Reyes et al v. La Casa Del Mofongo 207 LLC et al
Plaintiff: Hector De Jesus Cruz Reyes
Defendant: La Casa Del Mofongo 207 LLC and Avi Dishi
Case Number: 1:2022cv07956
Filed: September 16, 2022
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Paul A Engelmayer
Referring Judge: Ona T Wang
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. § 201 Denial of Overtime Compensation
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 18, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER grantng #13 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #13 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #10 Order for Initial Pretrial Conference, #6 Complaint addressed to Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang from Martin E Restituyo dated Nov 8, 2022. Defendants' request for an adjournment of the Initial Case Management Conference is GRANTED. (ECF 13). The Initial Case Management Conference is adjourned from November 15, 2022, to December 8, 2022, at 3:00 p.m. in Courtroom 20D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007. Defendant La Casa Del Mofongo 207 LLC's answer was due October 25, 2022. (ECF 9). Defendant Avi Dishi's Answer was due November 2, 2022. (ECF 11). Counsel for Defendants filed a notice of appearance and letter motion on November 8, 2022. (ECF 12, 13). If Counsel for Defendants wishes to request an extension of the deadlines for both Defendants to file an Answer, nunc pro tunc, Counsel is directed to file a letter motion on the docket specifying which date Counsel would like the extension to. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to close ECF 13.. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang on 11/10/2022) (rro)
November 10, 2022 Set/Reset Hearings: Initial Conference set for 12/8/2022 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 20D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang. (rro)
November 8, 2022 Filing 13 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #10 Order for Initial Pretrial Conference, #6 Complaint addressed to Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang from Martin E Restituyo dated Nov 8, 2022. Document filed by Avi Dishi, La Casa Del Mofongo 207 LLC..(Restituyo, Martin)
November 8, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Martin E. Restituyo on behalf of Avi Dishi, La Casa Del Mofongo 207 LLC..(Restituyo, Martin)
November 1, 2022 Filing 11 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Avi Dishi served on 10/12/2022, answer due 11/2/2022. Document filed by Hector De Jesus Cruz Reyes(on behalf of himself); Hector De Jesus Cruz Reyes(on behalf of all other persons similarly situated)..(Barnhorn, David)
October 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER: An Initial Pretrial Conference in accordance with Rule 16(b) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure will be held on Tuesday, November 15, 2022 at 11:00 a.m. in Courtroom 20D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007. Initial Conference set for 11/15/2022 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 20D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang on 10/12/2022) (rro)
October 10, 2022 Filing 9 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. La Casa Del Mofongo 207 LLC served on 10/4/2022, answer due 10/25/2022. Service was accepted by NY Secretary of State. Document filed by Hector De Jesus Cruz Reyes(on behalf of himself); Hector De Jesus Cruz Reyes(on behalf of all other persons similarly situated)..(Barnhorn, David)
September 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement). Referred to Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 9/22/2022) (vfr)
September 22, 2022 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to La Casa Del Mofongo 207 LLC..(lal)
September 21, 2022 Filing 6 COMPLAINT against Avi Dishi, La Casa Del Mofongo 207 LLC. Document filed by Hector De Jesus Cruz Reyes(on behalf of himself), Hector De Jesus Cruz Reyes(on behalf of all other persons similarly situated)..(Barnhorn, David)
September 21, 2022 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to LA CASA DEL MOFONGO 207 LLC and AVI DISHI, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Hector De Jesus Cruz Reyes(on behalf of himself), Hector De Jesus Cruz Reyes(on behalf of all other persons similarly situated)..(Barnhorn, David)
September 21, 2022 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Barnhorn, David)
September 21, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David Donald Barnhorn on behalf of Hector De Jesus Cruz Reyes(on behalf of himself), Hector De Jesus Cruz Reyes(on behalf of all other persons similarly situated)..(Barnhorn, David)
September 19, 2022 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
September 19, 2022 Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
September 19, 2022 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
September 19, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Peter Arcadio Romero to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong filer/filers were selected for the request for issuance of summons;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (pc)
September 19, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Peter Arcadio Romero. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Hector De Jesus Cruz Reyes, Hector De Jesus Cruz Reyes. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted; alias party type was entered incorrectly;. (pc)
September 19, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Peter Arcadio Romero to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong filer/filers were selected for the pleading;. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (pc)
September 19, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Peter Arcadio Romero to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the event wrong event type was used to file the civil cover sheet; Jurisdiction was not selected;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated October 1, 2020. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated October 1, 2020 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (pc)
September 19, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Peter Arcadio Romero. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code New York;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to Suffolk;. (pc)
September 16, 2022 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILER ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to La Casa Del Mofongo 207 LLC; Avi Dishi, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Hector De Jesus Cruz Reyes..(Romero, Peter) Modified on 9/19/2022 (pc).
September 16, 2022 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILER ERROR - COMPLAINT against Avi Dishi, La Casa Del Mofongo 207 LLC. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-26695095)Document filed by Hector De Jesus Cruz Reyes. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet).(Romero, Peter) Modified on 9/19/2022 (pc).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reyes et al v. La Casa Del Mofongo 207 LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hector De Jesus Cruz Reyes
Represented By: Peter Arcadio Romero
Represented By: David Donald Barnhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: La Casa Del Mofongo 207 LLC
Represented By: Martin E. Restituyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Avi Dishi
Represented By: Martin E. Restituyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?