Sony Music Entertainment et al v. Triller, Inc.
Plaintiff: Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin LLC, Arista Records LLC, Records Label, LLC, Zomba Recording LLC and Provident Label Group LLC.
Defendant: Triller, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2022cv07380
Filed: August 29, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: P Kevin Castel
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 101 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 18, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on: UNOPPOSED MOTION TO EXTEND DEADLINE FOR DEFENDANT TRILLER, INC. TO FILE RESPONSIVE PLEADING AND CONDUCT INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: granting #17 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #17 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Unopposed. ENDORSEMENT: Time to respond to the complaint extended to November 23, 2022. The October 31 conference is adjourned to December 9, 2022 at 12:15 p.m. The conference will proceed telephonically. Dial-In No.: 1-888-363-4749, Access Code: 3667981. Motion DE 17 is terminated. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 10/25/2022) (ama)
October 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Jeffrey M. Gould dated October 25, 2022 re: Initial Pretrial Conference Joint Letter. Document filed by Arista Records LLC, Provident Label Group LLC., Records Label, LLC, Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin LLC, Zomba Recording LLC..(Gould, Jeffrey)
October 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Triller, Inc. answer due 11/23/2022., Set/Reset Hearings:( Initial Conference set for 12/9/2022 at 12:15 PM before Judge P. Kevin Castel.) (ama)
October 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Jeffrey M. Gould dated October 24, 2022 re: Initial Pretrial Conference Letter. Document filed by Arista Records LLC, Provident Label Group LLC., Records Label, LLC, Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin LLC, Zomba Recording LLC..(Gould, Jeffrey)
October 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Unopposed. Document filed by Triller, Inc...(Fields, Peter)
October 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Peter A. Fields on behalf of Triller, Inc...(Fields, Peter)
October 12, 2022 Opinion or Order NOTICE: The initial pretrial conference previously scheduled for October 24, 2022 is adjourned to October 31, 2022 at 11:30 a.m. Refer to Order of Initial Pretrial Conference dated 9/1/2022, Docket Entry 10. (Nacanther, Florence)
October 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Andrew L. Guerra on behalf of Arista Records LLC, Provident Label Group LLC., Records Label, LLC, Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin LLC, Zomba Recording LLC..(Guerra, Andrew)
September 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Sony Group Corporation for Arista Records LLC, Provident Label Group LLC., Records Label, LLC, Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin LLC, Zomba Recording LLC. Document filed by Arista Records LLC, Provident Label Group LLC., Records Label, LLC, Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin LLC, Zomba Recording LLC..(Oppenheim, Matthew)
September 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint, against Triller, Inc. with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Sony Music Entertainment, Records Label, LLC, Arista Records LLC, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin LLC, Zomba Recording LLC, Provident Label Group LLC.. Related document: #1 Complaint,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A).(Oppenheim, Matthew)
September 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Jeffrey M. Gould to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge P. Kevin Castel)(Text Only Order) (Nacanther, Florence)
September 9, 2022 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #11 MOTION for Jeffrey M. Gould to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-26650509. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (sgz)
September 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MOTION for Jeffrey M. Gould to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-26650509. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Arista Records LLC, Records Label, LLC, Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin LLC, Zomba Recording LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order).(Gould, Jeffrey)
September 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF (OR THE REMOVING DEFENDANT) SHALL IMMEDIATELY SEND A COPY OF THIS ORDER TO ALL PARTIES. Counsel for all parties shall appear for an Initial Pretrial Conference, held pursuant to Rule 16 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, October 24, 2022 at 10:30 a.m. Principal trial counsel shall appear at this and all subsequent conferences. The call-in information for all teleconferences is: Dial-in: (888) 363-4749; Access Code: 3667981. SO ORDERED.Telephonic Initial Conference set for 10/24/2022 at 10:30 AM before Judge P. Kevin Castel. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 9/01/2022) (ama)
August 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Triller, Inc. waiver sent on 8/30/2022, answer due 10/31/2022. Document filed by Sony Music Entertainment; Records Label, LLC; Arista Records LLC; Sony Music Entertainment US Latin LLC; Zomba Recording LLC..(Oppenheim, Matthew)
August 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 17 U.S.C. 508, the Register of Copyrights is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following copyright(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Form e-mailed to Register of Copyrights..(jgo)
August 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Triller, Inc...(jgo)
August 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Oppenheim, Matthew)
August 30, 2022 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Matthew Jan Oppenheim to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the civil cover sheet is not correct; multiple Nature of Suit codes were selected;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated October 1, 2020. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated October 1, 2020 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (jgo)
August 30, 2022 Opinion or Order CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge P. Kevin Castel. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
August 30, 2022 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Matthew Jan Oppenheim. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Nature of Suit code 190 (Contract: Other); County code New York;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Nature of Suit code has been modified to 820 (Copyright); the County code has been modified to XX Out of State;. (jgo)
August 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
August 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
August 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Triller, Inc., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Arista Records LLC, Records Label, LLC, Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin LLC, Zomba Recording LLC..(Oppenheim, Matthew)
August 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Sony Group Corporation for Arista Records LLC, Records Label, LLC, Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin LLC, Zomba Recording LLC. Document filed by Arista Records LLC, Records Label, LLC, Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin LLC, Zomba Recording LLC..(Oppenheim, Matthew)
August 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 121 Form Copyright for case opening submitted to court for review..(Oppenheim, Matthew)
August 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Oppenheim, Matthew) Modified on 8/30/2022 (jgo).
August 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Triller, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-26609237)Document filed by Sony Music Entertainment, Records Label, LLC, Arista Records LLC, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin LLC, Zomba Recording LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Recordings).(Oppenheim, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sony Music Entertainment et al v. Triller, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sony Music Entertainment
Represented By: Matthew Jan Oppenheim
Represented By: Andrew L. Guerra
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Gould
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sony Music Entertainment US Latin LLC
Represented By: Matthew Jan Oppenheim
Represented By: Andrew L. Guerra
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Gould
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arista Records LLC
Represented By: Matthew Jan Oppenheim
Represented By: Andrew L. Guerra
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Gould
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Records Label, LLC
Represented By: Matthew Jan Oppenheim
Represented By: Andrew L. Guerra
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Gould
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zomba Recording LLC
Represented By: Matthew Jan Oppenheim
Represented By: Andrew L. Guerra
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Gould
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Provident Label Group LLC.
Represented By: Andrew L. Guerra
Represented By: Matthew Jan Oppenheim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Triller, Inc.
Represented By: Peter A. Fields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?