Hatwood v. Ricotta et al
Plaintiff: Annette Hatwood
Defendant: Thomas Ricotta and Ricotta & Marks P.C.
Case Number: 1:2022cv05528
Filed: June 28, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Laura Taylor Swain
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 22, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2022 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Certified Copy of Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re: #6 Notice of Appeal. (tp)
August 22, 2022 Appeal Record Sent to USCA (Electronic File). Certified Indexed record on Appeal Electronic Files for #6 Notice of Appeal filed by Annette Hatwood were transmitted to the U.S. Court of Appeals. (tp)
August 18, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEAL from #5 Judgment - Sua Sponte (Complaint), #4 Order of Dismissal. Document filed by Annette Hatwood. Form D-P is due within 14 days to the Court of Appeals, Second Circuit. (tp)
August 18, 2022 Appeal Fee Due: for #6 Notice of Appeal. Appeal fee due by 9/1/2022. (tp)
August 18, 2022 Appeal Remark as to #6 Notice of Appeal filed by Annette Hatwood. IFP Denied 08/01/2022. (tp)
August 3, 2022 MAILING RECEIPT: Document No: 4-5. Mailed to: Annette Hatwood 135 W 123 Street New York, NY 10027. Mailed: (Attachments: # 1 PRO SE APPEAL PACKAGE) (dsh)
August 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CIVIL JUDGMENT: For the reasons stated in the August 1, 2022, order, this action is dismissed. The Court certifies under 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from the Court's judgment would not be taken in good faith. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 8/1/22) (Attachments: #1 PRO SE APPEAL PACKAGE) (rdz)
August 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF DISMISSAL: Accordingly, the Court dismisses this action for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(h)(3). The Court dismisses this action for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(h)(3). The Court certifies under 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore IFP status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). Judgment shall issue. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 8/1/22) (rdz)
July 14, 2022 MAILING RECEIPT: Document No: 3. Mailed to: Annette Hatwood 135 W 123 Street New York, NY 10027. (kh)
July 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER GRANTING IFP APPLICATION: Leave to proceed in this Court without prepayment of fees is authorized. 28 U.S.C. 1915. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 7/13/2022) (vn)
July 13, 2022 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT - SUA SPONTE to Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (laq)
June 28, 2022 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Thomas Ricotta, Ricotta & Marks P.C.. Document filed by Annette Hatwood..(rdz)
June 28, 2022 Filing 1 REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by Annette Hatwood..(rdz)
June 28, 2022 Case Designated ECF. (rdz)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hatwood v. Ricotta et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Annette Hatwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Ricotta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ricotta & Marks P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?