Ortiz v. U.S Dept. of Homeland Security
Petitioner: Luis Ortiz
Respondent: U.S Dept. of Homeland Security
Case Number: 1:2022cv10327
Filed: December 5, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Jennifer H Rearden
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241 fd Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Federal)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 19, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 HABEAS PACKAGE MAILED to Luis Ortiz, 17-A-5242, at Fishkill Correctional Facility P.O. Box 1245, Beacon, NY 12508, on 1/19/2023 Re: #6 Order to Answer, 28 U.S.C. 2241. The following document(s) were enclosed in the Service Package: a copy of the order of service or order to answer and other orders entered to date, the individual practices of the district judge and magistrate judge assigned to your case, Instructions for Litigants Who Do Not Have Attorneys, Notice Regarding Privacy and Public Access to Electronic Case Files, a Motions guide, a notice that the Pro Se Manual has been discontinued, a Notice of Change of Address form to use if your contact information changes, a handout explaining matters handled by magistrate judges and consent form to complete if all parties agree to proceed for all purposes before the magistrate judge. (sha)
January 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO ANSWER, 28 U.S.C. 2241... The Court, having examined the petition filed in the above-captioned action, which Petitioner filed pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2241, hereby ORDERS that: The Clerk of Court shall electronically notify the Civil Division of the U.S. Attorney's Office for the Southern District of New York that this Order has been issued. Within 60 days of the date of this Order, the U.S. Attorney's Office shall file an answer or other pleadings in response to the petition. Petitioner may file reply papers, if any, within 30 days of the date Petitioner is served with Respondent's answer. The Clerk of Court shall mail this Order, along with Judge Rearden's Individual Rules and Practices in Civil Cases and Individual Rules and Practices in Civil Pro Se Cases, to the pro se Petitioner. SO ORDERED. U.S Dept. of Homeland Security answer due on 3/20/2023. (Signed by Judge Jennifer H. Rearden on 1/18/2023) (kv) Transmission to Pro Se Assistants for processing.
January 11, 2023 Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (sac)
January 11, 2023 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Jennifer H. Rearden. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (sac)
January 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER GRANTING IFP APPLICATION: Leave to proceed in this Court without prepayment of fees is authorized. 28 U.S.C. 1915. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 1/4/2023) (vn)
December 5, 2022 Filing 3 PRISONER AUTHORIZATION. Document filed by Luis Ortiz..(rdz)
December 5, 2022 Filing 2 PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2241. Document filed by Luis Ortiz..(rdz)
December 5, 2022 Filing 1 REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by Luis Ortiz..(rdz) Modified on 12/7/2022 (rdz).
December 5, 2022 Case Designated ECF. (rdz)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ortiz v. U.S Dept. of Homeland Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Luis Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: U.S Dept. of Homeland Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?