Inventory Generation Inc. et al v. Silverline Services Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Inventory Generation Inc. individually and on behalf of all of those similarly situated doing business as Coast to Coast Dispatch
Defendant: SILVERLINE SERVICES INC., SHMUEL BRUMMEL, PROVENTURE CAPITAL FUNDING LLC, Benjamin Aryeh, WYNWOOD CAPITAL GROUP LLC, Zalmen Teitelbaum, Sam Gross, GLOBEX FUNDING LLC, Jack Brown, MCA RECEIVABLES, LLC, Yisroel C. Getter, John Doe #1-10, John Doe Investors 1-10, MCA Receivables, LLC doing business as United Fund USA and John Does 1-10
Lead Plaintiff: INVENTORY GENERATION INC. and Earl David
Case Number: 1:2022cv10529
Filed: December 13, 2022
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Paul A Engelmayer
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. § 1962 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 26, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 49 INTERNET CITATION NOTE: Material from decision with Internet citation re: #44 Memorandum & Opinion,,,..(kgo)
April 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 48 INTERNET CITATION NOTE: Material from decision with Internet citation re: #44 Memorandum & Opinion,,,..(kgo)
March 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 47 VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO F.R.C.P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i): Plaintiffs, INVENTORY GENERATION INC. D/B/A COAST TO COAST DISPATCH and EARL DAVID, by and through their attorney Jonathan E. Neuman, Esq., hereby submits this notice of voluntary dismissal with prejudice of the above captioned action against Defendants MCA RECEIVABLES, LLC, and ISROEL C. GETTER pursuant to F.R.C.P. 4 l(a)(l )(A)(i). This notice of voluntary dismissal is being made before any opposing party has served either an answer or a motion for summary judgment. Granted. Accordingly, the Court adjourns the pretrial conference scheduled for this afternoon sine die. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 3/30/2023) (rro)
March 30, 2023 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Document No. #46 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal, was reviewed and referred to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer for approval for the following reason(s): the plaintiff(s) filed their voluntary dismissal and it did not dismiss all of the parties or the action in its entirety. (tp)
March 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 46 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice and without costs against the defendant(s) Yisroel C. Getter, MCA Receivables, LLC. Document filed by Earl David, Inventory Generation Inc.. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)...(Neuman, Jonathan)
March 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER: Thus, only plaintiffs claims against the MCA Receivables defendants remain actively before this Court. On March 21, 2023, plaintiffs represented that they had reached a settlement with the MCA defendants and intended to dismiss the MCA defendants voluntarily. Dkt. 42-1. No such notice of voluntary dismissal, however, has been filed. The Court therefore orders plaintiffs, by March 28, 2023, to file either a notice of voluntary dismissal as to the MCA defendants pursuant to the settlement or a revised case management plan taking into account todays decision compelling arbitration of the claims against the PCF defendants. Should plaintiffs voluntarily dismiss the MCA defendants, the telephonic conference scheduled for March 30, 2023 will be adjourned sine die. Should plaintiffs file a revised case management plan, however, the conference will occur as scheduled. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 3/23/2023) (rro)
March 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 44 OPINION & ORDER re: #26 MOTION to Stay Action. MOTION to Compel Arbitration . filed by Benjamin Aryeh, Proventure Capital Funding LLC. For the foregoing reasons, the Court grants the PCF defendants' motion to compel arbitration and denies the PCF defendants' motion for costs and attorneys' fees. The Court stays this action as to the PCF defendants to the extent described above pending the completion of the arbitration, but does not stay any claims against any other defendants. Inventory Generation and the PCF defendants are directed to submit a joint status letter to the Court every 90 days, measured from the date of this decision, advising the Court of the status of the arbitration proceedings involving the PCF defendants. The Clerk of the Court is respectfully directed to terminate the motion at docket 26. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 3/23/2023) (rro)
March 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Case Stayed (rro)
March 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 43 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from Gene W. Rosen, Esq. dated March 21, 2023 re: letter accompanying proposed case management order filed by plaintiffs. Document filed by Benjamin Aryeh, Proventure Capital Funding LLC..(Rosen, Gene)
March 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 42 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN. Document filed by Earl David, Inventory Generation Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Letter to Court).(Neuman, Jonathan)
February 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 41 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of ECF Doc. 39 - Notice of Initial Pretrial Conference served on MCA RECEIVABLES, LLC D/B/A UNITED FUND USA, YISROEL C. GETTER, PROVENTURE CAPITAL FUNDING LLC, BENJAMIN ARYEH on 2/20/23. Document filed by Earl David, Inventory Generation Inc...(Neuman, Jonathan)
February 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER: The Court received an email from plaintiffs' counsel earlier today asking whether service of the Order at docket 39 is required as to those defendants who have been voluntarily dismissed from this action. To clarify, the Court directs plaintiffs to serve those defendants who remain parties in this case-that is, those defendants who have not been voluntarily dismissed. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 2/17/2023) (vfr)
February 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 39 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: The parties should call into the Court's dedicated conference line at (888) 363-4749, and enter Access Code 468-4906, followed by the pound(#) key. Counsel are directed to review the Court's Emergency Individual Rules and Practices in Light ofCOVID-19, found at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/hon-paul-engelmayer, for the Court's procedures for telephonic conferences and for instructions for communicating with chambers. Initial Conference set for 3/30/2023 at 04:00 PM before Judge Paul A. Engelmayer. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 2/17/2023) (va)
February 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Yisroel C. Getter, MCA Receivables, LLC..(Parsons, William)
February 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER granting #36 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #36 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint, addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from Steven W. Wells dated February 2, 2023., #1 Complaint. Granted. SO ORDERED. Yisroel C. Getter answer due 2/16/2023; MCA Receivables, LLC answer due 2/16/2023. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 2/6/2023) (kv)
February 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 36 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint, addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from Steven W. Wells dated February 2, 2023. Document filed by Yisroel C. Getter, MCA Receivables, LLC..(Wells, Steven)
February 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 35 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #26 MOTION to Stay Action. MOTION to Compel Arbitration . . Document filed by Benjamin Aryeh, Proventure Capital Funding LLC..(Rosen, Gene)
January 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 34 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #26 MOTION to Stay Action. MOTION to Compel Arbitration . . Document filed by Earl David, Inventory Generation Inc...(Neuman, Jonathan)
January 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 33 VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO F.R.C.P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i): Plaintiffs, INVENTORY GENERATION INC. D/B/ A COAST TO COAST DISPATCH and EARL DAVID, by and through their attorney Jonathan E. Neuman, Esq., hereby submits this notice of voluntary dismissal with prejudice of the above captioned action against Defendants WYNWOOD CAPITAL GROUP LLC, ZALMEN TEITELBAUM, and SAM GROSS pursuant to F.R.C.P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i). This notice of voluntary dismissal is being made before any opposing party has served either an answer or a motion for summary judgment. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 1/25/2023) Wynwood Capital Group LLC, Sam Gross and Zalmen Teitelbaum terminated. (ks)
January 25, 2023 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Document No. #32 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal, was reviewed and referred to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer for approval for the following reason(s): the plaintiff(s) filed their voluntary dismissal and it did not dismiss all of the parties or the action in its entirety. (tp)
January 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 32 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice and without costs against the defendant(s) Sam Gross, Zalmen Teitelbaum, Wynwood Capital Group LLC. Document filed by Earl David, Inventory Generation Inc.. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)...(Neuman, Jonathan)
January 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 31 VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO F.R.C.P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i): Plaintiffs, INVENTORY GENERATION INC. D/B/A COAST TO COAST DISPATCH and EARL DAVID, by and through their attorney Jonathan E. Neuman, Esq., hereby submits this notice of voluntary dismissal with prejudice of the above captioned action against Defendants SILVERLINE SERVICES, INC., SHMUEL BRUMMEL, GLOBEX FUNDING LLC., and JACK BROWN pursuant to F.R.C.P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i). This notice of voluntary dismissal is being made before any opposing party has served either an answer or a motion for summary judgment. SO ORDERED. Shmuel Brummel, Silverline Services Inc., Jack Brown and Globex Funding LLC terminated. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 1/18/2023) (tg)
January 18, 2023 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Document No. #30 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal was reviewed and referred to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer for approval for the following reason(s): the plaintiff(s) filed their voluntary dismissal and it did not dismiss all of the parties or the action in its entirety;. (nd)
January 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 30 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice and without costs against the defendant(s) Jack Brown, Globex Funding LLC, Shmuel Brummel, Silverline Services Inc.. Document filed by Earl David, Inventory Generation Inc.. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)...(Neuman, Jonathan)
January 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER: On December 13, 2022, plaintiffs filed the complaint in this action and sought a temporary restraining order as to certain defendants. Dkt. 1. On December 14, 2022, plaintiffs attempted service on defendants Benjamin Aryeh and Proventure Capital Funding LLC, Dkt. 10-1, but were unsuccessful, see Dkt. 10. On December 20 and 21, 2022, respectively, plaintiffs successfully served defendants Aryeh and Proventure Capital Funding LLC. Dkt. 12. On January 7, 2023, defendants Aryeh and Proventure Capital Funding LLC moved to stay the action and compel arbitration as to plaintiffs' claims against them, specifically. Dkt. 15. Plaintiffs' opposition to the motion to compel, if any, will be due January 30, 2023. Defendants' reply, if any, will be due February 10, 2023. SO ORDERED., ( Responses due by 1/30/2023, Replies due by 2/10/2023.) (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 1/09/2023) (ama)
January 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #26 MOTION to Stay Action. MOTION to Compel Arbitration . . Document filed by Benjamin Aryeh, Proventure Capital Funding LLC..(Rosen, Gene)
January 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 27 DECLARATION of Benjamin Aryeh in Support re: #26 MOTION to Stay Action. MOTION to Compel Arbitration .. Document filed by Benjamin Aryeh, Proventure Capital Funding LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Agreement, #3 Exhibit C - Request to Proceed to Arbitration).(Rosen, Gene)
January 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MOTION to Stay Action., MOTION to Compel Arbitration . Document filed by Benjamin Aryeh, Proventure Capital Funding LLC..(Rosen, Gene)
January 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #24 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. Granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 1/3/2023) (jca)
January 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 24 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from Will Parsons dated January 3, 2023. Document filed by Sam Gross, Zalmen Teitelbaum, Wynwood Capital Group LLC..(Parsons, William)
January 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER GRANTING PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION: Having received no opposition papers from the MCA defendants, and the MCA defendants having failed to appear for the January 3, 2023 hearing, the Court hereby finds that plaintiffs have satisfied the elements necessary for a preliminary injunction, and hereby converts the previously granted temporary restraining order into a preliminary injunction. Accordingly, it is hereby ordered that pending the determination and outcome of this case, the MCA defendants are hereby preliminarily enjoined from issuing any levies against any of plaintiffs' bank accounts, including but not limited to the TD Bank account in the name of Inventory Generation Inc. ending in 6401 and the TD Bank account in the name of Earl David ending in 1178. Similarly, it is hereby ordered that pending the determination and outcome of this case, TD Bank NA is hereby preliminarily enjoined from enforcing or applying any levies issued by the MCA defendants to plaintiffs' bank accounts, including but not limited to the TD Bank account in the name of Inventory Generation Inc. ending in 6401 and the TD Bank account in the name of Earl David ending in 1178. SO ORDERED. Motions terminated: #5 EMERGENCY MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order . filed by Inventory Generation Inc., Earl David. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 1/3/2023) (tg)
January 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 22 PROPOSED ORDER. Document filed by Earl David, Inventory Generation Inc.. Related Document Number: #11 ..(Neuman, Jonathan) Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
January 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by William Parsons on behalf of Sam Gross, Zalmen Teitelbaum, Wynwood Capital Group LLC..(Parsons, William)
January 3, 2023 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED ORDER. Document No. #22 Proposed Order was reviewed and approved as to form. (km)
January 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Paul A. Engelmayer: Show Cause Hearing held on 1/3/2023. Plaintiffs' counsel present. Counsel for Silverline Services & Shmuel Brummel present. Court reporter present. (ajs)
January 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Sam Gross answer due 2/6/2023; Zalmen Teitelbaum answer due 2/6/2023; Wynwood Capital Group LLC answer due 2/6/2023. (jca)
January 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Proventure Capital Funding LLC..(Rosen, Gene)
January 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Gene Wurzel Rosen on behalf of Benjamin Aryeh, Proventure Capital Funding LLC..(Rosen, Gene)
December 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #17 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. Granted. The scheduled show-cause hearing remains in place on January 3, 2023, and the Court directs defendants to appear at that hearing. See Dkt. 11. The Court wishes counsel a happy new year. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 12/30/2022) (tg)
December 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from Defendants' Counsel dated 12/27/2022. Document filed by Shmuel Brummel, Silverline Services Inc...(Weinstein, Jacob)
December 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Shmuel Brummel answer due 1/18/2023; Silverline Services Inc. answer due 1/18/2023. (tg)
December 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Order to Show Cause served on YISROEL C. GETTER on 12/28/22. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Earl David, Inventory Generation Inc...(Neuman, Jonathan)
December 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Order to Show Cause served on MCA RECEIVABLES, LLC D/B/A UNITED FUND USA on 12/28/22. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Earl David, Inventory Generation Inc...(Neuman, Jonathan)
December 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jacob Zev Weinstein on behalf of Shmuel Brummel, Silverline Services Inc...(Weinstein, Jacob)
December 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time and Alternate Method of Service. Granted. The Court authorizes plaintiff to serve defendants Getter and MCA Receivables LLC, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4 and New York Civil Practice Law and Rules 308 and 311, at the above-listed address by certified mail. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 12/23/2022) (jca)
December 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time and Alternate Method of Service addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from Jonathan E. Neuman dated 12/23/2022. Document filed by Earl David, Inventory Generation Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavits of Service).(Neuman, Jonathan)
December 23, 2022 Opinion or Order CASHIERS OFFICE REGISTRY DEPOSIT as per #11 Order to Show Cause, dated 12/20/2022, from Judge Paul A. Engelmayer, received $1,000.00 from Inventory Generation INC. Receipt Number NYSCCA23-00098 on 12/23/2022. (cde)
December 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AND TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER: ORDERED, that Defendants MCA RECEIVABLES, LLC D/B/A UNITED FUND USA and YISROEL C. GETTER show cause before a motion term of this Court, at Room, United States Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, in the City of New York, County of New York and State of New York, on Jan. 3, 2023 at 10 o'clock in the a.m. thereof, or as soon thereafter as counsel may be heard, why an order should not be issued pursuant to Rule 65 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure enjoining the defendants during the pendency of this action from levying against any of Plaintiffs' bank accounts, including but not limited to Plaintiffs' TD Bank accounts ending in 6401 and 1178 ; and it is further ORDERED that, sufficient reason having been shown therefor, pending the hearing of Plaintiffs' application for a preliminary injunction, pursuant to Rule 65, Fed. R. Civ. P., the Defendants are temporarily restrained and enjoined from issuing any levies against any of Plaintiffs' bank accounts, including but not limited to the TD Bank account in the name of Inventory Generation Inc. ending in 6401 and the TD Bank account in the name of Earl David ending in 1178; and it is further ORDERED that, sufficient reason having been shown therefor, pending the hearing of Plaintiffs' application for a preliminary injunction, pursuant to Rule 65, Fed. R. Civ. P., TD Bank NA is temporarily restrained and enjoined from enforcing or applying any levies issued by Defendants to Plaintiffs' bank accounts, including but not limited to the TD Bank account in the name of Inventory Generation Inc. ending in 6401 and the TD Bank account in the name of Earl David ending in 1178, and TD Bank NA is ordered to immediately return all money that has been withdrawn from the TD Bank account in the name of Inventory Generation Inc. ending in 6401 and the TD Bank account in the name of Earl David ending in 1178 as a result of any pre-judgment levy by MCA Receivables, LLC d/b/a United Fund USA; and it is further ORDERED that security in the amount of $1,000 be posted by the plaintiffs prior to Dec. 23, 2022, at 4 o'clock in the p.m. of that day; and it is further ORDERED that personal service of a copy of this order and annexed affidavit upon the defendant or his counsel via process server on or before 5 pm o'clock in the p.m. December 21, 2022, shall be deemed good and sufficient service thereof. Show Cause Hearing set for 1/3/2023 at 10:00 AM before Judge Paul A. Engelmayer. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 12/20/2022) (tg) Transmission to Finance Unit (Cashiers) for processing.
December 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Paul A. Engelmayer: Show Cause Hearing held on 12/20/2022. Court reporter present. (ajs)
December 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #9 Letter, filed by Inventory Generation Inc., Earl David. ENDORSEMENT: The Court appreciates this update and explanation. The hearing on Tuesday, December 20, 2022 will proceed as scheduled. The Court expects defendants to attend. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 12/16/2022) (vfr)
December 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from Jonathan E. Neuman dated December 16, 2022 re: Court's Order of 12/16/22. Document filed by Earl David, Inventory Generation Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavits of Service).(Neuman, Jonathan)
December 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: On December 13, 2022, plaintiffs filed the complaint and an emergency motion for temporary restraining order in this action. Dkts. 1, 5. That same day, the Court ordered plaintiffs to serve all defendants and file proof of service on the docket of the above-captioned case by close of business on December 13, 2022. Dkt. 7. The Court also ordered defendants to respond by December 19, 2022 and scheduled a conference for December 20, 2022. Dkt. 7. Plaintiffs have not filed proof of service or requested an extension. It is hereby ORDERED that the plaintiffs advise the Court in writing why they failed to serve the Summons, Complaint, emergency motion, and the Court's order at docket 7 on defendants as ordered, or, if plaintiffs believe that defendants have been served, when and in what manner such service was made. It is further ORDERED that if the Court does not receive any written communication from plaintiffs by the close of business on December 16, 2022, showing good cause why such service was not made, the Court will adjourn next weeks conference. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 12/16/2022) (va)
December 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AND RESTRAINING ORDER: It is ORDERED, that Defendants MCA RECEIVABLES, LLC D/B/ A UNITED FUND USA and YISROEL C. GETTER show cause before term of this Court, at Courtroom 1305, Thurgood Marshall United States Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, in the City of New York, County of New York and State of New York, on December 20, 2022, at 2 o'clock in the afternoon thereof, why an order should not be issued pursuant to Rule 65 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure enjoining the defendants during the pendency of this action from levying against any of Plaintiffs' bank accounts, including but not limited to Plaintiffs' TD Bank accounts ending in 6401 and 1178 ; and it is further ORDERED that, plaintiffs will serve this Order, the complaint, and the application for a preliminary injunction on all defendants no later than the close of business today, and forthwith file proof of service on the docket of this case; and it is further ORDERED defendants will have until Monday, December 19, 2022, at 12 p.m. (i.e., noon) to file any response to plaintiffs application for a preliminary injunction. For avoidance of doubt, this Order does not grant plaintiffs application for temporary relief in advance of the December 20, 2022 hearing. SO ORDERED. ( Show Cause Hearing set for 12/20/2022 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 1305, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Paul A. Engelmayer.) Show Cause Response due by 12/19/2022. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 12/14/2022) (va)
December 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Benjamin Aryeh, Jack Brown, Yisroel C. Getter, Globex Funding LLC, Sam Gross, MCA Receivables, LLC, Proventure Capital Funding LLC, Shmuel Brummel, Silverline Services Inc., Zalmen Teitelbaum, Wynwood Capital Group LLC. (vf)
December 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Case Designated ECF. (vf)
December 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge Jennifer Willis is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vf)
December 14, 2022 Opinion or Order CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vf)
December 14, 2022 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Jonathan Ellery Neuman. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code 18:1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 18:1962 Racketeering (RICO) Act. (vf)
December 14, 2022 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Jonathan Ellery Neuman. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: SHMUEL BRUMMEL, GLOBEX FUNDING LLC, MCA RECEIVABLES, LLC, PROVENTURE CAPITAL FUNDING LLC, SILVERLINE SERVICES INC, WYNWOOD CAPITAL GROUP LLC, Earl David, INVENTORY GENERATION INC. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps; party role was entered incorrectly; party text was omitted; alias party name was omitted. (vf)
December 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 EMERGENCY MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order . Document filed by Earl David, INVENTORY GENERATION INC.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration in Support of Jonathan Neuman in Support of Emergency Motion, #2 Affidavit Declaration of Plaintiffs in Support, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Complaint, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - United Fund USA Agreement).(Neuman, Jonathan) (Refer to ECF Rule 13.19(b) and (c) for directions regarding promptly alerting the court to this filing.)
December 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to SILVERLINE SERVICES INC., SHMUEL BRUMMEL, PROVENTURE CAPITAL FUNDING LLC, BENJAMIN ARYEH; WYNWOOD CAPITAL GROUP LLC, ZALMEN TEITELBAUM, SAM GROSS; GLOBEX FUNDING LLC, JACK BROWN; MCA RECEIVABLES, LLC D/B/A UNITED FUND USA, YISROEL C. GETTER, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Earl David, INVENTORY GENERATION INC...(Neuman, Jonathan)
December 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Earl David, INVENTORY GENERATION INC...(Neuman, Jonathan)
December 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Neuman, Jonathan)
December 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Benjamin Aryeh, SHMUEL BRUMMEL, Jack Brown, John Doe #1-10, GLOBEX FUNDING LLC, Yisroel C. Getter, Sam Gross, John Doe Investors 1-10, MCA RECEIVABLES, LLC, PROVENTURE CAPITAL FUNDING LLC, SILVERLINE SERVICES INC., Zalmen Teitelbaum, WYNWOOD CAPITAL GROUP LLC. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-27082480)Document filed by Earl David, INVENTORY GENERATION INC...(Neuman, Jonathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Inventory Generation Inc. et al v. Silverline Services Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Lead plaintiff: INVENTORY GENERATION INC.
Represented By: Jonathan Ellery Neuman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Lead plaintiff: Earl David
Represented By: Jonathan Ellery Neuman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SILVERLINE SERVICES INC.
Represented By: Jacob Zev Weinstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SHMUEL BRUMMEL
Represented By: Jacob Zev Weinstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PROVENTURE CAPITAL FUNDING LLC
Represented By: Gene Wurzel Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benjamin Aryeh
Represented By: Gene Wurzel Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WYNWOOD CAPITAL GROUP LLC
Represented By: William Parsons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zalmen Teitelbaum
Represented By: William Parsons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sam Gross
Represented By: William Parsons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GLOBEX FUNDING LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jack Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MCA RECEIVABLES, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yisroel C. Getter
Represented By: Steven William Wells
Represented By: William Parsons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe #1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Investors 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MCA Receivables, LLC doing business as United Fund USA
Represented By: Steven William Wells
Represented By: William Parsons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Inventory Generation Inc. individually and on behalf of all of those similarly situated doing business as Coast to Coast Dispatch
Represented By: Jonathan Ellery Neuman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?