Klauber Brothers, Inc. v. Walmart, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Klauber Brothers, Inc.
Defendant: Walmart, Inc. and Does 1 through 10
Case Number: 1:2022cv08087
Filed: September 21, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Paul G Gardephe
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 101 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 24, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 JOINT STIPULATION EXTENDING DEADLINE TO RESPONSE TO THE COMPLAINT: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED THAT: 1. The deadline for Defendant to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint shall be and hereby is extended for an additional 30 days, up to and including, Thursday December 1, 2022. 2. By entering this Stipulation, the parties do not waive, and expressly preserve, all rights claims, defenses and objections, including, but not limited to, jurisdictional issues. 3. This stipulation may be signed in counterparts and electronic signatures shall have the same force and effect as originals. SO ORDERED. Walmart, Inc. answer due 12/1/2022. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 10/28/2022) (tg)
October 27, 2022 Filing 10 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Walmart, Inc...(Young, Elizabeth)
October 11, 2022 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Walmart, Inc. served on 10/11/2022, answer due 11/1/2022. Service was accepted by The Corporation Trust Company c/o Robin Hutt-Banks/Registered Agent for Service of Process. Document filed by Klauber Brothers, Inc...(Burroughs, Scott)
October 7, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Counsel for all parties are directed to appear before the Court for an initial pretrial conference in accordance with Rule 16 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure on December 22, 2022, at 11:00 a.m. in Courtroom 705 of the Thurgood Marshall United States Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, New York. Initial Conference set for 12/22/2022 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 705, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Paul G. Gardephe. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 10/7/2022) (rro)
September 22, 2022 Filing 7 AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 17 U.S.C. 508, the Register of Copyrights is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following copyright(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Form e-mailed to Register of Copyrights..(jgo)
September 22, 2022 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Walmart, Inc...(jgo)
September 22, 2022 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
September 22, 2022 Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
September 22, 2022 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Paul G. Gardephe. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
September 22, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Scott Alan Burroughs. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Klauber Brothers, Inc.; Walmart, Inc.. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted;. (jgo)
September 21, 2022 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Walmart, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Klauber Brothers, Inc...(Burroughs, Scott)
September 21, 2022 Filing 4 AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 121 Form Copyright for case opening submitted to court for review. (Attachments: #1 Supplement AO 121 Report on the Filing of an Action Regarding a Copyright Page 2 contd).(Burroughs, Scott)
September 21, 2022 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Klauber Brothers, Inc...(Burroughs, Scott)
September 21, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Burroughs, Scott)
September 21, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Does 1 through 10, Walmart, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-26715616)Document filed by Klauber Brothers, Inc...(Burroughs, Scott)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Klauber Brothers, Inc. v. Walmart, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Klauber Brothers, Inc.
Represented By: Scott Alan Burroughs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?