Garcia v. Target Corporation
Plaintiff: Martina Garcia
Defendant: Target Corporation
Case Number: 1:2022cv10101
Filed: November 29, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: John P Cronan
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 pi Petition for Removal- Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 6, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND SCHEDULING ORDER: This Civil Case Management Plan (the "Plan") is submitted by the parties in accordance with Rule 26(f)(3) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. All parties do not consent to conducting all further proceedings before a United States Magistrate Judge, including motions and trial. 28 U.S.C. 636(c). Settlement discussions have not taken place. The parties have conferred pursuant to Rule 26(f) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Depositions shall be completed by 4/14/23. All motions and applications shall be governed by the Court's Individual Rules and Practices in Civil Cases. This case is to be tried to a jury. Counsel for the parties have conferred and their best estimate of the length of trial is 3-4 days. Motions due by 2/5/2023. Deposition due by 7/21/2023. Fact Discovery due by 5/5/2023. Expert Discovery due by 7/21/2023. Discovery due by 7/21/2023. (And as further set forth herein.) SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John P. Cronan on 1/5/2023) (jca)
January 5, 2023 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John P. Cronan: Telephone Conference held on January 5, 2023. The Court held the initial pretrial conference. The Court will separately enter the case management plan (No court reporter present). (mhe)
January 5, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Matthew Albert Schroeder on behalf of Martina Garcia..(Schroeder, Matthew)
December 28, 2022 Filing 9 PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER. Document filed by Target Corporation..(Spitz, Alice)
December 28, 2022 Filing 8 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge John P. Cronan from Alice Spitz dated 12/28/22 re: Brief Case Synopsis pursuant to Notice of Assignment Order. Document filed by Target Corporation..(Spitz, Alice)
December 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT: Initial Conference set for 1/5/2023 at 11:30 AM before Judge John P. Cronan. Unless the Court orders otherwise, the Court will conduct the IPTC by teleconference. At the scheduled time, counsel for all parties should call (866) 434-5269, access code 9176261. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John P. Cronan on 12/13/2022) (vfr)
December 8, 2022 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal). Document filed by Target Corporation..(Spitz, Alice)
December 2, 2022 Filing 5 DEMAND for Trial by Jury. Document filed by Martina Garcia.(Grieco, Lisa)
December 2, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Lisa Lynn Grieco on behalf of Martina Garcia..(Grieco, Lisa)
December 1, 2022 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Target Corporation..(Spitz, Alice)
November 30, 2022 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge John P. Cronan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vf)
November 30, 2022 Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vf)
November 30, 2022 Case Designated ECF. (vf)
November 29, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Spitz, Alice)
November 29, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court of The State of New York, County of New York. Case Number: 156464/2022. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-27011413).Document filed by Target Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons & Complaint, #2 Exhibit Stipulation capping damages to $75,000 and Letter to Plaintiff's counsel).(Spitz, Alice)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garcia v. Target Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martina Garcia
Represented By: Matthew Albert Schroeder
Represented By: Lisa Lynn Grieco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Target Corporation
Represented By: Alice Spitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?