Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University v. Office of the Director of National Intelligence et al
Plaintiff: Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University and Committee to Protect Journalists
Defendant: Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Public Interest Declassification Board and Central Intelligence Agency
Case Number: 1:2022cv09096
Filed: October 24, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Alvin K Hellerstein
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 552 Freedom of Information Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 21, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2022 Filing 22 ANSWER to #20 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Public Interest Declassification Board..(Aronoff, Peter)
December 7, 2022 Filing 21 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Committee to Protect Journalists..(Wilkens, Scott)
December 7, 2022 Filing 20 AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint, against Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Public Interest Declassification Board.Document filed by Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University, Committee to Protect Journalists. Related document: #1 Complaint,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A).(Wilkens, Scott)
December 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #18 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. SO ORDERED. ( Amended Pleadings due by 12/7/2022.) (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 12/1/22) (yv)
November 28, 2022 Filing 18 JOINT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time with proposed schedule for amended complaint and response addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Peter Aronoff dated 11/28/2022. Document filed by Central Intelligence Agency, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Public Interest Declassification Board..(Aronoff, Peter)
November 7, 2022 Filing 17 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED (FOIA CASE). All Defendants. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University..(Wilkens, Scott)
November 7, 2022 Filing 16 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED (FOIA CASE). All Defendants. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University..(Wilkens, Scott)
November 7, 2022 Filing 15 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED (FOIA CASE). Public Interest Declassification Board served on 11/2/2022, answer due 12/2/2022. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University..(Wilkens, Scott)
November 7, 2022 Filing 14 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED (FOIA CASE). Central Intelligence Agency served on 11/3/2022, answer due 12/5/2022. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University..(Wilkens, Scott)
November 7, 2022 Filing 13 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED (FOIA CASE). Office of the Director of National Intelligence served on 11/7/2022, answer due 12/7/2022. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University..(Wilkens, Scott)
October 25, 2022 Filing 12 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Public Interest Declassification Board..(jgo)
October 25, 2022 Filing 11 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Office of the Director of National Intelligence..(jgo)
October 25, 2022 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Central Intelligence Agency..(jgo)
October 25, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jameel Jaffer on behalf of Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University..(Jaffer, Jameel)
October 25, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Alexander Abraham Abdo on behalf of Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University..(Abdo, Alexander)
October 25, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Alexia Ramirez on behalf of Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University..(Ramirez, Alexia)
October 25, 2022 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
October 25, 2022 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
October 25, 2022 Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
October 25, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Scott B. Wilkens. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Jurisdiction code 3 (Federal Question);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Jurisdiction code has been modified to 2 (U.S. Government Defendant);. (jgo)
October 24, 2022 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Central Intelligence Agency, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University..(Wilkens, Scott)
October 24, 2022 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Public Interest Declassification Board, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University..(Wilkens, Scott)
October 24, 2022 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Office of the Director of National Intelligence, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University..(Wilkens, Scott)
October 24, 2022 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Wilkens, Scott)
October 24, 2022 Filing 2 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University..(Wilkens, Scott)
October 24, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Central Intelligence Agency, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Public Interest Declassification Board. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-26859907)Document filed by Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A).(Wilkens, Scott)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University v. Office of the Director of National Intelligence et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University
Represented By: Scott B. Wilkens
Represented By: Alexander Abraham Abdo
Represented By: Alexia Ramirez
Represented By: Jameel Jaffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Committee to Protect Journalists
Represented By: Scott B. Wilkens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Office of the Director of National Intelligence
Represented By: Peter Max Aronoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Public Interest Declassification Board
Represented By: Peter Max Aronoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Central Intelligence Agency
Represented By: Peter Max Aronoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?