Hogan v. NYP Holdings, Inc.
Plaintiff: Jeremy Hogan
Defendant: NYP Holdings, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2022cv06190
Filed: July 21, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Ronnie Abrams
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 501 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 7, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 7, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE of DECLARATION OF SERVICE OF ORDER AND NOTICE OF INITIAL CONFERENCE (DKT. 10) re: #10 Order for Initial Pretrial Conference,. Document filed by Jeremy Hogan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex A - Dkt 10 Order).(Bartolomei, James)
August 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER AND NOTICE OF INITIAL CONFERENCE: IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for all parties appear for an initial status conference on October 6, 2022 at 2:30 p.m. The parties shall use the following dial-in information to call in to the conference: Call-in Number: (888) 363-4749; Access Code: 1015508. Initial Conference set for 10/6/2022 at 02:30 PM before Judge Ronnie Abrams. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 8/15/2022) (ate)
August 8, 2022 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. NYP Holdings, Inc. waiver sent on 8/2/2022, answer due 10/3/2022. Document filed by Jeremy Hogan..(Bartolomei, James)
July 24, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Bryan Daniel Hoben on behalf of Jeremy Hogan..(Hoben, Bryan)
July 22, 2022 Filing 7 AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 17 U.S.C. 508, the Register of Copyrights is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following copyright(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Form e-mailed to Register of Copyrights. (vf)
July 22, 2022 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to NYP Holdings, Inc.. (vf)
July 22, 2022 Case Designated ECF. (vf)
July 22, 2022 Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vf)
July 22, 2022 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Ronnie Abrams. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vf)
July 21, 2022 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to NYP HOLDINGS, INC., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Jeremy Hogan..(Bartolomei, James)
July 21, 2022 Filing 4 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Jeremy Hogan..(Bartolomei, James)
July 21, 2022 Filing 3 AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 121 Form Copyright for case opening submitted to court for review..(Bartolomei, James)
July 21, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Bartolomei, James)
July 21, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against NYP Holdings, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number BNYSDC-26444792)Document filed by Jeremy Hogan..(Bartolomei, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hogan v. NYP Holdings, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeremy Hogan
Represented By: James Henry Bartolomei
Represented By: Bryan Daniel Hoben
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NYP Holdings, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?