Wilmington Trust, National Association, As Trustee For The Benefit Of The Registered Holders Of Wells Fargo Commercial Mortgage Trust 2018-C44, Commercial Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 20 v. 31 Prince Street, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Wilmington Trust, National Association, As Trustee For The Benefit Of The Registered Holders Of Wells Fargo Commercial Mortgage Trust 2018-C44, Commercial Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 20
Defendant: 31 Prince Street, LLC, Wah Kok Realty Corp., Edmond Li, New York City Department of Finance, New York City Office of Administrative Trials and Hearings and John Doe No. 1 to John Doe No 100
Case Number: 1:2022cv05855
Filed: July 8, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: John G Koeltl
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity Action
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 25, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,. New York City Office of Administrative Trials and Hearings served on 8/4/2022, answer due 8/25/2022. Service was accepted by Lemar Reid, Authorized Agent. Document filed by Wilmington Trust, National Association, As Trustee For The Benefit Of The Registered Holders Of Wells Fargo Commercial Mortgage Trust 2018-C44, Commercial Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 20..(Brandofino, Keith)
August 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,. New York City Department of Finance served on 8/4/2022, answer due 8/25/2022. Service was accepted by Lemar Reid, Authorized Agent. Document filed by Wilmington Trust, National Association, As Trustee For The Benefit Of The Registered Holders Of Wells Fargo Commercial Mortgage Trust 2018-C44, Commercial Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 20..(Brandofino, Keith)
August 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John G. Koeltl: Initial Conference set for 10/19/2022 at 03:00 PM before Judge John G. Koeltl. Dial-in: 888 363-4749, with access code 8140049. (Fletcher, Donnie)
August 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS. Document filed by Wilmington Trust, National Association, As Trustee For The Benefit Of The Registered Holders Of Wells Fargo Commercial Mortgage Trust 2018-C44, Commercial Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 20..(Brandofino, Keith)
July 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to New York City Department of Finance. (sj)
July 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to New York City Office of Administrative Trials and Hearings. (sj)
July 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to New York City Department of Finance, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Wilmington Trust, National Association, As Trustee For The Benefit Of The Registered Holders Of Wells Fargo Commercial Mortgage Trust 2018-C44, Commercial Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 20..(Brandofino, Keith)
July 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to New York City Office of Administrative Trials and Hearings, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Wilmington Trust, National Association, As Trustee For The Benefit Of The Registered Holders Of Wells Fargo Commercial Mortgage Trust 2018-C44, Commercial Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 20..(Brandofino, Keith)
July 22, 2022 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Keith Michael Brandofino to RE-FILE Document No. #5 Request for Issuance of Summons, #4 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Summons Caption Error. Plaintiff party name listed in summons caption does not correspond to pleading caption.. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (vf)
July 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT - SUMMONS REQUEST - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to New York City Office of Administrative Trials and Hearings, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Wilmington Trust, National Association, As Trustee For The Benefit Of The Registered Holders Of Wells Fargo Commercial Mortgage Trust 2018-C44, Commercial Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 20..(Brandofino, Keith) Modified on 7/22/2022 (vf).
July 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT - SUMMONS REQUEST - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to New York City Department of Finance, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Wilmington Trust, National Association, As Trustee For The Benefit Of The Registered Holders Of Wells Fargo Commercial Mortgage Trust 2018-C44, Commercial Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 20..(Brandofino, Keith) Modified on 7/22/2022 (vf).
July 11, 2022 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Keith Michael Brandofino. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand 30,000,000; County code New York. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to 9,999,000; the County code has been modified to XX Out of State. (vf)
July 11, 2022 Opinion or Order CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge John G. Koeltl. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vf)
July 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vf)
July 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Case Designated ECF. (vf)
July 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Other Affiliate Wilmington Trust Corporation, Other Affiliate M&T Bank Corporation for Wilmington Trust, National Association, As Trustee For The Benefit Of The Registered Holders Of Wells Fargo Commercial Mortgage Trust 2018-C44, Commercial Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 20. Document filed by Wilmington Trust, National Association, As Trustee For The Benefit Of The Registered Holders Of Wells Fargo Commercial Mortgage Trust 2018-C44, Commercial Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 20..(Brandofino, Keith)
July 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Brandofino, Keith)
July 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against 31 Prince Street, LLC, John Doe No. 1 to John Doe No 100, Edmond Li, New York City Department of Finance, New York City Office of Administrative Trials and Hearings, Wah Kok Realty Corp.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-26389226)Document filed by Wilmington Trust, National Association, As Trustee For The Benefit Of The Registered Holders Of Wells Fargo Commercial Mortgage Trust 2018-C44, Commercial Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 20. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Property Description, #2 Exhibit B - Collateral Description).(Brandofino, Keith)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilmington Trust, National Association, As Trustee For The Benefit Of The Registered Holders Of Wells Fargo Commercial Mortgage Trust 2018-C44, Commercial Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 20 v. 31 Prince Street, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wilmington Trust, National Association, As Trustee For The Benefit Of The Registered Holders Of Wells Fargo Commercial Mortgage Trust 2018-C44, Commercial Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 20
Represented By: Keith Michael Brandofino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 31 Prince Street, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wah Kok Realty Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edmond Li
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York City Department of Finance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York City Office of Administrative Trials and Hearings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe No. 1 to John Doe No 100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?