Joseph v. Watch Guard 24/7 LLC et al
Plaintiff: Roberto Joseph
Defendant: Watch Guard 24/7 LLC doing business as Watch Guard 24/7, John Rafferty and Michele Rafferty
Case Number: 1:2022cv05935
Filed: July 12, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Ronnie Abrams
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 17, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STIPULATION: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties in the above captioned action, acting by means of their respective counsel, that Defendants shall have until September 16, 2022 to answer, move or otherwise respond with respect to the Complaint in the above matter. All Parties have agreed to this extension of time. IT IS FURTHER STIPULATED AND AGREED that Defendants also agree to (i) waive all defenses to invalid service of process and (ii) accept service of the Complaint and all amendments thereon. IT IS FURTHER STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the parties that this Stipulation may be signed by facsimile or electronic copy which shall be deemed an original, and may be executed in one or more counterparts, but which collectively will constitute one and the same instrument. SO ORDERED. John Rafferty answer due 9/16/2022; Michele Rafferty answer due 9/16/2022; Watch Guard 24/7 LLC answer due 9/16/2022.( Motions due by 9/16/2022.) (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 8/4/2022) (ate)
August 3, 2022 Filing 11 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time for Defendants to answer addressed to Magistrate Judge Jennifer Willis from C.K. Lee dated August 3, 2022. Document filed by Roberto Joseph. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Stipulation for Extension of Time).(Lee, C.K.)
July 20, 2022 Filing 10 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Watch Guard 24/7 LLC served on 7/15/2022, answer due 8/5/2022. Document filed by Roberto Joseph..(Lee, C.K.)
July 13, 2022 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Michele Rafferty. (vf)
July 13, 2022 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to John Rafferty. (vf)
July 13, 2022 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Watch Guard 24/7 LLC. (vf)
July 13, 2022 Case Designated ECF. (vf)
July 13, 2022 Magistrate Judge Jennifer Willis is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vf)
July 13, 2022 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Ronnie Abrams. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vf)
July 13, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney C.K. Lee. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Roberto Joseph. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted. (vf)
July 12, 2022 Filing 6 CONSENT TO SUE UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by Roberto Joseph..(Lee, C.K.)
July 12, 2022 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Michele Rafferty, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Roberto Joseph..(Lee, C.K.)
July 12, 2022 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to John Rafferty, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Roberto Joseph..(Lee, C.K.)
July 12, 2022 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Watch Guard 24/7 LLC, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Roberto Joseph..(Lee, C.K.)
July 12, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Lee, C.K.)
July 12, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against John Rafferty, Michele Rafferty, Watch Guard 24/7 LLC. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-26401409)Document filed by Roberto Joseph. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E).(Lee, C.K.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Joseph v. Watch Guard 24/7 LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roberto Joseph
Represented By: C.K. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watch Guard 24/7 LLC doing business as Watch Guard 24/7
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Rafferty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michele Rafferty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?