Raviv v. Mirror Biologics, Inc.
Plaintiff: Adi Raviv
Defendant: Mirror Biologics, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2022cv06847
Filed: August 11, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Sarah L Cave
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 ds Diversity-Contract Dispute
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 21, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER : It is hereby ORDERED that an initial conference in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 16 will be held on Tuesday, November 1, 2022 at 12:00 p.m., in Courtroom 18A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York. At the conference, the parties must be prepared to discuss the subjects set forth in Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and (c). It is further ORDERED that counsel shall meet and confer in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f) no later than 21 days before the Initial Case Management Conference. No later than one week (seven (7) calendar days) before the conference, the parties shall file a Report of Rule 26(f) Meeting and Proposed Case Management Plan, via ECF, signed by counsel for each party. A template is available at https://www.nysd.uscourts.gov/hon-sarah-l-cave. SO ORDERED. ( Initial Conference set for 11/1/2022 at 12:00 PM in Courtroom 18A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge Sarah L Cave.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah L Cave on 10/5/22) (yv)
October 4, 2022 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint. Document filed by Mirror Biologics, Inc...(Dunning, Brian)
October 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: Accordingly, Defendant shall answer, move, or otherwise, file a response to the Complaint by Tuesday, October 11, 2022. Failure to answer, move, or otherwise, file a response to the Complaint may result in the entry of a certificate of default and default judgment. SO ORDERED. Mirror Biologics, Inc. answer due 10/11/2022.( Motions due by 10/11/2022.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah L Cave on 10/4/2022) (tg)
September 29, 2022 Filing 10 CONSENT TO JURISDICTION BY A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Mirror Biologics, Inc., Adi Raviv. (Case No Longer Referred to Magistrate Judge) CASE ASSIGNED to Magistrate Judge Sarah L Cave. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 9/29/2022).(rro)
September 28, 2022 Filing 9 PROPOSED CONSENT TO JURISDICTION BY US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Adi Raviv. Document filed by Adi Raviv..(Rogin, Jonathan)
August 24, 2022 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Order scheduling conference served on Mirror Biologics, Inc. on 8/24/2022. Document filed by Adi Raviv..(Rogin, Jonathan)
August 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: This case has been assigned to me for all purposes. It is hereby ORDERED that a telephonic conference will be held on October 12, 2022 AT 4:00pm. The parties shall call (888) 363-4749 and enter the access code 558-3333. The telephonic conference is public, and the time of the conference is approximate, but the parties shall be ready to proceed by that time. All pretrial conferences must be attended by the attorney who will serve as principal trial counsel. The parties shall ensure they are all dialed into the conference call by the appointed conference time. Initial Conference set for 10/12/2022 at 04:00 PM before Judge Lorna G. Schofield. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 8/23/2022) (kv)
August 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STIPULATION:, Motions terminated: #5 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Brian C. Dunning dated August 16, 2022. filed by Mirror Biologics, Inc.., IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the parties to this case, through their undersigned counsel, that (1) Defendant's counsel, Dunning Rievman & MacDonald LLP, is authorized to accept, and has accepted, service of the summons and complaint on behalf of the defendant, with an effective service date of August 12, 2022; and (2) Defendant reserves its rights to answer the complaint, assert affirmative defenses and counterclaims against the plaintiff, and to move to dismiss the complaint other than for insufficient process or insufficient service of process under Rules 12(b)(4) and (5) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, and otherwise to defend itself in this case; and (3) The parties agree that the defendant' s time to answer, move against or otherwise respond to the complaint in this case shall be and hereby is adjourned to and including September 30, 2022. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 8/17/2022) Mirror Biologics, Inc. answer due 9/30/2022. (ks)
August 16, 2022 Filing 5 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Brian C. Dunning dated August 16, 2022. Document filed by Mirror Biologics, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Stipulation re Service and Time to Answer).(Dunning, Brian)
August 12, 2022 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Mirror Biologics, Inc...(jgo)
August 12, 2022 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Lorna G. Schofield. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
August 12, 2022 Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
August 12, 2022 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
August 11, 2022 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Mirror Biologics, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Adi Raviv..(Rogin, Jonathan)
August 11, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Rogin, Jonathan)
August 11, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Mirror Biologics, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-26536620)Document filed by Adi Raviv..(Rogin, Jonathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Raviv v. Mirror Biologics, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adi Raviv
Represented By: Jonathan Rogin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mirror Biologics, Inc.
Represented By: Brian Christopher Dunning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?