The Tokio Marine and Fire Insurance Co. (HK) Ltd. v. Eagle Logistic Service Inc.
Plaintiff: The Tokio Marine and Fire Insurance Co. (HK) Ltd.
Defendant: Eagle Logistic Service Inc.
Trustee: JESSICA SHIP HOLDING S.A.
3Rd Party Defendant: M/V One Apus, in rem, CHIDORI SHIP HOLDING LLC, NYK SHIPMANAGEMENT PTE LTD., OCEAN NETWORK EXPRESS PTE LTD, HMM Co. Ltd. f/k/a Hyundai Merchant Marine Co., Ltd and Logistics Cargo Concept, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2022cv08237
Filed: September 27, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Paul A Engelmayer
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 46 U.S.C. ยง 30701 Marine Cargo Loss or Damage - Liability of Water Carriers
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 9, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 9, 2022 Filing 13 LETTER MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:22-cv-4609 - that 1:22-cv-4609 be Consolidated as a Member Case on MDL Docket 1:22-md-3028 addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from Lauren B. Wilgus dated 11/8/22. Document filed by China Int'l Freight Co., Ltd..Filed In Associated Cases: 1:22-md-03028-PAE et al..(Wilgus, Lauren)
November 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (142 in 1:22-md-03028-PAE) Letter, filed by Starr Indemnity & Liability Company. ENDORSEMENT: The above four actions are to be added as member cases in 22md3028. This order is to be docketed in that case and in the four member cases. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 11/3/2022) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:22-md-03028-PAE, 1:22-cv-01808-PAE, 1:22-cv-02118-PAE, 1:22-cv-08094-PAE, 1:22-cv-08237-PAE (vfr)
November 4, 2022 CONSOLIDATED MDL CASE: Create association to 1:22-md-03028-PAE. (vfr)
November 3, 2022 Filing 11 THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against M/V One Apus, in rem, CHIDORI SHIP HOLDING LLC, JESSICA SHIP HOLDING S.A., NYK SHIPMANAGEMENT PTE LTD., OCEAN NETWORK EXPRESS PTE LTD, HMM Co. Ltd. f/k/a Hyundai Merchant Marine Co., Ltd, Logistics Cargo Concept, Inc..Document filed by Eagle Logistic Service Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Complaint, #2 Exhibit B: Answer, #3 Affidavit in Support of Rule B Attachment).(Nast, Timothy)
October 20, 2022 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint. Document filed by Eagle Logistic Service Inc...(Nast, Timothy)
October 20, 2022 Filing 9 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Eagle Logistic Service Inc...(Nast, Timothy)
October 20, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Timothy James Nast on behalf of Eagle Logistic Service Inc...(Nast, Timothy)
September 30, 2022 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Eagle Logistic Service Inc. served on 9/29/2022, answer due 10/20/2022. Service was accepted by Kyle Liu, authorized party/managing agent. Document filed by The Tokio Marine and Fire Insurance Co. (HK) Ltd...(O'Malley, Kevin)
September 29, 2022 Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (laq)
September 29, 2022 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (laq)
September 29, 2022 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:21-cv-07994-PAE-BCM. Notice of Assignment to follow. (laq)
September 28, 2022 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Eagle Logistic Service Inc.. (sj)
September 28, 2022 Case Designated ECF. (sj)
September 28, 2022 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. (sj)
September 27, 2022 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Eagle Logistic Service Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by The Tokio Marine and Fire Insurance Co. (HK) Ltd...(O'Malley, Kevin)
September 27, 2022 Filing 4 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 1:21-cv-07994. Document filed by The Tokio Marine and Fire Insurance Co. (HK) Ltd...(O'Malley, Kevin)
September 27, 2022 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Tokio Marine Asia Pte. Ltd. for The Tokio Marine and Fire Insurance Co. (HK) Ltd.. Document filed by The Tokio Marine and Fire Insurance Co. (HK) Ltd...(O'Malley, Kevin)
September 27, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(O'Malley, Kevin)
September 27, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Eagle Logistic Service Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-26737410)Document filed by The Tokio Marine and Fire Insurance Co. (HK) Ltd...(O'Malley, Kevin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Tokio Marine and Fire Insurance Co. (HK) Ltd. v. Eagle Logistic Service Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Tokio Marine and Fire Insurance Co. (HK) Ltd.
Represented By: Kevin John Byron O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eagle Logistic Service Inc.
Represented By: Timothy James Nast
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: JESSICA SHIP HOLDING S.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: M/V One Apus, in rem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: CHIDORI SHIP HOLDING LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: NYK SHIPMANAGEMENT PTE LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: OCEAN NETWORK EXPRESS PTE LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: HMM Co. Ltd. f/k/a Hyundai Merchant Marine Co., Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Logistics Cargo Concept, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?