Quaglia v. Flynn et al
Plaintiff: Frank M. Quaglia doing business as Full Circle Glass
Defendant: John J. Flynn and American Legion (Post 663)
Case Number: 1:2022cv06240
Filed: July 21, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Laura Taylor Swain
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 15, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CIVIL JUDGMENT: For the reasons stated in the September 15, 2022, order, this action is dismissed. The Court certifies under 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from the Court's judgment would not be taken in good faith. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 9/15/22) (Attachments: #1 PRO SE APPEAL PACKAGE) (rdz)
September 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF DISMISSAL: By order dated July 27, 2022, the Court directed Plaintiff, within 30 days, to submit a request to proceed in forma pauperis (IFP) or pay the $402.00 in fees required to file a civil action in this court. That order specified that failure to comply would result in dismissal of the complaint. Plaintiff has not filed an IFP application or paid the fees. Accordingly, the complaint is dismissed without prejudice. See 28 U.S.C. 1914, 1915. The Court certifies under 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore IFP status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. Cf. Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 44445 (1962) (holding that an appellant demonstrates good faith when he seeks review of a nonfrivolous issue). The Clerk of Court is directed to enter judgment in this case. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 9/15/22) (rdz)
July 28, 2022 MAILING RECEIPT: Document No: 3. Mailed to: Frank M. Quaglia 285 Main Street Highland Falls, NY 10928. (kh)
July 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER DIRECTING PAYMENT OF FEE OR IFP APPLICATION: Plaintiff is directed to render payment of the filing fee or submit an IFP application to this Court's Pro Se Office within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order. The Clerk of Court is directed to assign this matter to my docket. The Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3), that any appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). Filing Fee due by 8/26/2022. In Forma Pauperis (IFP) Application due by 8/26/2022. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 7/27/2022) (Attachments: #1 Supplement IFP) (aan)
July 26, 2022 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT - SUA SPONTE to Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (vba)
July 21, 2022 Filing 2 LETTER from Frank Quaglia dated 7/19/2022 re: Form Request: Application for waiver of prepayment of filing fees and costs. Document filed by Frank M. Quaglia. (sac)
July 21, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against American Legion (Post 663), John J. Flynn. Document filed by Frank M. Quaglia. (sac)
July 21, 2022 Case Designated ECF. (sac)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Quaglia v. Flynn et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank M. Quaglia doing business as Full Circle Glass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John J. Flynn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Legion (Post 663)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?