Tuy Xep v. De Hoop Corp. et al
Plaintiff: Francisco Tuy Xep
Defendant: De Hoop Corp. doing business as Kaia Wine Bar and Suzaan Hauptfleisch
Case Number: 1:2023cv00450
Filed: January 19, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Gregory H Woods
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 10, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 7, 2023 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. De Hoop Corp. waiver sent on 2/6/2023, answer due 4/7/2023; Suzaan Hauptfleisch waiver sent on 2/6/2023, answer due 4/7/2023. Document filed by Francisco Tuy Xep..(Mercado, Christian)
January 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: DUE DATE OF JOINT LETTER and PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN: September 25, 2023. (And as further set forth herein.) SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 10/2/2023 at 02:00 PM before Judge Gregory H. Woods. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 1/24/2023) (jca)
January 20, 2023 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Suzaan Hauptfleisch. (vf)
January 20, 2023 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to De Hoop Corp.. (vf)
January 20, 2023 Case Designated ECF. (vf)
January 20, 2023 Magistrate Judge Valerie Figueredo is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vf)
January 20, 2023 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Gregory H. Woods. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vf)
January 19, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Christian Mauricio Mercado on behalf of Francisco Tuy Xep..(Mercado, Christian)
January 19, 2023 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Suzaan Hauptfleisch, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Francisco Tuy Xep..(Pechman, Louis)
January 19, 2023 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to De Hoop Corp., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Francisco Tuy Xep..(Pechman, Louis)
January 19, 2023 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Pechman, Louis)
January 19, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against De Hoop Corp., Suzaan Hauptfleisch. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-27220004)Document filed by Francisco Tuy Xep..(Pechman, Louis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tuy Xep v. De Hoop Corp. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francisco Tuy Xep
Represented By: Christian Mauricio Mercado
Represented By: Louis Pechman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: De Hoop Corp. doing business as Kaia Wine Bar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Suzaan Hauptfleisch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?