Phillips v. United States Bureau of the Census
Plaintiff: Justin H. Phillips
Defendant: US Census Bureau and United States Bureau of the Census
Case Number: 1:2022cv09304
Filed: October 31, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Jed S Rakoff
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 552 Freedom of Information Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #4 Motion for Ruth Merewyn Greenwood to Appear Pro Hac Vice. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Applicant is admitted to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to the Local Rules of this Court, including the Rules governing discipline of attorneys.. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 12/20/2022) (kv)
December 20, 2022 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff: Telephone Conference held on 12/20/2022,A schedule for summary judgment is set. Defendants initial moving papers are due by no later than 2/1/2023. Responsive papers from the plaintiff are due by no later than 2/15/2023. Any reply is due by no later than 2/22/2023. Oral argument will be held at 4:30 PM on 2/24/2023, in Courtroom 14B of the Daniel Patrick Moynihan U.S. Courthouse, 500 Pearl St., New York, NY. ( Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/6/2023 at 04:30 PM before Judge Jed S. Rakoff., Oral Argument set for 2/24/2023 at 04:30 PM before Judge Jed S. Rakoff.). (Kotowski, Linda) Modified on 12/20/2022 (Kotowski, Linda).
December 13, 2022 Filing 14 RULE 26(f) DISCOVERY PLAN REPORT.Document filed by Justin H. Phillips. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Plaintiffs' Proposed Case Management Plan, #2 Exhibit B: Denial Letter).(Lee, Theresa)
December 7, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE OF COURT CONFERENCE: DATE AND PLACE OF CONFERENCE: 12-20-2022, ON A TELECONFERENCE LINE AT 11:15 am. The dial-in information for the call will be as follows: USA Toll-Free (888) 363-4735; USA Caller Paid/International Toll: (215) 446-3657; Access Code: 1086415. Initial Conference set for 12/20/2022 at 11:15 AM before Judge Jed S. Rakoff. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 12/7/2022) (kv)
December 5, 2022 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint. Document filed by United States Bureau of the Census..(Vargas, Jeannette)
November 14, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jeannette Anne Vargas on behalf of United States Bureau of the Census..(Vargas, Jeannette)
November 8, 2022 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice served on United States Bureau of the Census on 11/3/2022. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Justin H. Phillips..(Lee, Theresa)
November 7, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jeffrey Colin Zalesin on behalf of Justin H. Phillips. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit - Certificate of Service).(Zalesin, Jeffrey)
November 7, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jordan Ari Goldstein on behalf of Justin H. Phillips. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit - Certificate of Service).(Goldstein, Jordan)
November 4, 2022 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. United States Bureau of the Census served on 11/3/2022, answer due 11/25/2022. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Justin H. Phillips..(Lee, Theresa)
November 1, 2022 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States Bureau of the Census. (vf)
November 1, 2022 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States Bureau of the Census, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Justin H. Phillips..(Lee, Theresa)
November 1, 2022 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #4 MOTION for Ruth Merewyn Greenwood to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-26898438. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (sgz)
November 1, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Theresa Jeane Lee. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: US Census Bureau. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name entered incorrectly. (vf)
November 1, 2022 Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vf)
November 1, 2022 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Jed S. Rakoff. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vf)
November 1, 2022 Case Designated ECF. (vf)
November 1, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Theresa Jeane Lee to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Docket Entry Error. Enter the the party name as to whom the summons is issued for when prompted in ECF. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (vf)
October 31, 2022 Filing 4 MOTION for Ruth Merewyn Greenwood to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-26898438. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Justin H. Phillips. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Ruth Merewyn Greenwood in support of motion to admit counsel pro hac vice, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order for admission of Ruth Merewyn Greenwood pro hac vice).(Greenwood, Ruth)
October 31, 2022 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT - SUMMONS REQUEST As To - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to US Census Bureau, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Justin H. Phillips..(Lee, Theresa) Modified on 11/1/2022 (vf).
October 31, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Lee, Theresa)
October 31, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United States Bureau of the Census. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-26892526)Document filed by Justin H. Phillips. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - FOIA Request).(Lee, Theresa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Phillips v. United States Bureau of the Census
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justin H. Phillips
Represented By: Ruth M. Greenwood
Represented By: Theresa Jeane Lee
Represented By: Jeffrey Colin Zalesin
Represented By: Jordan Ari Goldstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Census Bureau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Bureau of the Census
Represented By: Jeannette Anne Vargas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?