Mitsui Sumitomo Insurance Company Of America, et al v. M/V One Apus, et al
Plaintiff: Mitsui Sumitomo Insurance Company Of America,, Affliated FM Insurance Company, Allianz Global Corporate & Specialty, Allianz Global Corp. & Spec. North America/Allianz of America, Inc., Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company and Coast Underwriters, AmWINS Specialty Logistics Underwriters (ASLU), Continental Insurance Company, Mitsui Sumitomo Insurance Co., Ltd (Thailand Branch), Sompo International Insurance, Uninsured (Nokia), QBE, London, Uninsured (Motool Inc), Cathay Century Insurance, Sentinel Marine Underwriters, LLC. (SMU), China Pacific Insurance Company, Shanghai, Zurich, Hong Kong, Vienna Insurance Group, PT Mandiri AXA General Insurance, Mitsui Sumitomo Insurance USA Inc, NTI Limited (Australia), Uninsured (Rooms to Go), RLI Insurance Co., Sompo Insurance (Thailand) Public Company Limited, The New India Assurance Company Ltd (HK Branch), Ascot Underwriting Limited, Zurich Insurance, Zurich, Roanoke - Munich Re Syndicate Ltd, AXA General Insurance Hong Kong Ltd., SBI General Insurance, Zurich North America, Cathedral Underwriting Ltd, U.S. Specialty Insurance Company, MSIG Insurance (Thailand) Public Co Ltd, Markel America Insurance Company, Mitsui Sumitomo Insurance, Hanover Insurance Company, Chaucer Syndicate, ICICI ex Bharti AXA, India, Fubon Insurance Co Limited, Uninsured (Flextronics), Falvey Cargo Underwriting, HDI Global Insurance Company, Munich re Underwriting Ltd, CNA Insurance Company, Sunshine Property and Casualty Insurance Co Ltd, CNA Hardy, UK, The Hanover Insurance Company, The Continental Insurance Company, QBE, Coast Underwriters, Rooms to Go, HDI Global SE Australia Branch, Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company, Flextronics, Motool Inc, CNA Insurance Company Limited, Zurich Insurance and Nokia
Defendant: One, BDP Transport Inc., HMM, AIT Worldwide Logistics, DSV Ocean Transport A/S, SEKO Worldwide, Yang Ming, Christal Lines, Pyramid Lines, Connected International Inc, TOPOCEAN Consolidation service (los Angeles) Inc, UPS Asia Group Pte Ltd., Ark Shipping inc, Hapag Lloyd, APL Logistics Ltd, Blue Anchor America Line, Rohlig USA LLC, Pelorus Ocean Line Ltd, OIA Global Logistics (China) Ltd, Eurasia Freight Service Inc, Ocean Crown Shipping Ltd. Adrienne Shipping Ltd., Tplogix Inc, Air Sea Worldwide Logistics Ltd., Capital Express International, Blue World Line, Star Asia International Inc, AZ Freight Inc, Unique Logistics International (HK) Ltd, Nissin International Transport USA Inc, Shenzhen Enland Logistics Co Ltd, Great China Shipping Ltd, TVL Container Line Ltd, Pancon Express Service, Indo Trans Logistics corporation, Golden Bridge International Inc, Mondial Freight (HK) Ltd, Expeditors International Ocean, Westwind Shipping & Logistics Private Ltd., Pacific Concord International Ltd, Orient Express Container Company Ltd, MOL Worldwide Logistics, Flexport International LLC, Apex Maritime Co. (ORD) Ltd, World Logistic Services Ltd, Mainfreight Inc, RS Logistics Ltd, Alliance Cargo Group (HK) Ltd, American International Cargo Services Inc., Mohawk Global Logistics, Transcon Shipping Co Inc, China International Freight Co Ltd, Jetsea Shipping Agency Ltd, Global Ocean Agency Lines, HT International Supply Chain (china) Ltd, Hency Shipping Ltd, Interglobo North America Inc, Speedmark Logistics Co Ltd, International Freight Line (IFL), China Wheel Shipping (Holdings) Ltd., Orient Star Transport International Ltd, CJ Korea Express Schenxhen Co Ltd, Consolidator International Container Service, Globe Express Service, Seamaster Logistics, Shenzhen Wanningocean International Logistics Co., Ltd, Ecu Line NV, Shenzhen Anda Shun International Logistics Co Ltd., Thornley & Pitt Inc, East-West Logistics, Yes Logistics Corp, Dimerco Express (USA) Corp, Schenker Ocean, Tianshi Logistics Co Ltd, Castlegate Logistics Inc, Air Tiger Express Asia Inc, Power Link Logistics Inc, Sankyu Inc., Toshiba Logistics, Benkel International Pte Ltd., The Sumitomo Warehouse Co Ltd, Apex Maritime Co. (LAX) Inc, Proshipping Group Corp, Transport Partner Ltd, Shine Express Inc, Meadows WYE Container Groupage, Apex Shipping Co Inc, Sino Connections Logistics Inc, Shenzhen Fengda Logistics International LTD, De Well Container Shipping Inc, Shenzhen AWS Tomax International Transportation Co Ltd, Translink Shipping Lines, Blue Lotus Ocean Line, Flexport, Easy Way Logistics (HK) Ltd., Apex Shipping Co, Transpac, Expeditors International, Shenzhen Wanning Ocean International Logistics Co., Ltd, CHIDORI SHIP HOLDING LLC, JESSICA SHIP HOLDING S.A., NYK SHIP MANAGEMENT PTE LTD., OCEAN NETWORK EXPRESS PTE LTD., HAPAG-LLOYD AKTIENGESELLCHAFT, Yang Ming Marine Transport Corp., HMM CO., LTD, American International Cargo Service Inc., OCEAN CROWN SHIPPING LTD., ADRIENNE SHIPPING LTD. and Infinity Cargo Logistics (China) Ltd
3Rd Party Plaintiff: Danmar Lines
Cross Claimant: Transpac Cargoline, New Chain Logistics Co Ltd, Samsung SDS Co Ltd, Kamigumi CO Ltd and Mitsubishi Logistics America Corporation
Alternative Dispute Resolution (Adr) Provider: M/V ONE APUS, IMO no. 9806079, including its engines, boilers, tackle, and other appurtenances, etc., in rem
Cross Defendant: Roes 1-10
3Rd Party Defendant: Orient Overseas Container Line, M/V One Apus in rem, ECU Worldwide and HAPAG-LLOYD AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT a/k/a/ HAPAG-LLOYD AG
Case Number: 1:2022cv08233
Filed: September 27, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Paul A Engelmayer
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 46 U.S.C. ยง 30701 Marine Cargo Loss or Damage - Liability of Water Carriers
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 31, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 185 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO F.R.C.P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i): Plaintiff CONTINENTAL INSURANCE COMPANY pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure hereby voluntarily dismisses the following claim ONLY as against Defendant SEAMASTER LOGISTICS without prejudice, with each party to bear its own fees and costs: Container# DRYU4265485; Claim Value: $99,544.00; Bill of Lading#: SHKG5238176. Plaintiff CONTINENTAL INSURANCE COMPANY does NOT dismiss its claim for loss of or damage to cargo contained in this particular container and carried under the particular bill of lading against any other defendants. ONLY Plaintiff CONTINENTAL INSURANCE COMPANY'S claim, referenced above, against SEAMASTER LOGISITICS is hereby dismissed. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 8/31/2023) (vfr)
August 30, 2023 ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Document No. #184 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal, was reviewed and referred to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer for approval for the following reason(s): the plaintiff(s) filed their voluntary dismissal and it did not dismiss all of the parties or the action in its entirety. (tp)
August 29, 2023 Filing 184 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice and without costs against the defendant(s) Seamaster Logistics. Document filed by The Continental Insurance Company. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)...(Thames, Jonathan)
August 1, 2023 Filing 183 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Peter Skoufalos on behalf of Seamaster Logistics..(Skoufalos, Peter)
July 24, 2023 Filing 182 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Seamaster Logistics served on 7/24/2023, answer due 8/14/2023. Service was accepted by Kartik Pandya, Agent for Service of Process (New York, NY). Document filed by Vienna Insurance Group; CNA Hardy, UK; Sompo International Insurance; Sompo Insurance (Thailand) Public Company Limited; Munich re Underwriting Ltd; Zurich North America; Coast Underwriters; Cathedral Underwriting Ltd; Fubon Insurance Co Limited; U.S. Specialty Insurance Company ; Affliated FM Insurance Company; HDI Global Insurance Company; Rooms to Go; Motool Inc; Mitsui Sumitomo Insurance Co., Ltd (Thailand Branch); Cathay Century Insurance; QBE; Flextronics; CNA Insurance Company Limited; Falvey Cargo Underwriting; Sentinel Marine Underwriters, LLC. (SMU); Chaucer Syndicate; ICICI ex Bharti AXA, India; Zurich Insurance; HDI Global SE Australia Branch; The Hanover Insurance Company; Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company; The Continental Insurance Company; Ascot Underwriting Limited; MSIG Insurance (Thailand) Public Co Ltd; Roanoke - Munich Re Syndicate Ltd; SBI General Insurance; Markel America Insurance Company; AXA General Insurance Hong Kong Ltd.; Hanover Insurance Company; Mitsui Sumitomo Insurance; Mitsui Sumitomo Insurance Company Of America,; Sunshine Property and Casualty Insurance Co Ltd; Zurich, Hong Kong; China Pacific Insurance Company, Shanghai; RLI Insurance Co.; The New India Assurance Company Ltd (HK Branch); AmWINS Specialty Logistics Underwriters (ASLU); Allianz Global Corporate & Specialty ; Mitsui Sumitomo Insurance USA Inc; NTI Limited (Australia); Allianz Global Corp. & Spec. North America/Allianz of America, Inc.; PT Mandiri AXA General Insurance; Nokia..(Thames, Jonathan)
July 24, 2023 Filing 181 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Seamaster Logistics served on 7/13/2023, answer due 8/3/2023. Service was accepted by Imanuel Jacobo, Agent for Service of Process (Glendale, CA). Document filed by Vienna Insurance Group; CNA Hardy, UK; Sompo International Insurance; Sompo Insurance (Thailand) Public Company Limited; Munich re Underwriting Ltd; Zurich North America; Coast Underwriters; Cathedral Underwriting Ltd; Fubon Insurance Co Limited; U.S. Specialty Insurance Company ; Affliated FM Insurance Company; HDI Global Insurance Company; Rooms to Go; Motool Inc; Mitsui Sumitomo Insurance Co., Ltd (Thailand Branch); Cathay Century Insurance; QBE; Flextronics; CNA Insurance Company Limited; Falvey Cargo Underwriting; Sentinel Marine Underwriters, LLC. (SMU); Chaucer Syndicate; ICICI ex Bharti AXA, India; Zurich Insurance; HDI Global SE Australia Branch; The Hanover Insurance Company; Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company; The Continental Insurance Company; Ascot Underwriting Limited; MSIG Insurance (Thailand) Public Co Ltd; Roanoke - Munich Re Syndicate Ltd; SBI General Insurance; Markel America Insurance Company; AXA General Insurance Hong Kong Ltd.; Hanover Insurance Company; Mitsui Sumitomo Insurance; Mitsui Sumitomo Insurance Company Of America,; Sunshine Property and Casualty Insurance Co Ltd; Zurich, Hong Kong; China Pacific Insurance Company, Shanghai; RLI Insurance Co.; The New India Assurance Company Ltd (HK Branch); AmWINS Specialty Logistics Underwriters (ASLU); Allianz Global Corporate & Specialty ; Mitsui Sumitomo Insurance USA Inc; NTI Limited (Australia); Allianz Global Corp. & Spec. North America/Allianz of America, Inc.; PT Mandiri AXA General Insurance; Nokia..(Thames, Jonathan)
July 5, 2023 Filing 180 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Marlo J. Hittman on behalf of Shipco Transport, Shipco Transport Inc, Shipco Transport Inc., Shipco Transport Inc., Shipco Transport, Inc.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:22-md-03028-PAE et al..(Hittman, Marlo)
June 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 179 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO F.R.C.P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i): Plaintiff CONTINENTAL INSURANCE COMPANY pursuant to Rule 4l(a)(l)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure hereby voluntarily dismisses the following claims ONLY as against Defendant CONSOLIDATOR INTERNATIONAL CONTAINER SERVICE without prejudice, with each party to bear its own fees and costs: and further set forth in this Order. Plaintiff CONTINENTAL INSURANCE COMP ANY does NOT dismiss its claims for loss of or damage to cargo contained in these particular containers and carried under these particular bills of lading against any other defendants. ONLY plaintiff CONTINENT AL INSURANCE COMPANY's two claims against CONSOLIDATOR INTERNATIONAL CONTAINER SERVICE are dismissed hereby. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 6/20/2023) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:22-md-03028-PAE, 1:22-cv-08233-PAE (rro)
June 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 178 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO F.R.C.P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i): Plaintiff CONTINENTAL INSURANCE COMPANY pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure hereby voluntarily dismisses the following claims ONLY as against Defendant AMERICAN INTERNATIONAL CARGO SERVICE, INC. without prejudice, with each party to bear its own fees and costs: and further set forth in this Order. Plaintiff CONTINENTAL INSURANCE COMPANY does NOT dismiss its claims for loss or for damage to cargo contained in these particular containers and carried under these particular bills of lading against any other defendants. ONLY plaintiff CONTINENTAL INSURANCE COMPANY's one claim against AMERICAN INTERNATIONAL CARGO SERVICE, INC. is dismissed hereby. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 6/20/2023) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:22-md-03028-PAE, 1:22-cv-08233-PAE (rro)
June 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 177 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO F.R.C.P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i) Plaintiff AFFILIATED FM INSURANCE COMPANY pursuant to Rule 4\(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure hereby voluntarily dismisses the following claims ONLY as against Defendant SEKO WORLDWIDE without prejudice, with each par(y to bear its own fees and costs: and further set forth in this Order. Plaintiff AFFILIATED FM INSURANCE COMPANY does NOT dismiss its claims for loss or for damage to cargo contained in these particular containers and carried under these particular bills oflading against any other defendants. ONLY plaintiff AFFILIATED FM INSURANCECOMPANY's three claims against SEKO WORLDWIDE are dismissed hereby. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 6/20/2023) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:22-md-03028-PAE, 1:22-cv-08233-PAE (rro)
June 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 176 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL TO F.R.C.P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i): Plaintiff ALLIANZ GLOBAL CORPORATE & SPECIALTY pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure hereby voluntarily dismisses the following claims ONLY as against Defendant ADRIENNE SHIPPING LTD without prejudice, with each party to bear its own fees and costs: as set forth herein. Plaintiff ALLIANZE GLOBAL CORPORATE & SPECIALTY does NOT dismiss its claims for loss of or damage to cargo contained in these particular containers and carried under these particular bills of lading against any other defendants. ONLY plaintiff ALLIANZ GLOBAL CORPORATE & SPECIALTY's one claim against ADRIENNE SHIPPING LTD is dismissed hereby. SO ORDERED., ADRIENNE SHIPPING LTD. terminated. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 6/20/2023) (ama)
June 20, 2023 ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Document No. #172 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal was reviewed and referred to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer for approval for the following reason(s): the plaintiff(s) filed their voluntary dismissal and it did not dismiss all of the parties or the action in its entirety. (km)
June 20, 2023 ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Document No. #173 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal was reviewed and referred to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer for approval for the following reason(s): the plaintiff(s) filed their voluntary dismissal and it did not dismiss all of the parties or the action in its entirety. (km)
June 20, 2023 ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Document No. #175 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal was reviewed and referred to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer for approval for the following reason(s): the plaintiff(s) filed their voluntary dismissal and it did not dismiss all of the parties or the action in its entirety. (km)
June 20, 2023 ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Document No. #174 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal was reviewed and referred to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer for approval for the following reason(s): the plaintiff(s) filed their voluntary dismissal and it did not dismiss all of the parties or the action in its entirety. (km)
June 16, 2023 Filing 175 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice and without costs against the defendant(s) ADRIENNE SHIPPING LTD.. Document filed by Allianz Global Corporate & Specialty. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)...(Thames, Jonathan)
June 16, 2023 Filing 174 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice and without costs against the defendant(s) Consolidator International Container Service. Document filed by The Continental Insurance Company. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)...(Thames, Jonathan)
June 16, 2023 Filing 173 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice and without costs against the defendant(s) American International Cargo Service Inc.. Document filed by The Continental Insurance Company. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)...(Thames, Jonathan)
June 16, 2023 Filing 172 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice and without costs against the defendant(s) SEKO Worldwide. Document filed by Affliated FM Insurance Company. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)...(Thames, Jonathan)
June 15, 2023 Filing 171 ANSWER to #169 Crossclaim. Document filed by HMM CO., LTD..(Giffin, John)
June 12, 2023 Filing 170 ANSWER to #169 Crossclaim. Document filed by OCEAN NETWORK EXPRESS PTE LTD...(Donatelli, Randolph)
May 25, 2023 Filing 169 ANSWER to #2 Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,., CROSSCLAIM against CHIDORI SHIP HOLDING LLC, HMM CO., LTD, JESSICA SHIP HOLDING S.A., M/V ONE APUS, IMO no. 9806079, including its engines, boilers, tackle, and other appurtenances, etc., in rem, NYK SHIP MANAGEMENT PTE LTD., OCEAN NETWORK EXPRESS PTE LTD.. Document filed by Samsung SDS Co Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A).(Reilly, Mary)
May 25, 2023 Filing 168 FIRST RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Samsung SDS Co Ltd..(Reilly, Mary)
May 2, 2023 Filing 167 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Transcon Shipping Co Inc.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:22-md-03028-PAE, 1:22-cv-08233-PAE.(Lee, Susan)
May 2, 2023 Filing 166 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Susan Lee on behalf of Transcon Shipping Co Inc. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:22-md-03028-PAE, 1:22-cv-08233-PAE.(Lee, Susan)
May 1, 2023 Filing 165 ANSWER to #2 Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Document filed by CHIDORI SHIP HOLDING LLC, JESSICA SHIP HOLDING S.A., M/V ONE APUS, IMO no. 9806079, including its engines, boilers, tackle, and other appurtenances, etc., in rem, NYK SHIP MANAGEMENT PTE LTD...(Semenoro, Timothy)
May 1, 2023 Filing 164 ANSWER to #109 Third Party Complaint,. Document filed by CHIDORI SHIP HOLDING LLC, JESSICA SHIP HOLDING S.A., NYK SHIP MANAGEMENT PTE LTD...(Semenoro, Timothy)
May 1, 2023 Filing 163 ANSWER to #95 Third Party Complaint,. Document filed by CHIDORI SHIP HOLDING LLC, JESSICA SHIP HOLDING S.A., M/V ONE APUS, IMO no. 9806079, including its engines, boilers, tackle, and other appurtenances, etc., in rem, NYK SHIP MANAGEMENT PTE LTD...(Semenoro, Timothy)
May 1, 2023 Filing 162 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Nippon Yusen Kabushiki Kaisha for NYK SHIP MANAGEMENT PTE LTD.; Corporate Parent Anchor Ocean for CHIDORI SHIP HOLDING LLC, JESSICA SHIP HOLDING S.A.. Document filed by CHIDORI SHIP HOLDING LLC, JESSICA SHIP HOLDING S.A., M/V One Apus in rem, NYK SHIP MANAGEMENT PTE LTD..Filed In Associated Cases: 1:22-md-03028-PAE, 1:22-cv-08233-PAE.(Nakazawa, Alan)
April 27, 2023 Filing 161 ANSWER to #109 Third Party Complaint,. Document filed by OCEAN NETWORK EXPRESS PTE LTD...(Donatelli, Randolph)
April 27, 2023 Filing 160 ANSWER to #95 Third Party Complaint,. Document filed by OCEAN NETWORK EXPRESS PTE LTD...(Donatelli, Randolph)
April 19, 2023 Filing 159 ANSWER to #148 Crossclaim. Document filed by OCEAN NETWORK EXPRESS PTE LTD...(Donatelli, Randolph)
April 19, 2023 Filing 158 ANSWER to #145 Crossclaim. Document filed by OCEAN NETWORK EXPRESS PTE LTD...(Donatelli, Randolph)
April 17, 2023 Filing 157 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE P LEASE TAKE NOTICE that Third Party Plaintiff Danmar Lines AG ("Danmar"), by its undersigned attorneys, Brown Gavalas & Fromm LLP, hereby voluntarily dismisses the claims it pled in its third-party complaint (Docket Entry 95) against Third Party Defendant Orient Overseas Container Line only, without prejudice, and without costs, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41 (a)(1)(A)(i). Third-Party Defendant Orient Overseas Container Line has neither answered, a ppeared nor filed a motion for summary judgment. D anmar does not dismiss its claims against any other third- party defendants Orient Express Container Co., Ltd. terminated. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 4/17/2023) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:22-md-03028-PAE, 1:22-cv-08233-PAE (rro)
April 17, 2023 ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Document No. #156 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal, was reviewed and referred to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer for approval for the following reason(s): the plaintiff(s) filed their voluntary dismissal and it did not dismiss all of the parties or the action in its entirety. (tp)
April 14, 2023 Filing 156 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice and without costs against the defendant(s) Orient Overseas Container Line. Document filed by Danmar Lines. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)...(Skoufalos, Peter)
April 5, 2023 Filing 155 ANSWER to #87 Crossclaim. Document filed by HMM CO., LTD..(Giffin, John)
April 4, 2023 Filing 154 ANSWER to #141 Crossclaim. Document filed by HMM CO., LTD..(Giffin, John)
March 31, 2023 Filing 153 ANSWER to #141 Crossclaim. Document filed by OCEAN NETWORK EXPRESS PTE LTD...(Donatelli, Randolph)
March 31, 2023 Filing 152 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Third Party Complaint,. ECU Worldwide served on 3/22/2023, answer due 4/12/2023. Service was accepted by Osmay Torres, Receiving Manager. Document filed by BDP Transport Inc...(Skoufalos, Peter)
March 30, 2023 Filing 151 ANSWER to #2 Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Document filed by De Well Container Shipping Inc..(Perrone, Joseph)
March 30, 2023 Filing 150 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by De Well Container Shipping Inc..(Perrone, Joseph)
March 30, 2023 Filing 149 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joseph John Perrone on behalf of De Well Container Shipping Inc..(Perrone, Joseph)
March 30, 2023 Filing 148 ANSWER to #2 Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,., CROSSCLAIM against CHIDORI SHIP HOLDING LLC, JESSICA SHIP HOLDING S.A., M/V ONE APUS, IMO no. 9806079, including its engines, boilers, tackle, and other appurtenances, etc., in rem, NYK SHIP MANAGEMENT PTE LTD., OCEAN NETWORK EXPRESS PTE LTD.. Document filed by Kamigumi CO Ltd..(Perrone, Joseph)
March 30, 2023 Filing 147 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Kamigumi CO Ltd..(Perrone, Joseph)
March 30, 2023 Filing 146 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joseph John Perrone on behalf of Kamigumi CO Ltd..(Perrone, Joseph)
March 30, 2023 Filing 145 ANSWER to #2 Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,., CROSSCLAIM against CHIDORI SHIP HOLDING LLC, JESSICA SHIP HOLDING S.A., M/V ONE APUS, IMO no. 9806079, including its engines, boilers, tackle, and other appurtenances, etc., in rem, NYK SHIP MANAGEMENT PTE LTD., OCEAN NETWORK EXPRESS PTE LTD.. Document filed by Mitsubishi Logistics America Corporation..(Perrone, Joseph)
March 30, 2023 Filing 144 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Mitsubishi Logistics Corporation for Mitsubishi Logistics America Corporation. Document filed by Mitsubishi Logistics America Corporation..(Perrone, Joseph)
March 17, 2023 Filing 143 ANSWER to #126 Crossclaim. Document filed by OCEAN NETWORK EXPRESS PTE LTD...(Donatelli, Randolph)
March 16, 2023 Filing 142 ANSWER to #141 Crossclaim. Document filed by Yang Ming Marine Transport Corp...(Wolfson, Garth)
March 14, 2023 Filing 141 ANSWER to #2 Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,., CROSSCLAIM against CHIDORI SHIP HOLDING LLC, HAPAG-LLOYD AKTIENGESELLCHAFT, HMM CO., LTD, JESSICA SHIP HOLDING S.A., M/V ONE APUS, IMO no. 9806079, including its engines, boilers, tackle, and other appurtenances, etc., in rem, NYK SHIP MANAGEMENT PTE LTD., OCEAN NETWORK EXPRESS PTE LTD., Yang Ming Marine Transport Corp.. Document filed by Alliance Cargo Group (HK) Ltd..(McKew, Mark)
March 9, 2023 Filing 140 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. OCEAN NETWORK EXPRESS PTE LTD. waiver sent on 3/1/2023, answer due 5/1/2023. Document filed by BDP Transport Inc...(Skoufalos, Peter)
March 9, 2023 Filing 139 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. OCEAN NETWORK EXPRESS PTE LTD. waiver sent on 3/1/2023, answer due 5/1/2023. Document filed by Danmar Lines..(Skoufalos, Peter)
March 3, 2023 Filing 138 ANSWER to #87 Crossclaim. Document filed by Yang Ming Marine Transport Corp...(Wolfson, Garth)
March 3, 2023 Filing 137 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. JESSICA SHIP HOLDING S.A. waiver sent on 3/1/2023, answer due 5/1/2023. Document filed by BDP Transport Inc...(Skoufalos, Peter)
March 3, 2023 Filing 136 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. CHIDORI SHIP HOLDING LLC waiver sent on 3/1/2023, answer due 5/1/2023. Document filed by BDP Transport Inc...(Skoufalos, Peter)
March 3, 2023 Filing 135 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. JESSICA SHIP HOLDING S.A. waiver sent on 3/1/2023, answer due 5/1/2023. Document filed by Danmar Lines..(Skoufalos, Peter)
March 3, 2023 Filing 134 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. CHIDORI SHIP HOLDING LLC waiver sent on 3/1/2023, answer due 5/1/2023. Document filed by Danmar Lines..(Skoufalos, Peter)
February 28, 2023 Filing 133 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to CHIDORI SHIP HOLDING LLC. (sj)
February 28, 2023 Filing 132 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to JESSICA SHIP HOLDING S.A.. (sj)
February 28, 2023 Filing 131 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to NYK SHIP MANAGEMENT PTE LTD.. (sj)
February 28, 2023 Filing 130 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to OCEAN NETWORK EXPRESS PTE LTD.. (sj)
February 28, 2023 Filing 129 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to HAPAG-LLOYD AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT a/k/a/ HAPAG-LLOYD AG. (sj)
February 28, 2023 Filing 128 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to ECU Worldwide. (sj)
February 28, 2023 Filing 127 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent JAS Worldwide S.a.r.l. for Blue World Line. Document filed by Blue World Line..(Spector, Andrew)
February 28, 2023 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Notice to Attorney Andrew Robert Spector to RE-FILE Document No. #125 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the corporate parent/other affiliate was not added;. Re-file the document using the event type Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement found under the event list Other Documents - select the correct filer/filers - attach the correct signed PDF - when prompted with the message "Are there any corporate parents or other affiliates?", select the Yes radio button - enter the corporate parent/other affiliate, click the Search button - select the correct corporate parent/other affiliate name from the search results list or if no person found, create a new corporate parent/other affiliate - select the party to whom the corporate parent/other affiliate should be linked - add corporate parent/other affiliate names one at a time. (lb)
February 27, 2023 Filing 126 ANSWER to #2 Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,., CROSSCLAIM against CHIDORI SHIP HOLDING LLC, HAPAG-LLOYD AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT a/k/a/ HAPAG-LLOYD AG, JESSICA SHIP HOLDING S.A., M/V One Apus in rem, OCEAN NETWORK EXPRESS PTE LTD.. Document filed by Blue World Line..(Spector, Andrew)
February 27, 2023 Filing 125 FILING ERROR - CORPORATE PARENT/OTHER AFFILIATE NOT ADDED - RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Blue World Line..(Spector, Andrew) Modified on 2/28/2023 (lb).
February 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER granting #117 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #117 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from Mark L. McKew dated 02/26/2023., #2 Complaint. Granted. SO ORDERED. Alliance Cargo Group (HK) Ltd answer due 3/14/2023. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 2/27/2023) (tg)
February 27, 2023 Filing 123 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to ECU Worldwide, re: #109 Third Party Complaint,. Document filed by BDP Transport Inc...(Skoufalos, Peter)
February 27, 2023 Filing 122 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to HAPAG-LLOYD AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT a/k/a/ HAPAG-LLOYD AG, re: #109 Third Party Complaint,. Document filed by BDP Transport Inc...(Skoufalos, Peter)
February 27, 2023 Filing 121 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to OCEAN NETWORK EXPRESS PTE LTD, re: #109 Third Party Complaint,. Document filed by BDP Transport Inc...(Skoufalos, Peter)
February 27, 2023 Filing 120 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to NYK SHIPMANAGEMENT PTE LTD, re: #109 Third Party Complaint,. Document filed by BDP Transport Inc...(Skoufalos, Peter)
February 27, 2023 Filing 119 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to JESSICA SHIP HOLDING S.A., re: #109 Third Party Complaint,. Document filed by BDP Transport Inc...(Skoufalos, Peter)
February 27, 2023 Filing 118 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to CHIDORI SHIP HOLDING LLC, re: #109 Third Party Complaint,. Document filed by BDP Transport Inc...(Skoufalos, Peter)
February 26, 2023 Filing 117 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from Mark L. McKew dated 02/26/2023. Document filed by Alliance Cargo Group (HK) Ltd..(McKew, Mark)
February 26, 2023 Filing 116 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Alliance Cargo Group (HK) Ltd..(McKew, Mark)
February 26, 2023 Filing 115 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Mark L. McKew on behalf of Alliance Cargo Group (HK) Ltd..(McKew, Mark)
February 24, 2023 Filing 114 ANSWER to #67 Crossclaim. Document filed by Yang Ming Marine Transport Corp...(Wolfson, Garth)
February 24, 2023 Filing 113 ANSWER to #65 Crossclaim. Document filed by Yang Ming Marine Transport Corp...(Wolfson, Garth)
February 24, 2023 Filing 112 ANSWER to #91 Crossclaim. Document filed by OCEAN NETWORK EXPRESS PTE LTD...(Donatelli, Randolph)
February 24, 2023 Filing 111 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Orient Overseas Container Line. (vf)
February 23, 2023 Filing 110 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Orient Overseas Container Line, re: #95 Third Party Complaint,. Document filed by Danmar Lines..(Skoufalos, Peter)
February 23, 2023 Filing 109 THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against CHIDORI SHIP HOLDING LLC, JESSICA SHIP HOLDING S.A., M/V One Apus in rem, NYK SHIP MANAGEMENT PTE LTD., OCEAN NETWORK EXPRESS PTE LTD., ECU Worldwide, HAPAG-LLOYD AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT a/k/a/ HAPAG-LLOYD AG.Document filed by BDP Transport Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2-BDP Answer).(Skoufalos, Peter)
February 17, 2023 Filing 108 ANSWER to #2 Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Document filed by BDP Transport Inc...(Skoufalos, Peter)
February 17, 2023 Filing 107 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent BDP International Inc. for BDP Transport Inc.. Document filed by BDP Transport Inc...(Skoufalos, Peter)
February 13, 2023 Filing 106 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to HAPAG-LLOYD AKTIENGESELLCHAFT. (sj)
February 13, 2023 Filing 105 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to OCEAN NETWORK EXPRESS PTE LTD.. (sj)
February 13, 2023 Filing 104 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to NYK SHIP MANAGEMENT PTE LTD.. (sj)
February 13, 2023 Filing 103 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to JESSICA SHIP HOLDING S.A.. (sj)
February 13, 2023 Filing 102 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to CHIDORI SHIP HOLDING LLC. (sj)
February 13, 2023 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Peter Skoufalos to RE-FILE Document No. #100 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; party name on PDF does not match name in docket entry. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (sj)
February 10, 2023 Filing 101 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to HAPAG-LLOYD AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT a/k/a/ HAPAG-LLOYD AG, re: #95 Third Party Complaint,. Document filed by Danmar Lines..(Skoufalos, Peter)
February 10, 2023 Filing 100 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST As To - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Orient Overseas Container Line, re: #95 Third Party Complaint. Document filed by Danmar Lines.(Skoufalos, Peter) Modified on 2/13/2023 (sj).
February 10, 2023 Filing 99 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to OCEAN NETWORK EXPRESS PTE LTD, re: #95 Third Party Complaint,. Document filed by Danmar Lines..(Skoufalos, Peter)
February 10, 2023 Filing 98 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to NYK SHIPMANAGEMENT PTE LTD, re: #95 Third Party Complaint,. Document filed by Danmar Lines..(Skoufalos, Peter)
February 10, 2023 Filing 97 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to JESSICA SHIP HOLDING S.A., re: #95 Third Party Complaint,. Document filed by Danmar Lines..(Skoufalos, Peter)
February 10, 2023 Filing 96 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to CHIDORI SHIP HOLDING LLC, re: #95 Third Party Complaint,. Document filed by Danmar Lines..(Skoufalos, Peter)
February 9, 2023 Filing 95 THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against CHIDORI SHIP HOLDING LLC, HAPAG-LLOYD AKTIENGESELLCHAFT, JESSICA SHIP HOLDING S.A., NYK SHIP MANAGEMENT PTE LTD., OCEAN NETWORK EXPRESS PTE LTD., Orient Overseas Container Line, M/V One Apus in rem.Document filed by Danmar Lines. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2-Danmar's Answer).(Skoufalos, Peter)
February 8, 2023 Filing 94 ANSWER to #68 Crossclaim. Document filed by OCEAN NETWORK EXPRESS PTE LTD...(Donatelli, Randolph)
February 8, 2023 Filing 93 ANSWER to #67 Crossclaim. Document filed by OCEAN NETWORK EXPRESS PTE LTD...(Donatelli, Randolph)
February 8, 2023 Filing 92 ANSWER to #66 Crossclaim. Document filed by OCEAN NETWORK EXPRESS PTE LTD...(Donatelli, Randolph)
February 6, 2023 Filing 91 ANSWER to #2 Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,., CROSSCLAIM against CHIDORI SHIP HOLDING LLC, JESSICA SHIP HOLDING S.A., M/V ONE APUS, IMO no. 9806079, including its engines, boilers, tackle, and other appurtenances, etc., in rem, NYK SHIP MANAGEMENT PTE LTD., OCEAN NETWORK EXPRESS PTE LTD.. Document filed by Mainfreight Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Bill of Lading).(Manasantivongs, Alisa)
February 6, 2023 Filing 90 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Mainfreight Inc.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:22-md-03028-PAE, 1:22-cv-08233-PAE.(Manasantivongs, Alisa)
February 1, 2023 Filing 89 ANSWER to #2 Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Document filed by Danmar Lines..(Skoufalos, Peter)
February 1, 2023 Filing 88 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent DANZAS HOLDINGS AG for Danmar Lines. Document filed by Danmar Lines..(Skoufalos, Peter)
January 30, 2023 Filing 87 ANSWER to #2 Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,., CROSSCLAIM against Benkel International Pte Ltd., CHIDORI SHIP HOLDING LLC, HMM CO., LTD, JESSICA SHIP HOLDING S.A., M/V ONE APUS, IMO no. 9806079, including its engines, boilers, tackle, and other appurtenances, etc., in rem, NYK SHIP MANAGEMENT PTE LTD., Yang Ming Marine Transport Corp., Roes 1-10. Document filed by Transpac Cargoline..(Floyd, Edward)
January 30, 2023 Filing 86 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by MCL-Multi Container Line, Inc., Transpac Cargoline.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:22-md-03028-PAE, 1:22-cv-08233-PAE.(Floyd, Edward)
January 27, 2023 Filing 85 FIRST RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by New Chain Logistics Co Ltd..(Pan, Ren Rong)
January 27, 2023 Filing 84 ANSWER to #2 Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,., CROSSCLAIM against M/V ONE APUS, IMO no. 9806079, including its engines, boilers, tackle, and other appurtenances, etc., in rem. Document filed by New Chain Logistics Co Ltd..(Pan, Ren Rong)
January 24, 2023 Filing 83 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by TOPOCEAN Consolidation service (los Angeles) Inc..(Jordan, Kenderick)
January 23, 2023 Filing 82 ANSWER to #2 Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Document filed by HMM CO., LTD..(Giffin, John)
January 23, 2023 Filing 81 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by HMM CO., LTD..(Giffin, John)
January 23, 2023 Filing 80 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by HMM CO., LTD.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:22-md-03028-PAE, 1:22-cv-08233-PAE.(Giffin, John)
January 23, 2023 Filing 79 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by John David Giffin on behalf of HMM CO., LTD. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:22-md-03028-PAE, 1:22-cv-08233-PAE.(Giffin, John)
January 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 78 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO F.R.C.P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i): Plaintiff NTI LIMITED (AUSTRALIA) pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure hereby voluntarily dismisses the following claims ONLY as against Defendant MEADOWS WYE CONTAINER GROUPAGE without prejudice, with each party to bear its own fees and costs: As further set forth in this order. Plaintiff NTI LIMITED (AUSTRALIA) does NOT dismiss its claims for loss of or damage to cargo contained in these particular containers and carried under these particular bills of lading against any other defendants. ONLY Plaintiff NTI LIMITED (AUSTRALIA)'s three claims against MEADOWS WYE CONTAINER GROUP AGE are hereby dismissed. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 1/23/2023) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:22-md-03028-PAE, 1:22-cv-08233-PAE (ks)
January 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 77 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO F.R.C.P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i): Plaintiff RLI INSURANCE CO. pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure hereby voluntarily dismisses the following claims ONLY as against Defendant GLOBAL OCEAN AGENCY LINES without prejudice, with each patty to bear its own fees and costs: As further set forth in this Order. Plaintiff RLI INSURANCE CO. does NOT dismiss its claims for loss of or damage to cargo contained in these particular containers and carried under these particular bills of lading against any other defendants. ONLY Plaintiff RLI INSURANCE CO.'s seven claims against GLOBAL OCEAN AGENCY LINES are hereby dismissed. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 1/23/2023) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:22-md-03028-PAE, 1:22-cv-08233-PAE (ks)
January 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 76 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO F.R.C.P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i): Plaintiff CONTINENTAL INSURANCE COMPANY pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1) (A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure hereby voluntarily dismisses the following claim ONLY as against Defendant GLOBAL OCEAN AGENCY LINES without prejudice, with each party to bear its own fees and costs: as further set forth in this Order. Plaintiff CONTINENTAL INSURANCE COMPANY does NOT dismiss its claim for loss of or damage to cargo contained in this particular container and carried under the particular bill of lading against any other defendants. ONLY Plaintiff CONTINENTAL INSURANCE COMPANY'S claim, referenced above, against GLOBAL OCEAN AGENCY LINES is hereby dismissed. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 1/23/2023) (ks) Modified on 1/23/2023 (ks).
January 23, 2023 Filing 75 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent AIT WORLDWIDE LOGISTICS INTERMEDIARY HOLDINGS, INC., Other Affiliate AIT WORLDWIDE LOGISTICS HOLDING, INC. for AIT Worldwide Logistics. Document filed by AIT Worldwide Logistics..(Jordan, Kenderick)
January 23, 2023 Filing 74 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent C.H. Robinson Worldwide, Inc., Other Affiliate BlackRock, Inc. (Owner of Ten Percent Plus Stock) for Christal Lines. Document filed by Christal Lines..(Jordan, Kenderick)
January 23, 2023 ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Document No. #72 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal was reviewed and referred to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer for approval for the following reason(s): the plaintiff(s) filed their voluntary dismissal and it did not dismiss all of the parties or the action in its entirety. (nd)
January 23, 2023 ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Document No. #71 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal,, was reviewed and referred to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer for approval for the following reason(s): the plaintiff(s) filed their voluntary dismissal and it did not dismiss all of the parties or the action in its entirety;. (nd)
January 23, 2023 ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Document No. #73 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal,, was reviewed and referred to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer for approval for the following reason(s): the plaintiff(s) filed their voluntary dismissal and it did not dismiss all of the parties or the action in its entirety. (nd)
January 20, 2023 Filing 73 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice and without costs against the defendant(s) Global Ocean Agency Lines. Document filed by The Continental Insurance Company. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)...(Thames, Jonathan)
January 20, 2023 Filing 72 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice and without costs against the defendant(s) Global Ocean Agency Lines. Document filed by RLI Insurance Co.. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)...(Thames, Jonathan)
January 20, 2023 Filing 71 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice and without costs against the defendant(s) Meadows WYE Container Groupage. Document filed by NTI Limited (Australia). Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)...(Thames, Jonathan)
January 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER: granting (69) Letter Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:22-cv-08233-PAE. Granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 1/20/2023) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:22-md-03028-PAE, 1:22-cv-08233-PAE (ama)
January 20, 2023 Filing 69 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from Kenderick M. Jordan dated January 20, 2023. Document filed by American International Cargo Service Inc., SEKO Worldwide. Return Date set for 3/31/2023 at 09:00 AM..(Jordan, Kenderick)
January 20, 2023 Filing 68 ANSWER to #2 Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,., CROSSCLAIM against CHIDORI SHIP HOLDING LLC, JESSICA SHIP HOLDING S.A., M/V ONE APUS, IMO no. 9806079, including its engines, boilers, tackle, and other appurtenances, etc., in rem, NYK SHIP MANAGEMENT PTE LTD., OCEAN NETWORK EXPRESS PTE LTD., Yang Ming Marine Transport Corp.. Document filed by AIT Worldwide Logistics. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit AIT Seaway Bill Copy).(Jordan, Kenderick)
January 20, 2023 Filing 67 ANSWER to #2 Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,., CROSSCLAIM against CHIDORI SHIP HOLDING LLC, JESSICA SHIP HOLDING S.A., M/V ONE APUS, IMO no. 9806079, including its engines, boilers, tackle, and other appurtenances, etc., in rem, NYK SHIP MANAGEMENT PTE LTD., OCEAN NETWORK EXPRESS PTE LTD., Yang Ming Marine Transport Corp.. Document filed by TOPOCEAN Consolidation service (los Angeles) Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit TopOcean Bill of Lading).(Jordan, Kenderick)
January 20, 2023 Filing 66 ANSWER to #2 Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,., CROSSCLAIM against CHIDORI SHIP HOLDING LLC, JESSICA SHIP HOLDING S.A., M/V ONE APUS, IMO no. 9806079, including its engines, boilers, tackle, and other appurtenances, etc., in rem, NYK SHIP MANAGEMENT PTE LTD., OCEAN NETWORK EXPRESS PTE LTD.. Document filed by Christal Lines. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Multimodal Bill of Lading from Christal Lines).(Jordan, Kenderick)
January 20, 2023 Filing 65 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - (SEE DOCUMENT#68) ANSWER to #2 Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,., CROSSCLAIM against CHIDORI SHIP HOLDING LLC, JESSICA SHIP HOLDING S.A., NYK SHIP MANAGEMENT PTE LTD., OCEAN NETWORK EXPRESS PTE LTD., Yang Ming Marine Transport Corp.. Document filed by AIT Worldwide Logistics. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit House Seaway bill dated 11.10.20).(Jordan, Kenderick) Modified on 1/20/2023 (lb).
January 20, 2023 Filing 64 FILING ERROR - CORPORATE PARENT/OTHER AFFILIATE NOT ADDED - RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT.. Document filed by Christal Lines..(Jordan, Kenderick) Modified on 1/20/2023 (lb).
January 20, 2023 Filing 63 FILING ERROR - CORPORATE PARENT/OTHER AFFILIATE NOT ADDED - RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT.. Document filed by AIT Worldwide Logistics..(Jordan, Kenderick) Modified on 1/20/2023 (lb).
January 20, 2023 Filing 62 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Robert Lee Reeb on behalf of AIT Worldwide Logistics, American International Cargo Service Inc., Christal Lines, SEKO Worldwide, TOPOCEAN Consolidation service (los Angeles) Inc..(Reeb, Robert)
January 20, 2023 Filing 61 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kenderick Mason Jordan on behalf of AIT Worldwide Logistics, American International Cargo Service Inc., Christal Lines, SEKO Worldwide, TOPOCEAN Consolidation service (los Angeles) Inc..(Jordan, Kenderick)
January 20, 2023 Filing 60 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Ocean Network Express Holdings, Ltd., Other Affiliate Nippon Yusen Kaisha, Other Affiliate Kawasaki Kisen Kaisha Ltd., Other Affiliate Mitsui O.S.K. Lines Ltd. for Ocean Network Express Pte. Ltd.. Document filed by Ocean Network Express Pte. Ltd..Filed In Associated Cases: 1:22-md-03028-PAE, 1:22-cv-08233-PAE.(Donatelli, Randolph)
January 20, 2023 Filing 59 ANSWER to #2 Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Document filed by OCEAN NETWORK EXPRESS PTE LTD...(Donatelli, Randolph)
January 20, 2023 Filing 58 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Ocean Network Express Holdings, Ltd., Other Affiliate Nippon Yusen Kaisha, Other Affiliate Kawasaki Kisen Kaisha Ltd., Other Affiliate Mitsui O.S.K. Lines Ltd. for OCEAN NETWORK EXPRESS PTE LTD.. Document filed by OCEAN NETWORK EXPRESS PTE LTD...(Donatelli, Randolph)
January 20, 2023 Set/Reset Deadlines: American International Cargo Service Inc. answer due 3/31/2023. (ama)
January 20, 2023 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Notice to Attorney Kenderick Mason Jordan to RE-FILE Document Nos. #64 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement and #63 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. These filings are deficient for the following reason(s): the corporate parent/other affiliate was not added;. Re-file the document using the event type Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement found under the event list Other Documents - select the correct filer/filers - attach the correct signed PDF - when prompted with the message "Are there any corporate parents or other affiliates?", select the Yes radio button - enter the corporate parent/other affiliate, click the Search button - select the correct corporate parent/other affiliate name from the search results list or if no person found, create a new corporate parent/other affiliate - select the party to whom the corporate parent/other affiliate should be linked - add corporate parent/other affiliate names one at a time. (lb)
January 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 57 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO F.R.C.P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i): Plaintiff AFFILIATED FM INSURANCE COMPANY pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure hereby voluntarily dismisses the following claims ONLY as against Defendant PYRAMID LINES without prejudice, with each party to bear its own fees and costs: As further set forth in this order. Plaintiff AFFILIATED FM INSURANCE COMPANY does NOT dismiss its claims for loss of or damage to cargo contained in these particular containers and carried under these particular bills of lading against any other defendants. ONLY Plaintiff AFFILIATED FM INSURANCE COMPANY'S eight claims against PYRAMID LINES are hereby dismissed. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 1/12/2023) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:22-md-03028-PAE, 1:22-cv-08233-PAE (ks)
January 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 56 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO F.R.C.P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i): Plaintiff CONTINENTAL INSURANCE COMPANY pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure hereby voluntarily dismisses the following claim ONLY as against Defendant CHINA INTERNATIONAL FREIGHT CO. LTD without prejudice, with each party to bear its own fees and costs: As further set forth in this order. Plaintiff CONTINENTAL INSURANCE COMPANY does NOT dismiss its claim for loss of or damage to cargo contained in this particular container and carried under this bill of lading against any other defendants. ONLY Plaintiff CONTINENTAL INSURANCE COMPANY'S claim, referenced above, against CHINA INTERNATIONAL FREIGHT CO. LTD is hereby dismissed. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 1/12/2023) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:22-md-03028-PAE, 1:22-cv-08233-PAE (ks)
January 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 55 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO F.R.C.P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i): Plaintiff AFFILIATED FM INSURANCE COMPANY pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure hereby voluntarily dismisses the following claims ONLY as against Defendant APL LOGISTICS LTD without prejudice, with each party to bear its own fees and costs: as further set forth in this order. Plaintiff AFFILIATED FM INSURANCE COMPANY does NOT dismiss its claims for loss of or damage to cargo contained in these particular containers and carried under these particular bills of lading against any other defendants. ONLY AFFILIATED FM INSURANCE COMPANYs two claims against APL LOGISTICS LTD are hereby dismissed. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 1/12/2023) (ks)
January 12, 2023 ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Document No. #52 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal, was reviewed and referred to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer for approval for the following reason(s): the plaintiff(s) filed their voluntary dismissal and it did not dismiss all of the parties or the action in its entirety. (tp)
January 12, 2023 ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Document No. #53 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal, was reviewed and referred to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer for approval for the following reason(s): the plaintiff(s) filed their voluntary dismissal and it did not dismiss all of the parties or the action in its entirety. (tp)
January 12, 2023 ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Document No. #54 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal, was reviewed and referred to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer for approval for the following reason(s): the plaintiff(s) filed their voluntary dismissal and it did not dismiss all of the parties or the action in its entirety. (tp)
January 11, 2023 Filing 54 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice and without costs against the defendant(s) Pyramid Lines. Document filed by Affliated FM Insurance Company. Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff...(Thames, Jonathan)
January 11, 2023 Filing 53 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice and without costs against the defendant(s) China International Freight Co Ltd. Document filed by The Continental Insurance Company. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)...(Thames, Jonathan)
January 11, 2023 Filing 52 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice and without costs against the defendant(s) APL Logistics Ltd. Document filed by Affliated FM Insurance Company. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)...(Thames, Jonathan)
January 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 51 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO F.R.C.P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i): Plaintiff AMWINS SPECIALTY LOGISTICS UNDERWRITERS pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure hereby voluntarily dismisses the following claims ONLY as against Defendant NISSIN INTERNATIONAL TRANSPORT USA INC. without prejudice, with each party to bear its own fees and costs: As further set forth in this Order. Plaintiff AMWINS SPECIALTY LOGISTICS UNDERWRITERS does NOT dismiss its claims for loss of or damage to cargo contained in these particular containers and carried under these particular bills of lading against any other defendants. ONLY plaintiff AMWINS SPECIALTY LOGISTICS UNDERWRITERS' four claims against NISSIN are dismissed hereby. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 1/11/2023) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:22-md-03028-PAE, 1:22-cv-08233-PAE (ks)
January 11, 2023 ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Document No. #50 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal, was reviewed and referred to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer for approval for the following reason(s): the plaintiff(s) filed their voluntary dismissal and it did not dismiss all of the parties or the action in its entirety. (tp)
January 10, 2023 Filing 50 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice and without costs against the defendant(s) Nissin International Transport USA Inc. Document filed by AmWINS Specialty Logistics Underwriters (ASLU). Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)...(Thames, Jonathan)
January 10, 2023 Filing 49 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR - (SEE DOCUMENT #50) - NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice and without costs against the defendant(s) AmWINS Specialty Logistics Underwriters (ASLU). Document filed by AmWINS Specialty Logistics Underwriters (ASLU). Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)...(Thames, Jonathan) Modified on 1/11/2023 (lb).
January 10, 2023 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL. Notice to Attorney Jonathan Thames. RE-FILE Document No. #48 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong party/parties whom the voluntary dismissal is against was/were selected. Re-file the document using the event type Notice of Voluntary Dismissal found under the event list Notices - select the correct filer/filers - select the correct party/parties the voluntary dismissal is against - and attach the correct signed PDF. (tp)
January 9, 2023 Filing 48 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR - NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, against the defendant(s) AmWINS Specialty Logistics Underwriters (ASLU). Document filed by AmWINS Specialty Logistics Underwriters (ASLU). Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)...(Thames, Jonathan) Modified on 1/10/2023 (tp).
January 5, 2023 Filing 47 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Orient Star Transport International Ltd..(Gutterman, Barry)
January 4, 2023 Filing 46 FILING ERROR - CORPORATE PARENT/OTHER AFFILIATE NOT ADDED - RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT.. Document filed by Orient Star Transport International Ltd..(Gutterman, Barry) Modified on 1/4/2023 (lb).
January 4, 2023 Filing 45 ANSWER to #2 Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Document filed by Orient Star Transport International Ltd..(Gutterman, Barry)
January 4, 2023 Filing 44 FILING ERROR - CORPORATE PARENT/OTHER AFFILIATE NOT ADDED - RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Orient Star Transport International Ltd..(Gutterman, Barry) Modified on 1/4/2023 (lb).
January 4, 2023 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Notice to Attorney Barry Neil Gutterman to RE-FILE Document No. #44 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the corporate parent/other affiliate was not added;. Re-file the document using the event type Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement found under the event list Other Documents - select the correct filer/filers - attach the correct signed PDF - when prompted with the message "Are there any corporate parents or other affiliates?", select the Yes radio button - enter the corporate parent/other affiliate, click the Search button - select the correct corporate parent/other affiliate name from the search results list or if no person found, create a new corporate parent/other affiliate - select the party to whom the corporate parent/other affiliate should be linked - add corporate parent/other affiliate names one at a time. (lb)
January 4, 2023 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Notice to Attorney Barry Neil Gutterman to RE-FILE Document No. #46 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the corporate parent/other affiliate was not added;. Re-file the document using the event type Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement found under the event list Other Documents - select the correct filer/filers - attach the correct signed PDF - when prompted with the message "Are there any corporate parents or other affiliates?", select the Yes radio button - enter the corporate parent/other affiliate, click the Search button - select the correct corporate parent/other affiliate name from the search results list or if no person found, create a new corporate parent/other affiliate - select the party to whom the corporate parent/other affiliate should be linked - add corporate parent/other affiliate names one at a time. (lb)
December 29, 2022 Filing 43 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Hmm Co. LTD..Filed In Associated Cases: 1:22-md-03028-PAE et al..(Giffin, John)
December 23, 2022 Filing 42 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Document filed by Vienna Insurance Group, CNA Hardy, UK, Sompo International Insurance, Sompo Insurance (Thailand) Public Company Limited, Munich re Underwriting Ltd, Zurich North America, Coast Underwriters, Cathedral Underwriting Ltd, Fubon Insurance Co Limited, U.S. Specialty Insurance Company, Affliated FM Insurance Company, HDI Global Insurance Company, Rooms to Go, Motool Inc, Mitsui Sumitomo Insurance Co., Ltd (Thailand Branch), Cathay Century Insurance, QBE, Flextronics, CNA Insurance Company Limited, Falvey Cargo Underwriting, Sentinel Marine Underwriters, LLC. (SMU), Chaucer Syndicate, ICICI ex Bharti AXA, India, Zurich Insurance, HDI Global SE Australia Branch, The Hanover Insurance Company, Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company, The Continental Insurance Company, Ascot Underwriting Limited, MSIG Insurance (Thailand) Public Co Ltd, Roanoke - Munich Re Syndicate Ltd, SBI General Insurance, Markel America Insurance Company, AXA General Insurance Hong Kong Ltd., Hanover Insurance Company, Mitsui Sumitomo Insurance, Mitsui Sumitomo Insurance Company Of America,, Sunshine Property and Casualty Insurance Co Ltd, Zurich, Hong Kong, China Pacific Insurance Company, Shanghai, RLI Insurance Co., The New India Assurance Company Ltd (HK Branch), AmWINS Specialty Logistics Underwriters (ASLU), Allianz Global Corporate & Specialty, Mitsui Sumitomo Insurance USA Inc, NTI Limited (Australia), Allianz Global Corp. & Spec. North America/Allianz of America, Inc., PT Mandiri AXA General Insurance, Nokia..(Thames, Jonathan)
December 23, 2022 Filing 41 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Document filed by Vienna Insurance Group, CNA Hardy, UK, Sompo International Insurance, Sompo Insurance (Thailand) Public Company Limited, Munich re Underwriting Ltd, Zurich North America, Coast Underwriters, Cathedral Underwriting Ltd, Fubon Insurance Co Limited, U.S. Specialty Insurance Company, Affliated FM Insurance Company, HDI Global Insurance Company, Rooms to Go, Motool Inc, Mitsui Sumitomo Insurance Co., Ltd (Thailand Branch), Cathay Century Insurance, QBE, Flextronics, CNA Insurance Company Limited, Falvey Cargo Underwriting, Sentinel Marine Underwriters, LLC. (SMU), Chaucer Syndicate, ICICI ex Bharti AXA, India, Zurich Insurance, HDI Global SE Australia Branch, The Hanover Insurance Company, Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company, The Continental Insurance Company, Ascot Underwriting Limited, MSIG Insurance (Thailand) Public Co Ltd, Roanoke - Munich Re Syndicate Ltd, SBI General Insurance, Markel America Insurance Company, AXA General Insurance Hong Kong Ltd., Hanover Insurance Company, Mitsui Sumitomo Insurance, Mitsui Sumitomo Insurance Company Of America,, Sunshine Property and Casualty Insurance Co Ltd, Zurich, Hong Kong, China Pacific Insurance Company, Shanghai, RLI Insurance Co., The New India Assurance Company Ltd (HK Branch), AmWINS Specialty Logistics Underwriters (ASLU), Allianz Global Corporate & Specialty, Mitsui Sumitomo Insurance USA Inc, NTI Limited (Australia), Allianz Global Corp. & Spec. North America/Allianz of America, Inc., PT Mandiri AXA General Insurance, Nokia..(Thames, Jonathan)
December 23, 2022 Filing 40 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Document filed by Vienna Insurance Group, CNA Hardy, UK, Sompo International Insurance, Sompo Insurance (Thailand) Public Company Limited, Munich re Underwriting Ltd, Zurich North America, Coast Underwriters, Cathedral Underwriting Ltd, Fubon Insurance Co Limited, U.S. Specialty Insurance Company, Affliated FM Insurance Company, HDI Global Insurance Company, Rooms to Go, Motool Inc, Mitsui Sumitomo Insurance Co., Ltd (Thailand Branch), Cathay Century Insurance, QBE, Flextronics, CNA Insurance Company Limited, Falvey Cargo Underwriting, Sentinel Marine Underwriters, LLC. (SMU), Chaucer Syndicate, ICICI ex Bharti AXA, India, Zurich Insurance, HDI Global SE Australia Branch, The Hanover Insurance Company, Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company, The Continental Insurance Company, Ascot Underwriting Limited, MSIG Insurance (Thailand) Public Co Ltd, Roanoke - Munich Re Syndicate Ltd, SBI General Insurance, Markel America Insurance Company, AXA General Insurance Hong Kong Ltd., Hanover Insurance Company, Mitsui Sumitomo Insurance, Mitsui Sumitomo Insurance Company Of America,, Sunshine Property and Casualty Insurance Co Ltd, Zurich, Hong Kong, China Pacific Insurance Company, Shanghai, RLI Insurance Co., The New India Assurance Company Ltd (HK Branch), AmWINS Specialty Logistics Underwriters (ASLU), Allianz Global Corporate & Specialty, Mitsui Sumitomo Insurance USA Inc, NTI Limited (Australia), Allianz Global Corp. & Spec. North America/Allianz of America, Inc., PT Mandiri AXA General Insurance, Nokia..(Thames, Jonathan)
December 23, 2022 Filing 39 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Document filed by Vienna Insurance Group, CNA Hardy, UK, Sompo International Insurance, Sompo Insurance (Thailand) Public Company Limited, Munich re Underwriting Ltd, Zurich North America, Coast Underwriters, Cathedral Underwriting Ltd, Fubon Insurance Co Limited, U.S. Specialty Insurance Company, Affliated FM Insurance Company, HDI Global Insurance Company, Rooms to Go, Motool Inc, Mitsui Sumitomo Insurance Co., Ltd (Thailand Branch), Cathay Century Insurance, QBE, Flextronics, CNA Insurance Company Limited, Falvey Cargo Underwriting, Sentinel Marine Underwriters, LLC. (SMU), Chaucer Syndicate, ICICI ex Bharti AXA, India, Zurich Insurance, HDI Global SE Australia Branch, The Hanover Insurance Company, Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company, The Continental Insurance Company, Ascot Underwriting Limited, MSIG Insurance (Thailand) Public Co Ltd, Roanoke - Munich Re Syndicate Ltd, SBI General Insurance, Markel America Insurance Company, AXA General Insurance Hong Kong Ltd., Hanover Insurance Company, Mitsui Sumitomo Insurance, Mitsui Sumitomo Insurance Company Of America,, Sunshine Property and Casualty Insurance Co Ltd, Zurich, Hong Kong, China Pacific Insurance Company, Shanghai, RLI Insurance Co., The New India Assurance Company Ltd (HK Branch), AmWINS Specialty Logistics Underwriters (ASLU), Allianz Global Corporate & Specialty, Mitsui Sumitomo Insurance USA Inc, NTI Limited (Australia), Allianz Global Corp. & Spec. North America/Allianz of America, Inc., PT Mandiri AXA General Insurance, Nokia..(Thames, Jonathan)
December 23, 2022 Filing 38 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Document filed by Vienna Insurance Group, CNA Hardy, UK, Sompo International Insurance, Sompo Insurance (Thailand) Public Company Limited, Munich re Underwriting Ltd, Zurich North America, Coast Underwriters, Cathedral Underwriting Ltd, Fubon Insurance Co Limited, U.S. Specialty Insurance Company, Affliated FM Insurance Company, HDI Global Insurance Company, Rooms to Go, Motool Inc, Mitsui Sumitomo Insurance Co., Ltd (Thailand Branch), Cathay Century Insurance, QBE, Flextronics, CNA Insurance Company Limited, Falvey Cargo Underwriting, Sentinel Marine Underwriters, LLC. (SMU), Chaucer Syndicate, ICICI ex Bharti AXA, India, Zurich Insurance, HDI Global SE Australia Branch, The Hanover Insurance Company, Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company, The Continental Insurance Company, Ascot Underwriting Limited, MSIG Insurance (Thailand) Public Co Ltd, Roanoke - Munich Re Syndicate Ltd, SBI General Insurance, Markel America Insurance Company, AXA General Insurance Hong Kong Ltd., Hanover Insurance Company, Mitsui Sumitomo Insurance, Mitsui Sumitomo Insurance Company Of America,, Sunshine Property and Casualty Insurance Co Ltd, Zurich, Hong Kong, China Pacific Insurance Company, Shanghai, RLI Insurance Co., The New India Assurance Company Ltd (HK Branch), AmWINS Specialty Logistics Underwriters (ASLU), Allianz Global Corporate & Specialty, Mitsui Sumitomo Insurance USA Inc, NTI Limited (Australia), Allianz Global Corp. & Spec. North America/Allianz of America, Inc., PT Mandiri AXA General Insurance, Nokia..(Thames, Jonathan)
December 23, 2022 Filing 37 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Document filed by Vienna Insurance Group, CNA Hardy, UK, Sompo International Insurance, Sompo Insurance (Thailand) Public Company Limited, Munich re Underwriting Ltd, Zurich North America, Coast Underwriters, Cathedral Underwriting Ltd, Fubon Insurance Co Limited, U.S. Specialty Insurance Company, Affliated FM Insurance Company, HDI Global Insurance Company, Rooms to Go, Motool Inc, Mitsui Sumitomo Insurance Co., Ltd (Thailand Branch), Cathay Century Insurance, QBE, Flextronics, CNA Insurance Company Limited, Falvey Cargo Underwriting, Sentinel Marine Underwriters, LLC. (SMU), Chaucer Syndicate, ICICI ex Bharti AXA, India, Zurich Insurance, HDI Global SE Australia Branch, The Hanover Insurance Company, Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company, The Continental Insurance Company, Ascot Underwriting Limited, MSIG Insurance (Thailand) Public Co Ltd, Roanoke - Munich Re Syndicate Ltd, SBI General Insurance, Markel America Insurance Company, AXA General Insurance Hong Kong Ltd., Hanover Insurance Company, Mitsui Sumitomo Insurance, Mitsui Sumitomo Insurance Company Of America,, Sunshine Property and Casualty Insurance Co Ltd, Zurich, Hong Kong, China Pacific Insurance Company, Shanghai, RLI Insurance Co., The New India Assurance Company Ltd (HK Branch), AmWINS Specialty Logistics Underwriters (ASLU), Allianz Global Corporate & Specialty, Mitsui Sumitomo Insurance USA Inc, NTI Limited (Australia), Allianz Global Corp. & Spec. North America/Allianz of America, Inc., PT Mandiri AXA General Insurance, Nokia..(Thames, Jonathan)
December 23, 2022 Filing 36 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Document filed by Vienna Insurance Group, CNA Hardy, UK, Sompo International Insurance, Sompo Insurance (Thailand) Public Company Limited, Munich re Underwriting Ltd, Zurich North America, Coast Underwriters, Cathedral Underwriting Ltd, Fubon Insurance Co Limited, U.S. Specialty Insurance Company, Affliated FM Insurance Company, HDI Global Insurance Company, Rooms to Go, Motool Inc, Mitsui Sumitomo Insurance Co., Ltd (Thailand Branch), Cathay Century Insurance, QBE, Flextronics, CNA Insurance Company Limited, Falvey Cargo Underwriting, Sentinel Marine Underwriters, LLC. (SMU), Chaucer Syndicate, ICICI ex Bharti AXA, India, Zurich Insurance, HDI Global SE Australia Branch, The Hanover Insurance Company, Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company, The Continental Insurance Company, Ascot Underwriting Limited, MSIG Insurance (Thailand) Public Co Ltd, Roanoke - Munich Re Syndicate Ltd, SBI General Insurance, Markel America Insurance Company, AXA General Insurance Hong Kong Ltd., Hanover Insurance Company, Mitsui Sumitomo Insurance, Mitsui Sumitomo Insurance Company Of America,, Sunshine Property and Casualty Insurance Co Ltd, Zurich, Hong Kong, China Pacific Insurance Company, Shanghai, RLI Insurance Co., The New India Assurance Company Ltd (HK Branch), AmWINS Specialty Logistics Underwriters (ASLU), Allianz Global Corporate & Specialty, Mitsui Sumitomo Insurance USA Inc, NTI Limited (Australia), Allianz Global Corp. & Spec. North America/Allianz of America, Inc., PT Mandiri AXA General Insurance, Nokia..(Thames, Jonathan)
December 23, 2022 Filing 35 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Document filed by Vienna Insurance Group, CNA Hardy, UK, Sompo International Insurance, Sompo Insurance (Thailand) Public Company Limited, Munich re Underwriting Ltd, Zurich North America, Coast Underwriters, Cathedral Underwriting Ltd, Fubon Insurance Co Limited, U.S. Specialty Insurance Company, Affliated FM Insurance Company, HDI Global Insurance Company, Rooms to Go, Motool Inc, Mitsui Sumitomo Insurance Co., Ltd (Thailand Branch), Cathay Century Insurance, QBE, Flextronics, CNA Insurance Company Limited, Falvey Cargo Underwriting, Sentinel Marine Underwriters, LLC. (SMU), Chaucer Syndicate, ICICI ex Bharti AXA, India, Zurich Insurance, HDI Global SE Australia Branch, The Hanover Insurance Company, Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company, The Continental Insurance Company, Ascot Underwriting Limited, MSIG Insurance (Thailand) Public Co Ltd, Roanoke - Munich Re Syndicate Ltd, SBI General Insurance, Markel America Insurance Company, AXA General Insurance Hong Kong Ltd., Hanover Insurance Company, Mitsui Sumitomo Insurance, Mitsui Sumitomo Insurance Company Of America,, Sunshine Property and Casualty Insurance Co Ltd, Zurich, Hong Kong, China Pacific Insurance Company, Shanghai, RLI Insurance Co., The New India Assurance Company Ltd (HK Branch), AmWINS Specialty Logistics Underwriters (ASLU), Allianz Global Corporate & Specialty, Mitsui Sumitomo Insurance USA Inc, NTI Limited (Australia), Allianz Global Corp. & Spec. North America/Allianz of America, Inc., PT Mandiri AXA General Insurance, Nokia..(Thames, Jonathan)
December 23, 2022 Filing 34 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - FILER ERROR - WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Document filed by Vienna Insurance Group, CNA Hardy, UK, NYK SHIP MANAGEMENT PTE LTD., Sompo International Insurance, Sompo Insurance (Thailand) Public Company Limited, Munich re Underwriting Ltd, Zurich North America, Coast Underwriters, Cathedral Underwriting Ltd, Fubon Insurance Co Limited, U.S. Specialty Insurance Company, Affliated FM Insurance Company, HDI Global Insurance Company, Rooms to Go, Motool Inc, Mitsui Sumitomo Insurance Co., Ltd (Thailand Branch), Cathay Century Insurance, QBE, Flextronics, CNA Insurance Company Limited, Falvey Cargo Underwriting, Sentinel Marine Underwriters, LLC. (SMU), Chaucer Syndicate, ICICI ex Bharti AXA, India, Zurich Insurance, HDI Global SE Australia Branch, The Hanover Insurance Company, Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company, The Continental Insurance Company, Ascot Underwriting Limited, MSIG Insurance (Thailand) Public Co Ltd, Roanoke - Munich Re Syndicate Ltd, SBI General Insurance, Markel America Insurance Company, AXA General Insurance Hong Kong Ltd., Hanover Insurance Company, Mitsui Sumitomo Insurance, Mitsui Sumitomo Insurance Company Of America,, Sunshine Property and Casualty Insurance Co Ltd, Zurich, Hong Kong, China Pacific Insurance Company, Shanghai, RLI Insurance Co., The New India Assurance Company Ltd (HK Branch), AmWINS Specialty Logistics Underwriters (ASLU), Allianz Global Corporate & Specialty, Mitsui Sumitomo Insurance USA Inc, NTI Limited (Australia), Allianz Global Corp. & Spec. North America/Allianz of America, Inc., PT Mandiri AXA General Insurance, Nokia..(Thames, Jonathan) Modified on 12/23/2022 (kj).
December 22, 2022 Filing 33 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. HMM CO., LTD waiver sent on 11/23/2022, answer due 1/23/2023. Document filed by Vienna Insurance Group; CNA Hardy, UK; Sompo International Insurance; Sompo Insurance (Thailand) Public Company Limited; Munich re Underwriting Ltd; Zurich North America; Coast Underwriters; Cathedral Underwriting Ltd; Fubon Insurance Co Limited; U.S. Specialty Insurance Company ; Affliated FM Insurance Company; HDI Global Insurance Company; Rooms to Go; Motool Inc; Mitsui Sumitomo Insurance Co., Ltd (Thailand Branch); Cathay Century Insurance; QBE; Flextronics; CNA Insurance Company Limited; Falvey Cargo Underwriting; Sentinel Marine Underwriters, LLC. (SMU); Chaucer Syndicate; ICICI ex Bharti AXA, India; Zurich Insurance; HDI Global SE Australia Branch; The Hanover Insurance Company; Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company; The Continental Insurance Company; Ascot Underwriting Limited; MSIG Insurance (Thailand) Public Co Ltd; Roanoke - Munich Re Syndicate Ltd; SBI General Insurance; Markel America Insurance Company; AXA General Insurance Hong Kong Ltd.; Hanover Insurance Company; Mitsui Sumitomo Insurance; Mitsui Sumitomo Insurance Company Of America,; Sunshine Property and Casualty Insurance Co Ltd; Zurich, Hong Kong; China Pacific Insurance Company, Shanghai; RLI Insurance Co.; The New India Assurance Company Ltd (HK Branch); AmWINS Specialty Logistics Underwriters (ASLU); Allianz Global Corporate & Specialty ; Mitsui Sumitomo Insurance USA Inc; NTI Limited (Australia); Allianz Global Corp. & Spec. North America/Allianz of America, Inc.; PT Mandiri AXA General Insurance; Nokia..(Thames, Jonathan)
December 22, 2022 Filing 32 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. UPS Asia Group Pte Ltd. waiver sent on 11/23/2022, answer due 1/23/2023. Document filed by Vienna Insurance Group; CNA Hardy, UK; Sompo International Insurance; Sompo Insurance (Thailand) Public Company Limited; Munich re Underwriting Ltd; Zurich North America; Coast Underwriters; Cathedral Underwriting Ltd; Fubon Insurance Co Limited; U.S. Specialty Insurance Company ; Affliated FM Insurance Company; HDI Global Insurance Company; Rooms to Go; Motool Inc; Mitsui Sumitomo Insurance Co., Ltd (Thailand Branch); Cathay Century Insurance; QBE; Flextronics; CNA Insurance Company Limited; Falvey Cargo Underwriting; Sentinel Marine Underwriters, LLC. (SMU); Chaucer Syndicate; ICICI ex Bharti AXA, India; Zurich Insurance; HDI Global SE Australia Branch; The Hanover Insurance Company; Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company; The Continental Insurance Company; Ascot Underwriting Limited; MSIG Insurance (Thailand) Public Co Ltd; Roanoke - Munich Re Syndicate Ltd; SBI General Insurance; Markel America Insurance Company; AXA General Insurance Hong Kong Ltd.; Hanover Insurance Company; Mitsui Sumitomo Insurance; Mitsui Sumitomo Insurance Company Of America,; Sunshine Property and Casualty Insurance Co Ltd; Zurich, Hong Kong; China Pacific Insurance Company, Shanghai; RLI Insurance Co.; The New India Assurance Company Ltd (HK Branch); AmWINS Specialty Logistics Underwriters (ASLU); Allianz Global Corporate & Specialty ; Mitsui Sumitomo Insurance USA Inc; NTI Limited (Australia); Allianz Global Corp. & Spec. North America/Allianz of America, Inc.; PT Mandiri AXA General Insurance; Nokia..(Thames, Jonathan)
December 22, 2022 Filing 31 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Mainfreight Inc waiver sent on 11/23/2022, answer due 1/23/2023. Document filed by Vienna Insurance Group; CNA Hardy, UK; Sompo International Insurance; Sompo Insurance (Thailand) Public Company Limited; Munich re Underwriting Ltd; Zurich North America; Coast Underwriters; Cathedral Underwriting Ltd; Fubon Insurance Co Limited; U.S. Specialty Insurance Company ; Affliated FM Insurance Company; HDI Global Insurance Company; Rooms to Go; Motool Inc; Mitsui Sumitomo Insurance Co., Ltd (Thailand Branch); Cathay Century Insurance; QBE; Flextronics; CNA Insurance Company Limited; Falvey Cargo Underwriting; Sentinel Marine Underwriters, LLC. (SMU); Chaucer Syndicate; ICICI ex Bharti AXA, India; Zurich Insurance; HDI Global SE Australia Branch; The Hanover Insurance Company; Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company; The Continental Insurance Company; Ascot Underwriting Limited; MSIG Insurance (Thailand) Public Co Ltd; Roanoke - Munich Re Syndicate Ltd; SBI General Insurance; Markel America Insurance Company; AXA General Insurance Hong Kong Ltd.; Hanover Insurance Company; Mitsui Sumitomo Insurance; Mitsui Sumitomo Insurance Company Of America,; Sunshine Property and Casualty Insurance Co Ltd; Zurich, Hong Kong; China Pacific Insurance Company, Shanghai; RLI Insurance Co.; The New India Assurance Company Ltd (HK Branch); AmWINS Specialty Logistics Underwriters (ASLU); Allianz Global Corporate & Specialty ; Mitsui Sumitomo Insurance USA Inc; NTI Limited (Australia); Allianz Global Corp. & Spec. North America/Allianz of America, Inc.; PT Mandiri AXA General Insurance; Nokia..(Thames, Jonathan)
December 22, 2022 Filing 30 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. TOPOCEAN Consolidation service (los Angeles) Inc waiver sent on 11/23/2022, answer due 1/23/2023. Document filed by Vienna Insurance Group; CNA Hardy, UK; Sompo International Insurance; Sompo Insurance (Thailand) Public Company Limited; Munich re Underwriting Ltd; Zurich North America; Coast Underwriters; Cathedral Underwriting Ltd; Fubon Insurance Co Limited; U.S. Specialty Insurance Company ; Affliated FM Insurance Company; HDI Global Insurance Company; Rooms to Go; Motool Inc; Mitsui Sumitomo Insurance Co., Ltd (Thailand Branch); Cathay Century Insurance; QBE; Flextronics; CNA Insurance Company Limited; Falvey Cargo Underwriting; Sentinel Marine Underwriters, LLC. (SMU); Chaucer Syndicate; ICICI ex Bharti AXA, India; Zurich Insurance; HDI Global SE Australia Branch; The Hanover Insurance Company; Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company; The Continental Insurance Company; Ascot Underwriting Limited; MSIG Insurance (Thailand) Public Co Ltd; Roanoke - Munich Re Syndicate Ltd; SBI General Insurance; Markel America Insurance Company; AXA General Insurance Hong Kong Ltd.; Hanover Insurance Company; Mitsui Sumitomo Insurance; Mitsui Sumitomo Insurance Company Of America,; Sunshine Property and Casualty Insurance Co Ltd; Zurich, Hong Kong; China Pacific Insurance Company, Shanghai; RLI Insurance Co.; The New India Assurance Company Ltd (HK Branch); AmWINS Specialty Logistics Underwriters (ASLU); Allianz Global Corporate & Specialty ; Mitsui Sumitomo Insurance USA Inc; NTI Limited (Australia); Allianz Global Corp. & Spec. North America/Allianz of America, Inc.; PT Mandiri AXA General Insurance; Nokia..(Thames, Jonathan)
December 22, 2022 Filing 29 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. SEKO Worldwide waiver sent on 11/29/2022, answer due 1/30/2023. Document filed by Vienna Insurance Group; CNA Hardy, UK; Sompo International Insurance; Sompo Insurance (Thailand) Public Company Limited; Munich re Underwriting Ltd; Zurich North America; Coast Underwriters; Cathedral Underwriting Ltd; Fubon Insurance Co Limited; U.S. Specialty Insurance Company ; Affliated FM Insurance Company; HDI Global Insurance Company; Rooms to Go; Motool Inc; Mitsui Sumitomo Insurance Co., Ltd (Thailand Branch); Cathay Century Insurance; QBE; Flextronics; CNA Insurance Company Limited; Falvey Cargo Underwriting; Sentinel Marine Underwriters, LLC. (SMU); Chaucer Syndicate; ICICI ex Bharti AXA, India; Zurich Insurance; HDI Global SE Australia Branch; The Hanover Insurance Company; Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company; The Continental Insurance Company; Ascot Underwriting Limited; MSIG Insurance (Thailand) Public Co Ltd; Roanoke - Munich Re Syndicate Ltd; SBI General Insurance; Markel America Insurance Company; AXA General Insurance Hong Kong Ltd.; Hanover Insurance Company; Mitsui Sumitomo Insurance; Mitsui Sumitomo Insurance Company Of America,; Sunshine Property and Casualty Insurance Co Ltd; Zurich, Hong Kong; China Pacific Insurance Company, Shanghai; RLI Insurance Co.; The New India Assurance Company Ltd (HK Branch); AmWINS Specialty Logistics Underwriters (ASLU); Allianz Global Corporate & Specialty ; Mitsui Sumitomo Insurance USA Inc; NTI Limited (Australia); Allianz Global Corp. & Spec. North America/Allianz of America, Inc.; PT Mandiri AXA General Insurance; Nokia..(Thames, Jonathan)
December 22, 2022 Filing 28 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Meadows WYE Container Groupage waiver sent on 11/29/2022, answer due 1/30/2023. Document filed by Vienna Insurance Group; CNA Hardy, UK; Sompo International Insurance; Sompo Insurance (Thailand) Public Company Limited; Munich re Underwriting Ltd; Zurich North America; Coast Underwriters; Cathedral Underwriting Ltd; Fubon Insurance Co Limited; U.S. Specialty Insurance Company ; Affliated FM Insurance Company; HDI Global Insurance Company; Rooms to Go; Motool Inc; Mitsui Sumitomo Insurance Co., Ltd (Thailand Branch); Cathay Century Insurance; QBE; Flextronics; CNA Insurance Company Limited; Falvey Cargo Underwriting; Sentinel Marine Underwriters, LLC. (SMU); Chaucer Syndicate; ICICI ex Bharti AXA, India; Zurich Insurance; HDI Global SE Australia Branch; The Hanover Insurance Company; Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company; The Continental Insurance Company; Ascot Underwriting Limited; MSIG Insurance (Thailand) Public Co Ltd; Roanoke - Munich Re Syndicate Ltd; SBI General Insurance; Markel America Insurance Company; AXA General Insurance Hong Kong Ltd.; Hanover Insurance Company; Mitsui Sumitomo Insurance; Mitsui Sumitomo Insurance Company Of America,; Sunshine Property and Casualty Insurance Co Ltd; Zurich, Hong Kong; China Pacific Insurance Company, Shanghai; RLI Insurance Co.; The New India Assurance Company Ltd (HK Branch); AmWINS Specialty Logistics Underwriters (ASLU); Allianz Global Corporate & Specialty ; Mitsui Sumitomo Insurance USA Inc; NTI Limited (Australia); Allianz Global Corp. & Spec. North America/Allianz of America, Inc.; PT Mandiri AXA General Insurance; Nokia..(Thames, Jonathan)
December 22, 2022 Filing 27 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Global Ocean Agency Lines waiver sent on 11/23/2022, answer due 1/23/2023. Document filed by Vienna Insurance Group; CNA Hardy, UK; Sompo International Insurance; Sompo Insurance (Thailand) Public Company Limited; Munich re Underwriting Ltd; Zurich North America; Coast Underwriters; Cathedral Underwriting Ltd; Fubon Insurance Co Limited; U.S. Specialty Insurance Company ; Affliated FM Insurance Company; HDI Global Insurance Company; Rooms to Go; Motool Inc; Mitsui Sumitomo Insurance Co., Ltd (Thailand Branch); Cathay Century Insurance; QBE; Flextronics; CNA Insurance Company Limited; Falvey Cargo Underwriting; Sentinel Marine Underwriters, LLC. (SMU); Chaucer Syndicate; ICICI ex Bharti AXA, India; Zurich Insurance; HDI Global SE Australia Branch; The Hanover Insurance Company; Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company; The Continental Insurance Company; Ascot Underwriting Limited; MSIG Insurance (Thailand) Public Co Ltd; Roanoke - Munich Re Syndicate Ltd; SBI General Insurance; Markel America Insurance Company; AXA General Insurance Hong Kong Ltd.; Hanover Insurance Company; Mitsui Sumitomo Insurance; Mitsui Sumitomo Insurance Company Of America,; Sunshine Property and Casualty Insurance Co Ltd; Zurich, Hong Kong; China Pacific Insurance Company, Shanghai; RLI Insurance Co.; The New India Assurance Company Ltd (HK Branch); AmWINS Specialty Logistics Underwriters (ASLU); Allianz Global Corporate & Specialty ; Mitsui Sumitomo Insurance USA Inc; NTI Limited (Australia); Allianz Global Corp. & Spec. North America/Allianz of America, Inc.; PT Mandiri AXA General Insurance; Nokia..(Thames, Jonathan)
December 22, 2022 Filing 26 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Christal Lines waiver sent on 11/23/2022, answer due 1/23/2023. Document filed by Vienna Insurance Group; CNA Hardy, UK; Sompo International Insurance; Sompo Insurance (Thailand) Public Company Limited; Munich re Underwriting Ltd; Zurich North America; Coast Underwriters; Cathedral Underwriting Ltd; Fubon Insurance Co Limited; U.S. Specialty Insurance Company ; Affliated FM Insurance Company; HDI Global Insurance Company; Rooms to Go; Motool Inc; Mitsui Sumitomo Insurance Co., Ltd (Thailand Branch); Cathay Century Insurance; QBE; Flextronics; CNA Insurance Company Limited; Falvey Cargo Underwriting; Sentinel Marine Underwriters, LLC. (SMU); Chaucer Syndicate; ICICI ex Bharti AXA, India; Zurich Insurance; HDI Global SE Australia Branch; The Hanover Insurance Company; Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company; The Continental Insurance Company; Ascot Underwriting Limited; MSIG Insurance (Thailand) Public Co Ltd; Roanoke - Munich Re Syndicate Ltd; SBI General Insurance; Markel America Insurance Company; AXA General Insurance Hong Kong Ltd.; Hanover Insurance Company; Mitsui Sumitomo Insurance; Mitsui Sumitomo Insurance Company Of America,; Sunshine Property and Casualty Insurance Co Ltd; Zurich, Hong Kong; China Pacific Insurance Company, Shanghai; RLI Insurance Co.; The New India Assurance Company Ltd (HK Branch); AmWINS Specialty Logistics Underwriters (ASLU); Allianz Global Corporate & Specialty ; Mitsui Sumitomo Insurance USA Inc; NTI Limited (Australia); Allianz Global Corp. & Spec. North America/Allianz of America, Inc.; PT Mandiri AXA General Insurance; Nokia..(Thames, Jonathan)
December 22, 2022 Filing 25 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. American International Cargo Service Inc. waiver sent on 11/23/2022, answer due 1/23/2023. Document filed by Vienna Insurance Group; CNA Hardy, UK; Sompo International Insurance; Sompo Insurance (Thailand) Public Company Limited; Munich re Underwriting Ltd; Zurich North America; Coast Underwriters; Cathedral Underwriting Ltd; Fubon Insurance Co Limited; U.S. Specialty Insurance Company ; Affliated FM Insurance Company; HDI Global Insurance Company; Rooms to Go; Motool Inc; Mitsui Sumitomo Insurance Co., Ltd (Thailand Branch); Cathay Century Insurance; QBE; Flextronics; CNA Insurance Company Limited; Falvey Cargo Underwriting; Sentinel Marine Underwriters, LLC. (SMU); Chaucer Syndicate; ICICI ex Bharti AXA, India; Zurich Insurance; HDI Global SE Australia Branch; The Hanover Insurance Company; Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company; The Continental Insurance Company; Ascot Underwriting Limited; MSIG Insurance (Thailand) Public Co Ltd; Roanoke - Munich Re Syndicate Ltd; SBI General Insurance; Markel America Insurance Company; AXA General Insurance Hong Kong Ltd.; Hanover Insurance Company; Mitsui Sumitomo Insurance; Mitsui Sumitomo Insurance Company Of America,; Sunshine Property and Casualty Insurance Co Ltd; Zurich, Hong Kong; China Pacific Insurance Company, Shanghai; RLI Insurance Co.; The New India Assurance Company Ltd (HK Branch); AmWINS Specialty Logistics Underwriters (ASLU); Allianz Global Corporate & Specialty ; Mitsui Sumitomo Insurance USA Inc; NTI Limited (Australia); Allianz Global Corp. & Spec. North America/Allianz of America, Inc.; PT Mandiri AXA General Insurance; Nokia..(Thames, Jonathan)
December 22, 2022 Filing 24 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Document filed by Vienna Insurance Group, CNA Hardy, UK, NYK SHIP MANAGEMENT PTE LTD., Sompo International Insurance, Sompo Insurance (Thailand) Public Company Limited, Munich re Underwriting Ltd, JESSICA SHIP HOLDING S.A., Zurich North America, Coast Underwriters, Cathedral Underwriting Ltd, Fubon Insurance Co Limited, U.S. Specialty Insurance Company, Yang Ming Marine Transport Corp., Affliated FM Insurance Company, HDI Global Insurance Company, Rooms to Go, Motool Inc, Mitsui Sumitomo Insurance Co., Ltd (Thailand Branch), Cathay Century Insurance, QBE, Flextronics, CNA Insurance Company Limited, Falvey Cargo Underwriting, Sentinel Marine Underwriters, LLC. (SMU), Chaucer Syndicate, ICICI ex Bharti AXA, India, Zurich Insurance, HDI Global SE Australia Branch, The Hanover Insurance Company, Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company, The Continental Insurance Company, Ascot Underwriting Limited, MSIG Insurance (Thailand) Public Co Ltd, Roanoke - Munich Re Syndicate Ltd, SBI General Insurance, Markel America Insurance Company, AXA General Insurance Hong Kong Ltd., Hanover Insurance Company, Mitsui Sumitomo Insurance, Mitsui Sumitomo Insurance Company Of America,, Sunshine Property and Casualty Insurance Co Ltd, M/V ONE APUS, IMO no. 9806079, including its engines, boilers, tackle, and other appurtenances, etc., in rem, Zurich, Hong Kong, China Pacific Insurance Company, Shanghai, CHIDORI SHIP HOLDING LLC, RLI Insurance Co., The New India Assurance Company Ltd (HK Branch), AmWINS Specialty Logistics Underwriters (ASLU), Allianz Global Corporate & Specialty, Mitsui Sumitomo Insurance USA Inc, NTI Limited (Australia), Allianz Global Corp. & Spec. North America/Allianz of America, Inc., PT Mandiri AXA General Insurance, Nokia..(Thames, Jonathan)
December 22, 2022 Filing 23 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - FILER ERROR -(SEE #41) WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. AIT Worldwide Logistics waiver sent on 11/23/2022, answer due 1/23/2023. Document filed by Vienna Insurance Group; CNA Hardy, UK; NYK SHIP MANAGEMENT PTE LTD.; Sompo International Insurance; Sompo Insurance (Thailand) Public Company Limited; Munich re Underwriting Ltd; JESSICA SHIP HOLDING S.A.; Zurich North America; Coast Underwriters; Cathedral Underwriting Ltd; Fubon Insurance Co Limited; U.S. Specialty Insurance Company ; Yang Ming Marine Transport Corp.; Affliated FM Insurance Company; HDI Global Insurance Company; Rooms to Go; Motool Inc; Mitsui Sumitomo Insurance Co., Ltd (Thailand Branch); Cathay Century Insurance; QBE; Flextronics; CNA Insurance Company Limited; Falvey Cargo Underwriting; Sentinel Marine Underwriters, LLC. (SMU); Chaucer Syndicate; ICICI ex Bharti AXA, India; Zurich Insurance; HDI Global SE Australia Branch; The Hanover Insurance Company; Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company; The Continental Insurance Company; Ascot Underwriting Limited; MSIG Insurance (Thailand) Public Co Ltd; Roanoke - Munich Re Syndicate Ltd; SBI General Insurance; Markel America Insurance Company; AXA General Insurance Hong Kong Ltd.; Hanover Insurance Company; Mitsui Sumitomo Insurance; Mitsui Sumitomo Insurance Company Of America,; Sunshine Property and Casualty Insurance Co Ltd; M/V ONE APUS, IMO no. 9806079, including its engines, boilers, tackle, and other appurtenances, etc., in rem; Zurich, Hong Kong; China Pacific Insurance Company, Shanghai; CHIDORI SHIP HOLDING LLC; RLI Insurance Co.; The New India Assurance Company Ltd (HK Branch); AmWINS Specialty Logistics Underwriters (ASLU); Allianz Global Corporate & Specialty ; Mitsui Sumitomo Insurance USA Inc; NTI Limited (Australia); Allianz Global Corp. & Spec. North America/Allianz of America, Inc.; PT Mandiri AXA General Insurance; Nokia..(Thames, Jonathan) Modified on 12/23/2022 (kj).
December 22, 2022 Filing 22 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - FILER ERROR -(SEE #40) WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Danmar Lines waiver sent on 11/23/2022, answer due 1/23/2023. Document filed by Vienna Insurance Group; CNA Hardy, UK; NYK SHIP MANAGEMENT PTE LTD.; Sompo International Insurance; Sompo Insurance (Thailand) Public Company Limited; Munich re Underwriting Ltd; JESSICA SHIP HOLDING S.A.; Zurich North America; Coast Underwriters; Cathedral Underwriting Ltd; Fubon Insurance Co Limited; U.S. Specialty Insurance Company ; Yang Ming Marine Transport Corp.; Affliated FM Insurance Company; HDI Global Insurance Company; Rooms to Go; Motool Inc; Mitsui Sumitomo Insurance Co., Ltd (Thailand Branch); Cathay Century Insurance; QBE; Flextronics; CNA Insurance Company Limited; Falvey Cargo Underwriting; Sentinel Marine Underwriters, LLC. (SMU); Chaucer Syndicate; ICICI ex Bharti AXA, India; Zurich Insurance; HDI Global SE Australia Branch; The Hanover Insurance Company; Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company; The Continental Insurance Company; Ascot Underwriting Limited; MSIG Insurance (Thailand) Public Co Ltd; Roanoke - Munich Re Syndicate Ltd; SBI General Insurance; Markel America Insurance Company; AXA General Insurance Hong Kong Ltd.; Hanover Insurance Company; Mitsui Sumitomo Insurance; Mitsui Sumitomo Insurance Company Of America,; Sunshine Property and Casualty Insurance Co Ltd; M/V ONE APUS, IMO no. 9806079, including its engines, boilers, tackle, and other appurtenances, etc., in rem; Zurich, Hong Kong; China Pacific Insurance Company, Shanghai; CHIDORI SHIP HOLDING LLC; RLI Insurance Co.; The New India Assurance Company Ltd (HK Branch); AmWINS Specialty Logistics Underwriters (ASLU); Allianz Global Corporate & Specialty ; Mitsui Sumitomo Insurance USA Inc; NTI Limited (Australia); Allianz Global Corp. & Spec. North America/Allianz of America, Inc.; PT Mandiri AXA General Insurance; Nokia..(Thames, Jonathan) Modified on 12/23/2022 (kj).
December 22, 2022 Filing 21 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - FILER ERROR -(SEE #39) WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. APL Logistics Ltd waiver sent on 11/23/2022, answer due 1/23/2023. Document filed by Vienna Insurance Group; CNA Hardy, UK; NYK SHIP MANAGEMENT PTE LTD.; Sompo International Insurance; Sompo Insurance (Thailand) Public Company Limited; Munich re Underwriting Ltd; JESSICA SHIP HOLDING S.A.; Zurich North America; Coast Underwriters; Cathedral Underwriting Ltd; Fubon Insurance Co Limited; U.S. Specialty Insurance Company ; Yang Ming Marine Transport Corp.; Affliated FM Insurance Company; HDI Global Insurance Company; Rooms to Go; Motool Inc; Mitsui Sumitomo Insurance Co., Ltd (Thailand Branch); Cathay Century Insurance; QBE; Flextronics; CNA Insurance Company Limited; Falvey Cargo Underwriting; Sentinel Marine Underwriters, LLC. (SMU); Chaucer Syndicate; ICICI ex Bharti AXA, India; Zurich Insurance; HDI Global SE Australia Branch; The Hanover Insurance Company; Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company; The Continental Insurance Company; Ascot Underwriting Limited; MSIG Insurance (Thailand) Public Co Ltd; Roanoke - Munich Re Syndicate Ltd; SBI General Insurance; Markel America Insurance Company; AXA General Insurance Hong Kong Ltd.; Hanover Insurance Company; Mitsui Sumitomo Insurance; Mitsui Sumitomo Insurance Company Of America,; Sunshine Property and Casualty Insurance Co Ltd; M/V ONE APUS, IMO no. 9806079, including its engines, boilers, tackle, and other appurtenances, etc., in rem; Zurich, Hong Kong; China Pacific Insurance Company, Shanghai; CHIDORI SHIP HOLDING LLC; RLI Insurance Co.; The New India Assurance Company Ltd (HK Branch); AmWINS Specialty Logistics Underwriters (ASLU); Allianz Global Corporate & Specialty ; Mitsui Sumitomo Insurance USA Inc; NTI Limited (Australia); Allianz Global Corp. & Spec. North America/Allianz of America, Inc.; PT Mandiri AXA General Insurance; Nokia..(Thames, Jonathan) Modified on 12/23/2022 (kj).
December 22, 2022 Filing 20 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - FILER ERROR -(SEE #38) WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. OCEAN NETWORK EXPRESS PTE LTD. waiver sent on 11/23/2022, answer due 1/23/2023. Document filed by Vienna Insurance Group; CNA Hardy, UK; NYK SHIP MANAGEMENT PTE LTD.; Sompo International Insurance; Sompo Insurance (Thailand) Public Company Limited; Munich re Underwriting Ltd; JESSICA SHIP HOLDING S.A.; Zurich North America; Coast Underwriters; Cathedral Underwriting Ltd; Fubon Insurance Co Limited; U.S. Specialty Insurance Company ; Yang Ming Marine Transport Corp.; Affliated FM Insurance Company; HDI Global Insurance Company; Rooms to Go; Motool Inc; Mitsui Sumitomo Insurance Co., Ltd (Thailand Branch); Cathay Century Insurance; QBE; Flextronics; CNA Insurance Company Limited; Falvey Cargo Underwriting; Sentinel Marine Underwriters, LLC. (SMU); Chaucer Syndicate; ICICI ex Bharti AXA, India; Zurich Insurance; HDI Global SE Australia Branch; The Hanover Insurance Company; Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company; The Continental Insurance Company; Ascot Underwriting Limited; MSIG Insurance (Thailand) Public Co Ltd; Roanoke - Munich Re Syndicate Ltd; SBI General Insurance; Markel America Insurance Company; AXA General Insurance Hong Kong Ltd.; Hanover Insurance Company; Mitsui Sumitomo Insurance; Mitsui Sumitomo Insurance Company Of America,; Sunshine Property and Casualty Insurance Co Ltd; M/V ONE APUS, IMO no. 9806079, including its engines, boilers, tackle, and other appurtenances, etc., in rem; Zurich, Hong Kong; China Pacific Insurance Company, Shanghai; CHIDORI SHIP HOLDING LLC; RLI Insurance Co.; The New India Assurance Company Ltd (HK Branch); AmWINS Specialty Logistics Underwriters (ASLU); Allianz Global Corporate & Specialty ; Mitsui Sumitomo Insurance USA Inc; NTI Limited (Australia); Allianz Global Corp. & Spec. North America/Allianz of America, Inc.; PT Mandiri AXA General Insurance; Nokia..(Thames, Jonathan) Modified on 12/23/2022 (kj).
December 22, 2022 Filing 19 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - FILER ERROR -(SEE #37) WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Mitsubishi Logistics America Corporation waiver sent on 11/23/2022, answer due 1/23/2023. Document filed by Vienna Insurance Group; CNA Hardy, UK; NYK SHIP MANAGEMENT PTE LTD.; Sompo International Insurance; Sompo Insurance (Thailand) Public Company Limited; Munich re Underwriting Ltd; JESSICA SHIP HOLDING S.A.; Zurich North America; Coast Underwriters; Cathedral Underwriting Ltd; Fubon Insurance Co Limited; U.S. Specialty Insurance Company ; Yang Ming Marine Transport Corp.; Affliated FM Insurance Company; HDI Global Insurance Company; Rooms to Go; Motool Inc; Mitsui Sumitomo Insurance Co., Ltd (Thailand Branch); Cathay Century Insurance; QBE; Flextronics; CNA Insurance Company Limited; Falvey Cargo Underwriting; Sentinel Marine Underwriters, LLC. (SMU); Chaucer Syndicate; ICICI ex Bharti AXA, India; Zurich Insurance; HDI Global SE Australia Branch; The Hanover Insurance Company; Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company; The Continental Insurance Company; Ascot Underwriting Limited; MSIG Insurance (Thailand) Public Co Ltd; Roanoke - Munich Re Syndicate Ltd; SBI General Insurance; Markel America Insurance Company; AXA General Insurance Hong Kong Ltd.; Hanover Insurance Company; Mitsui Sumitomo Insurance; Mitsui Sumitomo Insurance Company Of America,; Sunshine Property and Casualty Insurance Co Ltd; M/V ONE APUS, IMO no. 9806079, including its engines, boilers, tackle, and other appurtenances, etc., in rem; Zurich, Hong Kong; China Pacific Insurance Company, Shanghai; CHIDORI SHIP HOLDING LLC; RLI Insurance Co.; The New India Assurance Company Ltd (HK Branch); AmWINS Specialty Logistics Underwriters (ASLU); Allianz Global Corporate & Specialty ; Mitsui Sumitomo Insurance USA Inc; NTI Limited (Australia); Allianz Global Corp. & Spec. North America/Allianz of America, Inc.; PT Mandiri AXA General Insurance; Nokia..(Thames, Jonathan) Modified on 12/23/2022 (kj).
December 22, 2022 Filing 18 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - FILER ERROR -(SEE #36) WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. AZ Freight Inc waiver sent on 11/23/2022, answer due 1/23/2023. Document filed by Vienna Insurance Group; CNA Hardy, UK; NYK SHIP MANAGEMENT PTE LTD.; Sompo International Insurance; Sompo Insurance (Thailand) Public Company Limited; Munich re Underwriting Ltd; JESSICA SHIP HOLDING S.A.; Zurich North America; Coast Underwriters; Cathedral Underwriting Ltd; Fubon Insurance Co Limited; U.S. Specialty Insurance Company ; Yang Ming Marine Transport Corp.; Affliated FM Insurance Company; HDI Global Insurance Company; Rooms to Go; Motool Inc; Mitsui Sumitomo Insurance Co., Ltd (Thailand Branch); Cathay Century Insurance; QBE; Flextronics; CNA Insurance Company Limited; Falvey Cargo Underwriting; Sentinel Marine Underwriters, LLC. (SMU); Chaucer Syndicate; ICICI ex Bharti AXA, India; Zurich Insurance; HDI Global SE Australia Branch; The Hanover Insurance Company; Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company; The Continental Insurance Company; Ascot Underwriting Limited; MSIG Insurance (Thailand) Public Co Ltd; Roanoke - Munich Re Syndicate Ltd; SBI General Insurance; Markel America Insurance Company; AXA General Insurance Hong Kong Ltd.; Hanover Insurance Company; Mitsui Sumitomo Insurance; Mitsui Sumitomo Insurance Company Of America,; Sunshine Property and Casualty Insurance Co Ltd; M/V ONE APUS, IMO no. 9806079, including its engines, boilers, tackle, and other appurtenances, etc., in rem; Zurich, Hong Kong; China Pacific Insurance Company, Shanghai; CHIDORI SHIP HOLDING LLC; RLI Insurance Co.; The New India Assurance Company Ltd (HK Branch); AmWINS Specialty Logistics Underwriters (ASLU); Allianz Global Corporate & Specialty ; Mitsui Sumitomo Insurance USA Inc; NTI Limited (Australia); Allianz Global Corp. & Spec. North America/Allianz of America, Inc.; PT Mandiri AXA General Insurance; Nokia..(Thames, Jonathan) Modified on 12/23/2022 (kj).
December 22, 2022 Filing 17 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - FILER ERROR - (See #35)WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Pancon Express Service waiver sent on 11/29/2022, answer due 1/30/2023. Document filed by Vienna Insurance Group; CNA Hardy, UK; NYK SHIP MANAGEMENT PTE LTD.; Sompo International Insurance; Sompo Insurance (Thailand) Public Company Limited; Munich re Underwriting Ltd; JESSICA SHIP HOLDING S.A.; Zurich North America; Coast Underwriters; Cathedral Underwriting Ltd; Fubon Insurance Co Limited; U.S. Specialty Insurance Company ; Yang Ming Marine Transport Corp.; Affliated FM Insurance Company; HDI Global Insurance Company; Rooms to Go; Motool Inc; Mitsui Sumitomo Insurance Co., Ltd (Thailand Branch); Cathay Century Insurance; QBE; Flextronics; CNA Insurance Company Limited; Falvey Cargo Underwriting; Sentinel Marine Underwriters, LLC. (SMU); Chaucer Syndicate; ICICI ex Bharti AXA, India; Zurich Insurance; HDI Global SE Australia Branch; The Hanover Insurance Company; Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company; The Continental Insurance Company; Ascot Underwriting Limited; MSIG Insurance (Thailand) Public Co Ltd; Roanoke - Munich Re Syndicate Ltd; SBI General Insurance; Markel America Insurance Company; AXA General Insurance Hong Kong Ltd.; Hanover Insurance Company; Mitsui Sumitomo Insurance; Mitsui Sumitomo Insurance Company Of America,; Sunshine Property and Casualty Insurance Co Ltd; M/V ONE APUS, IMO no. 9806079, including its engines, boilers, tackle, and other appurtenances, etc., in rem; Zurich, Hong Kong; China Pacific Insurance Company, Shanghai; CHIDORI SHIP HOLDING LLC; RLI Insurance Co.; The New India Assurance Company Ltd (HK Branch); AmWINS Specialty Logistics Underwriters (ASLU); Allianz Global Corporate & Specialty ; Mitsui Sumitomo Insurance USA Inc; NTI Limited (Australia); Allianz Global Corp. & Spec. North America/Allianz of America, Inc.; PT Mandiri AXA General Insurance; Nokia..(Thames, Jonathan) Modified on 12/23/2022 (kj).
December 22, 2022 Filing 16 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - FILER ERROR -(See #42) WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Orient Star Transport International Ltd waiver sent on 11/23/2022, answer due 1/23/2023. Document filed by Vienna Insurance Group; CNA Hardy, UK; NYK SHIP MANAGEMENT PTE LTD.; Sompo International Insurance; Sompo Insurance (Thailand) Public Company Limited; Munich re Underwriting Ltd; JESSICA SHIP HOLDING S.A.; Zurich North America; Coast Underwriters; Cathedral Underwriting Ltd; Fubon Insurance Co Limited; U.S. Specialty Insurance Company ; Yang Ming Marine Transport Corp.; Affliated FM Insurance Company; HDI Global Insurance Company; Rooms to Go; Motool Inc; Mitsui Sumitomo Insurance Co., Ltd (Thailand Branch); Cathay Century Insurance; QBE; Flextronics; CNA Insurance Company Limited; Falvey Cargo Underwriting; Sentinel Marine Underwriters, LLC. (SMU); Chaucer Syndicate; ICICI ex Bharti AXA, India; Zurich Insurance; HDI Global SE Australia Branch; The Hanover Insurance Company; Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company; The Continental Insurance Company; Ascot Underwriting Limited; MSIG Insurance (Thailand) Public Co Ltd; Roanoke - Munich Re Syndicate Ltd; SBI General Insurance; Markel America Insurance Company; AXA General Insurance Hong Kong Ltd.; Hanover Insurance Company; Mitsui Sumitomo Insurance; Mitsui Sumitomo Insurance Company Of America,; Sunshine Property and Casualty Insurance Co Ltd; M/V ONE APUS, IMO no. 9806079, including its engines, boilers, tackle, and other appurtenances, etc., in rem; Zurich, Hong Kong; China Pacific Insurance Company, Shanghai; CHIDORI SHIP HOLDING LLC; RLI Insurance Co.; The New India Assurance Company Ltd (HK Branch); AmWINS Specialty Logistics Underwriters (ASLU); Allianz Global Corporate & Specialty ; Mitsui Sumitomo Insurance USA Inc; NTI Limited (Australia); Allianz Global Corp. & Spec. North America/Allianz of America, Inc.; PT Mandiri AXA General Insurance; Nokia..(Thames, Jonathan) Modified on 12/23/2022 (kj).
December 16, 2022 Filing 15 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Keith Wayne Heard on behalf of Global Ocean Agency Lines, Meadows WYE Container Groupage..(Heard, Keith)
December 16, 2022 Filing 14 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Charles Edmund Murphy on behalf of Global Ocean Agency Lines, Meadows WYE Container Groupage..(Murphy, Charles)
December 12, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joseph John Perrone on behalf of Mitsubishi Logistics America Corporation..(Perrone, Joseph)
December 6, 2022 Filing 12 ANSWER to #2 Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,., CROSSCLAIM against CHIDORI SHIP HOLDING LLC, JESSICA SHIP HOLDING S.A., M/V ONE APUS, IMO no. 9806079, including its engines, boilers, tackle, and other appurtenances, etc., in rem, NYK SHIP MANAGEMENT PTE LTD.. Document filed by Yang Ming Marine Transport Corp...(Wolfson, Garth)
December 6, 2022 Filing 11 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Yang Ming Marine Transport Corp...(Wolfson, Garth)
November 22, 2022 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to CHIDORI SHIP HOLDING LLC; JESSICA SHIP HOLDING S.A.; NYK SHIP MANAGEMENT PTE LTD.; OCEAN NETWORK EXPRESS PTE LTD.; HAPAG- LLOYD AKTIENGESELLCHAFT; YANG MING MARINE TRANSPORT CORP.; HMM CO., LTD.; AIR SEA WORLDWIDE LOGISTICS LTD.; AIR TIGER EXPRESS ASIA INC; AIT WORLDWIDE LOGISTICS; ALLIANCE CARGO GROUP (HK) LTD; AMERICAN INTERNATIONAL CARGO SERVICE INC.; APEX MARITIME CO. (LAX) INC; APEX MARITIME CO. (ORD) LTD; APEX SHIPPING CO INC; APL LOGISTICS LTD; ARK SHIPPING INC; AZ FREIGHT INC; BDP TRANSPORT INC; BENKEL INTERNATIONAL PTE LTD; BLUE ANCHOR AMERICA LINE; BLUE LOTUS OCEAN LINE; BLUE WORLD LINE; CAPITAL EXPRESS INTERNATIONAL; CASTLEGATE LOGISTICS INC; CHINA INTERNATIONAL FREIGHT CO LTD; CHINA WHEEL SHIPPING (HOLDINGS) LTD.; CHRISTAL LINES; CJ KOREA EXPRESS SCHENXHEN CO LTD; CONNECTED INTERNATIONAL INC; CONSOLIDATOR INTERNATIONAL CONTAINER SERVICE; DANMAR LINES; DE WELL CONTAINER SHIPPING INC; DIMERCO EXPRESS (USA) CORP; DSV OCEAN TRANSPORT A/S; EAST- WEST LOGISTICS; EASY WAY LOGISTICS (HK) LTD.; ECU LINE NV; EURASIA FREIGHT SERVICE INC; EXPEDITORS INTERNATIONAL; FLEXPORT INTERNATIONAL LLC; GLOBAL OCEAN AGENCY LINES; GLOBE EXPRESS SERVICE; GOLDEN BRIDGE INTERNATIONAL INC; GREAT CHINA SHIPPING LTD; HECNY SHIPPING LTD; HT INTERNATIONAL SUPPLY CHAIN (CHINA) LTD; INDO TRANS LOGISTICS CORPORATION; INFINITY CARGO LOGISTICS (CHINA) LTD; INTERGLOBO NORTH AMERICA INC; INTERNATIONAL FREIGHT LINE (IFL); JETSEA SHIPPING AGENCY LTD; KAMIGUMI CO LTD; MAINFREIGHT INC; MEADOWS WYE CONTAINER GROUPAGE; MITSUBISHI LOGISTICS AMERICA CORPORATION; MOHAWK GLOBAL LOGISTICS; MOL WORLDWIDE LOGISTICS; MONDIAL FREIGHT (HK) LTD; NEW CHAIN LOGISTICS CO LTD; NISSIN INTERNATIONAL TRANSPORT USA INC; OCEAN CROWN SHIPPING LTD.; ADRIENNE SHIPPING LTD.; OIA GLOBAL LOGISTICS (CHINA) LTD; ORIENT EXPRESS CONTAINER COMPANY LTD; ORIENT STAR TRANSPORT INTERNATIONAL LTD; PACIFIC CONCORD INTERNATIONAL LTD; PANCON EXPRESS SERVICE; PELORUS OCEAN LINE LTD; POWER LINK LOGISTICS INC; PROSHIPPPING GROUP CORP; PYRAMID LINES; ROHLIG USA LLC; RS LOGISTICS LTD; SAMSUNG SDS CO LTD; SANKYU INC; SCHENKER OCEAN; SEAMASTER LOGISTICS; SEKO WORLDWIDE; SHENZHEN ANDA SHUN INTERNATIONAL LOGISTICS CO LTD.; SHENZHEN AWS TOMAX INTERNATIONAL TRANSPORTATION CO LTD; SHENZHEN ENLAND LOGISTICS CO LTD; SHENZHEN FENGDA LOGISTICS INTERNATIONAL LTD; SHENZHEN WANNING OCEAN INTERNATIONAL LOGISTICS CO., LTD; SHINE EXPRESS INC; SINO CONNECTIONS SOLUTIONS INC; SPEEDMARK LOGISTICS CO LTD; STAR ASIA INTERNATIONAL INC; THE SUMITOMO WAREHOUSE CO LTD; THORNLEY & PITT INC; TIANSHI LOGISTICS CO LTD; TOPOCEAN CONSOLIDATION SERVICE (LOS ANGELES) INC; TOSHIBA LOGISTICS; TPLOGIX INC; TRANSCON SHIPPING CO INC; TRANSLINK SHIPPING LINES; TRANSPAC CARGOLINE; TRANSPORT PARTNER LTD; TVL CONTAINER LINE LTD; UNIQUE LOGISTICS INTERNATIONAL (HK) LTD; UPS ASIA GROUP PTE LTD; WESTWIND SHIPPING & LOGISTICS PRIVATE LTD.; WORLD LOGISTIC SERVICES LTD; and YES LOGISTICS CORP., in personam.(gp) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/22/2022: #1 Exhibit) (gp).
November 21, 2022 Filing 9 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to CHIDORI SHIP HOLDING LLC; JESSICA SHIP HOLDING S.A.; NYK SHIP MANAGEMENT PTE LTD.; OCEAN NETWORK EXPRESS PTE LTD.; HAPAG- LLOYD AKTIENGESELLCHAFT; YANG MING MARINE TRANSPORT CORP.; HMM CO., LTD.; AIR SEA WORLDWIDE LOGISTICS LTD.; AIR TIGER EXPRESS ASIA INC; AIT WORLDWIDE LOGISTICS; ALLIANCE CARGO GROUP (HK) LTD; AMERICAN INTERNATIONAL CARGO SERVICE INC.; APEX MARITIME CO. (LAX) INC; APEX MARITIME CO. (ORD) LTD; APEX SHIPPING CO INC; APL LOGISTICS LTD; ARK SHIPPING INC; AZ FREIGHT INC; BDP TRANSPORT INC; BENKEL INTERNATIONAL PTE LTD; BLUE ANCHOR AMERICA LINE; BLUE LOTUS OCEAN LINE; BLUE WORLD LINE; CAPITAL EXPRESS INTERNATIONAL; CASTLEGATE LOGISTICS INC; CHINA INTERNATIONAL FREIGHT CO LTD; CHINA WHEEL SHIPPING (HOLDINGS) LTD.; CHRISTAL LINES; CJ KOREA EXPRESS SCHENXHEN CO LTD; CONNECTED INTERNATIONAL INC; CONSOLIDATOR INTERNATIONAL CONTAINER SERVICE; DANMAR LINES; DE WELL CONTAINER SHIPPING INC; DIMERCO EXPRESS (USA) CORP; DSV OCEAN TRANSPORT A/S; EAST- WEST LOGISTICS; EASY WAY LOGISTICS (HK) LTD.; ECU LINE NV; EURASIA FREIGHT SERVICE INC; EXPEDITORS INTERNATIONAL; FLEXPORT INTERNATIONAL LLC; GLOBAL OCEAN AGENCY LINES; GLOBE EXPRESS SERVICE; GOLDEN BRIDGE INTERNATIONAL INC; GREAT CHINA SHIPPING LTD; HECNY SHIPPING LTD; HT INTERNATIONAL SUPPLY CHAIN (CHINA) LTD; INDO TRANS LOGISTICS CORPORATION; INFINITY CARGO LOGISTICS (CHINA) LTD; INTERGLOBO NORTH AMERICA INC; INTERNATIONAL FREIGHT LINE (IFL); JETSEA SHIPPING AGENCY LTD; KAMIGUMI CO LTD; MAINFREIGHT INC; MEADOWS WYE CONTAINER GROUPAGE; MITSUBISHI LOGISTICS AMERICA CORPORATION; MOHAWK GLOBAL LOGISTICS; MOL WORLDWIDE LOGISTICS; MONDIAL FREIGHT (HK) LTD; NEW CHAIN LOGISTICS CO LTD; NISSIN INTERNATIONAL TRANSPORT USA INC; OCEAN CROWN SHIPPING LTD.; ADRIENNE SHIPPING LTD.; OIA GLOBAL LOGISTICS (CHINA) LTD; ORIENT EXPRESS CONTAINER COMPANY LTD; ORIENT STAR TRANSPORT INTERNATIONAL LTD; PACIFIC CONCORD INTERNATIONAL LTD; PANCON EXPRESS SERVICE; PELORUS OCEAN LINE LTD; POWER LINK LOGISTICS INC; PROSHIPPPING GROUP CORP; PYRAMID LINES; ROHLIG USA LLC; RS LOGISTICS LTD; SAMSUNG SDS CO LTD; SANKYU INC; SCHENKER OCEAN; SEAMASTER LOGISTICS; SEKO WORLDWIDE; SHENZHEN ANDA SHUN INTERNATIONAL LOGISTICS CO LTD.; SHENZHEN AWS TOMAX INTERNATIONAL TRANSPORTATION CO LTD; SHENZHEN ENLAND LOGISTICS CO LTD; SHENZHEN FENGDA LOGISTICS INTERNATIONAL LTD; SHENZHEN WANNING OCEAN INTERNATIONAL LOGISTICS CO., LTD; SHINE EXPRESS INC; SINO CONNECTIONS SOLUTIONS INC; SPEEDMARK LOGISTICS CO LTD; STAR ASIA INTERNATIONAL INC; THE SUMITOMO WAREHOUSE CO LTD; THORNLEY & PITT INC; TIANSHI LOGISTICS CO LTD; TOPOCEAN CONSOLIDATION SERVICE (LOS ANGELES) INC; TOSHIBA LOGISTICS; TPLOGIX INC; TRANSCON SHIPPING CO INC; TRANSLINK SHIPPING LINES; TRANSPAC CARGOLINE; TRANSPORT PARTNER LTD; TVL CONTAINER LINE LTD; UNIQUE LOGISTICS INTERNATIONAL (HK) LTD; UPS ASIA GROUP PTE LTD; WESTWIND SHIPPING & LOGISTICS PRIVATE LTD.; WORLD LOGISTIC SERVICES LTD; and YES LOGISTICS CORP., in personam, re: #2 Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Document filed by AXA General Insurance Hong Kong Ltd., Affliated FM Insurance Company, Allianz Global Corp. & Spec. North America/Allianz of America, Inc., Allianz Global Corporate & Specialty, Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company, AmWINS Specialty Logistics Underwriters (ASLU), Ascot Underwriting Limited, CNA Hardy, UK, CNA Insurance Company Limited, Cathay Century Insurance, Cathedral Underwriting Ltd, Chaucer Syndicate, China Pacific Insurance Company, Shanghai, Coast Underwriters, Falvey Cargo Underwriting, Flextronics, Fubon Insurance Co Limited, HDI Global Insurance Company, HDI Global SE Australia Branch, Hanover Insurance Company, ICICI ex Bharti AXA, India, MSIG Insurance (Thailand) Public Co Ltd, Markel America Insurance Company, Mitsui Sumitomo Insurance, Mitsui Sumitomo Insurance Co., Ltd (Thailand Branch), Mitsui Sumitomo Insurance Company Of America,, Mitsui Sumitomo Insurance USA Inc, Motool Inc, Munich re Underwriting Ltd, NTI Limited (Australia), Nokia, PT Mandiri AXA General Insurance, QBE, RLI Insurance Co., Roanoke - Munich Re Syndicate Ltd, Rooms to Go, SBI General Insurance, Sentinel Marine Underwriters, LLC. (SMU), Sompo Insurance (Thailand) Public Company Limited, Sompo International Insurance, Sunshine Property and Casualty Insurance Co Ltd, The Continental Insurance Company, The Hanover Insurance Company, The New India Assurance Company Ltd (HK Branch), U.S. Specialty Insurance Company, Vienna Insurance Group, Zurich Insurance, Zurich North America, Zurich, Hong Kong. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Rider - List of Defendants Names and Addresses (unissued)).(Thames, Jonathan)
November 21, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Jonathan W. Thames to RE-FILE Document No. #8 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all of the party names whom summons is for must be listed on the docket entry text;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (jgo)
November 20, 2022 Filing 8 FILING ERROR - SUMMONS REQUEST As To ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to See attached Rider, re: #2 Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Document filed by AXA General Insurance Hong Kong Ltd., Affliated FM Insurance Company, Allianz Global Corp. & Spec. North America/Allianz of America, Inc., Allianz Global Corporate & Specialty, Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company, AmWINS Specialty Logistics Underwriters (ASLU), Ascot Underwriting Limited, CNA Hardy, UK, CNA Insurance Company Limited, Cathay Century Insurance, Cathedral Underwriting Ltd, Chaucer Syndicate, China Pacific Insurance Company, Shanghai, Coast Underwriters, Falvey Cargo Underwriting, Flextronics, Fubon Insurance Co Limited, HDI Global Insurance Company, HDI Global SE Australia Branch, Hanover Insurance Company, ICICI ex Bharti AXA, India, MSIG Insurance (Thailand) Public Co Ltd, Markel America Insurance Company, Mitsui Sumitomo Insurance, Mitsui Sumitomo Insurance Co., Ltd (Thailand Branch), Mitsui Sumitomo Insurance Company Of America,, Mitsui Sumitomo Insurance USA Inc, Motool Inc, Munich re Underwriting Ltd, NTI Limited (Australia), Nokia, PT Mandiri AXA General Insurance, QBE, RLI Insurance Co., Roanoke - Munich Re Syndicate Ltd, Rooms to Go, SBI General Insurance, Sentinel Marine Underwriters, LLC. (SMU), Sompo Insurance (Thailand) Public Company Limited, Sompo International Insurance, Sunshine Property and Casualty Insurance Co Ltd, The Continental Insurance Company, The Hanover Insurance Company, The New India Assurance Company Ltd (HK Branch), U.S. Specialty Insurance Company, Vienna Insurance Group, Zurich Insurance, Zurich North America, Zurich, Hong Kong. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Rider - List of Defendants Names and Addresses).(Thames, Jonathan) Modified on 11/21/2022 (jgo).
October 4, 2022 Filing 7 SUPPLEMENTAL RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent CNA Financial Corporation for CNA Hardy, UK, CNA Insurance Company Limited, The Continental Insurance Company; Corporate Parent MS & AD Insurance Group Holdings, Inc. for MSIG Insurance (Thailand) Public Co Ltd, Mitsui Sumitomo Insurance, Mitsui Sumitomo Insurance Co., Ltd (Thailand Branch), Mitsui Sumitomo Insurance Company Of America,, Mitsui Sumitomo Insurance USA Inc; Corporate Parent AXA Group for AXA General Insurance Hong Kong Ltd., ICICI ex Bharti AXA, India, PT Mandiri AXA General Insurance; Corporate Parent China Reinsurance (Group) Corporation, Other Affiliate China Re's Syndicate at Lloyds for Chaucer Syndicate; Corporate Parent Sompo Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Sompo Japan Insurance for Sompo Insurance (Thailand) Public Company Limited, Sompo International Insurance; Corporate Parent Markel Corporation for Markel America Insurance Company; Corporate Parent FM Global Group for Affliated FM Insurance Company; Corporate Parent The Hanover Insurance Group, Inc. for The Hanover Insurance Company; Corporate Parent Munich RE Group for Munich re Underwriting Ltd, Roanoke - Munich Re Syndicate Ltd; Other Affiliate Suncorp Group Limited, Other Affiliate CGU Insurance Limited, Other Affiliate Insurance Australia Group (IAG), Other Affiliate Vero Insurance, Other Affiliate AAI Limited for NTI Limited (Australia); Corporate Parent Sunshine Ins. Group, Ltd. for Sunshine Property and Casualty Insurance Co Ltd; Other Affiliate AmWINS Group Inc. for AmWINS Specialty Logistics Underwriters (ASLU), Sentinel Marine Underwriters, LLC. (SMU); Corporate Parent Ascot Underwriting Group Limited, Other Affiliate Syndicate 1414 at Lloyd's for Ascot Underwriting Limited; Corporate Parent Zurich Insurance Group Ltd. for Zurich Insurance, Zurich North America, Zurich, Hong Kong; Corporate Parent Talanx AG, Corporate Parent HDI Global Insurance Company SE for HDI Global Insurance Company; Corporate Parent Wiener Stadtische Versicherungsverein for Vienna Insurance Group; Corporate Parent China Pacific Insurance (Group) Co., Ltd. for China Pacific Insurance Company, Shanghai; Other Affiliate Intact Financial Corporation for Coast Underwriters; Corporate Parent State Bank of India, Corporate Parent Napean Opportunities LLP, Corporate Parent Honey Wheat Investment Ltd., Corporate Parent PI Opportunities Fund, Corporate Parent Axis New Opportunities AIF-I for SBI General Insurance; Corporate Parent Tokio Marine Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Tokio Marine HCC for U.S. Specialty Insurance Company ; Corporate Parent AGCS International Holding B.V., Corporate Parent Allianz SE, Corporate Parent Allianz of America, Inc. for Allianz Global Corp. & Spec. North America/Allianz of America, Inc., Allianz Global Corporate & Specialty, Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company; Corporate Parent Lancashire Holdings Limited, Corporate Parent Lloyd's syndicates 2010 and 3010 for Cathedral Underwriting Ltd; Corporate Parent Fubon Financial Holding Co. Ltd. for Fubon Insurance Co Limited; Corporate Parent RLI Corp. for RLI Insurance Co.; Corporate Parent Cathay Financial Holding Co., Ltd. for Cathay Century Insurance. Document filed by AXA General Insurance Hong Kong Ltd., Affliated FM Insurance Company, Allianz Global Corp. & Spec. North America/Allianz of America, Inc., Allianz Global Corporate & Specialty, Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company, AmWINS Specialty Logistics Underwriters (ASLU), Ascot Underwriting Limited, CNA Hardy, UK, CNA Insurance Company Limited, Cathay Century Insurance, Cathedral Underwriting Ltd, Chaucer Syndicate, China Pacific Insurance Company, Shanghai, Coast Underwriters, Falvey Cargo Underwriting, Flextronics, Fubon Insurance Co Limited, HDI Global Insurance Company, ICICI ex Bharti AXA, India, MSIG Insurance (Thailand) Public Co Ltd, Markel America Insurance Company, Mitsui Sumitomo Insurance, Mitsui Sumitomo Insurance Co., Ltd (Thailand Branch), Mitsui Sumitomo Insurance Company Of America,, Mitsui Sumitomo Insurance USA Inc, Motool Inc, Munich re Underwriting Ltd, NTI Limited (Australia), Nokia, PT Mandiri AXA General Insurance, QBE, RLI Insurance Co., Roanoke - Munich Re Syndicate Ltd, Rooms to Go, SBI General Insurance, Sentinel Marine Underwriters, LLC. (SMU), Sompo Insurance (Thailand) Public Company Limited, Sompo International Insurance, Sunshine Property and Casualty Insurance Co Ltd, The Continental Insurance Company, The Hanover Insurance Company, The New India Assurance Company Ltd (HK Branch), U.S. Specialty Insurance Company, Vienna Insurance Group, Zurich Insurance, Zurich North America, Zurich, Hong Kong..(Thames, Jonathan)
October 4, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Notice to Attorney Jonathan W. Thames to RE-FILE Document No. #6 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement,,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): not all corporate parents/other affiliates were added;. Re-file the document using the event type Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement found under the event list Other Documents - select the correct filer/filers - attach the correct signed PDF - when prompted with the message "Are there any corporate parents or other affiliates?", select the Yes radio button - enter the corporate parent/other affiliate, click the Search button - select the correct corporate parent/other affiliate name from the search results list or if no person found, create a new corporate parent/other affiliate - select the party to whom the corporate parent/other affiliate should be linked - add corporate parent/other affiliate names one at a time. (lb)
October 3, 2022 Filing 6 FILING ERROR - NOT ALL CORPORATE PARENTS/OTHER AFFILIATES WERE ADDED - SUPPLEMENTAL RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Tokio Marine Holding, Inc. for U.S. Specialty Insurance Company ; Corporate Parent Wiener Stadtische Versicherungsverein for Vienna Insurance Group; Corporate Parent Zurich Insurance Group Ltd for Zurich Insurance. Document filed by The New India Assurance Company Ltd (HK Branch), U.S. Specialty Insurance Company, Vienna Insurance Group, Zurich Insurance, Zurich North America, Zurich, Hong Kong..(Thames, Jonathan) Modified on 10/4/2022 (lb).
September 30, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING REMOVAL OF PARTY. Notice to attorney Jonathan W. Thames. The following party/parties has been removed from this case: Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company and Coast Underwriters, American International Cargo Services Inc., Apex Shipping Co, CNA Insurance Company, Continental Insurance Company, Flexport, HMM, Hapag Lloyd, Ocean Crown Shipping Ltd. Adrienne Shipping Ltd., One, QBE, London, Transpac, Uninsured (Flextronics), Uninsured (Motool Inc), Uninsured (Nokia), Uninsured (Rooms to Go), Yang Ming, Zurich Insurance, Zurich. The party was added to the case in error. (sj)
September 30, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Jonathan W. Thames. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Expeditors International Ocean, Shenzhen Wanningocean International Logistics Co., Ltd. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error. (sj)
September 29, 2022 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. (sj)
September 29, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Jonathan W. Thames. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code Albany. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State. (sj)
September 29, 2022 Case Designated ECF. (sj)
September 29, 2022 CASE REFERRED TO Judge Paul A. Engelmayer as possibly related to 1:22md3028. (sj)
September 29, 2022 Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (laq)
September 29, 2022 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (laq)
September 29, 2022 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:22-md-03028-PAE. Notice of Assignment to follow. (laq)
September 28, 2022 Filing 5 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 22-MD-3028. Document filed by Mitsui Sumitomo Insurance Company Of America,..(Thames, Jonathan)
September 28, 2022 Filing 4 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent CNA Financial Corporation for The Continental Insurance Company. Document filed by The Continental Insurance Company..(Thames, Jonathan)
September 28, 2022 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Thames, Jonathan)
September 28, 2022 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against AIT Worldwide Logistics, Air Sea Worldwide Logistics Ltd., Air Tiger Express Asia Inc, Alliance Cargo Group (HK) Ltd, Apex Maritime Co. (LAX) Inc, Apex Maritime Co. (ORD) Ltd, Apex Shipping Co, Apex Shipping Co Inc, Ark Shipping inc, BDP Transport Inc., Benkel International Pte Ltd., Blue Anchor America Line, Blue Lotus Ocean Line, Blue World Line, CJ Korea Express Schenxhen Co Ltd, Capital Express International, Castlegate Logistics Inc, China International Freight Co Ltd, China Wheel Shipping (Holdings) Ltd., Christal Lines, Connected International Inc, Consolidator International Container Service, DSV Ocean Transport A/S, Danmar Lines, De Well Container Shipping Inc, Dimerco Express (USA) Corp, East-West Logistics, Easy Way Logistics (HK) Ltd., Ecu Line NV, Eurasia Freight Service Inc, Expeditors International Ocean, Flexport International LLC, Global Ocean Agency Lines, Globe Express Service, Golden Bridge International Inc, Great China Shipping Ltd, HT International Supply Chain (china) Ltd, Hency Shipping Ltd, Indo Trans Logistics corporation, Interglobo North America Inc, International Freight Line (IFL), Jetsea Shipping Agency Ltd, Kamigumi CO Ltd, M/V ONE APUS, IMO no. 9806079, including its engines, boilers, tackle, and other appurtenances, etc., in rem, MOL Worldwide Logistics, Mainfreight Inc, Meadows WYE Container Groupage, Mitsubishi Logistics America Corporation, Mohawk Global Logistics, Mondial Freight (HK) Ltd, New Chain Logistics Co Ltd, Nissin International Transport USA Inc, OIA Global Logistics (China) Ltd, Ocean Crown Shipping Ltd. Adrienne Shipping Ltd., Orient Express Container Company Ltd, Orient Star Transport International Ltd, Pacific Concord International Ltd, Pancon Express Service, Pelorus Ocean Line Ltd, Power Link Logistics Inc, Proshipping Group Corp, Pyramid Lines, RS Logistics Ltd, Rohlig USA LLC, SEKO Worldwide, Samsung SDS Co Ltd, Sankyu Inc., Schenker Ocean, Seamaster Logistics, Shenzhen AWS Tomax International Transportation Co Ltd, Shenzhen Anda Shun International Logistics Co Ltd., Shenzhen Enland Logistics Co Ltd, Shenzhen Fengda Logistics International LTD, Shenzhen Wanningocean International Logistics Co., Ltd, Shine Express Inc, Sino Connections Logistics Inc, Speedmark Logistics Co Ltd, Star Asia International Inc, TOPOCEAN Consolidation service (los Angeles) Inc, TVL Container Line Ltd, The Sumitomo Warehouse Co Ltd, Thornley & Pitt Inc, Tianshi Logistics Co Ltd, Toshiba Logistics, Tplogix Inc, Transcon Shipping Co Inc, Translink Shipping Lines, Transpac Cargoline, Transport Partner Ltd, UPS Asia Group Pte Ltd., Unique Logistics International (HK) Ltd, Westwind Shipping & Logistics Private Ltd., World Logistic Services Ltd, Yes Logistics Corp, CHIDORI SHIP HOLDING LLC, JESSICA SHIP HOLDING S.A., NYK SHIP MANAGEMENT PTE LTD., OCEAN NETWORK EXPRESS PTE LTD., HAPAG-LLOYD AKTIENGESELLCHAFT, Yang Ming Marine Transport Corp., HMM CO., LTD, American International Cargo Service Inc., OCEAN CROWN SHIPPING LTD., ADRIENNE SHIPPING LTD., Infinity Cargo Logistics (China) Ltd. Document filed by Vienna Insurance Group, CNA Hardy, UK, Sompo International Insurance, Sompo Insurance (Thailand) Public Company Limited, Munich re Underwriting Ltd, Zurich North America, Cathedral Underwriting Ltd, Fubon Insurance Co Limited, U.S. Specialty Insurance Company, Affliated FM Insurance Company, HDI Global Insurance Company, Mitsui Sumitomo Insurance Co., Ltd (Thailand Branch), Cathay Century Insurance, Falvey Cargo Underwriting, Sentinel Marine Underwriters, LLC. (SMU), Chaucer Syndicate, ICICI ex Bharti AXA, India, The Hanover Insurance Company, The Continental Insurance Company, Ascot Underwriting Limited, MSIG Insurance (Thailand) Public Co Ltd, Roanoke - Munich Re Syndicate Ltd, SBI General Insurance, Markel America Insurance Company, AXA General Insurance Hong Kong Ltd., Hanover Insurance Company, Mitsui Sumitomo Insurance, Mitsui Sumitomo Insurance Company Of America,, Sunshine Property and Casualty Insurance Co Ltd, Zurich, Hong Kong, China Pacific Insurance Company, Shanghai, RLI Insurance Co., The New India Assurance Company Ltd (HK Branch), AmWINS Specialty Logistics Underwriters (ASLU), Allianz Global Corporate & Specialty, Mitsui Sumitomo Insurance USA Inc, NTI Limited (Australia), Allianz Global Corp. & Spec. North America/Allianz of America, Inc., PT Mandiri AXA General Insurance, QBE, Coast Underwriters, Rooms to Go, HDI Global SE Australia Branch, Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company, Flextronics, Motool Inc, CNA Insurance Company Limited, Zurich Insurance, Nokia. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Schedule A).(Thames, Jonathan)
September 28, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Jonathan W. Thames to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the pleading is not correct; All parties must be listed in caption, et al not accepted; the wrong filer/filers were selected for the pleading; the wrong party/parties whom the pleading is against were selected;. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. If the deficiency/deficiencies are not corrected within five (5) days per Amended Standing Order 15-mc-00131 this case will be administratively closed. Initial Pleading due by 10/3/2022. (sj)
September 28, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT RELATED CASE STATEMENT. Notice to attorney Jonathan W. Thames to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong event type was used to file the related case statement. Re-file the document using the event type Statement of Relatedness found under the event list Other Documents - select the correct filer - enter the related case number when prompted - and attach the correct PDF. (sj)
September 28, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Jonathan W. Thames to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the event wrong event type was used to file the civil cover sheet. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. (sj)
September 28, 2022 Civil Case Opening Fee Paid electronically via Pay.gov: for #1 Complaint. Filing fee $ 402.00. Pay.gov receipt number ANYSDC-26737915, paid on 9/27/2022. (sj)
September 27, 2022 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - PDF ERROR COMPLAINT against One, BDP Transport Inc.. Document filed by Continental Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplement Civil Disclosures, #3 Supplement Related Cases, #4 Exhibit Schedule A).(Thames, Jonathan) Modified on 9/28/2022 (sj).
September 27, 2022 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Plaintiffs/Petitioners Mitsui Sumitomo Insurance Co., Ltd (Thailand Branch), Sompo International Insurance, Uninsured (Nokia), QBE, London, Uninsured (Motool Inc), Cathay Century Insurance, Sentinel Marine Underwriters, LLC. (SMU), China Pacific Insurance Company, Shanghai, Zurich, Hong Kong, Vienna Insurance Group, PT Mandiri AXA General Insurance, Mitsui Sumitomo Insurance USA Inc, NTI Limited (Australia), Uninsured (Rooms to Go), RLI Insurance Co., Sompo Insurance (Thailand) Public Company Limited, The New India Assurance Company Ltd (HK Branch), Ascot Underwriting Limited, Zurich Insurance, Zurich, Roanoke - Munich Re Syndicate Ltd, AXA General Insurance Hong Kong Ltd., SBI General Insurance, Zurich North America, Cathedral Underwriting Ltd, U.S. Specialty Insurance Company, MSIG Insurance (Thailand) Public Co Ltd, Markel America Insurance Company, Mitsui Sumitomo Insurance, Hanover Insurance Company, Chaucer Syndicate, ICICI ex Bharti AXA, India, Fubon Insurance Co Limited, Uninsured (Flextronics), Falvey Cargo Underwriting, HDI Global Insurance Company, Munich re Underwriting Ltd, CNA Insurance Company, Sunshine Property and Casualty Insurance Co Ltd, CNA Hardy, UK, The Hanover Insurance Company added. Party added pursuant to #1 Complaint,.Document filed by Mitsui Sumitomo Insurance Co., Ltd (Thailand Branch), Sompo International Insurance, Uninsured (Nokia), QBE, London, Uninsured (Motool Inc), Cathay Century Insurance, Sentinel Marine Underwriters, LLC. (SMU), China Pacific Insurance Company, Shanghai, Zurich, Hong Kong, Vienna Insurance Group, PT Mandiri AXA General Insurance, Mitsui Sumitomo Insurance USA Inc, NTI Limited (Australia), Uninsured (Rooms to Go), RLI Insurance Co., Sompo Insurance (Thailand) Public Company Limited, The New India Assurance Company Ltd (HK Branch), Ascot Underwriting Limited, Zurich Insurance, Zurich, Roanoke - Munich Re Syndicate Ltd, AXA General Insurance Hong Kong Ltd., SBI General Insurance, Zurich North America, Cathedral Underwriting Ltd, U.S. Specialty Insurance Company, MSIG Insurance (Thailand) Public Co Ltd, Markel America Insurance Company, Mitsui Sumitomo Insurance, Hanover Insurance Company, Chaucer Syndicate, ICICI ex Bharti AXA, India, Fubon Insurance Co Limited, Uninsured (Flextronics), Falvey Cargo Underwriting, HDI Global Insurance Company, Munich re Underwriting Ltd, CNA Insurance Company, Sunshine Property and Casualty Insurance Co Ltd, CNA Hardy, UK, The Hanover Insurance Company. Related document: #1 Complaint,..(Thames, Jonathan)
September 27, 2022 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Defendants/Respondents Apex Maritime Co. (LAX) Inc, Proshipping Group Corp, Transport Partner Ltd, Shine Express Inc, Meadows WYE Container Groupage, Apex Shipping Co Inc, Sino Connections Logistics Inc, Shenzhen Fengda Logistics International LTD, De Well Container Shipping Inc, Kamigumi CO Ltd, Mitsubishi Logistics America Corporation, Shenzhen AWS Tomax International Transportation Co Ltd, Translink Shipping Lines, Blue Lotus Ocean Line, Flexport, Easy Way Logistics (HK) Ltd., Apex Shipping Co, Transpac, M/V ONE APUS, IMO no. 9806079, including its engines, boilers, tackle, and other appurtenances, etc., in rem, The Continental Insurance Company added. Party added pursuant to #1 Complaint,.Document filed by Vienna Insurance Group, CNA Hardy, UK, Uninsured (Nokia), Sompo International Insurance, Sompo Insurance (Thailand) Public Company Limited, Munich re Underwriting Ltd, QBE, London, Uninsured (Flextronics), Zurich North America, Cathedral Underwriting Ltd, Fubon Insurance Co Limited, CNA Insurance Company, U.S. Specialty Insurance Company, Affliated FM Insurance Company, HDI Global Insurance Company, Mitsui Sumitomo Insurance Co., Ltd (Thailand Branch), Cathay Century Insurance, Continental Insurance Company, Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company and Coast Underwriters, Falvey Cargo Underwriting, Sentinel Marine Underwriters, LLC. (SMU), Chaucer Syndicate, ICICI ex Bharti AXA, India, The Hanover Insurance Company, Ascot Underwriting Limited, Zurich Insurance, Zurich, MSIG Insurance (Thailand) Public Co Ltd, Roanoke - Munich Re Syndicate Ltd, SBI General Insurance, Markel America Insurance Company, AXA General Insurance Hong Kong Ltd., Hanover Insurance Company, Mitsui Sumitomo Insurance, Mitsui Sumitomo Insurance Company Of America,, Sunshine Property and Casualty Insurance Co Ltd, Zurich, Hong Kong, China Pacific Insurance Company, Shanghai, Uninsured (Rooms to Go), Uninsured (Motool Inc), RLI Insurance Co., The New India Assurance Company Ltd (HK Branch), AmWINS Specialty Logistics Underwriters (ASLU), Allianz Global Corporate & Specialty, Mitsui Sumitomo Insurance USA Inc, NTI Limited (Australia), Allianz Global Corp. & Spec. North America/Allianz of America, Inc., PT Mandiri AXA General Insurance. Related document: #1 Complaint,..(Thames, Jonathan)
September 27, 2022 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Defendants/Respondents Interglobo North America Inc, Speedmark Logistics Co Ltd, International Freight Line (IFL), China Wheel Shipping (Holdings) Ltd., Orient Star Transport International Ltd, CJ Korea Express Schenxhen Co Ltd, Consolidator International Container Service, Globe Express Service, Seamaster Logistics, New Chain Logistics Co Ltd, Shenzhen Wanningocean International Logistics Co., Ltd, Ecu Line NV, Shenzhen Anda Shun International Logistics Co Ltd., Thornley & Pitt Inc, East-West Logistics, Yes Logistics Corp, Dimerco Express (USA) Corp, Samsung SDS Co Ltd, Schenker Ocean, Tianshi Logistics Co Ltd, Castlegate Logistics Inc, Air Tiger Express Asia Inc, Power Link Logistics Inc, Sankyu Inc., Toshiba Logistics, Benkel International Pte Ltd., The Sumitomo Warehouse Co Ltd added. Party added pursuant to #1 Complaint,.Document filed by Vienna Insurance Group, CNA Hardy, UK, Sentinel Marine Underwriters, LLC. (SMU), Falvey Cargo Underwriting, Uninsured (Nokia), Chaucer Syndicate, Sompo International Insurance, Sompo Insurance (Thailand) Public Company Limited, Munich re Underwriting Ltd, ICICI ex Bharti AXA, India, QBE, London, The Hanover Insurance Company, Uninsured (Flextronics), Ascot Underwriting Limited, Zurich Insurance, Zurich, MSIG Insurance (Thailand) Public Co Ltd, Zurich North America, Roanoke - Munich Re Syndicate Ltd, Cathedral Underwriting Ltd, SBI General Insurance, Markel America Insurance Company, Fubon Insurance Co Limited, CNA Insurance Company, U.S. Specialty Insurance Company, AXA General Insurance Hong Kong Ltd., Hanover Insurance Company, Mitsui Sumitomo Insurance, Affliated FM Insurance Company, Mitsui Sumitomo Insurance Company Of America,, Sunshine Property and Casualty Insurance Co Ltd, Zurich, Hong Kong, HDI Global Insurance Company, China Pacific Insurance Company, Shanghai, Uninsured (Rooms to Go), Mitsui Sumitomo Insurance Co., Ltd (Thailand Branch), Cathay Century Insurance, RLI Insurance Co., Uninsured (Motool Inc), The New India Assurance Company Ltd (HK Branch), AmWINS Specialty Logistics Underwriters (ASLU), Mitsui Sumitomo Insurance USA Inc, Allianz Global Corporate & Specialty, NTI Limited (Australia), Continental Insurance Company, Allianz Global Corp. & Spec. North America/Allianz of America, Inc., PT Mandiri AXA General Insurance, Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company and Coast Underwriters. Related document: #1 Complaint,..(Thames, Jonathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mitsui Sumitomo Insurance Company Of America, et al v. M/V One Apus, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mitsui Sumitomo Insurance Company Of America,
Represented By: Jonathan W. Thames
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Affliated FM Insurance Company
Represented By: Jonathan W. Thames
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allianz Global Corporate & Specialty
Represented By: Jonathan W. Thames
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allianz Global Corp. & Spec. North America/Allianz of America, Inc.
Represented By: Jonathan W. Thames
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company and Coast Underwriters
Represented By: Jonathan W. Thames
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AmWINS Specialty Logistics Underwriters (ASLU)
Represented By: Jonathan W. Thames
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Continental Insurance Company
Represented By: Jonathan W. Thames
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mitsui Sumitomo Insurance Co., Ltd (Thailand Branch)
Represented By: Jonathan W. Thames
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sompo International Insurance
Represented By: Jonathan W. Thames
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Uninsured (Nokia)
Represented By: Jonathan W. Thames
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: QBE, London
Represented By: Jonathan W. Thames
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Uninsured (Motool Inc)
Represented By: Jonathan W. Thames
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cathay Century Insurance
Represented By: Jonathan W. Thames
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sentinel Marine Underwriters, LLC. (SMU)
Represented By: Jonathan W. Thames
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: China Pacific Insurance Company, Shanghai
Represented By: Jonathan W. Thames
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zurich, Hong Kong
Represented By: Jonathan W. Thames
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vienna Insurance Group
Represented By: Jonathan W. Thames
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PT Mandiri AXA General Insurance
Represented By: Jonathan W. Thames
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mitsui Sumitomo Insurance USA Inc
Represented By: Jonathan W. Thames
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NTI Limited (Australia)
Represented By: Jonathan W. Thames
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Uninsured (Rooms to Go)
Represented By: Jonathan W. Thames
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RLI Insurance Co.
Represented By: Jonathan W. Thames
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sompo Insurance (Thailand) Public Company Limited
Represented By: Jonathan W. Thames
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The New India Assurance Company Ltd (HK Branch)
Represented By: Jonathan W. Thames
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ascot Underwriting Limited
Represented By: Jonathan W. Thames
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zurich Insurance, Zurich
Represented By: Jonathan W. Thames
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roanoke - Munich Re Syndicate Ltd
Represented By: Jonathan W. Thames
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AXA General Insurance Hong Kong Ltd.
Represented By: Jonathan W. Thames
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SBI General Insurance
Represented By: Jonathan W. Thames
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zurich North America
Represented By: Jonathan W. Thames
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cathedral Underwriting Ltd
Represented By: Jonathan W. Thames
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: U.S. Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: Jonathan W. Thames
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MSIG Insurance (Thailand) Public Co Ltd
Represented By: Jonathan W. Thames
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Markel America Insurance Company
Represented By: Jonathan W. Thames
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mitsui Sumitomo Insurance
Represented By: Jonathan W. Thames
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hanover Insurance Company
Represented By: Jonathan W. Thames
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chaucer Syndicate
Represented By: Jonathan W. Thames
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ICICI ex Bharti AXA, India
Represented By: Jonathan W. Thames
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fubon Insurance Co Limited
Represented By: Jonathan W. Thames
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Uninsured (Flextronics)
Represented By: Jonathan W. Thames
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Falvey Cargo Underwriting
Represented By: Jonathan W. Thames
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HDI Global Insurance Company
Represented By: Jonathan W. Thames
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Munich re Underwriting Ltd
Represented By: Jonathan W. Thames
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CNA Insurance Company
Represented By: Jonathan W. Thames
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sunshine Property and Casualty Insurance Co Ltd
Represented By: Jonathan W. Thames
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CNA Hardy, UK
Represented By: Jonathan W. Thames
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Hanover Insurance Company
Represented By: Jonathan W. Thames
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Continental Insurance Company
Represented By: Jonathan W. Thames
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: QBE
Represented By: Jonathan W. Thames
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Coast Underwriters
Represented By: Jonathan W. Thames
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rooms to Go
Represented By: Jonathan W. Thames
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HDI Global SE Australia Branch
Represented By: Jonathan W. Thames
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company
Represented By: Jonathan W. Thames
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Flextronics
Represented By: Jonathan W. Thames
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Motool Inc
Represented By: Jonathan W. Thames
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CNA Insurance Company Limited
Represented By: Jonathan W. Thames
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zurich Insurance
Represented By: Jonathan W. Thames
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nokia
Represented By: Jonathan W. Thames
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: One
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BDP Transport Inc.
Represented By: Peter Skoufalos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HMM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AIT Worldwide Logistics
Represented By: Kenderick Mason Jordan
Represented By: Robert Lee Reeb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DSV Ocean Transport A/S
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SEKO Worldwide
Represented By: Kenderick Mason Jordan
Represented By: Robert Lee Reeb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yang Ming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christal Lines
Represented By: Kenderick Mason Jordan
Represented By: Robert Lee Reeb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pyramid Lines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Connected International Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TOPOCEAN Consolidation service (los Angeles) Inc
Represented By: Kenderick Mason Jordan
Represented By: Robert Lee Reeb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UPS Asia Group Pte Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ark Shipping inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hapag Lloyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: APL Logistics Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue Anchor America Line
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rohlig USA LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pelorus Ocean Line Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OIA Global Logistics (China) Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eurasia Freight Service Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ocean Crown Shipping Ltd. Adrienne Shipping Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tplogix Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Air Sea Worldwide Logistics Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital Express International
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue World Line
Represented By: Andrew Robert Spector
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Star Asia International Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AZ Freight Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unique Logistics International (HK) Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nissin International Transport USA Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shenzhen Enland Logistics Co Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Great China Shipping Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TVL Container Line Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pancon Express Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Indo Trans Logistics corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Golden Bridge International Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mondial Freight (HK) Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Expeditors International Ocean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Westwind Shipping & Logistics Private Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pacific Concord International Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Orient Express Container Company Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MOL Worldwide Logistics
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flexport International LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apex Maritime Co. (ORD) Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: World Logistic Services Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mainfreight Inc
Represented By: Alisa Manasantivongs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RS Logistics Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alliance Cargo Group (HK) Ltd
Represented By: Mark L. McKew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American International Cargo Services Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mohawk Global Logistics
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Transcon Shipping Co Inc
Represented By: Susan Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: China International Freight Co Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jetsea Shipping Agency Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Global Ocean Agency Lines
Represented By: Charles Edmund Murphy
Represented By: Keith Wayne Heard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HT International Supply Chain (china) Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hency Shipping Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Interglobo North America Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Speedmark Logistics Co Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Freight Line (IFL)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: China Wheel Shipping (Holdings) Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Orient Star Transport International Ltd
Represented By: Barry Neil Gutterman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CJ Korea Express Schenxhen Co Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Consolidator International Container Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Globe Express Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seamaster Logistics
Represented By: Peter Skoufalos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shenzhen Wanningocean International Logistics Co., Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ecu Line NV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shenzhen Anda Shun International Logistics Co Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thornley & Pitt Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: East-West Logistics
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yes Logistics Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dimerco Express (USA) Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Schenker Ocean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tianshi Logistics Co Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Castlegate Logistics Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Air Tiger Express Asia Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Power Link Logistics Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sankyu Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toshiba Logistics
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benkel International Pte Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Sumitomo Warehouse Co Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apex Maritime Co. (LAX) Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Proshipping Group Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Transport Partner Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shine Express Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meadows WYE Container Groupage
Represented By: Charles Edmund Murphy
Represented By: Keith Wayne Heard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apex Shipping Co Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sino Connections Logistics Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shenzhen Fengda Logistics International LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: De Well Container Shipping Inc
Represented By: Joseph John Perrone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shenzhen AWS Tomax International Transportation Co Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Translink Shipping Lines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue Lotus Ocean Line
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flexport
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Easy Way Logistics (HK) Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apex Shipping Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Transpac
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Expeditors International
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shenzhen Wanning Ocean International Logistics Co., Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHIDORI SHIP HOLDING LLC
Represented By: Timothy Semenoro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JESSICA SHIP HOLDING S.A.
Represented By: Timothy Semenoro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NYK SHIP MANAGEMENT PTE LTD.
Represented By: Timothy Semenoro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OCEAN NETWORK EXPRESS PTE LTD.
Represented By: Randolph H Donatelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HAPAG-LLOYD AKTIENGESELLCHAFT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yang Ming Marine Transport Corp.
Represented By: Garth S. Wolfson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HMM CO., LTD
Represented By: John David Giffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American International Cargo Service Inc.
Represented By: Kenderick Mason Jordan
Represented By: Robert Lee Reeb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OCEAN CROWN SHIPPING LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ADRIENNE SHIPPING LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Infinity Cargo Logistics (China) Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Danmar Lines
Represented By: Peter Skoufalos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross claimant: Transpac Cargoline
Represented By: Edward William Floyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross claimant: New Chain Logistics Co Ltd
Represented By: Ren Rong Pan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross claimant: Samsung SDS Co Ltd
Represented By: Mary Teresa Reilly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross claimant: Kamigumi CO Ltd
Represented By: Joseph John Perrone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross claimant: Mitsubishi Logistics America Corporation
Represented By: Joseph John Perrone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Alternative dispute resolution (adr) provider: M/V ONE APUS, IMO no. 9806079, including its engines, boilers, tackle, and other appurtenances, etc., in rem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Roes 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Orient Overseas Container Line
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: M/V One Apus in rem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: ECU Worldwide
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: HAPAG-LLOYD AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT a/k/a/ HAPAG-LLOYD AG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?