The New York Times Company et al v. United States Department of Defense et al
Plaintiff: The New York Times Company and Matthieu Aikins
Defendant: United States Department of Defense and United States Department of State
Case Number: 1:2022cv09448
Filed: November 4, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Andrew L Carter
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 552 Freedom of Information Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 14, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 14, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Al-Amyn Shiraz Sumar on behalf of Matthieu Aikins, The New York Times Company..(Sumar, Al-Amyn)
November 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #9 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. SO ORDERED.. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 11/30/2022) (kv)
November 30, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Lucas Estlund Issacharoff on behalf of United States Department of Defense, United States Department of State..(Issacharoff, Lucas)
November 30, 2022 Filing 9 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from Alyssa B. O'Gallagher dated November 30, 2022. Document filed by United States Department of Defense, United States Department of State..(O'Gallagher, Alyssa)
November 30, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Alyssa O'Gallagher on behalf of United States Department of Defense, United States Department of State..(O'Gallagher, Alyssa)
November 30, 2022 Set/Reset Deadlines: United States Department of Defense answer due 1/13/2023; United States Department of State answer due 1/13/2023. (kv)
November 7, 2022 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States Department of State..(pc)
November 7, 2022 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States Department of Defense..(pc)
November 7, 2022 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
November 7, 2022 Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
November 7, 2022 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
November 4, 2022 Filing 5 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Matthieu Aikins, The New York Times Company..(McCraw, David)
November 4, 2022 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States Department of State, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Matthieu Aikins, The New York Times Company..(McCraw, David)
November 4, 2022 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States Department of Defense, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Matthieu Aikins, The New York Times Company..(McCraw, David)
November 4, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(McCraw, David)
November 4, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United States Department of Defense, United States Department of State. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-26919253)Document filed by The New York Times Company, Matthieu Aikins..(McCraw, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The New York Times Company et al v. United States Department of Defense et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The New York Times Company
Represented By: David Edward McCraw
Represented By: Al-Amyn Shiraz Sumar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthieu Aikins
Represented By: David Edward McCraw
Represented By: Al-Amyn Shiraz Sumar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Defense
Represented By: Lucas Estlund Issacharoff
Represented By: Alyssa O'Gallagher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of State
Represented By: Alyssa O'Gallagher
Represented By: Lucas Estlund Issacharoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?