Sticky Fingers Restaurants, LLC v. Sticky's Holdings, LLC
Plaintiff: Sticky Fingers Restaurants, LLC
Defendant: Sticky's Holdings, LLC
Case Number: 1:2022cv05606
Filed: June 30, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: John P Cronan
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1114 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 9, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. Defendant's unopposed request is granted. The Initial Pretrial Conference ("IPTC") currently scheduled for September 27, 2022 is adjourned to September 28, 2022, at 1:00 p.m. At the scheduled time, counsel for all parties should call (866) 434-5269, access code 9176261. The parties shall submit the pre-IPTC joint letter and the proposed case management plan and scheduling order, see Dkt. 14 at 1-2, by September 21, 2022. SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 9/28/2022 at 01:00 PM before Judge John P. Cronan.. (Signed by Judge John P. Cronan on 8/17/2022) (kv)
August 17, 2022 Filing 15 LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Judge John P. Cronan from Brian H. Brick dated August 17, 2022. Document filed by Sticky's Holdings, LLC..(Brick, Brian)
August 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: Unless the Court orders otherwise, the Court will conduct the IPTC by teleconference. At the scheduled time, counsel for all parties should call (866) 434-5269, access code 9176261. Absent leave of Court obtained by letter-motion filed before the conference, all pretrial conferences must be attended by the attorney who will serve as principal trial counsel. Initial Conference set for 9/27/2022 at 01:00 PM before Judge John P. Cronan. (Signed by Judge John P. Cronan on 8/15/2022) (tg)
August 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting in part #10 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. In light of the parties' letter, the August 22, 2022 deadline for Plaintiff to move for default judgment and the hearing on Plaintiff's motion for default judgment scheduled for October 4, 2022 is adjourned sine die. Defendant is directed to file its waiver of service by August 12, 2022. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John P. Cronan on 8/10/2022) (vfr)
August 11, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Brian Howard Brick on behalf of Sticky's Holdings, LLC..(Brick, Brian)
August 11, 2022 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Sticky's Holdings, LLC waiver sent on 8/9/2022, answer due 10/11/2022. Document filed by Sticky's Holdings, LLC..(Brick, Brian)
August 11, 2022 Set/Reset Deadlines: Sticky's Holdings, LLC answer due 9/6/2022. (vfr)
August 10, 2022 Filing 10 JOINT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time for Plaintiff's Motion for a Default Judgment Against Defendant from August 22, 2022 to September 12, 2022 addressed to Judge John P. Cronan from Janet B. Linn dated August 10, 2022. Document filed by Sticky Fingers Restaurants, LLC..(Linn, Janet)
August 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that no later than August 22, 2022, Plaintiff shall move for default judgment as to Defendant, in accordance with Local Civil Rule 55.2 and 3.D of the Courts Individual Rules and Practices for Civil Cases, or show cause why this case should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute. Defendant shall file any opposition to the motion for default judgment no later than September 12, 2022. Plaintiff shall file any reply no later than September 19, 2022. It is further ORDERED that Defendant appear and show cause at a hearing before this Court on October 4, 2022, at 11:00 a.m., why an order should not be issued granting a default judgment against Defendant. That hearing shall take place telephonically. At the scheduled time, counsel for all parties should call (866) 434-5269, access code 9176261. In the event that Defendant appears in this case and opposes the motion for default judgment prior to the scheduled court appearance on October 4, 2022, that court appearance shall also serve as an Initial Case Management Conference pursuant to 5.B of the Court's Individual Rules and Practices in Civil Cases. It is further ORDERED that Plaintiff serve Defendant via overnight courier with a copy of this Order within one week of the date of this Order. Within two business days of service, Plaintiff must file proof of such service on the docket. SO ORDERED. (Motions due by 8/22/2022., Responses due by 9/12/2022, Replies due by 9/19/2022., Initial Conference set for 10/4/2022 at 11:00 AM before Judge John P. Cronan.) (Signed by Judge John P. Cronan on 8/1/2022) (jca)
July 6, 2022 Filing 8 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint, served. Sticky's Holdings, LLC served on 7/5/2022, answer due 7/26/2022. Service was accepted by Destiny Doe (Refused to Give Surname). Document filed by Sticky Fingers Restaurants, LLC..(Linn, Janet)
July 1, 2022 Filing 7 AO 120 FORM TRADEMARK - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 15 U.S.C. 1116, the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following trademark(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office electronically notified via Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)..(jgo)
July 1, 2022 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Sticky's Holdings, LLC..(jgo)
July 1, 2022 Magistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
July 1, 2022 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge John P. Cronan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
July 1, 2022 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
June 30, 2022 Filing 5 AO 120 FORM TRADEMARK - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark for case opening submitted to court for review..(Linn, Janet)
June 30, 2022 Filing 4 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Sticky Fingers Acquisition LLC for Sticky Fingers Restaurants, LLC. Document filed by Sticky Fingers Restaurants, LLC..(Linn, Janet)
June 30, 2022 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Sticky's Holdings, LLC, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Sticky Fingers Restaurants, LLC..(Linn, Janet)
June 30, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Linn, Janet)
June 30, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Sticky's Holdings, LLC. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number BNYSDC-26357699)Document filed by Sticky Fingers Restaurants, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10).(Linn, Janet)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sticky Fingers Restaurants, LLC v. Sticky's Holdings, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sticky Fingers Restaurants, LLC
Represented By: Janet Beth Linn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sticky's Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Brian Howard Brick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?