Koenigsberg et al v. The Board of Trustees of Columbia University in the City of New York
Plaintiff: Alexandra Koenigsberg, Maxwell Koenigsberg and Olga Stambler
Defendant: The Board of Trustees of Columbia University in the City of New York
Case Number: 1:2023cv01044
Filed: February 7, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Paul G Gardephe
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 oc Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 24, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The motion of Matthew T. Hurst for admission to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above-captioned action is granted. As further set forth by this Order. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 3/14/2023) (tg)
March 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The motion of Matthew T. Heffner for admission to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above-captioned action is granted. As further set forth by this Order. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 3/14/2023) (tg)
March 10, 2023 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #11 MOTION for Matthew T. Hurst to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.; #10 MOTION for Matthew T. Heffner to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (sac)
March 9, 2023 Filing 11 MOTION for Matthew T. Hurst to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Alexandra Koenigsberg, Maxwell Koenigsberg, Olga Stambler. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Hurst Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Affidavit Hurst Declaration, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice).(Miller, Kim)
March 9, 2023 Filing 10 MOTION for Matthew T. Heffner to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Alexandra Koenigsberg, Maxwell Koenigsberg, Olga Stambler. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Heffner Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Affidavit Heffner Declaration, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice).(Miller, Kim)
March 2, 2023 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. The Board of Trustees of Columbia University in the City of New York waiver sent on 3/2/2023, answer due 5/1/2023. Document filed by Alexandra Koenigsberg; Olga Stambler; Maxwell Koenigsberg..(Miller, Kim)
February 16, 2023 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #7 MOTION for Matthew T. Heffner to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-27349050. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from Supreme Court of Illinois 217-782-2035;. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order. (sgz)
February 16, 2023 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #8 MOTION for Matthew T. Hurst to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-27349198. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from Supreme Court of Illinois 217-782-2035;. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order. (sgz)
February 15, 2023 Filing 8 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Matthew T. Hurst to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-27349198. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Alexandra Koenigsberg, Maxwell Koenigsberg, Olga Stambler. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Hurst certificate of good standing, #2 Affidavit Hurst declaration, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed order).(Miller, Kim) Modified on 2/16/2023 (sgz).
February 15, 2023 Filing 7 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Matthew T. Heffner to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-27349050. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Alexandra Koenigsberg, Maxwell Koenigsberg, Olga Stambler. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Heffner cert of good standing, #2 Affidavit Heffner declaration, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order).(Miller, Kim) Modified on 2/16/2023 (sgz).
February 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 5/18/2023 at 10:45 AM in Courtroom 705, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Paul G. Gardephe. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 2/15/2023) (ks)
February 10, 2023 Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (laq)
February 10, 2023 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Paul G. Gardephe. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (laq)
February 10, 2023 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:22-cv-05945-PGG. Notice of Assignment to follow. (laq)
February 8, 2023 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to The Board of Trustees of Columbia University in the City of New York..(pc)
February 8, 2023 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
February 8, 2023 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Kim Elaine Miller. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Alexandra Koenigsberg, Olga Stambler, Maxwell Koenigsberg. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted;. (pc)
February 8, 2023 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. .(pc)
February 8, 2023 CASE REFERRED TO Judge Paul G. Gardephe as possibly related to 22cv5945. (pc)
February 7, 2023 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to The Board of Trustees of Columbia University in the City of New York, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Alexandra Koenigsberg, Maxwell Koenigsberg, Olga Stambler..(Miller, Kim)
February 7, 2023 Filing 3 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 22-cv-5945 (PGG). Document filed by Alexandra Koenigsberg, Maxwell Koenigsberg, Olga Stambler..(Miller, Kim)
February 7, 2023 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Miller, Kim)
February 7, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against The Board of Trustees of Columbia University in the City of New York. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-27310102)Document filed by Alexandra Koenigsberg, Olga Stambler, Maxwell Koenigsberg..(Miller, Kim)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Koenigsberg et al v. The Board of Trustees of Columbia University in the City of New York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexandra Koenigsberg
Represented By: Kim Elaine Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maxwell Koenigsberg
Represented By: Kim Elaine Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Olga Stambler
Represented By: Kim Elaine Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Board of Trustees of Columbia University in the City of New York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?