AMTAX Holdings 227, LLC v. CohnReznick LLP
Plaintiff: AMTAX Holdings 227, LLC
Defendant: CohnReznick LLP
Intervenor Defendant: Tenants' Development Corporation
Case Number: 1:2023cv01124
Filed: February 9, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Naomi Reice Buchwald
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 fr Fed. Question: Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion addressed to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald from L. Reid Skibell dated 3/15/2023 re: #12 LETTER MOTION for Conference [PRE-MOTION] addressed to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald from Sean M. Zaroogian for Tenants' Development Corporation dated March 8, 2023. . Document filed by AMTAX Holdings 227, LLC..(Skibell, L. Reid)
March 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 LETTER RESPONSE to Motion addressed to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald from Melissa A. Pena, Esq. dated March 13, 2023 re: #12 LETTER MOTION for Conference [PRE-MOTION] addressed to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald from Sean M. Zaroogian for Tenants' Development Corporation dated March 8, 2023. . Document filed by CohnReznick LLP..(Pena, Melissa)
March 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion addressed to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald from L. Reid Skibell dated 3/13/2023 re: #12 LETTER MOTION for Conference [PRE-MOTION] addressed to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald from Sean M. Zaroogian for Tenants' Development Corporation dated March 8, 2023. . Document filed by AMTAX Holdings 227, LLC..(Skibell, L. Reid)
March 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Motion for David A. Davenport to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald on 3/10/2023) (ate)
March 9, 2023 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #13 MOTION for David Allan Davenport to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-27442047. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (aea)
March 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MOTION for David Allan Davenport to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-27442047. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Tenants' Development Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of Motion to Admit Counsel Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Text of Proposed Order Granting Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice).(Davenport, David)
March 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 LETTER MOTION for Conference [PRE-MOTION] addressed to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald from Sean M. Zaroogian for Tenants' Development Corporation dated March 8, 2023. Document filed by Tenants' Development Corporation..(Zaroogian, Sean)
March 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #10 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint, addressed to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald from Melissa A. Pena dated March 2, 2023., #1 Complaint. Application granted. CohnReznick LLP answer due 4/8/2023. (Signed by Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald on 3/3/2023) (ate)
March 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint, addressed to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald from Melissa A. Pena dated March 2, 2023. Document filed by CohnReznick LLP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Stipulation to Extend Time to File Responsive Pleading).(Pena, Melissa)
March 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Benjamin Schwartz on behalf of CohnReznick LLP..(Schwartz, Benjamin)
March 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Melissa Anne Pena on behalf of CohnReznick LLP..(Pena, Melissa)
February 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. CohnReznick LLP served on 2/15/2023, answer due 3/8/2023. Service was accepted by Stephen Scott, Clerk. Document filed by AMTAX Holdings 227, LLC..(Skibell, L. Reid)
February 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to CohnReznick LLP..(pc)
February 10, 2023 Opinion or Order CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
February 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
February 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Case Designated ECF. (pc)
February 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Avelino A. Garcia on behalf of AMTAX Holdings 227, LLC..(Garcia, Avelino)
February 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Olga Lucia Fuentes-Skinner on behalf of AMTAX Holdings 227, LLC..(Fuentes-Skinner, Olga)
February 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to CohnReznick LLP, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by AMTAX Holdings 227, LLC..(Skibell, L. Reid)
February 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Skibell, L. Reid)
February 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CohnReznick LLP. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-27321875)Document filed by AMTAX Holdings 227, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - 2/28/2017 Letter, #2 Exhibit 2 - 4/3/2018 Letter, #3 Exhibit 3 - 5/26/2019).(Skibell, L. Reid)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AMTAX Holdings 227, LLC v. CohnReznick LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AMTAX Holdings 227, LLC
Represented By: Avelino A. Garcia
Represented By: Olga Lucia Fuentes-Skinner
Represented By: L. Reid Skibell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CohnReznick LLP
Represented By: Benjamin Schwartz
Represented By: Melissa Anne Pena
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Tenants' Development Corporation
Represented By: David A Davenport
Represented By: Sean Michael Zaroogian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?