Avangrid Networks, Inc. et al v. Security Limits Inc., et al
Plaintiff: Avangrid Networks, Inc. and Avangrid Service Company
Defendant: Security Limits Inc., and Paulo Silva
Case Number: 1:2022cv09622
Filed: November 10, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Analisa Torres
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 ds Diversity-Contract Dispute
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 24, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #22 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. GRANTED in part, and DENIED in part. The deadline for Defendants' first pre-motion letter to Plaintiffs under Rule III.B is extended until January 13, 2023; The deadline for Plaintiffs' responsive letter under Rule III.B is extended until January 23, 2023; and Defendants' deadline to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint is extended until February 15, 2023. SO ORDERED.. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 1/6/2023) (kv)
January 6, 2023 Set/Reset Deadlines: Security Limits Inc., answer due 2/15/2023; Paulo Silva answer due 2/15/2023. (kv)
January 5, 2023 Filing 22 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Matthew C. DeFrancesco dated 1/05/2023. Document filed by Security Limits Inc.,, Paulo Silva..(Defrancesco, Matthew)
December 15, 2022 Filing 21 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Security Limits Inc.,, Paulo Silva..(Defrancesco, Matthew)
December 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #19 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. GRANTED. SO ORDERED.. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 12/14/2022) (kv)
December 14, 2022 Set/Reset Deadlines: Security Limits Inc., answer due 1/16/2023; Paulo Silva answer due 1/16/2023. (kv)
December 13, 2022 Filing 19 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Matthew C. DeFrancesco dated 12/13/2022. Document filed by Security Limits Inc.,, Paulo Silva..(Defrancesco, Matthew)
December 13, 2022 Filing 18 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Matthew Christian Defrancesco on behalf of Security Limits Inc.,, Paulo Silva..(Defrancesco, Matthew)
November 28, 2022 Filing 17 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Security Limits Inc., served on 11/23/2022, answer due 12/14/2022. Service was accepted by Paulo Silva, CEO/Owner. Document filed by Avangrid Service Company; Avangrid Networks, Inc...(Sanderson, Joseph)
November 28, 2022 Filing 16 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Paulo Silva served on 11/23/2022, answer due 12/14/2022. Service was accepted by Paulo Silva. Document filed by Avangrid Service Company; Avangrid Networks, Inc...(Sanderson, Joseph)
November 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: To protect the public health, while promoting the "just, speedy, and inexpensive determination of every action and proceeding," Fed. R. Civ. P. 1, it is ORDERED pursuant to Rules 30(b)(3) and 30(b)(4) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure that all depositions in this action may be taken via telephone, videoconference, or other remote means. It is further ORDERED pursuant to Rule 30(b)(5) that a deposition will be deemed to have taken place "before an officer appointed or designated under Rule 28" if such officer attends the deposition using the same remote means used to connect all other participants, so long as all participants (including the officer) can clearly hear and be heard by all other participants. The parties are encouraged to engage in discovery through remote means at every available opportunity. SO ORDERED (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 11/22/2022) (jca)
November 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 INITIAL PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Counsel for all parties are directed to submit a joint letter and a jointly proposed Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order by January 22, 2023, in accordance with Rule 16 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the instructions set forth below. COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF IS DIRECTED TO IMMEDIATELY SEND A COPY OF THIS ORDER AND THE COURT'S INDIVIDUAL PRACTICES TO ALL PARTIES. If this case has been settled or otherwise terminated, counsel are required to notify the Court before the deadline for the above submissions by calling (212) 805-0292 and must e-mail a stipulation of discontinuance, voluntary dismissal, or other proof of termination to the Orders and Judgments Clerk (judgments@nysd.uscourts.gov). (And as further set forth herein.) SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 11/22/2022) (jca)
November 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: To conserve resources, to promote judicial efficiency, and in an effort to achieve a faster disposition of this matter, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties discuss whether they are willing to consent, under 28 U.S.C. 636(c), to conducting all further proceedings before the assigned Magistrate Judge. If any party does not consent to conducting all further proceedings before the assigned Magistrate Judge, the parties must file a joint letter, by January 22, 2023, advising the Court that the parties do not consent, but without disclosing the identity of the party or parties who do not consent. The parties are free to withhold consent without negative consequences. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 11/22/2022) (jca)
November 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Thomas B. Watson to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Analisa Torres)(Text Only Order) (jgh)
November 22, 2022 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #11 MOTION for Thomas B. Watson to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-26987025. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (sgz)
November 21, 2022 Filing 11 MOTION for Thomas B. Watson to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-26987025. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Avangrid Networks, Inc., Avangrid Service Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Thomas Watson in Support of Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A - California Supreme Court Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Admitting Thomas Watson Pro Hac Vice).(Watson, Thomas)
November 21, 2022 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Security Limits Inc.,..(jgo)
November 21, 2022 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Paulo Silva..(jgo)
November 18, 2022 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Security Limits, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Avangrid Networks, Inc., Avangrid Service Company..(Sanderson, Joseph)
November 18, 2022 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Paulo Silva, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Avangrid Networks, Inc., Avangrid Service Company..(Sanderson, Joseph)
November 14, 2022 Filing 6 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Avangrid Networks, Inc., Other Affiliate Avangrid, Inc., Other Affiliate Iberdrola S.A. for Avangrid Service Company. Document filed by Avangrid Service Company..(Sanderson, Joseph)
November 14, 2022 Filing 5 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Avangrid, Inc., Other Affiliate Iberdrola S.A. for Avangrid Networks, Inc.. Document filed by Avangrid Networks, Inc...(Sanderson, Joseph)
November 14, 2022 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Analisa Torres. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(gp)
November 14, 2022 Magistrate Judge Valerie Figueredo is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (gp)
November 14, 2022 Case Designated ECF. (gp)
November 10, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joseph Myer Sanderson on behalf of Avangrid Networks, Inc., Avangrid Service Company..(Sanderson, Joseph)
November 10, 2022 Filing 3 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 1:21-cv-10124-GHW. Document filed by Avangrid Networks, Inc., Avangrid Service Company..(Mockler, Robert)
November 10, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Mockler, Robert)
November 10, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Avangrid Service Company, Avangrid Networks, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-26947160)Document filed by Avangrid Service Company, Avangrid Networks, Inc...(Mockler, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Avangrid Networks, Inc. et al v. Security Limits Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Avangrid Networks, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph Myer Sanderson
Represented By: Robert William Mockler
Represented By: Thomas Bernard Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Avangrid Service Company
Represented By: Joseph Myer Sanderson
Represented By: Robert William Mockler
Represented By: Thomas Bernard Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Security Limits Inc.,
Represented By: Matthew Christian Defrancesco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paulo Silva
Represented By: Matthew Christian Defrancesco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?