Lebron v. Capra
Petitioner: Hector Lebron
Respondent: Michael Capra
Case Number: 1:2022cv10227
Filed: December 1, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Ronnie Abrams
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 28, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: The Court directs the Finance Unit to apply the $5.00 filing fee from ECF 1:22-CV-10227 (RA) to ECF 1:22-CV-9089 (RA). The Court further directs the Clerk of Court to (1) file the signed petition and letter from Lebron, ECF 1:22-CV-10227, 1-2, in the original action, Lebron, ECF 1:22-CV-9089; and (2) administratively close the action, Lebron, ECF 1:22-CV-10227, as having been opened in error. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 12/28/2022) (ate) Transmission to Finance Unit (Cashiers) for processing. Transmission to Office of the Clerk of Court for processing.
December 9, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David M. Cohn on behalf of Michael Capra. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Service).(Cohn, David)
December 1, 2022 Filing 2 LETTER from Hector Lebron dated 11/17/22 re: Your Honor, I would like to bring to Your attention that this habeas petition was initially filed on or about June 3, 2019, to the wrong district court, Eastern District. Document filed by Hector Lebron..(rdz)
December 1, 2022 Filing 1 PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2254. County of Conviction: Bronx. (Filing Fee $ 5.00, Receipt Number 9277)Document filed by Hector Lebron..(rdz)
December 1, 2022 Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (rdz)
December 1, 2022 Case Designated ECF. (rdz)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lebron v. Capra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Hector Lebron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Michael Capra
Represented By: David M. Cohn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?