Golam v. First Horizon Bank
Plaintiff: Mohammed Golam
Defendant: First Horizon Bank
Case Number: 1:2023cv00805
Filed: January 31, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Vernon S Broderick
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 bc Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 15, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Motion to Amend/Correct #12 MOTION to Amend/Correct . APPLICATION GRANTED. Plaintiff shall serve the complaint by March 13, 2023. This Order supersedes my Order at Doc. 10. SO ORDERED.. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 2/15/2023) (kv)
February 15, 2023 Set/Reset Deadlines: Service due by 3/13/2023. (kv)
February 14, 2023 Filing 12 MOTION to Amend/Correct . Document filed by Mohammed Golam. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit February 14, 2023 Order).(Eyland, Jessica)
February 14, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David S. Tannenbaum on behalf of Mohammed Golam..(Tannenbaum, David)
February 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #8 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. APPLICATION GRANTED. Defendant shall respond to Plaintiffs complaint by March 13, 2023. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to terminate the motion at Doc. 8. SO ORDERED.. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 2/14/2023) (kv)
February 14, 2023 Set/Reset Deadlines: First Horizon Bank answer due 3/13/2023. (kv)
February 13, 2023 Filing 9 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Mohammed Golam..(Eyland, Jessica)
February 13, 2023 Filing 8 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick from Jessica Eyland dated February 13, 2023. Document filed by Mohammed Golam. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit proposed stipulation).(Eyland, Jessica)
February 13, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jessica Eyland on behalf of Mohammed Golam..(Eyland, Jessica)
February 1, 2023 Filing 6 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent First Horizon Corporation for First Horizon Bank. Document filed by First Horizon Bank..(Garson, Robert)
February 1, 2023 Filing 5 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Garson, Robert)
February 1, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of New York. Case Number: 654944/2022..Document filed by First Horizon Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons with Notice, #2 Exhibit Affidavit of Service).(Garson, Robert)
February 1, 2023 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Vernon S. Broderick. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
February 1, 2023 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Robert David Garson. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Citizenship Plaintiff code 1 (Citizen of This State); County code New York;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Citizenship Plaintiff code has been modified to 4 (Incorporated/Principal Place of Business-This State); the County code has been modified to XX Out of State;. (jgo)
February 1, 2023 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Notice to Attorney Robert David Garson to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the jurisdiction of this action is based on diversity - the party/intervenor did not name and identify the citizenship of every individual or entity whose citizenship is attributed to that party or intervenor. Re-file the document using the event type Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement found under the event list Other Documents - select the correct filer/filers - attach the correct signed PDF - when prompted with the message "Are there any corporate parents or other affiliates?", select the Yes radio button - enter the corporate parent/other affiliate, click the Search button - select the correct corporate parent/other affiliate name from the search results list or if no person found, create a new corporate parent/other affiliate - select the party to whom the corporate parent/other affiliate should be linked - add corporate parent/other affiliate names one at a time - name and identify the citizenship of every individual or entity whose citizenship is attributed to that party or intervenor. Please use the revised form found here # NYSD form page (lb)
February 1, 2023 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Robert David Garson to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the civil cover sheet is not correct; the incorrect Citizenship Plaintiff code was selected under Citizenship of Principal Parties section; the PDF was not properly signed by the attorney;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated October 1, 2020. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated October 1, 2020 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (jgo)
February 1, 2023 Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
February 1, 2023 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
February 1, 2023 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Robert David Garson to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Notice of Removal,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): pursuant to Rule 13.3, exhibits must be filed as separate attachments to the pleading. Re-file the pleading using the event type Notice of Removal found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (jgo)
January 31, 2023 Filing 3 FILING ERROR -- DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MISSING DIVERSITY INFORMATION - RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent First Horizon Corporation for First Horizon Bank. Document filed by First Horizon Bank..(Garson, Robert) Modified on 2/1/2023 (lb).
January 31, 2023 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Garson, Robert) Modified on 2/1/2023 (jgo).
January 31, 2023 Filing 1 FILING ERROR DEFICIENT PLEADING - PDF ERROR - NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of New York. Case Number: 654944/2022. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-27276179).Document filed by First Horizon Bank..(Garson, Robert) Modified on 2/1/2023 (jgo).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Golam v. First Horizon Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mohammed Golam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Horizon Bank
Represented By: Robert David Garson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?