Goldstein et al v. Hochul et al
Plaintiff: Steven Goldstein and Meir Ornstein
Defendant: Kathy Hochul, Letitia James, Keechant Sewell, Louis Falco, III, Eric Gonzalez and Thomas Walsh, II
Amicus Curiae: Everytown for Gun Safety
Case Number: 1:2022cv08300
Filed: September 29, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Vernon S Broderick
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2022 Filing 64 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 10/26/2022 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days....(Moya, Goretti)
November 15, 2022 Filing 63 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 10/28/2022 before Judge Vernon S. Broderick. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Kelly Surina, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 12/6/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/16/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/13/2023..(Moya, Goretti)
November 8, 2022 Filing 62 LETTER addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick from Ameer Benno dated Nov. 8, 2022 re: Plaintiffs' application for a preliminary injunction. Document filed by Steven Goldstein(and on behalf of Congregation Bnei Matisyahu), Steven Goldstein(individually ), Meir Ornstein. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Antonyuk v. Hochul Preliminary Injunction Decision).(Benno, Ameer)
November 4, 2022 Filing 61 LETTER addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick from Ameer Benno dated Nov. 4, 2022 re: Plaintiffs' application for a preliminary injunction. Document filed by Steven Goldstein(and on behalf of Congregation Bnei Matisyahu), Steven Goldstein(individually ), Meir Ornstein. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exh 1 (Hardaway Decision & Order), #2 Exhibit Exh 2 (Transcript of PI hearing)).(Benno, Ameer)
November 2, 2022 Filing 60 DECLARATION of Steven Goldstein in Support re: #58 Order,,,. Document filed by Steven Goldstein(and on behalf of Congregation Bnei Matisyahu), Steven Goldstein(individually ), Meir Ornstein. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exh 1 (Licenses)).(Benno, Ameer)
November 2, 2022 Filing 59 DECLARATION of Meir Ornstein in Support re: #58 Order,,,. Document filed by Steven Goldstein(and on behalf of Congregation Bnei Matisyahu), Steven Goldstein(individually ), Meir Ornstein. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exh 1 (licenses)).(Benno, Ameer)
October 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER re: #57 Order. It is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiffs submit supplemental declarations from the individual plaintiffs answering the questions contained in my October 27 Order and/or raised during the hearing today. If Defendants wish to reply to the supplemental declarations, they must file a letter explaining why they believe a sur-reply is necessary and appropriate. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs attach clear and legible copies of their firearm licenses to their supplemental declarations, including any firearms licenses from other states. To the extent that there is information that Plaintiffs believe should be redacted from the licenses, they should consult my individual rules regarding the procedures concerning redactions and filing under seal. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 10/31/2022) (kv)
October 28, 2022 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Vernon S. Broderick: Show Cause Hearing held on 10/28/2022. (Court Reporter Kelly Surina) (ldi)
October 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER re: #38 Response to Order to Show Cause filed by Kathy Hochul, Letitia James, #49 Reply Memorandum of Law in Support, filed by Steven Goldstein, Meir Ornstein, #37 Response to Order to Show Cause filed by Keechant Sewell, Eric Gonzalez. It is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiffs Goldstein and Ornstein provide the Court with copies of their New York firearm licenses. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties should be prepared to discuss, among other things, the following questions: as further set forth herein. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 10/27/2022) (kv)
October 27, 2022 Filing 56 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Patrick John Fischer on behalf of Louis Falco, III, Thomas Walsh, II..(Fischer, Patrick)
October 26, 2022 Filing 55 LETTER addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick from Cory Morris dated October 26, 2022 re: Proposed Order for Admittance of Electronic Devices for the October 28, 2022 Oral Argument. Document filed by Steven Goldstein(and on behalf of Congregation Bnei Matisyahu), Steven Goldstein(individually ), Meir Ornstein. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order).(Morris, Cory)
October 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER granting #48 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #48 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #8 Complaint addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick from Matthew L. Conrad dated October 21, 2022., #53 Letter,. APPLICATION GRANTED. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 10/24/2022) (tg)
October 24, 2022 Filing 53 LETTER addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick from Ameer Benno dated Oct. 24, 2022 re: Defendants' Request for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. Document filed by Steven Goldstein(and on behalf of Congregation Bnei Matisyahu), Steven Goldstein(individually ), Meir Ornstein..(Benno, Ameer)
October 24, 2022 Filing 52 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Order to Show Cause and Supporting Documents served on Letitia James on 10/11/22. Service was accepted by Jasmine Hughes. Document filed by Steven Goldstein(and on behalf of Congregation Bnei Matisyahu), Steven Goldstein(individually ), Meir Ornstein..(Benno, Ameer)
October 24, 2022 Filing 51 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Order to Show Cause and Supporting Documents served on Kathy Hochul on 10/11/22. Service was accepted by Megan Meyers. Document filed by Steven Goldstein(and on behalf of Congregation Bnei Matisyahu), Steven Goldstein(individually ), Meir Ornstein..(Benno, Ameer)
October 24, 2022 Filing 50 DECLARATION of Ameer Benno re: #49 Reply Memorandum of Law in Support, . Document filed by Steven Goldstein(and on behalf of Congregation Bnei Matisyahu), Steven Goldstein(individually ), Meir Ornstein. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exh 1 (Sponsor's Memo), #2 Exhibit Exh 2 (Hardaway v. Nigrelli), #3 Exhibit Exh 3 (Declaration of Joyce Lee Malcolm), #4 Exhibit Exh 4 (Georgia law), #5 Exhibit Exh 5 (Maryland law), #6 Exhibit Exh 6 (Massachusetts law), #7 Exhibit Exh 7 (South Carolina law), #8 Exhibit Exh 8 (Virginia law), #9 Exhibit Exh 9 (New Haven Colony law), #10 Exhibit Exh 10 (Plymouth Colony law)).(Benno, Ameer)
October 24, 2022 Filing 49 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #38 Response to Order to Show Cause, #39 Declaration in Opposition,,, #37 Response to Order to Show Cause, #5 Memorandum of Law in Support, #35 Response to Order to Show Cause . Document filed by Steven Goldstein(and on behalf of Congregation Bnei Matisyahu), Steven Goldstein(individually ), Meir Ornstein..(Benno, Ameer)
October 21, 2022 Filing 48 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #8 Complaint addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick from Matthew L. Conrad dated October 21, 2022. Document filed by Kathy Hochul, Letitia James..(Conrad, Matthew)
October 20, 2022 Filing 47 LETTER addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick from Ameer Benno dated Oct. 20, 2022 re: Hardaway v. Nigrelli, 22-CV-771 (JLS) (WDNY). Document filed by Steven Goldstein(and on behalf of Congregation Bnei Matisyahu), Steven Goldstein(individually ), Meir Ornstein..(Benno, Ameer)
October 20, 2022 Filing 46 BRIEF of Amicus Curiae. Document filed by Everytown for Gun Safety..(Taylor, William)
October 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER: granting #43 Letter Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Application Granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 10/19/2022) (ama)
October 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER: granting #41 Letter Motion to File Amicus Brief. Everytown for Gun Safety moves for leave to file an amicus curiae brief in this case in support of Defendants' response to the order to show cause and in opposition to Plaintiffs' motion for a preliminary injunction. Plaintiffs oppose this motion on the grounds of untimeliness. For the reasons stated below, this motion is GRANTED. On September 29, 2022, Plaintiffs filed this 42 U.S.C. 1983 action, moving for a temporary restraining order and preliminary injunction to enjoin Defendants from enforcing New York Penal Law 265.01-e(2)(c). I denied Plaintiffs' Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction on October 3, 2022, and ordered the parties to show cause at a hearing on October 28, 2022 as to why I should not issue an order pursuant to Rule 65 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure enjoining Defendants from enforcing Penal Law 265.01-e(2)(c) during the pendency of this action. (Doc. 21.) I further ordered that Defendants file their opposing papers by October 14, 2022, and Plaintiffs file their reply by October 21, 2022. Id. I take into consideration Petitioner's concern regarding the time they will have to respond to the amicus brief in their reply. Unfortunately, a hectic briefing schedule is unavoidable given the nature of temporary restraining orders and preliminary injunctions as extraordinary emergency injunctive relief. In light of Petitioner's concerns, I will adjourn the deadline for Petitioner to reply from October 21, 2014 to October 24, 2022. October 24, 2022 is six days from October 18, 2022, the day the proposed amicus brief was filed. Given that Plaintiff originally had a week to respond to Defendants' opposition, six days is a fair amount of time to for Plaintiffs' to respond to Defendants' opposition and the amicus brief. And as set forth herein. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 10/19/2022) (ama)
October 19, 2022 Set/Reset Deadlines: Replies due by 10/24/2022. (ama)
October 19, 2022 Filing 43 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick from Ameer Benno dated Oct. 19, 2022. Document filed by Steven Goldstein(and on behalf of Congregation Bnei Matisyahu), Steven Goldstein(individually ), Meir Ornstein..(Benno, Ameer)
October 18, 2022 Filing 42 LETTER RESPONSE to Motion addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick from Ameer Benno dated 10/18/22 re: #41 LETTER MOTION to File Amicus Brief addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick from William J. Taylor, Jr. dated October 18, 2022. . Document filed by Steven Goldstein(and on behalf of Congregation Bnei Matisyahu), Steven Goldstein(individually ), Meir Ornstein..(Benno, Ameer)
October 18, 2022 Filing 41 LETTER MOTION to File Amicus Brief addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick from William J. Taylor, Jr. dated October 18, 2022. Document filed by Everytown for Gun Safety. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Amicus Brief).(Taylor, William)
October 17, 2022 Filing 40 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Thomas Edward Humbach on behalf of Louis Falco, III, Thomas Walsh, II..(Humbach, Thomas)
October 14, 2022 Filing 39 DECLARATION of Patrick J. Charles in Opposition re: #21 Order to Show Cause,,,,, Set Deadlines,,,,. Document filed by Kathy Hochul, Letitia James. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Patrick J. Charles Resume, #2 Exhibit B - 1889 Wallace, Kansas Ordinance, #3 Exhibit C - 1882 Burlington, Kansas Ordinance, #4 Exhibit D - 1871 Abilene, Kansas Ordinance, #5 Exhibit E - 1873 Stanley Creek, North Carolina Law, #6 Exhibit F - 1872 Rock Spring, North Carolina Law, #7 Exhibit G - 1887 Stockton, Kansas Law, #8 Exhibit H - 1870 Ga. Laws 421, #9 Exhibit I - 1870 Tex. Gen. Laws 63, #10 Exhibit J - 1883 Mo. Laws 76, #11 Exhibit K - 1877 Va. Acts 305, #12 Exhibit L - 1889 Ariz. Sess. Laws 16, #13 Exhibit M - 1890 Okla. Stat. 495-96, #14 Exhibit N - State v. Reando (Mo. 1878)).(Conrad, Matthew)
October 14, 2022 Filing 38 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re: #21 Order to Show Cause,,,,, Set Deadlines,,,,. Document filed by Kathy Hochul, Letitia James..(Conrad, Matthew)
October 14, 2022 Filing 37 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re: #21 Order to Show Cause,,,,, Set Deadlines,,,,. Document filed by Eric Gonzalez, Keechant Sewell..(Ciappetta, Nicholas)
October 14, 2022 Filing 36 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Nicholas Robert Ciappetta on behalf of Eric Gonzalez, Keechant Sewell..(Ciappetta, Nicholas)
October 14, 2022 Filing 35 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re: #21 Order to Show Cause,,,,, Set Deadlines,,,,. Document filed by Louis Falco, III, Thomas Walsh, II..(Fischer, Patrick)
October 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER: granting #23 Letter Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Application Granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 10/13/2022) (ama)
October 12, 2022 Filing 33 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Order to Show Cause and Supporting Documents served on Thomas Walsh, II on 10/11/22. Service was accepted by Denise Serra. Document filed by Steven Goldstein(and on behalf of Congregation Bnei Matisyahu), Steven Goldstein(individually ), Meir Ornstein..(Benno, Ameer)
October 12, 2022 Filing 32 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Order to Show Cause and Supporting Documents served on Keechant Sewell on 10/11/22. Service was accepted by Georgia Bono. Document filed by Steven Goldstein(and on behalf of Congregation Bnei Matisyahu), Steven Goldstein(individually ), Meir Ornstein..(Benno, Ameer)
October 12, 2022 Filing 31 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Order to Show Cause and Supporting Documents served on Eric Gonzalez on 10/11/22. Service was accepted by Joanne F.. Document filed by Steven Goldstein(and on behalf of Congregation Bnei Matisyahu), Steven Goldstein(individually ), Meir Ornstein..(Benno, Ameer)
October 12, 2022 Filing 30 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Order to Show Cause and Supporting Documents served on Louis Falco, III on 10/11/22. Service was accepted by Robert VanCura. Document filed by Steven Goldstein(and on behalf of Congregation Bnei Matisyahu), Steven Goldstein(individually ), Meir Ornstein..(Benno, Ameer)
October 12, 2022 Filing 29 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Thomas Walsh, II served on 10/7/2022, answer due 10/28/2022. Service was accepted by Denise Serra. Document filed by Steven Goldstein(and on behalf of Congregation Bnei Matisyahu); Steven Goldstein(individually ); Meir Ornstein..(Benno, Ameer)
October 12, 2022 Filing 28 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Keechant Sewell served on 10/5/2022, answer due 10/26/2022. Service was accepted by Georgia Bono. Document filed by Steven Goldstein(and on behalf of Congregation Bnei Matisyahu); Steven Goldstein(individually ); Meir Ornstein..(Benno, Ameer)
October 12, 2022 Filing 27 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Letitia James served on 10/4/2022, answer due 10/25/2022. Service was accepted by Lorraine Wright. Document filed by Steven Goldstein(and on behalf of Congregation Bnei Matisyahu); Steven Goldstein(individually ); Meir Ornstein..(Benno, Ameer)
October 12, 2022 Filing 26 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Kathy Hochul served on 10/4/2022, answer due 10/25/2022. Service was accepted by Emma Muirhead. Document filed by Steven Goldstein(and on behalf of Congregation Bnei Matisyahu); Steven Goldstein(individually ); Meir Ornstein..(Benno, Ameer)
October 12, 2022 Filing 25 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Eric Gonzalez served on 10/5/2022, answer due 10/26/2022. Service was accepted by Joanne F.. Document filed by Steven Goldstein(and on behalf of Congregation Bnei Matisyahu); Steven Goldstein(individually ); Meir Ornstein..(Benno, Ameer)
October 12, 2022 Filing 24 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Louis Falco, III served on 10/7/2022, answer due 10/28/2022. Service was accepted by Officer Leonard. Document filed by Steven Goldstein(and on behalf of Congregation Bnei Matisyahu); Steven Goldstein(individually ); Meir Ornstein..(Benno, Ameer)
October 12, 2022 Filing 23 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick from Matthew L. Conrad dated October 12, 2022. Document filed by Kathy Hochul, Letitia James..(Conrad, Matthew)
October 12, 2022 Filing 22 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Matthew Lawrence Conrad on behalf of Kathy Hochul, Letitia James..(Conrad, Matthew)
October 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER: For these reasons, it is hereby: ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction is DENIED without prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the above named defendants show cause, at Room 518, United States Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, in the City, County and State of New York, on October 28, 2022 at 10:00 a.m., or as soon thereafter as counsel may be heard, why an order should not be issued pursuant to Rule 65 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure enjoining defendants during the pendency of this action from enforcing Penal Law 265.01-e(2)(c). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that to the extent that Defendants wish to file opposing papers, such papers be filed by October 14, 2022, and that Plaintiff's reply be filed by October 21, 2022. SO ORDERED. (Show Cause Hearing set for 10/28/2022 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 518, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Vernon S. Broderick.), ( Replies due by 10/21/2022.) Show Cause Response due by 10/14/2022. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 9/30/2022) (kv)
September 30, 2022 Filing 20 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Thomas Walsh, II..(jgo)
September 30, 2022 Filing 19 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Louis Falco, III..(jgo)
September 30, 2022 Filing 18 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Letitia James..(jgo)
September 30, 2022 Filing 17 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Keechant Sewell..(jgo)
September 30, 2022 Filing 16 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Kathy Hochul..(jgo)
September 30, 2022 Filing 15 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Eric Gonzalez..(jgo)
September 30, 2022 Filing 14 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Thomas Walsh, II, re: #8 Complaint. Document filed by Steven Goldstein(and on behalf of Congregation Bnei Matisyahu), Steven Goldstein(individually ), Meir Ornstein..(Benno, Ameer)
September 30, 2022 Filing 13 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Eric Gonzalez, re: #8 Complaint. Document filed by Steven Goldstein(and on behalf of Congregation Bnei Matisyahu), Steven Goldstein(individually ), Meir Ornstein..(Benno, Ameer)
September 30, 2022 Filing 12 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Louis Falco, III, re: #8 Complaint. Document filed by Steven Goldstein(and on behalf of Congregation Bnei Matisyahu), Steven Goldstein(individually ), Meir Ornstein..(Benno, Ameer)
September 30, 2022 Filing 11 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Keechant Sewell, re: #8 Complaint. Document filed by Steven Goldstein(and on behalf of Congregation Bnei Matisyahu), Steven Goldstein(individually ), Meir Ornstein..(Benno, Ameer)
September 30, 2022 Filing 10 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Letitia James, re: #8 Complaint. Document filed by Steven Goldstein(and on behalf of Congregation Bnei Matisyahu), Steven Goldstein(individually ), Meir Ornstein..(Benno, Ameer)
September 30, 2022 Filing 9 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Kathy Hochul, re: #8 Complaint. Document filed by Steven Goldstein(and on behalf of Congregation Bnei Matisyahu), Steven Goldstein(individually ), Meir Ornstein..(Benno, Ameer)
September 29, 2022 Filing 8 COMPLAINT against Louis Falco, III, Eric Gonzalez, Kathy Hochul, Letitia James, Keechant Sewell, Thomas Walsh, II. Document filed by Steven Goldstein, Meir Ornstein, Steven Goldstein..(Benno, Ameer)
September 29, 2022 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Ameer Benno re: #4 Proposed Order to Show Cause With Emergency Relief, Rule 65 Certification. Document filed by Congregation Bnei Matisyahu, Steven Goldstein, Meir Ornstein..(Benno, Ameer)
September 29, 2022 Filing 6 DECLARATION of Ameer Benno re: #4 Proposed Order to Show Cause With Emergency Relief, . Document filed by Congregation Bnei Matisyahu, Steven Goldstein, Meir Ornstein. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Verified Complaint, #2 Exhibit ADL Audit Report, #3 Exhibit Goldstein Declaration, #4 Exhibit Ornstein Declaration, #5 Exhibit Rabbi Rubin Declaration).(Benno, Ameer)
September 29, 2022 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #4 Proposed Order to Show Cause With Emergency Relief, . Document filed by Congregation Bnei Matisyahu, Steven Goldstein, Meir Ornstein..(Benno, Ameer)
September 29, 2022 Filing 4 PROPOSED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WITH EMERGENCY RELIEF. Document filed by Congregation Bnei Matisyahu, Steven Goldstein, Meir Ornstein..(Benno, Ameer) Proposed Order to Show Cause to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Modified on 9/29/2022 (km).
September 29, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Cory Morris on behalf of Congregation Bnei Matisyahu, Steven Goldstein, Meir Ornstein..(Morris, Cory)
September 29, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Benno, Ameer)
September 29, 2022 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILER ERROR - COMPLAINT against Louis Falco, III, Eric Gonzalez, Kathy Hochul, Letitia James, Keechant Sewell, Thomas Walsh, II. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-26747748)Document filed by Steven Goldstein, Meir Ornstein, Congregation Bnei Matisyahu..(Benno, Ameer) Modified on 9/29/2022 (vf).
September 29, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Ameer N. Benno. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Louis Falco, III, Eric Gonzalez, Kathy Hochul, Letitia James, Keechant Sewell, Thomas Walsh, II, Steven Goldstein. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted. (vf)
September 29, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Ameer N. Benno. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code New York. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to Kings. (vf)
September 29, 2022 Case Designated ECF. (vf)
September 29, 2022 ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WITH EMERGENCY RELIEF. Document No. #4 Proposed Order to Show Cause With Emergency Relief was reviewed and approved as to form. (km)
September 29, 2022 Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vf)
September 29, 2022 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Vernon S. Broderick. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vf)
September 29, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Ameer N. Benno to RE-FILE re: Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all of the parties listed on the pleading were not entered on CM ECF; Add party Steven Goldstein with party text "and on behalf of Congregation Bnei Matisyahu"; wrong filer/filers were selected for the pleading. Docket the event type Add Party to Pleading found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (vf)
September 29, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING REMOVAL OF PARTY. Notice to attorney Ameer N. Benno. The following party/parties has been removed from this case: Congregation Bnei Matisyahu. The party was added to the case in error. (vf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Goldstein et al v. Hochul et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Goldstein
Represented By: Cory Morris
Represented By: Ameer N. Benno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Meir Ornstein
Represented By: Cory Morris
Represented By: Ameer N. Benno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathy Hochul
Represented By: Matthew Lawrence Conrad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Letitia James
Represented By: Matthew Lawrence Conrad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keechant Sewell
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Ciappetta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louis Falco, III
Represented By: Thomas Edward Humbach
Represented By: Patrick John Fischer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Gonzalez
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Ciappetta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Walsh, II
Represented By: Thomas Edward Humbach
Represented By: Patrick John Fischer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Everytown for Gun Safety
Represented By: William James Taylor, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?