Santos-Escalante v. Muschette et al
Plaintiff: Bernis Santos-Escalante
Defendant: Cortney Muschette and United Parcel Service, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2022cv10162
Filed: November 30, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Jesse M Furman
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 ct Diversity-(Citizenship)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #12 Response to Order to Show Cause, filed by United Parcel Service, Inc., Cortney Muschette. ENDORSEMENT: Although subject-matter jurisdiction cannot be waived, Plaintiff has not disputed Defendants showing below. Accordingly, the Court concludes that there is no basis to remand at this time. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 12/20/2022) (tg)
December 9, 2022 Filing 12 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re: #9 Order to Show Cause,. Document filed by Cortney Muschette, United Parcel Service, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Right Shoulder Surgery Records, #2 Exhibit Cervical Spine Treatment Records).(Kritzer, David)
December 9, 2022 Filing 11 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent United Parcel Service, Inc., an Ohio corporation for United Parcel Service, Inc.. Document filed by Cortney Muschette, United Parcel Service, Inc...(Kritzer, David)
December 8, 2022 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Order of Hon. Jesse M. Furman served on Bernis Santos-Escalante on 12/07/2022. Service was accepted by Simon B. Landsberg. Document filed by Cortney Muschette, United Parcel Service, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Copy of Letter sent to Plaintiff as per Court Order).(Kritzer, David)
December 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER. No later than December 14, 2022, Defendants are ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE why this action should not be remanded for lack of subject-matter jurisdiction. Plaintiff may file a response no later than December 19, 2022. Defendants shall, within two business days of this Order, serve on Plaintiff a copy of this Order and file proof of such service on the docket. SO ORDERED. ( Show Cause Response due by 12/19/2022.) (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 12/5/22) (yv)
December 6, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Simon Benjamin Landsberg on behalf of Bernis Santos-Escalante. New Address: The Tadchiev Law Firm, P.C., 299 Jericho Turnpike, Floral Park, NY, United States 11001, 7183801200..(Landsberg, Simon)
December 5, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Simon Benjamin Landsberg on behalf of Bernis Santos-Escalante..(Landsberg, Simon)
December 2, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David Scott Kritzer on behalf of Cortney Muschette, United Parcel Service, Inc...(Kritzer, David)
December 2, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Karl Egils Zamurs on behalf of Cortney Muschette, United Parcel Service, Inc...(Zamurs, Karl)
December 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference by telephone set for 3/28/2023 at 9:00 AM before Judge Jesse M. Furman. The parties should join the conference by calling the Court's dedicated conference line at (888) 363-4749 and using access code 542-1540, followed by the pound (#) key. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 12/1/2022) (vfr)
December 1, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of Bronx. Case Number: 811102/2022E..Document filed by United Parcel Service, Inc., Cortney Muschette. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Santos-Escalante Summons & Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Affidavits of Service, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C - Incorporation Documents for UPS, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D - Affidavit of Service for Notice of Removal).(Zamurs, Karl)
December 1, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Zamurs, Karl)
December 1, 2022 Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
December 1, 2022 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Jesse M. Furman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
December 1, 2022 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
December 1, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Karl Egils Zamurs to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Notice of Removal,,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the event wrong event type was used to file the civil cover sheet;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF.. (pc)
December 1, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Karl Egils Zamurs to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Notice of Removal,,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the pleading was not signed by the filing attorney. Re-file the pleading using the event type Notice of Removal found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (pc)
December 1, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Karl Egils Zamurs. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code Bronx;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State;. (pc)
November 30, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of Bronx. Case Number: 811102/2022E. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-27021488).Document filed by United Parcel Service, Inc., Cortney Muschette. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A - Summons & Complaint in Supreme Court Action, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B - Affidavits of Service for Supreme Court Action, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C - Proof of UPS Incorporation in Ohio, #5 Exhibit Exhibit D - Affidavit of Service of Notice of Removal in NY Supreme Bronx County).(Zamurs, Karl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Santos-Escalante v. Muschette et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bernis Santos-Escalante
Represented By: Simon Benjamin Landsberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cortney Muschette
Represented By: Karl Egils Zamurs
Represented By: David Scott Kritzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Parcel Service, Inc.
Represented By: Karl Egils Zamurs
Represented By: David Scott Kritzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?