Mejia v. Peace Coffee LLC
Plaintiff: Richard Mejia
Defendant: Peace Coffee LLC
Case Number: 1:2022cv05799
Filed: July 7, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Ronnie Abrams
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 12101 The Americans with Disabilities Act of 1990
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 19, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #7 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from Matthew T. Boos dated 8/18/2022. filed by Peace Coffee LLC, ENDORSEMENT: Application granted. Pursuant to the Court's Order of August 1, 2022, the parties' joint letter as described in that Order shall be filed by September 19, 2022. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 8/19/2022) Peace Coffee LLC answer due 9/23/2022. (ks)
August 18, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Notice to Attorney John Keil to RE-FILE Document #7 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from Matthew T. Boos dated 8/18/2022.. ERROR(S): Attorney address does not match login. Attorney did not file a notice of appearance.. (kj)
August 18, 2022 Filing 7 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from Matthew T. Boos dated 8/18/2022. Document filed by Peace Coffee LLC..(Keil, John) Modified on 8/19/2022 (kj).
August 8, 2022 Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Peace Coffee LLC served on 8/4/2022, answer due 8/25/2022. Service was accepted by Ashley Payne, Customer Service Representative. Document filed by Richard Mejia..(Kroub, Edward)
August 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: This case has been assigned to me for all purposes. It is hereby: ORDERED that, within thirty (30) days of service of the summons and complaint, the parties must meet and confer for at least one hour in a good-faith attempt to settle this action. To the extent the parties are unable to settle the case themselves, they must also discuss whether further settlement discussions through the district's court-annexed mediation program or before a magistrate judge would be productive at this time. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that within fifteen (15) additional days (i.e., within forty-five (45) days of service of the summons and complaint), the parties must submit a joint letter requesting that the Court either (1) refer the case to mediation or a magistrate judge (and indicate a preference between the two options), or (2) schedule an initial status conference in the matter. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 8/1/2022) (kv)
July 8, 2022 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Peace Coffee LLC. (sj)
July 8, 2022 Case Designated ECF. (sj)
July 8, 2022 Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (sj)
July 8, 2022 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Ronnie Abrams. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(sj)
July 7, 2022 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Peace Coffee LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Richard Mejia..(Kroub, Edward)
July 7, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Kroub, Edward)
July 7, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Peace Coffee LLC. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-26382893)Document filed by Richard Mejia..(Kroub, Edward)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mejia v. Peace Coffee LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Mejia
Represented By: Edward Y. Kroub
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peace Coffee LLC
Represented By: John Patrick Keil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?