Ortiz et al v. Mouton & Brown Trucking LLC et al
Plaintiff: antonio ortiz and jesus vasquez
Defendant: Mouton & Brown Trucking LLC, Alberto Morales Bueno and Serghei Grama
Case Number: 1:2022cv08609
Filed: October 10, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Sarah L Cave
Referring Judge: Paul G Gardephe
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446 mv Notice of Removal - Motor Vehicle
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 23, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 1, 2022 Filing 17 FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES to Mouton & Brown Trucking LLC and Alberto Morales Bueno.Document filed by Antonio Ortiz..(Kimmelman, Michael)
November 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULING ORDER: A settlement conference before Judge Cave is scheduled for Monday, February 6, 2023 at 2:00 p.m. and will take place in person, in Courtroom 18A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York, as further set forth herein. Settlement Conference set for 2/6/2023 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 18A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge Sarah L Cave. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah L Cave on 11/22/2022) (mml)
November 22, 2022 Filing 15 FIRST LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave from Matthew D. Goodstein, Esq. dated 11/22/2022 re: Requesting a settlement conference. Document filed by Jesus Vasquez..(Goodstein, Matthew)
November 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #12 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. Defendants' letter-motion seeking to adjourn the initial case management conference set for Tuesday, November 22, 2022 at 4:30 p.m. (the "Conference") (ECF No. 12) is GRANTED, and the Conference is ADJOURNED sine die. An order endorsing the proposed case management plan is forthcoming. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to close ECF No. 12. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah L Cave on 11/16/2022) (tg)
November 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 REPORT OF RULE 26(f) CONFERENCE AND CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN: In accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f) and Judge Cave's Individual Practices, the parties met on November 2 2022 (at least one week before the Initial Case Management Conference) and exchanged communications thereafter. The parties now submit the following report for the Court's consideration: As further set forth by this Order. Last date to amend any pleading pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 15(a) is May 1, 2023. The parties have discussed the possibility of settlement. The parties do not consent to a trial before a Magistrate Judge at this time. The parties request a jury trial. By Thursday, December 15, 2022, the parties shall file a joint status letter advising the Court whether they are interested in a settlement conference with the Court, or alternatively, a referral to the mediation program. A telephonic status conference is scheduled for February 3, 2023 at 2:30 p.m. on the Court's conference line. The parties are directed to call: (866) 390-1828; access code: 380-9799, at the scheduled time. SO ORDERED. Amended Pleadings due by 5/1/2023. Deposition due by 3/31/2023. Fact Discovery due by 5/31/2023. Expert Discovery due by 9/15/2023. Estimate length of trial 10 days. Telephone Conference set for 2/3/2023 at 02:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Sarah L Cave. Ready for Trial by 11/15/2023. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah L Cave on 11/16/2022) (tg)
November 16, 2022 Filing 12 FIRST LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference on Consent addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave from Matthew K. Finkelstein dated 11/16/2022. Document filed by Alberto Morales Bueno, Mouton & Brown Trucking LLC..(Finkelstein, Matthew)
November 16, 2022 Filing 11 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN. Document filed by Alberto Morales Bueno, Mouton & Brown Trucking LLC..(Finkelstein, Matthew)
October 26, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Matthew Goodstein on behalf of Jesus Vasquez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent to Change Attorney).(Goodstein, Matthew)
October 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER SCHEDULING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for Tuesday, 11/22/2022 at 04:30 PM in Courtroom 18A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge Sarah L Cave. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah L Cave on 10/24/2022) (tro)
October 21, 2022 Filing 8 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave from Michael Kimmelman dated 10/21/22 re: status of service on Grama. Document filed by Antonio Ortiz..(Kimmelman, Michael)
October 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER. By Wednesday, October 26, 2022, Plaintiff shall file a status letter advising the Court of the status of service on Grama. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah L Cave on 10/20/22) (yv)
October 19, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael Lawrence Kimmelman on behalf of Jesus Vasquez..(Kimmelman, Michael)
October 19, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael Lawrence Kimmelman on behalf of Antonio Ortiz..(Kimmelman, Michael)
October 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement). Referred to Magistrate Judge Sarah L Cave. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 10/18/2022) (ate)
October 12, 2022 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, with Notice of Removal and all Exhibits served on Antonio Ortiz, Jesus Vasquez and Serghei Grama on October 10, 2022 (Ortiz/Vasquez) October 11, 2022 (Grama). Service was made by Mail (Grama) NYSCEF (Ortiz/Vasquez). Document filed by Alberto Morales Bueno, Mouton & Brown Trucking LLC..(Finkelstein, Matthew)
October 11, 2022 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Paul G. Gardephe. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(gp)
October 11, 2022 Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (gp)
October 11, 2022 Case Designated ECF. (gp)
October 10, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Finkelstein, Matthew)
October 10, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of Bronx. Case Number: 809556/2022E. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-26794996).Document filed by Alberto Morales Bueno, Mouton & Brown Trucking LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Defendants' Answers, #3 Exhibit C - Plaintiff's Response to CPLR 3017 demand, #4 Exhibit D - Plaintiffs Bill of Particulars, #5 Exhibit E - Preliminary Conference Order).(Finkelstein, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ortiz et al v. Mouton & Brown Trucking LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: antonio ortiz
Represented By: Michael Lawrence Kimmelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: jesus vasquez
Represented By: Matthew Goodstein
Represented By: Michael Lawrence Kimmelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mouton & Brown Trucking LLC
Represented By: Matthew Kory Finkelstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alberto Morales Bueno
Represented By: Matthew Kory Finkelstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Serghei Grama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?