Brody v. Fox Broadcasting Company, LLC
Plaintiff: Robyn Brody
Defendant: Fox Broadcasting Company, LLC
Case Number: 1:2022cv06249
Filed: July 22, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Denise L Cote
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 501 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 22, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 19, 2022 Filing 24 LETTER MOTION to Stay re: #9 Order for Initial Pretrial Conference and to Stay Discovery addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Steven G. Mintz dated September 19, 2022., LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Steven G. Mintz dated September 19, 2022. Document filed by Fox Broadcasting Company, LLC..(Mintz, Steven)
September 15, 2022 Filing 23 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Audiovisual File addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Steven G. Mintz dated September 15, 2022. Document filed by Fox Broadcasting Company, LLC..(Mintz, Steven)
September 15, 2022 Filing 22 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Exhibits served on Counsel for Plaintiff on 9/15/2022. Document filed by Fox Broadcasting Company, LLC..(McCormick, Terence)
September 15, 2022 Filing 21 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #17 MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by Fox Broadcasting Company, LLC..(Mintz, Steven)
September 15, 2022 Filing 20 DECLARATION of Laura Cleveland in Support re: #17 MOTION to Dismiss .. Document filed by Fox Broadcasting Company, LLC..(Mintz, Steven)
September 15, 2022 Filing 19 DECLARATION of Melissa Medalie in Support re: #17 MOTION to Dismiss .. Document filed by Fox Broadcasting Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Fox 35 TV Interview (1/6/2022 10pm), #2 Exhibit Fox 35 TV Interview (1/6/2022 11pm), #3 Exhibit Criminal Complaint and Affidavit U.S. v. Meggs (D.D.C.)).(Mintz, Steven)
September 15, 2022 Filing 18 DECLARATION of Steven G. Mintz in Support re: #17 MOTION to Dismiss .. Document filed by Fox Broadcasting Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint).(Mintz, Steven)
September 15, 2022 Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss . Document filed by Fox Broadcasting Company, LLC. Responses due by 9/29/2022.(Mintz, Steven)
August 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 STIPULATION AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the attorneys for the respective parties hereto that the time in which Defendant Fox Broadcasting Company, LLC, may serve an answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint in this matter is hereby extended through and including Septetnber 16, 2022. This Stipulation may be executed by facsimile or electronic mail with the same force and effect as if signed with original signatures. IT IS SO ORDERED. Fox Broadcasting Company, LLC answer due 9/16/2022. ***Motion(s) terminated: #15 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint, addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Terence W. McCormick dated August 8, 2022 filed by Fox Broadcasting Company, LLC . (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 8/11/2022) (vfr) Modified on 8/11/2022 (vfr).
August 8, 2022 Filing 15 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint, addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Terence W. McCormick dated August 8, 2022. Document filed by Fox Broadcasting Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Stipulation and Proposed Order).(McCormick, Terence)
August 8, 2022 Filing 14 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent FOX Corporation for Fox Broadcasting Company, LLC. Document filed by Fox Broadcasting Company, LLC..(McCormick, Terence)
August 8, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Terence William McCormick on behalf of Fox Broadcasting Company, LLC..(McCormick, Terence)
August 8, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Steven Glen Mintz on behalf of Fox Broadcasting Company, LLC..(Mintz, Steven)
August 2, 2022 Filing 11 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint, served. Fox Broadcasting Company, LLC served on 7/27/2022, answer due 8/17/2022. Service was accepted by Paula Castro. Document filed by Robyn Brody..(Parker, Robert)
August 1, 2022 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Notice of Initial Pretrial Conference served on Fox Broadcasting Company on August 1, 2022. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by Robyn Brody..(Parker, Robert)
July 27, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 9/30/2022 at 3:00 PM in Courtroom 18B, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Denise L. Cote. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 7/27/2022) (vfr)
July 26, 2022 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Fox Broadcasting Company, LLC..(lal)
July 26, 2022 Filing 7 AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 17 U.S.C. 508, the Register of Copyrights is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following copyright(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Form e-mailed to Register of Copyrights. (vf)
July 25, 2022 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Fox Broadcasting Company, LLC, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Robyn Brody..(Parker, Robert)
July 25, 2022 Filing 5 FILING ERROR - WRONG PDF FILE ASSOCIATED WITH DOCKET ENTRY - PROPOSED ORDER. Document filed by Robyn Brody. Related Document Number: [SUMMONS]..(Parker, Robert) Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Modified on 7/25/2022 (nd).
July 25, 2022 Filing 4 AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 121 Form Copyright for case opening submitted to court for review..(Parker, Robert)
July 25, 2022 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Parker, Robert)
July 25, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO SUBMIT AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT. Notice to Attorney Robert Terry Parker to submit a completed AO 121 Form Copyright to court for review. Use the event type AO 121 Copyright - Notice of Submission by Attorney found under the event list Other Documents. (vf)
July 25, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Robert Terry Parker. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code Albany. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State. (vf)
July 25, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Robert Terry Parker. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Office code White Plains. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Office code has been modified to Foley Square. (vf)
July 25, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Robert Terry Parker to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Party name errors. Party names listed on Form do not correspond exactly to pleading caption. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. (vf)
July 25, 2022 Case Designated ECF. (vf)
July 25, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PROPOSED ORDER. Notice to attorney Parker, Robert to RE-FILE Document No. #5 Proposed Order,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the proposed order is not correct. (nd)
July 25, 2022 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Denise L. Cote. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vf)
July 25, 2022 Magistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vf)
July 22, 2022 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Parker, Robert) Modified on 7/25/2022 (vf).
July 22, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Fox Broadcasting Company, LLC. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-26452721)Document filed by Robyn Brody. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Original Image, #2 Exhibit B- USCO Certificate, #3 Exhibit C - Screenshots).(Parker, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brody v. Fox Broadcasting Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robyn Brody
Represented By: Robert Terry Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fox Broadcasting Company, LLC
Represented By: Steven Glen Mintz
Represented By: Terence William McCormick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?