Federal Insurance Company v. Topocean Consolidation Service Los Angeles Inc.
Plaintiff: Federal Insurance Company
Defendant: Topocean Consolidation Service Los Angeles Inc.
Case Number: 1:2022cv05273
Filed: June 22, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Paul A Engelmayer
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 46 U.S.C. ยง 1701 Violation of Shipping Act of 1984 (DISCONTINUED AFTER 1/27/2014)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 22, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 22, 2022 Filing 21 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from the United States District Court - District of California Central; Case Number: 2:21-cv-10016. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket entries received.
June 22, 2022 CONSOLIDATED MDL CASE: Create association to 1:22-md-03028-PAE. (laq)
June 22, 2022 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE - TRANSFER CASE: This case is assigned to: Judge Paul A. Engelmayer. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(laq)
June 22, 2022 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:22-md-03028-PAE. (laq)
June 22, 2022 Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (laq)
June 22, 2022 Case Designated ECF. (laq)
June 22, 2022 NOTE TO OUT OF STATE ATTORNEYS: Please visit the Court's website at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/ for information regarding admission to the S.D.N.Y. Bar and the CM/ECF Rules & Filing Instructions. (laq)
June 16, 2022 Filing 20 TRANSFER ORDER from the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, MDL 3028, transferring case to USDC, Southern District of New York and assigned to Honorable Paul A. Engelmayer. Case transferred electronically 6/17/2022. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (lc) [Transferred from California Central on 6/22/2022.]
June 7, 2022 Filing 19 JOINT REPORT of RE MDL ORDER AND SETTLEMENT filed by Plaintiff Federal Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Southwick, Joshua) [Transferred from California Central on 6/22/2022.]
June 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER DIRECTING COUNSEL TO ADHERE TO COURT'S ORDER AND FILE JOINT REPORT by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha: On March 25, 2022, the court ordered the parties to file a Joint Report pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f) by June 3, 2022. (Dkts. #15 , #17 ). The parties failed to file the Joint Report. Counsel shall file the report no later than June 10, 2022. The Scheduling Conference is continued to June 24, 2022 at 1:00 PM. Counsel are reminded to adhere to the deadlines set by the court. Any future failure to do so may result in the imposition of sanctions. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (tf) TEXT ONLY ENTRY [Transferred from California Central on 6/22/2022.]
March 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO CONTINUE SCHEDULING CONFERENCE TO JUNE 17, 2022 1:00 PM #16 by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha. (lc) [Transferred from California Central on 6/22/2022.]
March 18, 2022 Filing 16 STIPULATION to Continue Scheduling Conference from April 1, 2022 to June 17, 2022 Re: Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only #15 filed by defendant Topocean Consolidation Service Los Angeles Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order)(Kehagiaras, Andrew) [Transferred from California Central on 6/22/2022.]
February 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha. Scheduling Conference set for 4/1/2022 at 01:00 PM before Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha. (tf) [Transferred from California Central on 6/22/2022.]
January 31, 2022 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by defendant Topocean Consolidation Service Los Angeles Inc., identifying New York Marine and General Insurance Company. (Kehagiaras, Andrew) [Transferred from California Central on 6/22/2022.]
January 31, 2022 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by defendant Topocean Consolidation Service Los Angeles Inc..(Attorney Andrew D Kehagiaras added to party Topocean Consolidation Service Los Angeles Inc. (pty:dft))(Kehagiaras, Andrew) [Transferred from California Central on 6/22/2022.]
January 10, 2022 Filing 12 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Federal Insurance Company, upon Defendant Topocean Consolidation Service Los Angeles Inc. served on 1/10/2022, answer due 1/31/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Jacob Wu - Clerk & Authorized to Accept Service in compliance with statute not specified by substituted service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Southwick, Joshua) [Transferred from California Central on 6/22/2022.]
January 7, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Plaintiff Federal Insurance Company. Related Case(s): 2:21-cv-08974 SB (SKx); 2:21-cv-9159 MCS (PDx); 2:21-cv-08985 SB (PDx); 2:21-cv-09007 MCS (PDx); 2:21-cv-09083 MWF (MRWx); 2:21-cv-09400 RSWL (MARx); 2:21-cv-09605 FLA (JPRx); 2:21-cv-08784-RSWL-MAR; 2:21-cv-82000-CJC-AS; 2:21-cv-10016-FLA-GJS (Southwick, Joshua) [Transferred from California Central on 6/22/2022.]
January 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha. (tf) [Transferred from California Central on 6/22/2022.]
January 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 21-01 (Related Case) filed. Transfer of case declined by Judge Cormac J. Carney, for the reasons set forth on this order. Related Case No. 2:21-cv-07655 CJC(ASx) (rn) [Transferred from California Central on 6/22/2022.]
January 3, 2022 Filing 8 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (car) [Transferred from California Central on 6/22/2022.]
January 3, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) [Transferred from California Central on 6/22/2022.]
January 3, 2022 Filing 6 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Topocean Consolidation Service Los Angeles Inc.. (car) [Transferred from California Central on 6/22/2022.]
January 3, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fernando L Aenlle-Rocha and Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish. (car) [Transferred from California Central on 6/22/2022.]
December 30, 2021 Filing 4 Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Federal Insurance Company, identifying Federal Insurance Company - insurer of cargo; Drive DeVilbiss Healthcare - cargo owner. (Southwick, Joshua) [Transferred from California Central on 6/22/2022.]
December 30, 2021 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Federal Insurance Company. (Southwick, Joshua) [Transferred from California Central on 6/22/2022.]
December 30, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Federal Insurance Company. (Southwick, Joshua) [Transferred from California Central on 6/22/2022.]
December 30, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-32549908 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Federal Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Attorney Joshua A Southwick added to party Federal Insurance Company(pty:pla))(Southwick, Joshua) [Transferred from California Central on 6/22/2022.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Federal Insurance Company v. Topocean Consolidation Service Los Angeles Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Federal Insurance Company
Represented By: Michael J. Cummins
Represented By: Joshua A. Southwick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Topocean Consolidation Service Los Angeles Inc.
Represented By: Andrew D Kehagiaras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?