPANY is hereby discontinued, without prejudice, and without costs to any party; and it is further, STIPULATED AND AGREED, that Plaintiffs Action against Defendant NATIONAL FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY OF HARTFORD, shall remain pending; and it is further, STIPULATED AND AGREED, case caption shall be amended as follows: As further set forth by this Order. and it is further STIPULATED AND AGREED, that pending motion filed by counsel for CNA Financial Corporation sued herein as CNA Financial Insurance Company, is withdrawn without prejudice, and it is further, STIPULATED AND AGREED, that this Stipulation may be executed in counterparts and a fully executed facsimile or email copy of the within Stipulation shall have the same force and effect as if it contained original signatures. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the case against Defendant CNA Financial Insurance Company is DISMISSED without prejudice and without costs (including attorneys' fees) to either party. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all other deadlines with respect to CNA Financial Insurance Company are CANCELLED. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to amend the case caption to terminate CNA Financial Insurance Company as a party in this action, as this dismissal is operative only as between Plaintiff and CNA Financial Insurance Company. The Clerk of Court is also respectfully directed to close the open motion at docket entry 12. SO ORDERED.CNA Financial Insurance Company terminated. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 7/6/2022) (tg)
July 6, 2022 ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Document No. #15 Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal, was reviewed and referred to Judge Valerie E. Caproni for approval for the following reason(s): the plaintiff(s) filed their voluntary dismissal and it did not dismiss all of the parties or the action in its entirety. (tp)
July 5, 2022 Filing 15 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice against the defendant(s) CNA Financial Insurance Company and without costs pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by CNA Financial Insurance Company. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)...(Cornibe, Melissa)
June 23, 2022 Filing 14 DECLARATION of David B. Lehman in Support re: #12 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint.. Document filed by CNA Financial Insurance Company..(Lee, Janet)
June 23, 2022 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #12 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint. . Document filed by CNA Financial Insurance Company..(Lee, Janet)
June 23, 2022 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint. Document filed by CNA Financial Insurance Company..(Lee, Janet)
June 23, 2022 Filing 11 AMENDED LETTER addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Janet J. Lee dated June 23, 2022 re: Dkt 10 Letter re Exhibit to Answer. Document filed by National Fire Insurance Company of Hartford..(Lee, Janet)
June 23, 2022 Filing 10 LETTER addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Janet J. Lee dated June 23, 2022 re: Exhibit to Answer to Complaint. Document filed by CNA Financial Insurance Company, National Fire Insurance Company of Hartford. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - NFICH Policy).(Lee, Janet)
June 23, 2022 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal). Document filed by National Fire Insurance Company of Hartford..(Lee, Janet)
June 23, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Janet Jakyung Lee on behalf of CNA Financial Insurance Company, National Fire Insurance Company of Hartford..(Lee, Janet)
June 22, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 8/26/2022 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 443, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Valerie E. Caproni. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 6/22/2022) (va)
June 17, 2022 Filing 6 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Lee, Janet)
June 17, 2022 Filing 5 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Continental Casualty Company, Other Affiliate The Continental Corporation, Other Affiliate Loews Corporation for National Fire Insurance Company of Hartford. Document filed by National Fire Insurance Company of Hartford..(Lee, Janet)
June 17, 2022 Filing 4 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Other Affiliate Loews Corporation for CNA Financial Insurance Company. Document filed by CNA Financial Insurance Company..(Lee, Janet)
June 17, 2022 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Valerie E. Caproni. Judge Cathy Seibel is no longer assigned to the case. (vba)
June 17, 2022 Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vba)
June 17, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Janet Jakyung Lee to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Notice of Removal. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the event wrong event type was used to file the civil cover sheet. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. (sj)
June 17, 2022 Magistrate Judge Andrew E. Krause is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (sj)
June 17, 2022 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Cathy Seibel. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(sj)
June 17, 2022 Case Designated ECF. (sj)
June 16, 2022 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - CORPORATE PARENT/OTHER AFFILIATE NOT ADDED - RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Continental Casualty Company for National Fire Insurance Company of Hartford. Document filed by National Fire Insurance Company of Hartford..(Lee, Janet) Modified on 6/16/2022 (lb).
June 16, 2022 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - CORPORATE PARENT/OTHER AFFILIATE NOT ADDED - RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by CNA Financial Insurance Company..(Lee, Janet) Modified on 6/16/2022 (lb).
June 16, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from New York Supreme Court, County of Bronx. Case Number: 806454/2022E. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-26291944).Document filed by National Fire Insurance Company of Hartford, CNA Financial Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - State Court Documents, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet).(Lee, Janet)
June 16, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Notice to Attorney Janet Jakyung Lee to RE-FILE Document No.'s #2 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement and #3 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the corporate parent/other affiliate was not added;. Re-file these documents using the event type Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement found under the event list Other Documents - select the correct filer/filers - attach the correct PDF - when prompted with the message "Are there any corporate parents or other affiliates?", select the Yes radio button - enter the corporate parent/other affiliate, click the Search button - select the correct corporate parent/other affiliate name from the search results list or if no person found, create a new corporate parent/other affiliate - select the party to whom the corporate parent/other affiliate should be linked - add corporate parent/other affiliate names one at a time. (lb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NMB Therapeutics, Inc. v. National Fire Insurance Company of Hartford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NMB Therapeutics, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CNA Financial Insurance Company
Represented By: Janet Jakyung Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Fire Insurance Company of Hartford
Represented By: Janet Jakyung Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?