Costello v. Paramount Global, Inc.
Plaintiff: Sue Costello
Defendant: Paramount Global, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2023cv01553
Filed: February 21, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lorna G Schofield
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 1, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 6, 2023 Filing 10 LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Sue Costello dated 4/6/2023 re: I am writing ou to respectfully request that the entire back account number on my exhibit submitted for case 23cv1553 Sue Costello VS. Paramount Inc. be redacted to show only the last 4 digits...I request that the case to be public record. Document filed by Sue Costello. (ok)
March 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 INFORMATION PACKAGE MAILED to Sue Costello, at 120 Quincy Shore Drive, Quincy, MA 02171, on 3/31/2023 Re: #7 Order of Service. The following document(s) were enclosed in the Service Package: a copy of the order of service or order to answer and other orders entered to date, the individual practices of the district judge and magistrate judge assigned to your case, Instructions for Litigants Who Do Not Have Attorneys, Notice Regarding Privacy and Public Access to Electronic Case Files, a flyer about the free legal assistance clinic located in the Thurgood Marshall Courthouse (only in non prisoner cases), a Motions guide, a notice that the Pro Se Manual has been discontinued, a Notice of Change of Address form to use if your contact information changes, a handout explaining matters handled by magistrate judges and consent form to complete if all parties agree to proceed for all purposes before the magistrate judge, a form for you to complete if you consent to receive filings electronically (only in nonprisoner cases).(sha)
March 31, 2023 Filing 8 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Paramount Global, Inc.. (sha)
March 31, 2023 FRCP 4 SERVICE PACKAGE HAND DELIVERED TO U.S.M.: on 3/31/2023 Re: Judge Laura Taylor Swain #7 Order of Service. The following document(s) were enclosed in the Service Package: Complaint, Summons, IFP, Order of Service, Completed U.S.M. form(s) for defendant(s) Paramount Global, Inc.. (sha)
March 29, 2023 Mailed a copy of #6 Order for Initial Pretrial Conference, to Sue Costello at 120 Quincy Shore Drive Quincy, MA 02171. (ok)
March 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER OF SERVICE: The Court directs the Clerk of Court to mail an information package to Plaintiff. The Court also directs the Clerk of Court to issue a summons for Paramount; complete a USM-285 form with the address for Paramount; and deliver all documents necessary to effect service on Paramount to the U.S. Marshals Service. A flyer from NYLAG is attached to this order. SO ORDERED. USM-285 Form due by 4/27/2023. Request for Issuance of Summons due by 4/27/2023. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 3/28/2023) (ama)
March 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: This case has been assigned to me for all purposes. The parties should abide by this Court's Individual Rules of Practice in Civil Pro Se Cases, which are attached to this Order and can be found on the internet at http://www.nysd.uscourts.gov/judge/Schofield. It is hereby ORDERED that a telephonic conference will be held on May 31, 2023 at 4:20 p.m. The parties shall call (888) 363-4749 and enter the access code 558-3333. DATE AND TIME OF CONFERENCE: May 31, 2023 at 4:20 p.m. IPTC MATERIALS DUE: May 24, 2023 at noon. The clerk is directed to mail a copy of this order to the pro se Plaintiff. Telephonic Initial Conference set for 5/31/2023 at 04:20 PM before Judge Lorna G. Schofield. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 3/28/2023) (ama)
March 27, 2023 Magistrate Judge Valerie Figueredo is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vba)
March 27, 2023 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Lorna G. Schofield. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (vba)
March 2, 2023 Filing 4 PRO SE CONSENT TO RECEIVE ELECTRONIC SERVICE. The following party: Sue Costello consents to receive electronic service via the ECF system. Document filed by Sue Costello.(sc)
February 27, 2023 MAILING RECEIPT: Document No: 3. Mailed to: Sue Costello 120 Quincy Shore Drive Quincy, MA 02171. (kh)
February 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER GRANTING IFP APPLICATION: Leave to proceed in this Court without prepayment of fees is authorized. 28 U.S.C. 1915. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 2/24/2023) (vn)
February 21, 2023 Filing 2 REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by Sue Costello. (sac)
February 21, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Paramount Global, Inc. Document filed by Sue Costello. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4) (sac)
February 21, 2023 Case Designated ECF. (sac)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Costello v. Paramount Global, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sue Costello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paramount Global, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?