Rodriguez Flores v. 2145 Ricardo LLC et al
Plaintiff: Ulises Alan Rodriguez Flores
Defendant: James Mateus, 2145 Ricardo LLC doing business as Ricardo Steak House, RicardoSteak House Heart Foundation doing business as Ricardo Steak House, Ricardo LLC doing business as Ricardo Steak House, Edward M Mateus and Jimmy Mateus
Case Number: 1:2022cv07374
Filed: August 29, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Andrew L Carter
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201 Denial of Overtime Compensation
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 1, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2022 FIRST MEDIATION CONFERENCE. Mediation Conference scheduled for 12/1/2022 at 10:30 AM in telephone or video conference.(mnp)
October 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 27 STIPULATION, IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties in the above-captioned action, acting by means of their respective counsel, that Defendants shall have until November 5, 2022 to answer, move or otherwise respond to the Complaint. IT IS FURTHER STIPULATED AND AGREED that Defendants accept service of the Complaint and all amendments thereon, and waives all defenses of improper service of process. SO ORDERED. (All Defendants.) (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 10/3/22) (yv)
September 28, 2022 NOTICE OF MEDIATOR ASSIGNMENT - Notice of assignment of mediator. Mediator Schedule due by 10/28/2022.(ah)
September 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MEDIATION REFERRAL ORDER FOR CASES FILED UNDER THE FAIR LABOR STANDARDS ACT 29 U.S.C. Sec. 201 et seq. This case, involving claims under the Fair Labor Standards Act (FLSA), 29 U.S.C. Sec. 201 et seq., has been assigned to this Court for all purposes. In the Courts experience, cases involving FLSA claims often benefit from early mediation. To that end, prior to a Rule 16(b) case management conference the Court is referring this case to the Mediation Office for settlement purposes under Local Civil Rule 83.9. To facilitate mediation the parties shall, within four weeks of this Order, confer and provide the items set forth in this Order. Mediator to be Assigned by 10/11/2022. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 12/10/2019) (jpt)
September 26, 2022 Filing 25 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by 2145 Ricardo LLC, Edward M Mateus, James Mateus, Ricardo LLC, RicardoSteak House Heart Foundation..(Brown, William)
September 26, 2022 Filing 24 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by William Michael Brown on behalf of 2145 Ricardo LLC, Edward M Mateus, James Mateus, Ricardo LLC, RicardoSteak House Heart Foundation..(Brown, William)
September 19, 2022 Filing 23 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Edward M Mateus served on 9/7/2022, answer due 9/28/2022. Service was accepted by Rey G., authorized agent. Document filed by Ulises Alan Rodriguez Flores(on behalf of others similarly situated); Ulises Alan Rodriguez Flores (individually )..(Sojo, Catalina)
September 19, 2022 Filing 22 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. James Mateus served on 9/7/2022, answer due 9/28/2022. Service was accepted by Rey G., authorized agent. Document filed by Ulises Alan Rodriguez Flores(on behalf of others similarly situated); Ulises Alan Rodriguez Flores (individually )..(Sojo, Catalina)
September 14, 2022 Filing 21 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. RicardoSteak House Heart Foundation served on 9/2/2022, answer due 9/23/2022. Service was accepted by Nancy Dougherty, authorized agent in the Office of the Secretary of State. Document filed by Ulises Alan Rodriguez Flores(on behalf of others similarly situated); Ulises Alan Rodriguez Flores (individually )..(Sojo, Catalina)
September 14, 2022 Filing 20 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Ricardo LLC served on 9/2/2022, answer due 9/23/2022. Service was accepted by Nancy Dougherty, authorized agent in the Office of the Secretary of State. Document filed by Ulises Alan Rodriguez Flores(on behalf of others similarly situated); Ulises Alan Rodriguez Flores (individually )..(Sojo, Catalina)
September 14, 2022 Filing 19 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. 2145 Ricardo LLC served on 9/2/2022, answer due 9/23/2022. Service was accepted by Nancy Dougherty, authorized agent in the Office of the Secretary of State. Document filed by Ulises Alan Rodriguez Flores(on behalf of others similarly situated); Ulises Alan Rodriguez Flores (individually )..(Sojo, Catalina)
August 31, 2022 Filing 18 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to James Mateus. (sj)
August 31, 2022 Filing 17 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Edward M Mateus. (sj)
August 31, 2022 Filing 16 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Ricardo LLC. (sj)
August 31, 2022 Filing 15 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to RicardoSteak House Heart Foundation. (sj)
August 31, 2022 Filing 14 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to 2145 Ricardo LLC. (sj)
August 30, 2022 Filing 13 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to James Mateus, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Ulises Alan Rodriguez Flores(on behalf of others similarly situated), Ulises Alan Rodriguez Flores (individually )..(Sojo, Catalina)
August 30, 2022 Filing 12 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Edward M. Mateus, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Ulises Alan Rodriguez Flores(on behalf of others similarly situated), Ulises Alan Rodriguez Flores (individually )..(Sojo, Catalina)
August 30, 2022 Filing 11 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Ricardo LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Ulises Alan Rodriguez Flores(on behalf of others similarly situated), Ulises Alan Rodriguez Flores (individually )..(Sojo, Catalina)
August 30, 2022 Filing 10 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to RicardoSteak House Heart Foundation, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Ulises Alan Rodriguez Flores(on behalf of others similarly situated), Ulises Alan Rodriguez Flores (individually )..(Sojo, Catalina)
August 30, 2022 Filing 9 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to 2145 Ricardo LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Ulises Alan Rodriguez Flores(on behalf of others similarly situated), Ulises Alan Rodriguez Flores (individually )..(Sojo, Catalina)
August 30, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Bryan David Robinson, Jr on behalf of Ulises Alan Rodriguez Flores..(Robinson, Bryan)
August 30, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Catalina Sojo re: Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all of the parties listed on the pleading were not entered on CM ECF; Ulises Alan Rodriguez Flores must be added again with party text 'on behalf of others similarly situate'. Docket the event type Add Party to Pleading found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents. (sj)
August 30, 2022 Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (sj)
August 30, 2022 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(sj)
August 30, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Catalina Sojo to RE-FILE Document No. #7 Request for Issuance of Summons, #4 Request for Issuance of Summons, #6 Request for Issuance of Summons, #5 Request for Issuance of Summons, #3 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; caption error, caption should match pleading exactly; if all names do not fit in the space provided, name the first listed defendant on the pleading followed by 'et al'. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (sj)
August 30, 2022 Case Designated ECF. (sj)
August 30, 2022 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Plaintiffs/Petitioners Ulises Alan Rodriguez Flores added. Party added pursuant to #1 Complaint.Document filed by Ulises Alan Rodriguez Flores. Related document: #1 Complaint..(Sojo, Catalina)
August 29, 2022 Filing 7 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST - PDF ERROR REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to James Mateus, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Ulises Alan Rodriguez Flores..(Sojo, Catalina) Modified on 8/30/2022 (sj).
August 29, 2022 Filing 6 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST - PDF ERROR REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Edward M. Mateus, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Ulises Alan Rodriguez Flores..(Sojo, Catalina) Modified on 8/30/2022 (sj).
August 29, 2022 Filing 5 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST - PDF ERROR REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Ricardo Steak House Heart Foundation, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Ulises Alan Rodriguez Flores..(Sojo, Catalina) Modified on 8/30/2022 (sj).
August 29, 2022 Filing 4 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST - PDF ERROR REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Ricardo LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Ulises Alan Rodriguez Flores..(Sojo, Catalina) Modified on 8/30/2022 (sj).
August 29, 2022 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST - PDF ERROR REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to 2145 Ricardo LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Ulises Alan Rodriguez Flores..(Sojo, Catalina) Modified on 8/30/2022 (sj).
August 29, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Sojo, Catalina)
August 29, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against 2145 Ricardo LLC, Edward M Mateus, James Mateus, Ricardo LLC, RicardoSteak House Heart Foundation. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-26608247)Document filed by Ulises Alan Rodriguez Flores..(Sojo, Catalina)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rodriguez Flores v. 2145 Ricardo LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Mateus
Represented By: William Michael Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2145 Ricardo LLC doing business as Ricardo Steak House
Represented By: William Michael Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RicardoSteak House Heart Foundation doing business as Ricardo Steak House
Represented By: William Michael Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ricardo LLC doing business as Ricardo Steak House
Represented By: William Michael Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward M Mateus
Represented By: William Michael Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jimmy Mateus
Represented By: William Michael Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ulises Alan Rodriguez Flores
Represented By: Catalina Sojo
Represented By: Bryan David Robinson, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?