Rompalli v. 63 West LLC et al
Plaintiff: Murty Rompalli
Defendant: 63 West LLC and Real New York LLC
Case Number: 1:2022cv09617
Filed: November 10, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Laura Taylor Swain
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 24, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER DIRECTING PAYMENT OF FEES OR AMENDED IFP APPLICATION: Accordingly, within 30 days of the date of this order, Plaintiff must either pay the $402 in fees or complete, sign, and submit the attached amended IFP application. If Plaintiff submits the amended IFP application, it should be labeled with docket number 1:22-CV-9617 (LTS), and address the deficiencies described above by providing facts to establish that Plaintiff is unable to pay the fees to bring this action. If the Court grants the amended IFP application, Plaintiff will be permitted to proceed without prepayment of fees. See 1915(a)(1). No summons shall issue at this time. If Plaintiff complies with this order, this action shall be processed in accordance with the procedures of the Clerks Office. If Plaintiff fails to comply with this order within the time allowed, this action will be dismissed. The Court certifies under 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore IFP status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. Cf. Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962) (holding that appellant demonstrates good faith when seeking review of a nonfrivolous issue). SO ORDERED. Filing Fee due by 12/19/2022. In Forma Pauperis (IFP) Application due by 12/19/2022. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 11/18/22) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (rdz)
November 16, 2022 Filing 3 PRO SE CONSENT TO RECEIVE ELECTRONIC SERVICE. The following party: Murty Rompalli consents to receive electronic service via the ECF system. Document filed by Murty Rompalli.(sc)
November 14, 2022 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT - SUA SPONTE to Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (sac)
November 10, 2022 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against 63 West LLC, Real New York LLC. Document filed by Murty Rompalli..(rdz)
November 10, 2022 Filing 1 REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by Murty Rompalli..(rdz)
November 10, 2022 Case Designated ECF. (rdz)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rompalli v. 63 West LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Murty Rompalli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 63 West LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Real New York LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?