7 West 21 LI LLC v. Mosseri
Plaintiff: 7 West 21 LI LLC
Defendant: Clement Mosseri
Case Number: 1:2022cv09506
Filed: November 4, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Laura Taylor Swain
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 nr Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 23, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 23, 2022 Appeal Record Sent to USCA (Electronic File). Certified Indexed record on Appeal Electronic Files for #5 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal filed by Clement Mosseri were transmitted to the U.S. Court of Appeals..(nd)
November 23, 2022 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Certified Copy of Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re: #5 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal..(nd)
November 21, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE OF INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL from #4 Order Directing Payment of Fee or IFP Application,,. Document filed by Clement Mosseri. Form D-P is due within 14 days to the Court of Appeals, Second Circuit..(nd)
November 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER DIRECTING PAYMENT OF FEE OR IFP APPLICATION: Defendant is directed to render payment of the filing fee or submit an IFP application to this Court's Pro Se Office within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order. The Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3), that any appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). Filing Fee due by 12/14/2022. In Forma Pauperis (IFP) Application due by 12/14/2022. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 11/14/2022) (sha)
November 14, 2022 MAILING RECEIPT: Document No: 4. Mailed to: Clement Mosseri 7 West 21st Street #1708 New York, NY 10010. (dsh)
November 14, 2022 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT - SUA SPONTE to Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (sac)
November 9, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Dean Dreiblatt on behalf of 7 West 21 LI LLC..(Dreiblatt, Dean)
November 9, 2022 MAILING RECEIPT: Document No: 1. Mailed to: Clement Mosseri 7 West 21st Street #1708 New York, NY 10010. (dsh)
November 4, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Civil Court, County of New York. Case Number: 312858/2022..Document filed by Clement Mosseri..(rdz)
November 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 64 Remark filed by Clement Mosseri. ENDORSEMENT: Because Index No. L&T 312858/2022 is a separate case in New York City Civil Court, County of New York, from Index No. L&T 053774/2019, each case must be separately docketed upon removal to this Court, as well. Case No. 20 Civ. 279 in this Court is the removed version of Index No. L&T 053774/2019 in N.Y.C. Civil Court. Therefore, this Notice, which removes Index No. L&T 312858/2022, must be entered upon a separate docket. The Clerk of Court is therefore respectfully directed to open a new civil docket and transfer this filing thereto. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John P. Cronan on 11/4/22) (rdz)
November 4, 2022 Case Designated ECF. (rdz)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: 7 West 21 LI LLC v. Mosseri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 7 West 21 LI LLC
Represented By: Dean Dreiblatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clement Mosseri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?