Government Employees Insurance Company et al v. Datta et al
Plaintiff: Government Employees Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company, GEICO General Insurance Company and GEICO Casualty Company
Defendant: Sukdeb Datta, M.D., Datta Endoscopic Surgery & Pain Center, L.L.C., Garden State Neuro Stimulation, L.L.C., Saddle Brook Anesthesia Associates, L.L.C., Surgistar Holdings, L.L.C. doing business as Saddle Brook Endoscopic & Orthopedic Surgery Center, Gabriel Dassa, D.O., Dassa Orthopedic Medical Services, P.C., Darrin Kaloz, D.C. and Adjust for Life Chiropractic, P.C.
Case Number: 1:2022cv10531
Filed: December 13, 2022
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Edgardo Ramos
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. § 1962 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 28, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,,, with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Adjust for Life Chiropractic, P.C., Darrin Kaloz, DC..(Birzon, Peter)
February 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 22 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Adjust for Life Chiropractic, P.C...(Birzon, Peter)
February 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,,,. Document filed by Gabriel Dassa, DO, Dassa Orthopedic Medical Services, P.C...(Harfenist, Steven)
February 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Dassa Orthopedic Medical Services, P.C...(Harfenist, Steven)
January 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 STIPULATION: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between counsel for plaintiffs and counsel for defendants, Darrin Kaloz, D.C. and Adjust for Life Chiropractic, P.C. ("Defendants"), that Defendants' time to respond to the complaint is extended through and including February 15, 2023. IT IS FURTHER STIPULATED AND AGREED that Defendants waive any objections to the sufficiency of service of process. SO ORDERED., Adjust for Life Chiropractic, P.C. answer due 2/15/2023; Darrin Kaloz, DC answer due 2/15/2023. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 1/18/2023) (ama)
January 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Adjust for Life Chiropractic, P.C., Darrin Kaloz, DC..(Birzon, Peter)
January 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 STIPULATION: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between counsel for plaintiffs and counsel for defendants, Gabriel Dassa, D.O., Dassa Orthopedic Medical Services, P.C., ("Defendants"), that Defendants' time to respond to the complaint is extended through and including February 15, 2023. IT IS FURTHER STIPULATED AND AGREED that Defendants waive any objections to the sufficiency of service of process. SO ORDERED., Gabriel Dassa, DO answer due 2/15/2023; Dassa Orthopedic Medical Services, P.C. answer due 2/15/2023. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 1/12/2023) (ama)
January 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Gabriel Dassa, DO, Dassa Orthopedic Medical Services, P.C...(Harfenist, Steven)
January 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Neil Stuart Torczyner on behalf of Gabriel Dassa, DO, Dassa Orthopedic Medical Services, P.C...(Torczyner, Neil)
January 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Steven Jay Harfenist on behalf of Gabriel Dassa, DO, Dassa Orthopedic Medical Services, P.C...(Harfenist, Steven)
January 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Gabriel Dassa, DO served on 1/5/2023, answer due 1/26/2023. Service was accepted by Gabriel Dassa, D.O.. Document filed by GEICO General Insurance Company; GEICO Indemnity Company; GEICO Casualty Company; Government Employees Insurance Company..(Gershenoff, Max)
January 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Darrin Kaloz, DC served on 1/5/2023, answer due 1/26/2023. Service was accepted by Carly Rella Kaloz/Wife. Document filed by GEICO General Insurance Company; GEICO Indemnity Company; GEICO Casualty Company; Government Employees Insurance Company..(Gershenoff, Max)
January 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Peter Marc Birzon on behalf of Adjust for Life Chiropractic, P.C., Darrin Kaloz, DC..(Birzon, Peter)
January 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STIPULATION AND ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE: Mohamed Nabulsi hereby appears as counsel for the Datta Defendants; Counsel for the Datta Defendants agrees to accept service of the Summons and Complaint in this action on behalf of the Datta Defendants; The Datta Defendants agree to answer or otherwise move against the Complaint on or before February 17, 2023; and The Datta Defendants waive any objections to service. SO ORDERED., Sukdeb Datta, MD answer due 2/17/2023; Datta Endoscopic Surgery & Pain Center, L.L.C. answer due 2/17/2023. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 1/03/2023) (ama)
December 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Barry I. Levy on behalf of GEICO Casualty Company, GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company, Government Employees Insurance Company..(Levy, Barry)
December 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Christina Marie Bezas on behalf of GEICO Casualty Company, GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company, Government Employees Insurance Company..(Bezas, Christina)
December 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by GEICO Casualty Company, GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company, Government Employees Insurance Company..(Gershenoff, Max)
December 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Adjust for Life Chiropractic, P.C., Gabriel Dassa, DO, Dassa Orthopedic Medical Services, P.C., Sukdeb Datta, MD, Datta Endoscopic Surgery & Pain Center, L.L.C., Garden State Neuro Stimulation, L.L.C., Darrin Kaloz, DC, Saddle Brook Anesthesia Associates, L.L.C., Surgistar Holdings, L.L.C..
December 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Gershenoff, Max)
December 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Case Designated ECF. (vf)
December 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vf)
December 14, 2022 Opinion or Order CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Edgardo Ramos. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vf)
December 14, 2022 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Max S. Gershenoff. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code Albany. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State. (vf)
December 14, 2022 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Max S. Gershenoff to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the civil cover sheet is not correct; the PDF for the civil cover sheet is not viewable. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. (vf)
December 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent GEICO Corporation, Other Affiliate Berkshire Hathaway, Inc. for GEICO Casualty Company, GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company, Government Employees Insurance Company. Document filed by GEICO Casualty Company, GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company, Government Employees Insurance Company..(Gershenoff, Max)
December 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to SUKDEB DATTA, M.D., DATTA ENDOSCOPIC SURGERY & PAIN CENTER, L.L.C., GARDEN STATE NEURO STIMULATION, L.L.C., SADDLE BROOK ANESTHESIA ASSOCIATES, L.L.C., SURGISTAR HOLDINGS, L.L.C. d/b/a SADDLE BROOK ENDOSCOPIC & ORTHOPEDIC SURGERY CENTER, GABRIEL DASSA, D.O., DASSA ORTHOPEDIC MEDICAL SERVICES, P.C., DARRIN KALOZ, D.C., and ADJUST FOR LIFE CHIROPRACTIC, P.C., re: #1 Complaint,,,,,. Document filed by GEICO Casualty Company, GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company, Government Employees Insurance Company..(Gershenoff, Max)
December 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Gershenoff, Max) Modified on 12/14/2022 (vf).
December 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Adjust for Life Chiropractic, P.C., Gabriel Dassa, DO, Dassa Orthopedic Medical Services, P.C., Sukdeb Datta, MD, Datta Endoscopic Surgery & Pain Center, L.L.C., Garden State Neuro Stimulation, L.L.C., Darrin Kaloz, DC, Saddle Brook Anesthesia Associates, L.L.C., Surgistar Holdings, L.L.C.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-27083046)Document filed by GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company, GEICO Casualty Company, Government Employees Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Representative Sample of Fraudulent Claims Identified to Date - Adjust for Life Chiropractic, P.C., #2 Exhibit 2 - Representative Sample of Fraudulent Claims Identified to Date - Dassa Orthopedic Medical Services, P.C., #3 Exhibit 3 - Representative Sample of Fraudulent Claims Identified to Date - Garden State Neuro Stimulation, L.L.C., #4 Exhibit 4 - Representative Sample of Fraudulent Claims Identified to Date - Datta Endoscopic Surgery & Pain Center, L.L.C., #5 Exhibit 5 - Representative Sample of Fraudulent Claims Identified to Date - Saddle Brook Anesthesia Associates, L.L.C., #6 Exhibit 6 - Representative Sample of Fraudulent Claims Identified to Date - Surgistar Holdings, L.L.C.).(Gershenoff, Max)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Government Employees Insurance Company et al v. Datta et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Government Employees Insurance Company
Represented By: Max S. Gershenoff
Represented By: Barry I. Levy
Represented By: Christina Marie Bezas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GEICO Indemnity Company
Represented By: Max S. Gershenoff
Represented By: Barry I. Levy
Represented By: Christina Marie Bezas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GEICO General Insurance Company
Represented By: Max S. Gershenoff
Represented By: Barry I. Levy
Represented By: Christina Marie Bezas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GEICO Casualty Company
Represented By: Max S. Gershenoff
Represented By: Barry I. Levy
Represented By: Christina Marie Bezas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sukdeb Datta, M.D.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Datta Endoscopic Surgery & Pain Center, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Garden State Neuro Stimulation, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Saddle Brook Anesthesia Associates, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Surgistar Holdings, L.L.C. doing business as Saddle Brook Endoscopic & Orthopedic Surgery Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gabriel Dassa, D.O.
Represented By: Neil Stuart Torczyner
Represented By: Steven Jay Harfenist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dassa Orthopedic Medical Services, P.C.
Represented By: Neil Stuart Torczyner
Represented By: Steven Jay Harfenist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darrin Kaloz, D.C.
Represented By: Peter Marc Birzon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adjust for Life Chiropractic, P.C.
Represented By: Peter Marc Birzon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?