Kaplan v. Comedy Partners
Plaintiff: Michael Kaplan
Defendant: Comedy Partners
Case Number: 1:2022cv09355
Filed: November 1, 2022
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: John G Koeltl
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity Action
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 11, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #10 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer / Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint until January 9, 2023 addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Kenneth L. Steinthal, Esq. dated 12/6/2022., #1 Complaint. APPLICATION GRANTED. SO ORDERED. Comedy Partners answer due 1/9/2023. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 12/7/2022) (tg)
December 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer / Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint until January 9, 2023 addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Kenneth L. Steinthal, Esq. dated 12/6/2022. Document filed by Comedy Partners..(Steinthal, Kenneth)
December 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #7 Motion for Bobby Pouya to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The motion of Bobby Pouya for admission to practice pro hac vice in the above captioned matter is granted. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Applicant is admitted to practice pro hac vice in the above captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to the Local Rules of this Court, including the Rules governing discipline of attorneys. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 12/1/22) (yv)
December 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Comedy Partners served on 11/18/2022, answer due 12/9/2022. Service was accepted by Jane Doe, Legal Representative. Document filed by Michael Kaplan..(Rubinow, Laurie)
December 1, 2022 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #7 MOTION for Bobby Pouya to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-27019161. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (sac)
November 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION for Bobby Pouya to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-27019161. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Michael Kaplan. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Bobby Pouya, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order).(Pouya, Bobby)
November 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #3 Motion for Daniel L. Warshaw to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The motion of Daniel L. Warshaw for admission to practice pro hac vice in the above captioned matter is granted. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Applicant is admitted to practice pro hac vice in the above captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to the Local Rules of this Court, including the Rules governing discipline of attorneys. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 11/29/22) (yv)
November 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John G. Koeltl: Initial Conference set for 2/14/2023 at 12:30 PM before Judge John G. Koeltl. Dial-in: 888 363-4749, with access code 8140049. (Fletcher, Donnie)
November 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Comedy Partners. (sj)
November 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Comedy Partners, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Michael Kaplan..(Rubinow, Laurie)
November 9, 2022 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #3 MOTION for Daniel Leon Warshaw to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-26930237. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (sgz)
November 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MOTION for Daniel Leon Warshaw to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-26930237. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Michael Kaplan. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Daniel L. Warshaw, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order).(Warshaw, Daniel)
November 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Case Designated ECF. (vf)
November 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vf)
November 2, 2022 Opinion or Order CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge John G. Koeltl. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vf)
November 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Rubinow, Laurie)
November 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Comedy Partners. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-26902004)Document filed by Michael Kaplan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A).(Rubinow, Laurie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kaplan v. Comedy Partners
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Kaplan
Represented By: Laurie Rubinow
Represented By: Bobby Pouya
Represented By: Daniel L. Warshaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Comedy Partners
Represented By: Kenneth L. Steinthal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?