Travelers Property Casualty Company of America v. Cloud Ocean Line Limited et al
Plaintiff: Travelers Property Casualty Company of America
Defendant: Cloud Ocean Line Limited, Airport Clearance Service, Inc. and DRT International Logistics Inc.
Alternative Dispute Resolution (Adr) Provider: Ocean Network Express, PTE, LTD.
Case Number: 1:2023cv00331
Filed: January 13, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Loretta A Preska
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1333 ad Admiralty
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 27, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 13, 2023 Filing 25 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Ocean Network Express, PTE, Ltd., re: #24 Third Party Complaint. Document filed by Cloud Ocean Line Limited..(Spector, Andrew)
March 13, 2023 Filing 24 THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Ocean Network Express, PTE, LTD..Document filed by Cloud Ocean Line Limited..(Spector, Andrew)
March 10, 2023 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Andrew Robert Spector to RE-FILE Document No. #22 Answer to Complaint,, Third Party Complaint,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the pleading is not correct; the PDF must include a Third Party Complaint caption. Re-file the pleading using the event type Answer, Third Party Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (jgo)
March 10, 2023 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Andrew Robert Spector to RE-FILE Document No. #23 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): summons request was not processed due to deficient pleading; refile after the pleading is filed correctly. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (jgo)
March 9, 2023 Filing 23 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Ocean Network Express, PTE. Ltd. c/o Ocean Network Express (North America) Inc., re: #22 Answer to Complaint, Third Party Complaint. Document filed by Ocean Network Express, PTE, LTD...(Spector, Andrew)
March 9, 2023 Filing 22 FILING ERROR DEFICIENT PLEADING - PDF ERROR - ANSWER to #1 Complaint,., THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Ocean Network Express, PTE, LTD.. Document filed by Cloud Ocean Line Limited..(Spector, Andrew) Modified on 3/10/2023 (jgo).
March 9, 2023 Filing 21 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Cloud Ocean Line Limited..(Spector, Andrew)
March 9, 2023 Filing 20 AFFIRMATION of Yuri Starikov in Support re: #15 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim.. Document filed by DRT International Logistics Inc...(Starikov, Yuri)
March 9, 2023 Filing 19 PROPOSED ORDER. Document filed by DRT International Logistics Inc.. Related Document Number: #15 ..(Starikov, Yuri) Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
March 9, 2023 Filing 18 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #15 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. . Document filed by DRT International Logistics Inc...(Starikov, Yuri)
March 9, 2023 Filing 17 AFFIDAVIT of Tim Li in Support re: #15 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim.. Document filed by DRT International Logistics Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. "B" (House Bill of Lading No. SZXE21120069 not listing DRT), #2 Exhibit Ex. "C" (House Bill of Lading No. SZXE21120069 listing DRT as "for delivery of goods please apply to" party), #3 Exhibit Ex. "E" (Master Bill of Lading No. ONEYSZPBR2348301), #4 Exhibit Ex. "F" (Arrival Notice), #5 Exhibit Ex. "G" (VOCC ONE's Claim Denial), #6 Exhibit Ex. "H" (Captain's Note of Sea Protest)).(Starikov, Yuri)
March 9, 2023 Filing 16 AFFIRMATION of Yuri Starikov in Support re: #15 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim.. Document filed by DRT International Logistics Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. "A" (Pl.'s Compl.), #2 Exhibit Ex. "D" (Shenzhen Green Channel Logistics, Co. Ltd. FMC Registration).(Starikov, Yuri)
March 9, 2023 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Document filed by DRT International Logistics Inc...(Starikov, Yuri)
March 9, 2023 ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED ORDER. Document No. #19 Proposed Order was reviewed and approved as to form. (tp)
February 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #13 Motion for Yuri Starikov to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 2/17/2023) (va)
February 16, 2023 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #13 MOTION for Yuri Starikov to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-27349087. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (sgz)
February 15, 2023 Filing 13 MOTION for Yuri Starikov to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-27349087. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by DRT International Logistics Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit NY Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit NJ Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Affidavit Affidavit of Yuri Starikov, #4 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order).(Starikov, Yuri)
January 23, 2023 Filing 12 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint, served. DRT International Logistics Inc. served on 1/20/2023, answer due 2/10/2023. Service was accepted by Rolland K Yu, Registered Agent. Document filed by Travelers Property Casualty Company of America..(Heilig, Justin)
January 23, 2023 Filing 11 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint, served. Airport Clearance Service, Inc. served on 1/19/2023, answer due 2/9/2023. Service was accepted by C. McCann, Authorized Agent. Document filed by Travelers Property Casualty Company of America..(Heilig, Justin)
January 23, 2023 Filing 10 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint, served. Cloud Ocean Line Limited served on 1/19/2023, answer due 2/9/2023. Service was accepted by Ken Lemley, General Counsel Designee. Document filed by Travelers Property Casualty Company of America..(Heilig, Justin)
January 17, 2023 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to DRT International Logistics Inc...(jgo)
January 17, 2023 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Cloud Ocean Line Limited..(jgo)
January 17, 2023 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Airport Clearance Service, Inc...(jgo)
January 17, 2023 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Loretta A. Preska. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
January 17, 2023 Magistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
January 17, 2023 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
January 13, 2023 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to DRT International Logistics Inc., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Travelers Property Casualty Company of America..(Heilig, Justin)
January 13, 2023 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Airport Clearance Service, Inc., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Travelers Property Casualty Company of America..(Heilig, Justin)
January 13, 2023 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Cloud Ocean Line Limited, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Travelers Property Casualty Company of America..(Heilig, Justin)
January 13, 2023 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent The Travelers Indemnity Company, Corporate Parent Travelers Property Casualty Corp., Corporate Parent The Phoenix Insurance Company, Corporate Parent The Travelers Companies, Inc., Corporate Parent Travelers Insurance Group Holdings, Inc. for Travelers Property Casualty Company of America. Document filed by Travelers Property Casualty Company of America..(Heilig, Justin)
January 13, 2023 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Heilig, Justin)
January 13, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Airport Clearance Service, Inc., Cloud Ocean Line Limited, DRT International Logistics Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-27202217)Document filed by Travelers Property Casualty Company of America..(Heilig, Justin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Travelers Property Casualty Company of America v. Cloud Ocean Line Limited et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Travelers Property Casualty Company of America
Represented By: Justin Matthew Heilig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cloud Ocean Line Limited
Represented By: Andrew Robert Spector
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Airport Clearance Service, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DRT International Logistics Inc.
Represented By: Yuri Starikov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Alternative dispute resolution (adr) provider: Ocean Network Express, PTE, LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?