Ayassi v. Newman et al
Plaintiff: Tarek B. Ayassi
Defendant: Kenneth Newman and J. B. Hunt Transport, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2022cv07139
Filed: August 22, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lewis A Kaplan
Referring Judge: Katharine H Parker
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 tm Diversity-Tort/Motor Vehicle (P.I.)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 28, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER: The Defendants are directed to serve this order, and a copy of the Notice of Removal on the Plaintiff. SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 11/28/2022 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 17D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker on 8/24/2022) (kv)
August 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement) and Dispositive Motion (i.e., motion requiring a Report and Recommendation). All such motions: Referred to Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker. SO ORDERED: (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 8/23/22) (yv)
August 23, 2022 Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vf)
August 23, 2022 Case Designated ECF. (vf)
August 23, 2022 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vf)
August 23, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Anthony D. Luis. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Arbitration code e (Exempt); County code New York. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Arbitration code has been deleted; the County code has been modified to Bronx. (vf)
August 22, 2022 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint. Document filed by J. B. Hunt Transport, Inc., Kenneth Newman. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service to Verified Answer).(Luis, Anthony)
August 22, 2022 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent J.B. Hunt Transport, Inc., Corporate Parent T. Rowe Price Group, Inc. for J. B. Hunt Transport, Inc.. Document filed by J. B. Hunt Transport, Inc., Kenneth Newman..(Luis, Anthony)
August 22, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Luis, Anthony)
August 22, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of New York. Case Number: 155438/2022. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-26576446).Document filed by J. B. Hunt Transport, Inc., Kenneth Newman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A" - Summons & Verified Complaint, #2 Affidavit of Service to Notice of Removal).(Luis, Anthony)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ayassi v. Newman et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tarek B. Ayassi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Newman
Represented By: Anthony D. Luis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. B. Hunt Transport, Inc.
Represented By: Anthony D. Luis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?