Dicks v. Oaklandish, LLC
Plaintiff: Valerie Dicks
Defendant: Oaklandish, LLC
Case Number: 1:2022cv06447
Filed: July 29, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: James L Cott
Referring Judge: Jesse M Furman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 12132 Americans with Disabilities Act - Discrimination
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STIPULATION EXTENDING DEFENDANT'S TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT, IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the undersigned, that: 1. The time for Defendant Oaklandish, LLC. to answer, move or otherwise respond to the Complaint filed by Plaintiff in the above-captioned action is hereby extended to and including October 31, 2022. 2. Defendant has been properly served with the Summons and Complaint and Defendant waives any defenses, affirmative or otherwise, related to or concerning service of process. Application GRANTED. The deadline for Plaintiff to file a Motion for Default Judgment, see ECF No. 8, is accordingly ADJOURNED sine die. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate ECF No. 10. SO ORDERED. (Oaklandish, LLC answer due 10/31/2022.) (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 9/23/22) (yv)
September 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #10 JOINT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #8 Order,,,,, #1 Complaint . As Judge Furman has referred this case to me for general pretrial supervision, I hereby approve the stipulation submitted by the parties. The time for Defendant Oaklandish, LLC. to answer, move or otherwise respond to the complaint is hereby extended to and including October 31, 2022. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge James L. Cott)(Text Only Order) (Cott, James)
September 22, 2022 Filing 10 JOINT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #8 Order,,,,, #1 Complaint . Document filed by Oaklandish, LLC..(Gallaway, Brett)
September 22, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Brett Reed Gallaway on behalf of Oaklandish, LLC..(Gallaway, Brett)
September 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Defendant in this action appears to be in default. Plaintiff shall file any motion for default judgment, in accordance with the Court's Individual Rules and Practices for Civil Cases (available at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/hon-jesse-m-furman), within two weeks of the date of this Order. If Plaintiff's counsel submits calculations in support of any motion for default judgment, Plaintiff's counsel shall also email native versions of the files with the calculations (i.e., versions of the files in their original format, such as in ".xlsx") to Chambers at Furman_NYSDChambers@nysd.uscourts.gov. If or when a motion for default judgment is filed, the Court will enter a further Order setting a deadline for any opposition and reply and scheduling a show cause hearing. If no motion for default judgment is filed by the deadline set forth above, the case may be dismissed for failure to prosecute without further notice to the parties. Plaintiff shall electronically serve a copy of this Order on Defendant within two business days from the date of this Order and shall file proof of such service within three business days of the date of this Order. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 9/20/2022) (vfr)
August 29, 2022 Filing 7 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Oaklandish, LLC served on 8/29/2022, answer due 9/19/2022. Service was accepted by Joe Herbman. Document filed by Valerie Dicks..(Khaimov, Mars)
August 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for Dispositive Motion (i.e., motion requiring a Report and Recommendation) and General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement.) Referred to Magistrate Judge James L. Cott. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 8/2/22) (yv) Modified on 8/25/2022 (yv).
August 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties must discuss whether they are willing to consent, under 28 U.S.C. 636(c), to conducting all further proceedings before the assigned Magistrate Judge. If all parties so consent, counsel shall file on ECF a fully executed Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form, available at https://www.nysd.uscourts.gov/node/754. If the parties do so, and the Court so orders the form, all further proceedings will then be conducted before the assigned Magistrate Judge rather than before the undersigned. There will be no adverse consequences if the parties do not consent to proceed before the Magistrate Judge. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 8/2/22) (yv)
August 1, 2022 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Oaklandish, LLC. (sj)
August 1, 2022 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Jesse M. Furman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(sj)
August 1, 2022 Magistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (sj)
August 1, 2022 Case Designated ECF. (sj)
July 29, 2022 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Oaklandish, LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Valerie Dicks..(Khaimov, Mars)
July 29, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Khaimov, Mars)
July 29, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Oaklandish, LLC. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-26480850)Document filed by Valerie Dicks..(Khaimov, Mars)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dicks v. Oaklandish, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valerie Dicks
Represented By: Mars Khaimov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oaklandish, LLC
Represented By: Brett Reed Gallaway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?