Securities and Exchange Commission v. Infinity Q Diversified Alpha Fund
Plaintiff: Securities and Exchange Commisison and Securities and Exchange Commission
Defendant: Infinity Q Diversified Alpha Fund
Case Number: 1:2022cv09608
Filed: November 10, 2022
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: P Kevin Castel
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 6, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Neal Jacobson dated November 23, 2022 re: maintaining the case active. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission..(Jacobson, Neal)
November 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission..(Jacobson, Neal)
November 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 PROPOSED CONSENT ORDER. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission..(Jacobson, Neal)
November 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #10 MOTION to Approve Consent Judgment Notice of Motion on Consent for an Order Appointing Special Master and Imposing Litigation Injunction. . Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Special Master Order).(Jacobson, Neal)
November 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MOTION to Approve Consent Judgment Notice of Motion on Consent for an Order Appointing Special Master and Imposing Litigation Injunction. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission..(Jacobson, Neal)
November 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MEMO ENDORSEMENT: on re: #7 Letter filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. ENDORSEMENT: Application Granted. File motion within 21 days. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 11/17/2022) (ama)
November 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 FINAL JUDGMENT ON CONSENT AS TO DEFENDANT INFINITY Q DIVERSIFIED ALPHA FUND: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that Defendant is permanently restrained and enjoined from violating, directly or indirectly, Rule 22c-1 [17 C.F.R. 270.22c-l] promulgated under Section 22(c) of the Investment Company Act of 1940 [15 U.S.C. 80(a)-22(c)]. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that, as provided in Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 65( d)(2), the foregoing paragraph also binds the following who receive actual notice of this Final Judgment by personal service or otherwise: (a) Defendant's officers, agents, servants, employees, and attorneys; and (b) other persons in active concert or participation with Defendant or with anyone described in (a). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 53, this Court shall appoint a special master to carry out the duties set forth in the Consented to Order Appointing Special Master and Imposing Litigation Injunction. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that this Court shall retain jurisdiction of this matter for the purposes of enforcing the terms of this Final Judgment., Infinity Q Diversified Alpha Fund terminated. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 11/16/2022) (ama)
November 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from SEC dated 11/16/22 re: Proposed Consent Judgment and Waiver of Pre-Motion Letter. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission..(Tutor, David)
November 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vba)
November 15, 2022 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED JUDGMENT. Document No. #6 Proposed Judgment was reviewed and approved as to form. (tp)
November 15, 2022 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge P. Kevin Castel. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (vba)
November 15, 2022 Opinion or Order CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:22-cv-01346-PKC. Notice of Assignment to follow. (vba)
November 14, 2022 Opinion or Order CASE REFERRED TO Judge P. Kevin Castel as possibly related to 1:22-cv-1346. (gp)
November 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Case Designated ECF. (gp)
November 14, 2022 Opinion or Order CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. .(gp)
November 14, 2022 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Andrew Dean. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Securities and Exchange Commission. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error : Securities and Exchange Commisison. (gp)
November 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PROPOSED JUDGMENT. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commisison..(Tutor, David) Proposed Judgment to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
November 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David H. Tutor on behalf of Securities and Exchange Commisison..(Tutor, David)
November 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 22-cv-1346. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commisison..(Dean, Andrew)
November 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Neal Ralph Jacobson on behalf of Securities and Exchange Commisison..(Jacobson, Neal)
November 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Dean, Andrew)
November 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Infinity Q Diversified Alpha Fund. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commisison..(Dean, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Securities and Exchange Commission v. Infinity Q Diversified Alpha Fund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Securities and Exchange Commisison
Represented By: David H. Tutor
Represented By: Neal Ralph Jacobson
Represented By: Andrew Brett Dean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Securities and Exchange Commission
Represented By: David H. Tutor
Represented By: Andrew Brett Dean
Represented By: Neal Ralph Jacobson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Infinity Q Diversified Alpha Fund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?