Linares v. Cosan Construction Corp. et al
Plaintiff: Jose Linares
Defendant: Cosan Construction Corp., Cosan New York Inc. and Terence Ferguson
Case Number: 1:2022cv06267
Filed: July 23, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Vernon S Broderick
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 20, 2022 Opinion or Order FIRST MEDIATION CONFERENCE. Mediation Conference scheduled for 11/3/2022 at 10:30 AM in telephone or video conference.(mnp)
September 9, 2022 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF MEDIATOR ASSIGNMENT - Notice of assignment of mediator. Mediator Schedule due by 10/11/2022.(ah)
August 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ANSWER to #7 Complaint. Document filed by Cosan Construction Corp., Cosan New York Inc., Terence Ferguson..(Finkelstein, Jason)
August 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Cosan Construction Corp., Cosan New York Inc...(Finkelstein, Jason)
August 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jason Robert Finkelstein on behalf of Cosan Construction Corp., Cosan New York Inc., Terence Ferguson..(Finkelstein, Jason)
August 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Brian L. Gardner on behalf of Cosan Construction Corp., Cosan New York Inc., Terence Ferguson..(Gardner, Brian)
August 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Terence Ferguson served on 8/8/2022, answer due 8/29/2022. Service was accepted by Kunal Saraf. Document filed by Jose Linares..(Aronauer, Jacob)
August 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Cosan New York Inc. served on 8/3/2022, answer due 8/24/2022. Service was accepted by Amy Lesch. Document filed by Jose Linares..(Aronauer, Jacob)
August 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Cosan Construction Corp. served on 8/1/2022, answer due 8/22/2022. Service was accepted by Nancy Dougherty. Document filed by Jose Linares..(Aronauer, Jacob)
July 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Cosan Construction Corp...(pc)
July 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Terence Ferguson..(pc)
July 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Cosan New York Inc...(pc)
July 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Cosan New York Inc., re: #7 Complaint. Document filed by Jose Linares..(Aronauer, Jacob)
July 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Terrance Ferguson, re: #7 Complaint. Document filed by Jose Linares..(Aronauer, Jacob)
July 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Cosan Construction Corp., re: #7 Complaint. Document filed by Jose Linares..(Aronauer, Jacob)
July 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 COMPLAINT against Cosan Construction Corp., Cosan New York Inc., Terence Ferguson. Document filed by Jose Linares..(Aronauer, Jacob)
July 26, 2022 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Jacob Aronauer to RE-FILE Document No. #6 Request for Issuance of Summons, #4 Request for Issuance of Summons, #5 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): The summons requested was not processed due to the deficient pleading. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (gp)
July 26, 2022 Opinion or Order CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Vernon S. Broderick. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(gp)
July 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (gp)
July 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Case Designated ECF. (gp)
July 25, 2022 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Jacob Aronauer to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the pleading is not correct. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. If the deficiency/deficiencies are not corrected within five (5) days per Amended Standing Order 15-mc-00131 this case will be administratively closed. Initial Pleading due by 8/1/2022. (sj)
July 25, 2022 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Jacob Aronauer to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Amended Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong event type was used to file the pleading. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (sj)
July 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Terrance Ferguson, re: #2 Amended Complaint. Document filed by Jose Linares..(Aronauer, Jacob)
July 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Cosan New York INc., re: #2 Amended Complaint. Document filed by Jose Linares..(Aronauer, Jacob)
July 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Cosan Construction Corp., re: #2 Amended Complaint. Document filed by Jose Linares..(Aronauer, Jacob)
July 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Aronauer, Jacob)
July 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint against Cosan Construction Corp., Cosan New York Inc., Terence Ferguson.Document filed by Jose Linares. Related document: #1 Complaint.(Aronauer, Jacob) Modified on 7/25/2022 (sj).
July 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 FILING ERROR - WRONG PDF FILE ASSOCIATED WITH DOCKET ENTRY - COMPLAINT against Cosan Construction Corp., Cosan New York Inc., Terence Ferguson. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-26454298)Document filed by Jose Linares..(Aronauer, Jacob) Modified on 7/25/2022 (sj).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Linares v. Cosan Construction Corp. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Linares
Represented By: Jacob Aronauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cosan Construction Corp.
Represented By: Brian L. Gardner
Represented By: Jason Robert Finkelstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cosan New York Inc.
Represented By: Brian L. Gardner
Represented By: Jason Robert Finkelstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terence Ferguson
Represented By: Brian L. Gardner
Represented By: Jason Robert Finkelstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?