Sompo Japan Insurance Inc. v. XPO Logistics, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Sompo Japan Insurance Inc.
Defendant: XPO Logistics, LLC, XPO Intermodal Solutions, Inc., RXO Capacity Solutions, LLC and STG Intermodal Solutions, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2023cv00705
Filed: January 27, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Paul A Engelmayer
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 49 U.S.C. ยง 14706 Carmack Amendment to the Interstate Commerce Act / Liability of Carriers - Receipts & Bills
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 8, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL: PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that, Plaintiff Sompo Japan Insurance Inc. (hereinafter "Plaintiff") by its undersigned attorneys, Maloof & Browne LLC, hereby voluntarily dismisses the action against Defendants, with prejudice, and without costs, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i). The Defendants have neither answered, appeared nor filed a motion for summary judgment. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 3/7/2023) (va)
March 7, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice and without costs against the defendant(s) RXO Capacity Solutions, LLC, STG Intermodal Solutions, Inc., XPO Intermodal Solutions, Inc., XPO Logistics, LLC. Document filed by Sompo Japan Insurance Inc.. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)...(Maloof, David)
February 2, 2023 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to RXO Capacity Solutions, LLC, STG Intermodal Solutions, Inc...(pc)
February 2, 2023 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney David Thomas Maloof. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: RXO Capacity Solutions, LLC, STG Intermodal Solutions, Inc. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: alias party name was omitted;. (pc)
February 1, 2023 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to RXO Capacity Solutions, LLC and STG Intermodal Solutions, Inc., re: #7 Amended Complaint. Document filed by Sompo Japan Insurance Inc...(Maloof, David)
February 1, 2023 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint against RXO Capacity Solutions, LLC, STG Intermodal Solutions, Inc..Document filed by Sompo Japan Insurance Inc.. Related document: #1 Complaint..(Maloof, David)
January 30, 2023 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to XPO Intermodal Solutions, Inc., XPO Logistics, LLC..(gp)
January 30, 2023 Case Designated ECF. (gp)
January 30, 2023 Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (gp)
January 30, 2023 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(gp)
January 27, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kipp Charles Leland on behalf of Sompo Japan Insurance Inc...(Leland, Kipp)
January 27, 2023 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to XPO Logistics, LLC and XPO Intermodal Solutions, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Sompo Japan Insurance Inc...(Maloof, David)
January 27, 2023 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Sompo Holdings, Inc. for Sompo Japan Insurance Inc.. Document filed by Sompo Japan Insurance Inc...(Maloof, David)
January 27, 2023 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Maloof, David)
January 27, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against XPO Intermodal Solutions, Inc., XPO Logistics, LLC. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-27258729)Document filed by Sompo Japan Insurance Inc...(Maloof, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sompo Japan Insurance Inc. v. XPO Logistics, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sompo Japan Insurance Inc.
Represented By: Kipp Charles Leland
Represented By: David Thomas Maloof
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XPO Logistics, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XPO Intermodal Solutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RXO Capacity Solutions, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STG Intermodal Solutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?