Royal Borough of Kensington and Chelsea v. Tara Bafna-Louis
Petitioner: Royal Borough of Kensington and Chelsea and Michael S. Pascazi, ESQ.
Respondent: Tara Banfa-Louis, Talia Becker, Talia Louis, Tara Becker, Tara Maynard, Taliya Becker, and and Tara Bafna-Louis
Interested Party: CB-L
Case Number: 1:2022cv08303
Filed: September 29, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: P Kevin Castel
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 5, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 112 NOTICE OF PRO SE APPEARANCE by Tara Bafna-Louis. (sc)
October 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 111 APPLICATION, Re: for the Court to Request Pro Bono Counsel. Document filed by Tara Bafna-Louis.(sc)
June 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER of USCA (Certified Copy) as to #96 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal filed by Tara Bafna-Louis USCA Case Number 23-0470. Appellant, through counsel, moves for a stay pending appeal of the district court's return order under the Hague Convention on the Civil Aspects of International Child Abduction (the "Hague Convention"). Appellant also moves to seal certain exhibits and redact certain personal information in the filings. Appellee does not oppose the motion to seal. Upon due consideration, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion for a stay of return pending appeal is GRANTED. See In re World Trade Ctr. Disaster Site Litig., 503 F.3d 167, 170 (2d Cir. 2007). We are aware that the Supreme Court generally disfavors the granting of stays in the context of Hague Convention litigation, and that "the Hague Convention... stress[es] the importance of the prompt return of children wrongfully removed or retained." Chafin v. Chafin, 568 U.S. 165, 178 (2013). We note, however, that this is an unusual case insofar as it does not appear to involve a request for family reunification and also insofar as it potentially raises difficult questions under the law of the United Kingdom concerning custody, the answers to which are not apparent on the record presently before the panel. We further note that the appeal in this case has been expedited. It is further ORDERED that Appellant's motion to seal is GRANTED. Catherine O'Hagan Wolfe, Clerk USCA for the Second Circuit. Certified: 6/28/2023..(tp)
June 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER: Based on the foregoing, the respondent's application for a stay is DENIED. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 6/13/2023) (ama)
June 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 108 LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Stephen J. Cullen dated June 12, 2023 re: RBKC's Response to Respondent's June 6, 2023 Pre-Motion Letter. Document filed by Royal Borough of Kensington and Chelsea..(Cullen, Stephen)
June 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 107 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #105 Letter filed by Michael S. Pascazi, ESQ.. ENDORSEMENT: Mr. Pascazi's application to withdraw is GRANTED. SO ORDERED. Attorney Michael Salvatore Pascazi terminated. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 6/7/2023) (tg)
June 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 106 LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Valdi Licul dated June 7, 2023 re: Pre-Motion Conference for Stay of Return Order. Document filed by Tara Bafna-Louis..(Licul, Valdi)
June 7, 2023 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - EVENT TYPE ERROR. Notice to Attorney Valdi Licul to RE-FILE Document #104 LETTER MOTION for Conference addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Valdi Licul dated June 6, 2023.. Use the event type Other Filings- Other Documents found under the event list Letter. (kj)
June 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 105 LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Michael S. Pascazi dated June 6, 2023 re: Grant Attorney Pascazi's Fully Submitted Motion to Withdraw as Unopposed. Document filed by Michael S. Pascazi, ESQ...(Pascazi, Michael)
June 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 104 FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - LETTER MOTION for Conference addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Valdi Licul dated June 6, 2023. Document filed by Tara Bafna-Louis..(Licul, Valdi) Modified on 6/7/2023 (kj).
June 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 103 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by John S. Crain on behalf of Tara Bafna-Louis..(Crain, John)
June 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 102 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Valdi Licul on behalf of Tara Bafna-Louis..(Licul, Valdi)
May 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 101 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of OTSC with Supporting Papers served on Tara Bafna-Louis a/k/a Talia Becker on 05/04/2023. Service was made by U.S. Express Mail for Overnight Delivery. Document filed by Michael S. Pascazi, ESQ...(Pascazi, Michael)
May 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER of USCA (Certified Copy) as to #96 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal filed by Tara Bafna-Louis USCA Case Number 23-0470. Appellant, pro se and fee paid, moves for appointment of pro bono counsel and for a stay of the district court's return order under the Hague Convention on the Civil Aspects of International Child Abduction (the "Hague Convention"). Appellee opposes the motion and cross moves to expedite the appeal. Upon due consideration, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion for appointment of counsel is GRANTED. See 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(1); Cooper v. A. Sargenti Co., 877 F.2d 170, 17274 (2d Cir. 1989) (per curiam). Counsel shall be appointed from the pro bono panel and shall represent the Appellant through this Court's determination of the merits. Appointed counsel shall brief, among any other issues supported by the record, whether: (1) the district court erred by holding that Baby L was a habitual resident of the United Kingdom at the time of Baby L's removal from the United Kingdom; (2) the district court erred by holding that the Appellee had rights of custody over Baby L at the time of Baby L's removal from the United Kingdom; and (3) the district court erred by holding that Appellant had failed to establish, with clear and convincing evidence, an affirmative defense under Article 13(b) of the Hague Convention.It is further ORDERED that the motion for a stay of return pending appeal is DENIED without prejudice to renewal upon compliance with Fed. R. App. P. 8(a). See Agudath Isr. of Am. v. Cuomo, 980 F.3d 222, 225 (2d Cir. 2020) (per curiam) (denying an injunction pending appeal where the movants did not first move for an injunction pending appeal in the district court and did not justify that failure). Nevertheless, it is further ORDERED sua sponte that the return order shall be temporarily stayed for 60 days following the entry of this order. See Fed. R. App. P. 2 (providing that the Court may suspend any provision of the Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure in a particular case "to expedite its decision or for other good cause" shown). The purpose of the stay is to provide the Court with time to locate and appoint pro bono counsel, to provide pro bono counsel reasonable time to comply with Rule 8(a) and to prepare a stay motion, and for the district court and this Court to consider that presumed renewed motion for a stay pending appeal. It is further ORDERED that Appellee's cross-motion to expedite the appeal is GRANTED. See Fed. R. App. P. 2. After pro bono counsel is appointed, the Clerk of Court is directed to enter an expedited schedule for merits briefing, in consultation with counsel for both parties, and to calendar this appeal for the first available panel after the appeal is fully briefed. Catherine O'Hagan Wolfe, Clerk USCA for the Second Circuit. Certified: 5/2/2023. (tp)
May 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: It is hereby ORDERED that Tara Bafna-Louis a/k/a Talia Becker, Respondent and Petitioner show cause before this Court in writing filed on ECF on or before, 12th day of May, 2023 it is further ORDERED and that papers in opposition, if any, be filed, and served upon Pascazi Law Offices PLLC, Michael S. Pascazi, Esq., of Counsel, by ECF, no later than May 10, 2023.ORDERED that no personal appearance are permitted on this motion. Show Cause Response due by 5/12/2023. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 5/02/2023) (ama)
May 2, 2023 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WITH EMERGENCY RELIEF. Document No. #98 Proposed Order to Show Cause With Emergency Relief was reviewed and approved as to form. (km)
May 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 98 PROPOSED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WITH EMERGENCY RELIEF. Document filed by Michael S. Pascazi, ESQ.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration in Support of Michael S. Pascazi, #2 Exhibit Ex A Consent to Change Attorney Given by Respondent, #3 Exhibit Ex B Letter of Engagement Agreement re Hague Abduction Convention Case, #4 Exhibit Ex C Becker Statement of Financial Account 031423).(Pascazi, Michael) Proposed Order to Show Cause to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
April 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 97 LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Michael S. Pascazi dated April 30, 2023 re: Mother Elects to Return to England With Baby L. Document filed by Tara Bafna-Louis..(Pascazi, Michael)
March 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 96 NOTICE OF INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL from #95 Order. Document filed by Tara Bafna-Louis. Filing fee $ 505.00, receipt number 14458..(nd)
March 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Certified Copy of Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re: #96 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal..(nd)
March 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Appeal Record Sent to USCA (Electronic File). Certified Indexed record on Appeal Electronic Files for #96 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal filed by Tara Bafna-Louis were transmitted to the U.S. Court of Appeals..(nd)
March 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 95 RETURN ORDER: ORDERED, that Baby L, who is identified in the Petition as LCJB and was born in 2021, shall be returned to London, England on Wednesday, May 17, 2023 in the care and company of the Respondent, Tara Bafna-Louis (a/k/a Talia Becker) (the "Mother"), subject to the conditions and restrictions set f01ih in Paragraphs 2-10 below; and it is further ORDERED, that the Mother shall return Baby L to London, England on a nonstop flight departing on Tuesday, May 16, 2023 from John F. Kennedy International Airpo1t ("JFK") in New York and arriving at London Heathrow Airport ("LHR") on Wednesday, May 17, 2023; and it is further ORDERED, that the Mother shall promptly and timely take all steps necessary toobtain any and all necessary travel documents, including but not limited to any necessary new or replacement passports and visas, for her own travel and for Baby L's travel to England. The Mother shall comply with the terms of this Paragraph 3, even if she elects not to return to England herself with Baby L, in accordance with Paragraphs 6 and 7 below. ORDERED, that the Mother, through her counsel of record in this matter, shall provide a complete copy of the airline ticket booking and payment confirmation (for her own and Baby L's travel to England) to Petitioner's counsel of record in this matter via email, on or before Monday, May 1, 2023 at 5:00 p.m. EDT; and it is further ORDERED, that the Mother, through her counsel of record in this matter, shall provide to Petitioner's counsel of record in this matter via email color copies of all pages of the passports, visas, and other travel documents she will use for her own travel and for Baby L's travel, on or before Monday, May 1, 2023 at 5:00 p.m. EDT. To the extent the Mother already has in her possession, custody and control any such passports, visas, and other travel documents, the requiredemail (with the required copies attached as an exhibit) shall be sent within 72 hours of entry and service of this Return Order; and it is further ORDERED, that if the Mother elects not to return to England with Baby L, she shall, through her counsel of record in this matter, so notify this Court and all other counsel of record in this matter by filing a letter through the Court's CM/ECF system on or before Monday, May 1, 2023 at 5:00 p.m.; and it is further ORDERED, that if the Mother elects not to return to England with Baby L, the following provisions, conditions, and restrictions shall apply to Baby L's return to England: and as set forth herein. ORDERED, THAT THIS ORDER IS BINDING ON THE PARTIES, THEIR OFFICERS, AGENTS, SERVANTS, EMPLOYEES, ATTORNEYS, AND THOSE WHO ARE IN ACTIVE CONCERT AND PARTICIPATION WITH THEM. ANY VIOLATION OF THIS ORDER IS PUNISHABLE AS CONTEMPT OF COURT. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 3/21/2023) (ama)
March 20, 2023 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED ORDER. Document No. #94 Proposed Order was reviewed and approved as to form. (nd)
March 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 94 PROPOSED ORDER. Document filed by Tara Bafna-Louis. Related Document Number: #87 ..(Pascazi, Michael) Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
March 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 93 MEMO ENDORSEMENT: on re: #90 Letter filed by Tara Bafna-Louis. ENDORSEMENT: Application GRANTED. The Order of January 26, 2023 is vacated as to CB-L only.SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 3/17/2023) (ama)
March 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 92 LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Stephen Cullen dated March 17, 2023 re: Response re CB-L Ne Exeat Modification Request. Document filed by Royal Borough of Kensington and Chelsea..(Cullen, Stephen)
March 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 91 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #90 Letter, filed by Tara Bafna-Louis. ENDORSEMENT: Petitioner is directed to respond to the application by March 17, 2023. SO ORDERED. (Responses due by 3/17/2023) (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 3/14/2023) (kv)
March 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 90 LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Michael S. Pascazi dated March 14, 2023 re: Vacate Extant Ne Exeat Order Restraining CB-L Given the Court's Opinion and Order Denying Removal of CB-L from the USA. Document filed by Tara Banfa-Louis..(Pascazi, Michael)
March 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 89 MOTION Second Motion to Correct Typographical Error in Case Caption . Document filed by Royal Borough of Kensington and Chelsea. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order to Correct Case Caption).(Powers, Kelly)
March 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 88 NOTICE of Filing Petitioner's Proposed Return Order. Document filed by Royal Borough of Kensington and Chelsea. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Petitioner's Proposed Return Order).(Powers, Kelly)
March 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 87 OPINION, FINDINGS OF FACT, CONCLUSIONS OF LAW, AND ORDER re: #78 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Post-Trial Brief. addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Amelia T.R. Starr dated February 17, 2023 filed by CB-L. The Petition is GRANTED as to Baby L, who is identified in the Petition as LCJB. Based on the age and degree of maturity of CBL, the Court exercises the discretion afforded to it under Article 13 of the Hague Convention, defers to CBL's objections, and declines to order his return. The Petition is therefore DENIED as to CBL.The Clerk is respectfully directed to terminate the letter-motion at ECF 78.Within seven days of this Opinion and Order, the RBKC shall file a proposed Order for the return of Baby L to the United Kingdom. Bafna-Louis may file a response within five days of the filing of the RBKC's proposed Order. Because of the time sensitivity of this matter, the Court does not anticipate extending these time periods. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 3/07/2023) (ama)
February 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 86 POST TRIAL MEMORANDUM. Document filed by CB-L..(Starr, Amelia)
February 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER: granting #84 Letter Motion to Seal. The Clerk is directed to seal the Post-Trial Brief (ECF 78-1) and terminate the letter motion to seal (ECF 84). Counsel for CB-L shall file a redacted brief within 5 days. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 2/23/2023) (ama)
February 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 84 LETTER MOTION to Seal Document #78 addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Amelia T.R. Starr dated February 22, 2023. Document filed by CB-L..(Starr, Amelia)
February 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 83 LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Kelly A. Powers dated 2/20/2023 re: Withdrawing Objection to the Filing of CB-L's Post-Trial Brief. Document filed by Royal Borough of Kensington and Chelsea..(Powers, Kelly)
February 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 82 PROPOSED FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW. Document filed by Royal Borough of Kensington and Chelsea..(Powers, Kelly)
February 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 81 POST TRIAL MEMORANDUM. Document filed by Tara Banfa-Louis..(Pascazi, Michael)
February 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 80 POST TRIAL MEMORANDUM. Document filed by Royal Borough of Kensington and Chelsea..(Powers, Kelly)
February 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 79 LETTER RESPONSE in Support of Motion addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Michael S. Pascazi dated February 17, 2023 re: #78 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Post-Trial Brief addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Amelia T.R. Starr dated February 17, 2023. Respondent Consents to CB-L's Submission of a Post Trial Brief. Document filed by Tara Banfa-Louis..(Pascazi, Michael)
February 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 78 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Post-Trial Brief addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Amelia T.R. Starr dated February 17, 2023. Document filed by CB-L. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Post-Trial Brief).(Starr, Amelia)
February 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 77 LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Kelly A. Powers dated 2/16/2023 re: Pre-Motion Letter Regarding Respondent's Exhibit R51 (Doc. Nos. 68, 76). Document filed by Royal Borough of Kensington and Chelsea. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Email Correspondence Between Counsel).(Powers, Kelly)
February 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 76 RESPONSE to Discovery Request from Expert Witness Disclosure.Document filed by Tara Banfa-Louis..(Pascazi, Michael)
February 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 75 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a HEARING proceeding held on 1/25/2023 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days....(McGuirk, Kelly)
February 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 74 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: HEARING held on 1/25/2023 before Judge P. Kevin Castel. Court Reporter/Transcriber: George Malinowski, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/6/2023. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/16/2023. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/15/2023..(McGuirk, Kelly)
February 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 73 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a HEARING proceeding held on 1/24/2023 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days....(McGuirk, Kelly)
February 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 72 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: HEARING held on 1/24/2023 before Judge P. Kevin Castel. Court Reporter/Transcriber: George Malinowski, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/6/2023. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/16/2023. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/15/2023..(McGuirk, Kelly)
February 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 71 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a HEARING proceeding held on 1/23/2023 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days....(McGuirk, Kelly)
February 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 70 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: HEARING held on 1/23/2023 before Judge P. Kevin Castel. Court Reporter/Transcriber: George Malinowski, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/6/2023. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/16/2023. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/15/2023..(McGuirk, Kelly)
February 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL: granting #67 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Upon consideration of the Motion to Withdraw Joel L. Perrell Jr. as Counsel of Record, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED and Mr. Perrell is hereby withdrawn as counsel of record for the Petitioner. Attorney Joel L Perrell, Jr terminated. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 2/01/2023) (ama)
January 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 68 Exhibit List Respondent's Post Trial. Document filed by Tara Banfa-Louis..(Pascazi, Michael)
January 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 67 MOTION for Joel L. Perrell Jr. to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by Royal Borough of Kensington and Chelsea. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order).(Perrell, Joel)
January 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 66 Exhibit List Petitioner's Post-Trial Exhibit List. Document filed by Royal Borough of Kensington and Chelsea..(Powers, Kelly)
January 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER: Upon consideration of the Petitioner's oral ne exeat motion, made in open court on Wednesday, January 25, 2023, and without objection from the Respondent or Counsel for CB-L, it is hereby ORDERED, in accordance with 22 U.S.C. 9004, that the Respondent, Tara BafuaLouis, also known as Talia Becker, and also known from time to time by the names set forth above in the caption, be and hereby is PROHIBITED from removing the children CB-L and Baby-L, or causing the removal of the children CB-Land Baby-L, from the State of New York, before the final disposition of this case or further order of this Court. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 1/26/2023) (ama)
January 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 64 PROPOSED ORDER. Document filed by Royal Borough of Kensington and Chelsea..(Cullen, Stephen) Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
January 26, 2023 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED ORDER. Document No. #64 Proposed Order was reviewed and approved as to form. (km)
January 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge P. Kevin Castel: Evidentiary Hearing held on 1/25/2023. Appearing for Petitioner, Stephen Cullen and Kelly Powers. Also appearing Amelia Starr and Dara Sheinfeld. Appearing for Respondent, Michael Pascazi and Marykate Pascazi- Carrozza. Testimony of Tara Banfa-Louis continues. Testimony of James A. Moody. Respondent rests. The parties may submit post-trial briefing and proposed findings of fact and conclusions of law no later than February 17, 2023. Post-trial briefs shall not exceed 35 pages. Petitioner shall submit a proposed written order barring the removal of CBL and Baby L from the State of New York, pending final adjudication of this case. (Court Reporter George Malinowski) (Nacanther, Florence)
January 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER: granting #62 Letter Motion to Seal. Application Granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 1/24/2023) (ama)
January 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 62 LETTER MOTION to Seal Petitioner's Exhibit 18 addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Amelia T.R. Starr dated January 24, 2023. Document filed by CB-L..(Starr, Amelia)
January 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 61 NOTICE of of Filing. Document filed by Royal Borough of Kensington and Chelsea. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Oath of Jennifer Bastock, #2 Exhibit Oath of Nicola Shanks).(Powers, Kelly)
January 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER granting #57 Motion for Marykate F. Pascazi-Carrozza to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge P. Kevin Castel)(Text Only Order) (Nacanther, Florence)
January 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 59 NOTICE of of Filing of Second Declaration of Phil Haywood. Document filed by Royal Borough of Kensington and Chelsea. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Phil Haywood, #2 Exhibit A - Supplemental Opinion).(Powers, Kelly)
January 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 58 PRETRIAL MEMORANDUM. Document filed by Tara Banfa-Louis..(Pascazi, Michael)
January 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 57 MOTION for Marykate F. Pascazi-Carrozza to Appear Pro Hac Vice as Associate Trial Counsel for Respondent. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-27232723. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Tara Banfa-Louis. Return Date set for 1/23/2023 at 11:00 AM. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing DC Bar, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Pro Hac Vice Order).(Pascazi, Michael)
January 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 56 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #52 Letter filed by Michael S. Pascazi, ESQ. ENDORSEMENT: Motion deemed withdrawn. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 1/19/2023) (rro)
January 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER: As a cautionary matter, the Court Orders as follows: Respondent is directed to refrain from making any threats to counsel for non-party CB-L, directly or indirectly. Any communication by respondent with counsel for non-party CB-L shall be made by and through her counsel of record in this case. By reason of Rule 4(a) of the New York Rules of Professional Conduct, generally prohibiting communications by a lawyer with a represented party about the subject of the representation, silence by counsel to non-party CB-L in response to any communication by respondent, including the email of January 17, 2023, shall not be deemed to be acquiescence in any statement or position therein. Neither respondent nor respondent's counsel shall communicate, directly or indirectly, with non-party CB-L concerning the subject matter of this proceeding unless CB-L's counsel is present. The Court's Order of January 17, 2023 adequately sets forth the contemplated role of counsel for non-party CB-L. Counsel for respondent shall furnish a copy of this Order to his client. The letter of counsel for non-party CB-L, dated January 18, 2023 (ECF 49) shall be SEALED by the Clerk. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 1/19/2023) (rro)
January 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 54 LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Amelia T.R. Starr dated January 18, 2023 re: Scope of Role of Child's Attorney. Document filed by CB-L. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Email from Talia Becker a/k/a Tara Banfa-Luis to Davis Polk & Wardwell LLP dated January 17, 2023).(Starr, Amelia)
January 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER granting #50 Letter Motion to Seal. Application Granted. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 1/19/2023) (rro)
January 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 52 LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Michael S. Pascazi, Movant dated January 19, 2023 re: Withdrawing Pending Application of Respondent's Counsel to Withdraw. Document filed by Michael S. Pascazi, ESQ...(Pascazi, Michael)
January 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 51 FILING ERROR - ELECTRONIC FILING OF NON-ECF DOCUMENT - PROPOSED ORDER. Document filed by Royal Borough of Kensington and Chelsea. Related Document Number: [(Personal Electronic Devices - Petitioner's Counsel)]..(Powers, Kelly) Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Modified on 1/19/2023 (km).
January 19, 2023 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING REJECTION OF PROPOSED ORDER TO BRING PERSONAL ELECTRONIC DEVICE(S) OR GENERAL PURPOSE COMPUTING DEVICE(S) INTO THE COURTHOUSES OF THE SDNY FOR USE IN A PROCEEDING OR TRIAL. Notice to Attorney Kelly Powers re: Document #51 Proposed Order, was rejected by the Clerk's Office for the following reason, the Order to Bring Personal Electronic Device(s) or General Purpose Computing Device(s) Into the Courthouses of the SDNY for Use in a Proceeding or Trial should not be electronically filed. Please download and review the Local Rules, Judge's Individual Rules of Practice and ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions. (km)
January 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 50 LETTER MOTION to Seal Document #49 addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Ameila T.R. Starr dated January 18, 2023. Document filed by CB-L..(Starr, Amelia)
January 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 49 LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Amelia T.R. Starr dated January 18, 2023 re: Scope of Role of Child's Attorney. Document filed by CB-L. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Email from Talia Becker a/k/a Tara Banfa-Luis to Davis Polk & Wardwell LLP dated January 17, 2023).(Starr, Amelia)
January 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER: Application for the Court to direct CB-L's counsel and to adjourn the hearing is DENIED. And as set forth herein. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 1/17/2023) (ama)
January 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 47 LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Michael S. Pascazi dated January 16, 2023 re: CB-L's Counsel Informed Petitioner's Counsel that CB-L's Counsel is Not Planning on Appearing at nor Participating in Trial. Document filed by Tara Banfa-Louis..(Pascazi, Michael)
January 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 46 NOTICE of Raising Issues of Foreign Law. Document filed by Tara Banfa-Louis..(Pascazi, Michael)
January 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 45 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of OTSC with Supporting Papers served on Talia Becker on 01/13/2023. Service was made by U.S. Express Mail. Document filed by Michael S. Pascazi, ESQ...(Pascazi, Michael)
January 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Upon the annexed Declaration is Support of Michael S. Pascazi ESQ., with Exhibits, and received in Chambers on January 12, 2023 at 4:13 p.m. of the papers all of the papers and proceeding herein before had, it is hereby: ORDERED that Tara Banfa-Louis a/k/a Talia Becker, Respondent, show cause before this Court on written submission emailed to CastlelNYSDChambers@nysd.uscourts.gov by January 19, 2023 at 5:00 p.m. ORDERED that there is no stay of the January 23 proceeding and pending further order Michael S. Pascazi remain counsel of record. Upon receipt of Respondent's submission due on or before 5 p.m. on January 19, 2023, the Court will docket the response thereby causing it to be served on all counsel. Any reply is due by 9 a.m. on January 23, 2023. Show Cause Response due by 1/19/2023. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 1/12/2023) (ama)
January 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 43 PROPOSED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WITH EMERGENCY RELIEF. Document filed by Michael S. Pascazi, ESQ.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration in Support, #2 Exhibit Ex A LoEA First Engagement, #3 Exhibit Ex B LoEA Current Engagement, #4 Exhibit Ex C Statement of Accounting First Engagement, #5 Exhibit Ex D Retainer Replenishment Letter).(Pascazi, Michael) Proposed Order to Show Cause to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
January 12, 2023 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WITH EMERGENCY RELIEF. Document No. #43 Proposed Order to Show Cause With Emergency Relief was reviewed and approved as to form. (km)
January 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 42 TRIAL BRIEF . Document filed by Royal Borough of Kensington and Chelsea..(Powers, Kelly)
December 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 41 MEMO ENDORSEMENT: on re: #39 Letter filed by Tara Banfa-Louis, Set Deadlines/Hearing as to #39 Letter. ENDORSEMENT: Commencement of the hearing is adjourned to January 23, 2023 at 11 a.m. Petitioner's pre-hearing brief shall be submitted by 1/5/2023. Respondent's pre-hearing brief shall be submitted by 1/12/2023. SO ORDERED.( Motion Hearing set for 1/23/2023 at 11:00 AM before Judge P. Kevin Castel.) (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 12/28/2022) (ama)
December 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 40 MEMO ENDORSEMENT: on re: #34 Letter filed by Tara Banfa-Louis. ENDORSEMENT: For good cause compelling circumstances, The Court will allow Messirs Dempsey and Piggott to testify remotely subject to the conditions set forth in the Opinion and Order of December 16, 2022 (Doc. 30). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 12/23/2022) (ama)
December 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Motions due by 1/12/2023. (ama)
December 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 39 CONSENT LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Michael S. Pascazi dated December 27, 2022 re: Adjournment of Start of Hearing by Two Weeks to January 23, 2023. Document filed by Tara Banfa-Louis..(Pascazi, Michael)
December 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 38 CONSENT LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Petitioner dated December 27, 2022 re: Response to Respondent's Pre-Motion Letter Regarding Video Testimony of Respondent's UK Fact Witnesses. Document filed by Royal Borough of Kensington and Chelsea..(Cullen, Stephen)
December 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 37 NOTICE of of Intention to Offer Evidence of Foreign Law (Federal Rule 44.1). Document filed by Royal Borough of Kensington and Chelsea..(Powers, Kelly)
December 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 36 NOTICE of Filing of Declaration of Phil Haywood (UK Immigration Law). Document filed by Royal Borough of Kensington and Chelsea. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Phil Haywood (UK Immigration Law), #2 Exhibit A - British Nationality Act 1981, Part 1, Sections 1 and 3, #3 Exhibit B - Immigration Rules - Appendix FM, #4 Exhibit C - British Nationality Act 1981, Part 1, Sections 1 and 3, #5 Exhibit D - EU Directive, #6 Exhibit E - Cases Cited in Paragraph 84, #7 Exhibit F - Case Cited in Paragraph 86, #8 Exhibit G - Case Cited in Paragraph 88, #9 Exhibit H - Borders, Citizenship and Immigration Act 2009, Section 55, #10 Exhibit I - Case Cited in Paragraph 89).(Powers, Kelly)
December 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 35 NOTICE of Filing of Second Affidavit of English Law. Document filed by Royal Borough of Kensington and Chelsea. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit - Second Affidavit of English Law (Simon Craddock, Solicitor), #2 Exhibit A - March 10, 2022 Prohibited Steps Order, #3 Exhibit B - Child Abduction Act 1984 - Part 1, Sections 1 and 3, #4 Exhibit C - Children Act 1989, Part 1, Sections 2 and 4, #5 Exhibit D - November 15, 2022 Order, #6 Exhibit E - Case Cited By English Court in November 15, 2022 Order).(Powers, Kelly)
December 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 34 LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Michael S. Pascazi dated December 23, 2022 re: Pre Motion Letter Regarding Authorization of Remote Video Testimony. Document filed by Tara Banfa-Louis..(Pascazi, Michael)
December 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER: Petitioner seeks the return of two children under the Convention on the Civil Aspects of International Child Abduction and the International Child Abduction Remedies Act, 22 U.S.C. 9001 et seq. Petitioner alleges that the two children are wards of the English High Court and were wrongfully removed by respondent in violation of Court orders. The petitioner and respondent are both represented by counsel. The Court hereby appoints Dara L. Sheinfeld and Amelia T. R. Starr of Davis Polk & Wardwell LLP, 450 Lexington Avenue, New York, NY 10017, as attorneys for non-party CB-L, a 13-year old child, one of the two children who is the subject of the petition. Ms. Sheinfeld and Ms. Starr have graciously agreed to serve as counsel pro bono publico. Any other lawyer designated by Ms. Sheinfeld or Ms. Starr may file an appearance as well. The hearing is scheduled for January 9, 2023 in Courtroom 11D. A written submission is neither required nor prohibited. Counsel for petitioner and respondent shall cooperate in any request by CB-L's attorneys for private meetings with their client. The Court expresses gratitude to Clara Presler of the Court's Pro Se Office and the New York Lawyers Assistance Group for their prompt assistance.The Clerk shall note the appearances of Ms. Sheinfeld and Ms. Starr on thedocket. SO ORDERED. CB-L added., Set Deadlines/Hearing as to ( Motion Hearing set for 1/9/2023 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 11D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge P. Kevin Castel.) (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 12/22/2022) (ama)
December 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER: re: #31 Letter filed by Tara Banfa-Louis. In this proceeding brought under the Convention on the Civil Aspects of International Child Abduction (the "Convention") and the International Child Abduction Remedies Act, 22 U. S. C. 9001 et seq. ("ICARA"), respondent's counsel seeks the appointment by the Court of counsel for a non-party 13-year old child referred to as CB-L. The Court has solicited the assistance of pro bono counsel to represent CB-L who may be interviewed by the Court under procedures consistent with the Convention and ICARA. There is no mechanism for payment of attorneys' fees out of public funds, beyond reimbursement for certain out of pocket expenses. The Court will advise the parties when, as and if counsel is appointed. Letter motion (Doc 31) is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part as indicated herein. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 12/20/2022) (ama)
December 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 31 LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Michael S. Pascazi dated December 19, 2022 re: Respondent's Pre Motion Letter re Appointing an Attorney for the Minor CB-L. Document filed by Tara Banfa-Louis..(Pascazi, Michael)
December 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 30 OPINION AND ORDER: Petitioner has filed a petition for the return of a child under the Convention on the Civil Aspects of International Child Abduction, done at the Hague on October 25, 1980 and the International Child Abduction Remedies Act, 22 U.S.C. 9001 et seq. Petitioner now moves to permit four identified witnesses to testify by simultaneous transmission from the U.K. at the January 9, 2023 hearing. Respondent has opposed the application. (Doc 29.). Letter motion (Doc 28) is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part as indicated herein. SO ORDERED., Set Deadlines/Hearing as to ( Motion Hearing set for 1/9/2023 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 11D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge P. Kevin Castel.) (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 12/16/2022) (ama)
December 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 29 LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Michael S. Pascazi dated December 15, 2022 re: Respondent's Counter Pre-Motion Letter. Document filed by Tara Banfa-Louis..(Pascazi, Michael)
December 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 28 LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Stephen J. Cullen (Pro Hac Vice Counsel for Petitioner) dated 12/9/2022 re: Pre-Motion Letter - Zoom Appearances By UK Witnesses). Document filed by Royal Borough of Kensington and Chelsea..(Cullen, Stephen)
December 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 27 LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Michael S. Pascazi dated December 2, 2022 re: Addressing Petitioner's Lack of Standing/Capacity to Sue. Document filed by Tara Banfa-Louis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EX A Prohibited Steps Order Ajala 121521, #2 Exhibit EX B Prohibited Steps Order Ajala 031022).(Pascazi, Michael)
November 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL: granting #24 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Upon consideration of the Motion to Withdraw Jessica A. duHoffmann as Counsel of Record, is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED and Ms. duHoffmann is hereby withdrawn as counsel of record for the Petitioner. Attorney Jessica A. duHoffmann terminated. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 11/30/2022) (ama)
November 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 SUPPLEMENTAL LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Stephen Cullen dated November 22, 2022 re: Standing. Document filed by Royal Borough of Kensington and Chelsea. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A).(Cullen, Stephen)
November 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MOTION for Jessica A. duHoffmann to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by Royal Borough of Kensington and Chelsea. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Withdrawal).(duHoffmann, Jessica)
November 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Stephen Cullen dated November 18, 2022 re: Standing. Document filed by Royal Borough of Kensington and Chelsea. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D).(Cullen, Stephen)
November 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joel L Perrell on behalf of Royal Borough of Kensington and Chelsea..(Perrell, Joel)
November 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER: Within 14 days, the petitioner shall file a letter-brief that sets forth the basis for its standing under the Hague Convention. The respondent may respond by letter-brief within 14 days thereafter. Fact discovery in this case shall be completed no later than December 23, 2022. Each party may submit a pre-hearing brief no later than January 5, 2023. The hearing on the petition will begin at 10 a.m. on Januaiy 9, 2023 in Courtroom 11D. SO ORDERED., ( Fact Discovery due by 12/23/2022., Motions due by 1/5/2023.) (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 11/04/2022) (ama)
November 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on ORDER TO CORRECT CASE CAPTION: granting #10 Motion re: #10 MOTION to Correct Case Caption. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 11/04/2022) (ama)
November 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge P. Kevin Castel: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 11/4/2022. Appearing for Petitioner, Stephen Cullen. Appearing for Respondent, Michael Pascazi. Court Reporter: Khris Sellin. Hearing is scheduled on January 9, 2023 at 10:00 a.m. See, Order dated November 4, 2022. (Nacanther, Florence)
November 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines as to Motion Hearing set for 1/9/2023 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 11D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge P. Kevin Castel. (ama)
November 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN. Document filed by Royal Borough of Kensington and Chelsea. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Memorandum of Law).(Powers, Kelly)
November 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN. Document filed by Tara Banfa-Louis..(Pascazi, Michael)
November 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 RESPONSE to #1 Petition (Other). Document filed by Tara Banfa-Louis..(Pascazi, Michael)
October 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER The preliminary hearing is adjourned from October 28, 2022 to November 4, 2022 at 2 p.m. All call-in information remains the same. SO ORDERED. (Telephone Conference set for 11/4/2022 at 02:00 PM before Judge P. Kevin Castel.) (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 10/24/2022) (jca)
October 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Tara Banfa-Louis served on 10/11/2022, answer due 11/1/2022. Service was accepted by Tara Bafna-Louis. Document filed by Royal Borough of Kensington and Chelsea. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Part 1) - Process Served, #2 Exhibit A (Part 2) Process Served, #3 Exhibit B - Email Correspondence).(Powers, Kelly)
October 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTICE of of Filing of Affidavit of English Law. Document filed by Royal Borough of Kensington and Chelsea. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of English Law, #2 Exhibit A - Family Procedure Rule 12.3, #3 Exhibit B - Children Act Part 1 Section 3, #4 Exhibit C - Senior Courts Act Part 2 Section 41).(Powers, Kelly)
October 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ELECTRONIC AMENDED SUMMONS ISSUED as to Tara Banfa-Louis. (vf)
October 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SUMMONS as to Tara Bafna-Louis, re: #1 Petition (Other). Document filed by Royal Borough of Kensington and Chelsea..(Powers, Kelly)
October 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SUMMONS as to Tara Bafna-Louis, re: #1 Petition (Other). Document filed by Royal Borough of Kensington and Chelsea..(Powers, Kelly) Modified on 10/4/2022 (pc).
October 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MOTION to Correct Case Caption . Document filed by Royal Borough of Kensington and Chelsea. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order (Proposed Order to Correct Case Caption)).(Powers, Kelly)
October 4, 2022 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Kelly Ann Powers to RE-FILE Document No. #11 Request for Issuance of Amended Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; Caption title does not match Petition Caption title; party name does not match caption title. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (pc) Modified on 10/4/2022 (pc).
October 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: There will be a preliminary hearing on the matter on October 28, 2022 at 3:30 p.m. The hearing will proceed telephonically. Call-in information is: Dial-In No.: 1-888-363-4749, Access Code: 3667981. SO ORDERED., ( Telephone Conference set for 10/28/2022 at 03:30 PM before Judge P. Kevin Castel.) (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 10/03/2022) (ama)
October 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Stephen J. Cullen to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge P. Kevin Castel)(Text Only Order) (Nacanther, Florence)
October 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Kelly A. Powers to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge P. Kevin Castel)(Text Only Order) (Nacanther, Florence)
September 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Tara Banfa-Louis..(jgo)
September 30, 2022 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Jessica A. duHoffmann. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code New York;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of U.S.;. (jgo)
September 30, 2022 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #4 MOTION for Kelly A. Powers to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-26752587. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (sgz)
September 30, 2022 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #5 MOTION for Stephen J. Cullen to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-26752660. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (sgz)
September 30, 2022 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Jessica A. duHoffmann. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Tara Banfa-Louis. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: alias party name was omitted;. (jgo)
September 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
September 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
September 30, 2022 Opinion or Order CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge P. Kevin Castel. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
September 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION for Stephen J. Cullen to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-26752660. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Royal Borough of Kensington and Chelsea. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Bar and Court Admissions List, #2 Exhibit B - Certificates of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit C - Affidavit, #4 Text of Proposed Order (for admission pro hac vice)).(Cullen, Stephen)
September 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MOTION for Kelly A. Powers to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-26752587. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Royal Borough of Kensington and Chelsea. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Bar and Court Admissions List, #2 Exhibit B - Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit C - Affidavit, #4 Text of Proposed Order (for admission pro hac vice)).(Powers, Kelly)
September 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Tara Banfa-Louis, re: #1 Petition (Other). Document filed by Royal Borough of Kensington and Chelsea..(duHoffmann, Jessica)
September 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(duHoffmann, Jessica)
September 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 PETITION FOR RETURN OF CHILDREN TO ENGLAND. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-26748437).Document filed by Royal Borough of Kensington and Chelsea..(duHoffmann, Jessica)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Royal Borough of Kensington and Chelsea v. Tara Bafna-Louis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Royal Borough of Kensington and Chelsea
Represented By: Stephen John Cullen
Represented By: Kelly Ann Powers
Represented By: Jessica A. duHoffmann
Represented By: Joel L Perrell
Represented By: Joel L Perrell, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Michael S. Pascazi, ESQ.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Tara Banfa-Louis
Represented By: Michael Salvatore Pascazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Talia Becker, Talia Louis, Tara Becker, Tara Maynard, Taliya Becker, and
Represented By: Michael Salvatore Pascazi
Represented By: Valdi Licul
Represented By: John S. Crain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Tara Bafna-Louis
Represented By: Michael Salvatore Pascazi
Represented By: Valdi Licul
Represented By: John S. Crain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: CB-L
Represented By: Dara Lynn Sheinfeld
Represented By: Amelia Temple Redwood Starr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?