Toro v. Corsair Memory, Inc.
Plaintiff: Andrew Toro
Defendant: Corsair Memory, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2022cv10028
Filed: November 25, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Edgardo Ramos
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 12132 Americans with Disabilities Act - Discrimination
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 9, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 9, 2023 Filing 5 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Corsair Memory, Inc. served on 1/7/2023, answer due 1/30/2023. Service was accepted by Rick Berry. Document filed by Andrew Toro..(Khaimov, Mars)
November 28, 2022 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Corsair Memory, Inc.. (sj)
November 28, 2022 Case Designated ECF. (sj)
November 28, 2022 Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (sj)
November 28, 2022 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Edgardo Ramos. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(sj)
November 25, 2022 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Corsair Memory, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Andrew Toro..(Khaimov, Mars)
November 25, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Khaimov, Mars)
November 25, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Corsair Memory, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-27003774)Document filed by Andrew Toro..(Khaimov, Mars)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Toro v. Corsair Memory, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Toro
Represented By: Mars Khaimov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corsair Memory, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?